ALLIS v. ARMET, et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit New Jersey District Court, Case No. 1:97-cv-03619-SSB

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo ROSEMARIE ALLIS, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space HOWARD A. GROSS +1 856 488 4555
v.
No Logo Abc Corporation, Defendant
No Logo ARMET, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space WILLIAM A. GARRIGLE +1 856 427 9300 garrigle@aol.com
No Logo Abc Corporation, Cross-Defendant
No Logo ARMET, Cross-Claimant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space WILLIAM A. GARRIGLE +1 856 427 9300 garrigle@aol.com
Office Camden
Filed 7/18/1997
Jury Demand Both
Demand $0
Nature of Suit 365 - Personal Injury: Product Liability
Cause Section 28 U.S.C. § 1332 Diversity-Product Liability
Jurisdiction Diversity
Disposition Dismissed - Settled
County Camden
Terminated 1/28/2000
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case {}
Def Custody Status
Flags 12BG, CLOSED, PRETRL
  Entries (26) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 18 Filed: 5/4/2000, Entered: 5/4/2000 Stipulation of Dismissal
STIPULATION of dismissal with prejudice and without costs to either party. Notice mailed. (er)
    LREF
    Blank 17 Filed: 1/28/2000, Entered: 1/28/2000 OrderCourt Filing
    ORDER, dismissing action without costs & without prejudice ( signed by Judge Stanley S. Brotman ) (bf) Modified on 01/28/2000
      LREF
      Blank -- Filed: 1/28/2000, Entered: 1/28/2000 Terminated Case
      Case closed (bf)
        LREF
        Blank -- Filed: 1/27/2000, Entered: 1/27/2000 Pretrial Conference - Initial
        Pre-trial conference held before Mag. Judge Joel B. Rosen on 1/21/00. (femp)
          LREF
          Blank 16 Filed: 1/24/2000, Entered: 1/26/2000 Pretrial OrderCourt Filing
          FINAL PRETRIAL ORDER filed ( signed by Mag. Judge Joel B. Rosen ) (er)
            LREF
            Blank 15 Filed: 1/3/2000, Entered: 1/3/2000 OrderCourt Filing
            ORDER compelling the deposition of plaintiff's expert by February 1, 2000 or his expert report will be stricken and his testimony barred at the time of trial. nm ( signed by Mag. Judge Joel B. Rosen ) (er)
              LREF
              Blank 14 Filed: 12/29/1999, Entered: 12/30/1999 OrderCourt Filing
              ORDER compelling the deposition of plaintiff's expert no later than January 14, 2000, or his testimony will be barred at the time of trial in this matter ( signed by Mag. Judge Joel B. Rosen ) (er)
                LREF
                Blank -- Filed: 12/17/1999, Entered: 12/17/1999 Pretrial Conference - Initial
                Pre-trial conference resetting to 1/21/00 before Mag. Rosen. (bf)
                  LREF
                  Blank 13 Filed: 10/18/1999, Entered: 10/19/1999 Scheduling OrderCourt Filing
                  FINAL SCHEDULING ORDER setting Pretrial conference 10:00AM on 12/10/99; Trial with juryset for 1/10/00; Dispositive Motions due on or before 11/19/99; Trial briefs, proposed voir dire questions and request to charge, etc., are to be delivered to Judge Brotman no later than January 3, 2000 even if the trial is adjourned. (signed by Mag. Judge Joel B. Rosen ) (er) Modified on 10/19/1999
                    LREF
                    Blank -- Filed: 10/18/1999, Entered: 10/25/1999 Status Conference
                    Status conference held before Mag. Judge Joel B. Rosen on 10/18/99. (er)
                      LREF
                      Blank -- Filed: 4/28/1999, Entered: 4/28/1999 Settlement Conference
                      Settlement conference held before Mag. Judge Joel B. Rosen on 04/20/99. (bf)
                        LREF
                        Blank 12 Filed: 4/26/1999, Entered: 4/28/1999 Scheduling OrderCourt Filing
                        SCHEDULING ORDER setting Discovery cutoff 6/30/99 ; Pretrial conference 11:15 10/18/99 ; Trial with jury 9:30 11/8/99 ; Pretrial order to be submitted on or before 10/18/99 ; Pretrial Submission Due on or before 11/1/99 ; Dispositive Motion due on or before 9/1/99 ( signed by Mag. Judge Joel B. Rosen ) (bf)
                          LREF
                          Blank -- Filed: 12/31/1998, Entered: 12/31/1998 Scheduling Conference
                          Scheduling conference held before Mag. Judge Joel B. Rosen on December 23, 1998. (jm1)
                            LREF
                            Blank 11 Filed: 12/28/1998, Entered: 3/10/1999 Scheduling OrderCourt Filing
                            SCHEDULING ORDER setting Discovery cutoff 6/30/99 ; Settlement conference 9:00 4/26/99 ; ( signed by Mag. Judge Joel B. Rosen ) (er)
                              LREF
                              Blank 10 Filed: 11/4/1998, Entered: 11/4/1998 OrderCourt Filing
                              ORDER, setting scheduling conference for 2:00 12/23/98 ( signed by Mag. Judge Joel B. Rosen ) (er)
                                LREF
                                Blank 9 Filed: 11/4/1998, Entered: 11/4/1998 Crossclaim
                                CROSSCLAIM by ARMET against ABC CORPORATION (er)
                                  LREF
                                  Blank 9 Filed: 11/4/1998, Entered: 11/4/1998, Terminated: 1/28/2000 Answer to Amended Complaint
                                  ANSWER by ARMET to amended complaint; jury demand (er)
                                    LREF
                                    Blank 8 Filed: 11/4/1998, Entered: 11/4/1998 OrderCourt Filing
                                    CONSENT ORDER extending time to answer of defendant, ARMET (signed by Mag. Judge Joel B. Rosen ) (er) Modified on 11/04/1998
                                      LREF
                                      Blank 7 Filed: 4/13/1998, Entered: 4/14/1998 Summons Returned Executed
                                      RETURN OF SERVICE executed as to defendant ARMET 3/20/98 personally. Answer due on 4/9/98 for ARMET. (er)
                                        LREF
                                        Blank 6 Filed: 2/18/1998, Entered: 2/18/1998 Minutes-Miscellaneous
                                        Minute entry: Minutes of: 02/18/98; The following actions were taken, withdrawing [4-1] dismiss/dismissal notice Call for Dismissal (bf)
                                          LREF
                                          Blank 5 Filed: 2/18/1998, Entered: 2/18/1998 Affidavit
                                          AFFIDAVIT of Howard A. Gross, Esq. on behalf of ROSEMARIE ALLIS Re: [4-1] dismiss/dismissal notice Call for Dismissal (er)
                                            LREF
                                            Blank 4 Filed: 1/30/1998, Entered: 1/30/1998, Terminated: 2/18/1998 Notice of Call for dismissal
                                            NOTICE of Call for Dismissal Pursuant to Rule 41.1(a) Motion hearing set for 10:30 2/19/98 (bf)
                                              LREF
                                              Blank 3 Filed: 8/7/1997, Entered: 8/21/1997 Amended Complaint
                                              AMENDED COMPLAINT by Plaintiff, ROSEMARIE ALLIS , (Answer due 8/17/97 for ABC CORPORATION ) amending [1-1] complaint (er)
                                                LREF
                                                Blank 2 Filed: 7/18/1997, Entered: 7/18/1997 Case Assigned/Reassigned
                                                NOTICE of Allocation and Assignment filed. Magistrate JOEL B. ROSEN (et)
                                                  LREF
                                                  Blank 1 Filed: 7/18/1997, Entered: 7/18/1997 Complaint
                                                  COMPLAINT filed; jury demand FILING FEE $ 150.00 (et)
                                                    LREF
                                                    Blank -- Filed: 7/18/1997, Entered: 7/18/1997 Summons Issued
                                                    SUMMONS(ES) issued for ARMET ( 20 Days) (Mailed to Counsel) (et)
                                                      LREF

                                                      Statistics

                                                      This case has been viewed 26 times.

                                                      No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                      Space
                                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                       
                                                      PlainSite
                                                      Sign Up
                                                      Need Password Help?