U.S. Securities and Exchange Commission v. Kik Interactive Inc.
Federal Civil Lawsuit New York Southern District Court, Case No. 1:19-cv-05244-AKH
District Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein, presiding

Tags
Last Updated December 29, 2020 at 10:04 AM ST (8.8 months ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

United States Securities and Exchange Commission United States Securities and Exchange Commission, Plaintiff
Officially listed as "U.S. Securities and Exchange Commission"

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Laura D'Allaird +1 202 551 5475 dallairdl@sec.gov

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Securities and Exchange Commission

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space David Stuart Mendel +1 202 551 4418 +1 202 772 9240 mendeld@sec.gov
Space Stephan Jacob Schlegelmilch +1 202 551 4935 +1 202 772 9292 schlegelmilchs@sec.gov
v.
No Logo Kik Interactive Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Cooley LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Luke T. Cadigan +1 617 937 2480 +1 617 937 2400 lcadigan@cooley.com
Space Brett Hom De Jarnette +1 650 849 7005 +1 650 849 7400 bdejarnette@cooley.com
Space Patrick Edward Gibbs +1 650 843 5000 +1 650 849 7400 pgibbs@cooley.com
Space Sarah Malke Lightdale +1 212 479 6000 +1 212 479 6275 slightdale@cooley.com
Office Foley Square
Filed 6/4/2019
Jury Demand Both
Demand
Nature of Suit 850 - Other Statutes: Securities/Commodities/Exchange
Cause Section 15 U.S.C. § 77 Securities Fraud
Jurisdiction U.S. Government Plaintiff
Disposition
County XX Out of U.S.
Terminated
Origin 1
Reopened
Lead Case
None
Related Case
None
Other Court Case None
Defendant Custody Status
Flag ECF
  Entries (95) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 91 Filed: 12/29/2020, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 90 Filed: 10/21/2020, Entered: None Judgment
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 89 Filed: 10/20/2020, Entered: None Proposed Consent Order
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 88 Filed: 9/30/2020, Entered: None Memorandum & Opinion
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 87 Filed: 6/18/2020, Entered: None Order
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 86 Filed: 5/22/2020, Entered: None Order on Motion for Leave to File Document
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 85 Filed: 5/20/2020, Entered: None Letter
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 84 Filed: 5/19/2020, Entered: None Order on Motion for Leave to File Document
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 83 Filed: 5/11/2020, Entered: None Leave to File Document
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 82 Filed: 5/9/2020, Entered: None Reply Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 81 Filed: 5/8/2020, Entered: None Declaration in Support of Motion
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 80 Filed: 5/8/2020, Entered: None Reply Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 79 Filed: 4/24/2020, Entered: None Declaration in Opposition to Motion
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 78 Filed: 4/24/2020, Entered: None Counter Statement to Rule 56.1
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 77 Filed: 4/24/2020, Entered: None Memorandum of Law in Opposition to Motion
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 76 Filed: 4/24/2020, Entered: None Declaration in Opposition to Motion
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 75 Filed: 4/24/2020, Entered: None Counter Statement to Rule 56.1
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 74 Filed: 4/24/2020, Entered: None Memorandum of Law in Opposition to Motion
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 73 Filed: 4/22/2020, Entered: None Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 72 Filed: 4/22/2020, Entered: None Order on Motion for Leave to File Document
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 70 Filed: 4/17/2020, Entered: None Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 69 Filed: 4/17/2020, Entered: None Brief
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 68 Filed: 4/17/2020, Entered: None Leave to File Document
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 67 Filed: 4/17/2020, Entered: None Amicus Curiae Appearance
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 66 Filed: 4/17/2020, Entered: None Appear Pro Hac Vice
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 65 Filed: 3/26/2020, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 64 Filed: 3/20/2020, Entered: None Declaration in Support of Motion
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 63 Filed: 3/20/2020, Entered: None Rule 56.1 Statement
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 62 Filed: 3/20/2020, Entered: None Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 61 Filed: 3/20/2020, Entered: None SUMMARY JUDGMENT
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 60 Filed: 3/20/2020, Entered: None Declaration in Support of Motion
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 59 Filed: 3/20/2020, Entered: None Rule 56.1 Statement
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 58 Filed: 3/20/2020, Entered: None Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 3/20/2020, Entered: None SUMMARY JUDGMENT
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 3/13/2020, Entered: None Endorsed Letter
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 2/12/2020, Entered: None Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 2/12/2020, Entered: None Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 2/10/2020, Entered: None Appear Pro Hac Vice
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 2/10/2020, Entered: None Appear Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 2/4/2020, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 1/29/2020, Entered: None Notice of Filing Transcript
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 1/29/2020, Entered: None Transcript
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 1/23/2020, Entered: None Order on Motion for Discovery
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 1/17/2020, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 1/16/2020, Entered: None Order
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 1/14/2020, Entered: None Discovery
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 1/10/2020, Entered: None Memo Endorsement
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 1/9/2020, Entered: None Status Report
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 11/27/2019, Entered: None Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 11/26/2019, Entered: None Scheduling Order
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 11/26/2019, Entered: None Order on Motion to Compel
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 11/26/2019, Entered: None Appear Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 11/22/2019, Entered: None Compel
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 11/11/2019, Entered: None Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 11/8/2019, Entered: None Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 11/8/2019, Entered: None Reconsideration
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document 24 Filed: 8/13/2019, Entered: 8/13/2019 Order on Motion to appear pro hac viceCourt Filing
                                                                                                                  ORDER FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE granting [23] Motion for Laura K. D'Allaird to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The motion of Laura K. D' Allaird for admission to practice pro hac vice in the above-captioned action is granted. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED THAT Applicant is admitted to practice pro hac vice in the above-captioned case in the United States District Court for the Southern District of New York. All attorneys appearing before this Court are subject to the Local Rules of this Court, including the Rules governing discipline of attorneys. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 8/13/19) (yv)
                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 11/6/2019, Entered: None Extension of Time to Complete Discovery
                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 8/12/2019, Entered: 8/12/2019, Terminated: 8/13/2019 Motion to appear pro hac vice
                                                                                                                      MOTION for Laura Kathleen D'Allaird to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by U.S. Securities and Exchange Commission. (Attachments: # (1) Affidavit DAllaird Declaration, # (2) Exhibit Certificates of Good Standing, # (3) Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order for DAllaird Pro Hac)(D'Allaird, Laura)
                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 10/31/2019, Entered: None Protective Order
                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                          Blank  Notice Regarding Pro Hac Vice Motion
                                                                                                                          >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. [23] MOTION for Laura Kathleen D'Allaird to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (wb)
                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document 22 Filed: 8/6/2019, Entered: 8/6/2019 Answer
                                                                                                                            ANSWER to [1] Complaint with JURY DEMAND. Document filed by Kik Interactive Inc..(Gibbs, Patrick)
                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document 21 Filed: 8/6/2019, Entered: 8/6/2019 letterCourt Filing
                                                                                                                              LETTER addressed to Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein from Patrick E. Gibbs dated August 6, 2019 re: Submission of Authorities. Document filed by Kik Interactive Inc..(Gibbs, Patrick)
                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 10/29/2019, Entered: None Proposed Protective Order
                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 7/29/2019, Entered: 7/29/2019 Notice of Filing Transcript
                                                                                                                                  NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a CONFERENCE proceeding held on 7/19/19 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days...(McGuirk, Kelly)
                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 10/28/2019, Entered: None Discovery
                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 7/29/2019, Entered: 7/29/2019 transcriptCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                      TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings re: conference held on 7/19/2019 before Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Jennifer Thun, (212) 805-0300. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 8/19/2019. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 8/29/2019. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 10/28/2019.(McGuirk, Kelly)
                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 10/24/2019, Entered: None Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 7/24/2019, Entered: 7/24/2019 Order on Motion to appear pro hac viceCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                          ORDER FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE granting [17] Motion for Brett de Jarnette to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 7/24/2019) (ne)
                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 10/24/2019, Entered: None Judgment on the Pleadings
                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 7/23/2019, Entered: 7/23/2019, Terminated: 7/24/2019 Motion to appear pro hac vice
                                                                                                                                              MOTION for Brett de Jarnette to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-17298543. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Kik Interactive Inc.. (Attachments: # (1) Declaration of Brett de Jarnette, # (2) Certificate of Good Standing, # (3) Text of Proposed Order)(Brett, Jarnette)
                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                Blank  Notice Regarding Pro Hac Vice Motion
                                                                                                                                                >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. [17] MOTION for Brett de Jarnette to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-17298543. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (wb)
                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 16 Filed: 7/17/2019, Entered: 7/17/2019 Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement
                                                                                                                                                  RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Kik Interactive Inc..(Lightdale, Sarah)
                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 15 Filed: 7/16/2019, Entered: 7/16/2019 Order on Motion to appear pro hac viceCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                    ORDER FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE granting [14] Motion for Patrick E. Gibbs to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 7/16/2019) (ne)
                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 7/15/2019, Entered: 7/15/2019, Terminated: 7/16/2019 Motion to appear pro hac vice
                                                                                                                                                      MOTION for Patrick E. Gibbs to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-17245163. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Kik Interactive Inc.. (Attachments: # (1) Declaration of Patrick Gibbs, # (2) Certificate of Good Standing, # (3) Certificate of Good Standing, # (4) Text of Proposed Order)(Gibbs, Patrick)
                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 7/15/2019, Entered: 7/15/2019 Order on Motion to appear pro hac viceCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                        ORDER FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE granting [12] Motion for Luke T. Cadigan to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 7/15/2019) (jca)
                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Blank  Notice Regarding Pro Hac Vice Motion
                                                                                                                                                          >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. [14] MOTION for Patrick E. Gibbs to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-17245163. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (jc)
                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 7/12/2019, Entered: 7/12/2019, Terminated: 7/15/2019 Motion to appear pro hac vice
                                                                                                                                                            MOTION for Luke T. Cadigan to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-17235438. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Kik Interactive Inc.. (Attachments: # (1) Affidavit Declaration of Luke T. Cadigan, # (2) Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing - Massachusetts, # (3) Text of Proposed Order)(Cadigan, Luke)
                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 7/12/2019, Entered: 7/12/2019 Notice of appearance
                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Sarah Malke Lightdale on behalf of Kik Interactive Inc.. (Lightdale, Sarah)
                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Blank  Notice Regarding Pro Hac Vice Motion
                                                                                                                                                                >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. [12] MOTION for Luke T. Cadigan to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-17235438. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (wb)
                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 6/18/2019, Entered: 6/18/2019 waiver of service executed
                                                                                                                                                                  WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED. Kik Interactive Inc. waiver sent on 6/5/2019, answer due 9/3/2019. Document filed by U.S. Securities and Exchange Commission. (Mendel, David)
                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 9 Filed: 6/17/2019, Entered: 6/17/2019 Order for Initial Pretrial ConferenceCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE OF COURT CONFERENCE: It is Ordered that counsel to whom this Order is sent is responsible for faxing a copy to all counsel and retaining verification of such in the case file. Do not fax such verification to Chambers. Please include telephone numbers and fax numbers on all documents submitted to the Court. (Initial Conference set for 7/19/2019 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 14D, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein.) (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 6/17/2019) (jca)
                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 6/13/2019, Entered: 6/13/2019 Order on Motion to appear pro hac viceCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE granting [7] Motion for Stephan Jacob Schlegelmilch to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (As further set forth in this Order.) (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 6/13/2019) (cf)
                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 6/12/2019, Entered: 6/12/2019, Terminated: 6/13/2019 Motion to appear pro hac vice
                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION for Stephan Jacob Schlegelmilch to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by U.S. Securities and Exchange Commission. (Attachments: # (1) Affidavit, # (2) Text of Proposed Order)(Schlegelmilch, Stephan)
                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                          Blank  Notice Regarding Pro Hac Vice Motion
                                                                                                                                                                          >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. [7] MOTION for Stephan Jacob Schlegelmilch to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (bcu)
                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 6 Filed: 6/6/2019, Entered: 6/6/2019 Order on Motion to appear pro hac viceCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE granting [4] Motion for David S. Mendel to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 6/6/2019) (rjm)
                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 5 Filed: 6/5/2019, Entered: 6/5/2019 Summons issued
                                                                                                                                                                              ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Kik Interactive Inc.. (pc)
                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                Blank  Case Designated ECF.
                                                                                                                                                                                Case Designated ECF. (pc)
                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank  Case Designation
                                                                                                                                                                                  Magistrate Judge Stewart D. Aaron is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php. (pc)
                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank  Case Opening Initial Assignment Notice
                                                                                                                                                                                    CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at http://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/District. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at http://nysd.uscourts.gov/ecf_filing.php. (pc)
                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 6/4/2019, Entered: 6/4/2019, Terminated: 6/6/2019 Motion to appear pro hac vice
                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION for David Stuart Mendel to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by U.S. Securities and Exchange Commission. (Attachments: # (1) Affidavit Mendel Declaration, # (2) Exhibit Certificates of Good Standing, # (3) Text of Proposed Order)(Mendel, David)
                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 3 Filed: 6/4/2019, Entered: 6/4/2019 Request for Issuance of Summons
                                                                                                                                                                                        REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Kik Interactive Inc., re: [1] Complaint. Document filed by U.S. Securities and Exchange Commission. (Mendel, David)
                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 6/4/2019, Entered: 6/4/2019 Civil Cover Sheet
                                                                                                                                                                                          CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Mendel, David)
                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 1 Filed: 6/4/2019, Entered: 6/4/2019 Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                            COMPLAINT against Kik Interactive Inc.. Document filed by U.S. Securities and Exchange Commission.(Mendel, David)
                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank  Notice Regarding Pro Hac Vice Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                              >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. [4] MOTION for David Stuart Mendel to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (jc)
                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF

                                                                                                                                                                                                Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                                                This case has been viewed 94 times.

                                                                                                                                                                                                No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                                                Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                 
                                                                                                                                                                                                PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                                                Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                                                Need Password Help?