Singh v. U.S. Department of State
Federal Civil Lawsuit Washington Western District Court, Case No. 2:18-cv-01210
District Judge Thomas S. Zilly, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated January 15, 2020 at 7:36 PM ST (1.3 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Gurnek Singh, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by LAW OFFICES OF CAROL L. EDWARD & ASSOCIATES

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Carol L. Edward +1 206 956 9556 +1 206 956 4025 carol@seattle-immigration.com
No Logo Pawan Deep Kaur, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by LAW OFFICES OF CAROL L. EDWARD & ASSOCIATES

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Carol L. Edward +1 206 956 9556 +1 206 956 4025 carol@seattle-immigration.com
v.
Pompeo, Michael Richard Pompeo, Michael Richard, Defendant
Officially listed as "Michael R. Pompeo"
United States Department of State United States Department of State, Defendant
Officially listed as "U.S. Department of State"
Citation Section 05 U.S.C. § 552
Nature of Suit 895 - Freedom of Information Act
  Entries (20) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 1/15/2020, Entered: None Judgment by Court
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 1/15/2020, Entered: None Order on Motion for Summary Judgment
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 11/8/2019, Entered: None Supplement
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 10/25/2019, Entered: None 2 - Minute Order
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 9/21/2019, Entered: None Reply to Response to Motion
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 9/13/2019, Entered: None Declaration
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 9/13/2019, Entered: None Reply to Response to Motion
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 8/20/2019, Entered: None SUMMARY JUDGMENT
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 8/20/2019, Entered: None SUMMARY JUDGMENT
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 11/16/2018, Entered: None Answer
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 11/16/2018, Entered: None Notice of appearance
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 9/5/2018, Entered: None Court Filing
                        ORDER setting deadline for parties to file a Joint Status Report. Joint Status Report due by 12/4/2018. Signed by Judge Thomas S. Zilly. (PM) (Entered: 09/05/2018)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 8/23/2018, Entered: None Redacted Document
                          REDACTION to 1 Complaint,, by Plaintiff Gurnek Singh (Edward, Carol) (Entered: 08/23/2018)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 8/21/2018, Entered: None Redacted Document
                            REDACTION to 1 Complaint 4 Redacted Document, 3 Notice to Filer, Notice to Filer,, by Plaintiff Gurnek Singh (Edward, Carol) Modified docket entry relationship on 8/22/2018 (SWT). (Entered: 08/21/2018)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 8/20/2018, Entered: None Redacted Document
                              REDACTION to 1 Complaint Notice to Filer, by Plaintiff Gurnek Singh (Edward, Carol) Modified docket entry relationship on 8/21/2018 (SWT). (Entered: 08/20/2018)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 8/20/2018, Entered: None Notice to Filer
                                NOTICE TO FILER: re 1 Complaint. Notice of Filing Deficiency** Action Required ** See Attached Letter for More Information and Instructions. (ST) (Entered: 08/20/2018)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 8/20/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                  NOTICE TO FILER: re 1 Complaint. The exhibits attached to the complaint contain personal identifiers that must be redacted pursuant to FRCP 5.2 and LCR 5.2. Specifically, the pictures of the minor child on pages 3, 8 and 9 must be redacted as well as the personal identifier on page 25. You are required to re-file a redacted version of your document using the event "Redacted Document" located in the Other Documents category. This event will allow you to link back to your original filing and will not affect your original filing date. Pursuant to FRCP 5.2 and LCR 5.2, the document(s) have been administratively sealed by the Court. (ST)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 8/20/2018, Entered: None Summons issued
                                  Summons(es) Electronically Issued as to defendant(s) Michael R. Pompeo, U.S. Department of State (Attachments: # 1 Summons)(ST) (Entered: 08/20/2018)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 8/20/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                    Judge Thomas S. Zilly added. (ST)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document 1 Filed: 8/16/2018, Entered: None Complaint
                                      SEALED DOCUMENT COMPLAINT for Declaratory and Injunctive Relief against All Defendants (Receipt # 0981-5437757), filed by Gurnek Singh and Pawan Deep Kaur. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Summons, # 3 Summons, # 4 Civil Cover Sheet)(Edward, Carol) Modified on 8/20/2018 at the request of finance to correct the case number. (ST) Modified on 8/20/2018 to seal Complaint; document contains identifiers that must be redacted per FRCP 5.2 (full last name of minor child) (KB). (Entered: 08/16/2018)
                                      LREF

                                      Statistics

                                      This case has been viewed 3 times.

                                      No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                      Space
                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                       
                                      PlainSite
                                      Sign Up
                                      Need Password Help?