Fregosi v. Department of Social and Health Services
Federal Civil Lawsuit Washington Western District Court, Case No. 3:18-cv-05440

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated June 23, 2019 at 2:08 AM DT (2 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Citation Section 28 U.S.C. § 1331
Nature of Suit Assault Libel & Slander
  Entries (21) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 10/9/2018, Entered: None
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 10/8/2018, Entered: None Joint Status Report
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 9/27/2018, Entered: None Order on motion to appoint counsel
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 9/18/2018, Entered: None Notice re Pro Se Registration
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 9/13/2018, Entered: None Response to motion
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 9/11/2018, Entered: None Continue
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 9/11/2018, Entered: None Appoint Counsel
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 8/22/2018, Entered: None Answer to amended complaint
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 8/20/2018, Entered: None Notice of unavailability
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 8/15/2018, Entered: None Amended Complaint
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 7/30/2018, Entered: None Order on Motion for More Definite StatementCourt Filing
                      ORDER ON DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR A MORE DEFINITE STATEMENT, granting 11 Motion for More Definite Statement. Amended Complaint due 8/17/18. Signed by Judge Robert J. Bryan. Paper copy sent to plaintiff at Burley address. (JL)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 7/9/2018, Entered: None More Definite Statement
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 7/5/2018, Entered: None
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 6/27/2018, Entered: None Notice of appearance
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 6/19/2018, Entered: None Affidavit of Service of Summons and Complaint
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 6/19/2018, Entered: None Affidavit of Service of Summons and Complaint
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 6/13/2018, Entered: None Joint Status Report Order Form for District Judges
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 6/13/2018, Entered: None
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 6/13/2018, Entered: None Complaint
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 6/13/2018, Entered: None order on motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 6/5/2018, Entered: None Motion for Leave to Proceed in Forma Pauperis
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF

                                            Statistics

                                            This case has been viewed 0 times.

                                            No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                            Space
                                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                             
                                            PlainSite
                                            Sign Up
                                            Need Password Help?