Roche Diagnostics Corporation v. Priority Healthcare Corporation
Federal Civil Lawsuit Alabama Northern District Court, Case No. 2:18-cv-01479
District Judge Karon O. Bowdre, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated June 17, 2019 at 12:56 AM DT (1.9 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Roche Diabetes Care, Inc., Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Lanier Ford Shaver & Payne, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY David J Canupp +1 256 535 1100 +1 256 533 9322 djc@LanierFord.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY James Bradley Emmons +1 256 535 1100 +1 256 533 9322 jbe@lanierford.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of Jane Marie Metcalf

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, PRO HAC VICE, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, PRO HAC VICE, LEAD ATTORNEY Aron Fischer +1 212 336 2000 afischer@pbwt.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, PRO HAC VICE, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, PRO HAC VICE, LEAD ATTORNEY Timothy Gray +1 212 336 2000 +1 212 336 2222 tgray@pbwt.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, PRO HAC VICE, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, PRO HAC VICE, LEAD ATTORNEY Geoffrey Potter +1 212 336 2000 +1 212 336 2222 gpotter@pbwt.com
No Logo Roche Diagnostics Corporation, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Lanier Ford Shaver & Payne, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY David J Canupp +1 256 535 1100 +1 256 533 9322 djc@LanierFord.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY James Bradley Emmons +1 256 535 1100 +1 256 533 9322 jbe@lanierford.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of Jane Marie Metcalf

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, PRO HAC VICE, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, PRO HAC VICE, LEAD ATTORNEY Aron Fischer +1 212 336 2000 afischer@pbwt.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, PRO HAC VICE, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, PRO HAC VICE, LEAD ATTORNEY Timothy Gray +1 212 336 2000 +1 212 336 2222 tgray@pbwt.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, PRO HAC VICE, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, PRO HAC VICE, LEAD ATTORNEY Geoffrey Potter +1 212 336 2000 +1 212 336 2222 gpotter@pbwt.com
v.
No Logo Amory Discount Pharmacy LLC, Defendant
No Logo Amory Priority Care Pharmacy LLC, Defendant
No Logo Ashley Tigrett, Defendant
No Logo B&K Express Care Pharmacy LLC, Defendant
No Logo B&K Priority Care Pharmacy LLC, Defendant
No Logo Bowies Express Care Pharmacy LLC, Defendant
No Logo Bowies Priority Care Pharmacy LLC, Defendant
No Logo Burns Discount Drug Store LLC, Defendant
No Logo Burns Drugstore Inc, Defendant
No Logo Carbon Hill Express Care Pharmacy LLC, Defendant
No Logo Christopher Daniel Knotts, Defendant
No Logo Daniel Baker, Defendant
No Logo Geneva Oswalt, Defendant
No Logo Jasper Express Care Pharmacy LLC, Defendant
No Logo Kimberly P Carson, Defendant
No Logo Konie Minga, Defendant
No Logo Main Street Drugs LLC, Defendant
No Logo Medical Park Discount Pharmacy LLC, Defendant
No Logo Medical Park Pharmacy Inc, Defendant
No Logo Medpoint Advantage LLC, Defendant
No Logo Medpoint Pharmacy Benefit Managers, Defendant
No Logo Melissa Sheffield, Defendant
No Logo Ozark Family Pharmacy LLC, Defendant
No Logo Phillip Anthony Minga, Defendant
No Logo Priority Care Medical Supply LLC, Defendant
No Logo Priority Care Pharmacy 2 LLC, Defendant
No Logo Priority Care Pharmacy at Cotton Gin Point LLC, Defendant
No Logo Priority Care Pharmacy LLC, Defendant
No Logo Priority Care Pharmacy Services LLC, Defendant
No Logo Priority Care Pharmacy Solutions LLC, Defendant
No Logo Priority Healthcare Corporation, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by MITCHELL, MCNUTT & SAMS, PA - Tupelo

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, PRO HAC VICE H. Richmond Culp, III +1 662 842 3871 +1 662 842 8450 rculp@mitchellmcnutt.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, PRO HAC VICE Albert G Delgadillo +1 662 842 3871 adelgadillo@mitchellmcnutt.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, PRO HAC VICE Stephen K Otey +1 662 842 3871 sotey@mitchellmcnutt.com
LEAD ATTORNEY James Phillip Wilson, Jr. +1 662 245 5123 +1 662 328 8035 jwilson@mitchellmcnutt.com
No Logo Samuel Phillip Carson, Defendant
No Logo Tombigbee Pharmacy LLC, Defendant
No Logo Vickers Priority Care Pharmacy LLC, Defendant
No Logo Vincent Express Care Pharmacy LLC, Defendant
No Logo Vincent Priority Care Pharmacy LLC, Defendant
No Logo Wesley Minga, Defendant
No Logo William H Austin, Defendant
Citation Section 18 U.S.C. § 1964
Nature of Suit 470 - Civil (RICO) Racketeer/Corrupt Organization
  Entries (29) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 9/24/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
ORDER granting Motions to Admit H. Richmond Culp (doc. 26), Albert G. Delgadillo (doc. 27), and Stephn K. Otey, Jr. (doc. 28) Pro Hac Vice. The court advises counsel that it may require at least one attorney for each party to be physically present at every hearing and status conference and distance from the courthouse will be no excuse. Signed by Chief Judge Karon O Bowdre on 9/24/18. (MMW) (Entered: 09/24/2018)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 9/21/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
    MOTION for Leave to Appear Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Stephen K. Otey, Jr. by Priority Healthcare Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Letter of Good Standing)(Wilson, James) (Entered: 09/21/2018)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 9/21/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
      MOTION for Leave to Appear Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Albert G. Delgadillo by Priority Healthcare Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Letter of Good Standing)(Wilson, James) (Entered: 09/21/2018)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 9/21/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
        MOTION for Leave to Appear Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice H. Richmond Culp, III by Priority Healthcare Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Letter of Good Standing)(Wilson, James) (Entered: 09/21/2018)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 9/21/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
          TEXT ORDER: The court GRANTS the "Agreed Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint." (Doc. 24). For all Defendants properly served as of the date of this Order, the court extends the time to file a responsive pleading to on or before November 16, 2018. For all those Defendants not yet served as of the date of this Order, the court gives them 21 days after service or until November 16, 2018, whichever is later, to file their responsive pleadings. Signed by Chief Judge Karon O Bowdre on 9/21/18. (MMW) (Entered: 09/21/2018)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 9/18/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
            MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 1 Complaint,,,, by Priority Healthcare Corporation. (Wilson, James) (Entered: 09/18/2018)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 9/17/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
              MEDIATION ORDER - The court finds this case is appropriate for mediation pursuant to Section IV, paragraph 2 of this courts Alternative Dispute Resolution Plan, adopted November 18, 2014 (the Plan). The parties are DIRECTED to proceed promptly to select a mediator from the Court Panel of Neutrals according to the requirements of the Plan or to select an alternate mediator agreed upon by the parties. Signed by Chief Judge Karon O Bowdre on 9/17/2018. (KEK) (Entered: 09/17/2018)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 9/17/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                ORDER - In the joint status report, the parties explained that they resolved the issues regarding the temporary restraining order, preliminary injunction, and expedited discovery. The court enters this Order to reflect this resolution between the parties, but does not opine as to whether the Plaintiffs met the requirements for a temporary restraining order or preliminary injunction. Additionally, the court CANCELS the hearing scheduled for Monday, September 17, 2018, as the parties resolved the relevant issues in their joint status report. (Doc. 20). Signed by Chief Judge Karon O Bowdre on 9/17/2018. (KEK) (Entered: 09/17/2018)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 9/14/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                  TEXT ORDER: After receiving word from counsel that the parties have reached an agreement over the issues involved in the motion for a temporary restraining order, preliminary injunction, and expedited discovery (doc. 4), the court CANCELS the hearing previously scheduled for Monday, September 17, 2018 at 9:00 am. The court will enter the stipulated order by separate entry. Signed by Chief Judge Karon O Bowdre on 09/14/2018. (LMG) (Entered: 09/14/2018)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 9/14/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                    STATUS REPORT (Jointly Filed) by Roche Diabetes Care Inc, Roche Diagnostics Corporation. filed by Roche Diabetes Care Inc, Roche Diagnostics Corporation (Attachments: # 1 Stipulation and [proposed] Order)(Potter, Geoffrey) (Entered: 09/14/2018)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 9/12/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                      Summons Issued as to Amory Discount Pharmacy LLC, Amory Priority Care Pharmacy LLC, William H Austin, B&K Express Care Pharmacy LLC, B&K Priority Care Pharmacy LLC, Daniel Baker, Bowies Express Care Pharmacy LLC, Bowies Priority Care Pharmacy LLC, Burns Discount Drug Store LLC, Burns Drugstore Inc, Carbon Hill Express Care Pharmacy LLC, Kimberly P Carson, Samuel Phillip Carson, Jasper Express Care Pharmacy LLC, Christopher Daniel Knotts, Main Street Drugs LLC, Medical Park Discount Pharmacy LLC, Medical Park Pharmacy Inc, Medpoint Advantage LLC, Medpoint Pharmacy Benefit Managers, Konie Minga, Phillip Anthony Minga, Wesley Minga, Geneva Oswalt, Ozark Family Pharmacy LLC, Priority Care Medical Supply LLC, Priority Care Pharmacy 2 LLC, Priority Care Pharmacy LLC, Priority Care Pharmacy Services LLC, Priority Care Pharmacy Solutions LLC, Priority Care Pharmacy at Cotton Gin Point LLC, Priority Healthcare Corporation, Melissa Sheffield, Ashley Tigrett, Tombigbee Pharmacy LLC, Vickers Priority Care Pharmacy LLC, Vincent Express Care Pharmacy LLC, Vincent Priority Care Pharmacy LLC, Returned to Plaintiff's attorney for service on this the 12th day of September, 2018. (JLC) (Entered: 09/14/2018)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 9/12/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                        Transcript of Proceedings held on 9/11/2018, before Judge Karen O. Bowdre. Court Reporter/Transcriber Lindy M. Fuller, Telephone number 205-278-2062. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. NOTICE: The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. (A copy can be obtained at http://www.alnd.uscourts.gov/local/court%20forms/transcripts/Transcript% 20Redaction%20Policy.pdf) See Transcript Redaction Policy Redaction Request due 10/3/2018. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 10/13/2018. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 12/11/2018. (JLC) (Entered: 09/12/2018)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 9/12/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                          TEXT ORDER granting Motion to Admit Geoffrey Potter (doc. 12), Aron Fischer (doc 13), and Timothy Gray (doc. 14) Pro Hac Vice. The court advises counsel that it may require at least one attorney for each party to be physically present at every hearing and status conference. Signed by Chief Judge Karon O Bowdre on 9/12/18. (MMW) (Entered: 09/12/2018)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 9/11/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                            Minute Entry for proceedings held before Chief Judge Karon O Bowdre: Telephone Conference held on 9/11/2018. Geoff Potter, Aron Fischer and David Canupp, for plffs and Al Delgadillo and Rick Culp for defs participated in phone conference. Order to follow. (Court Reporter Lindy Fuller.) (FNC) (Entered: 09/12/2018)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 9/11/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                              TEXT ORDER. Telephone Conference set for Tuesday, September 11, 2018 at 03:30 PM before Chief Judge Karon O Bowdre. The call in information has been provided to plffs local counsel. Local counsel has been directed to provide the information to all other parties. Signed by Chief Judge Karon O Bowdre on 9/11/2018. (FNC) (Entered: 09/11/2018)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 9/11/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Timothy Gray by Roche Diabetes Care Inc, Roche Diagnostics Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 - Certificate of Good Standing)(Canupp, David) (Entered: 09/11/2018)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 9/11/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                  MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Aron Fischer by Roche Diabetes Care Inc, Roche Diagnostics Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 - Certificate of Good Standing)(Canupp, David) (Entered: 09/11/2018)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 9/11/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                    MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Geoffrey Potter by Roche Diabetes Care Inc, Roche Diagnostics Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 - Certificate of Good Standing)(Canupp, David) (Entered: 09/11/2018)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 9/11/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                      MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages re: Memorandum of Law in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for a Temporary Restraining Order, Preliminary Injunction, and Expedited Discovery [Dkt. No. 10] by Roche Diabetes Care Inc, Roche Diagnostics Corporation. (Canupp, David) (Entered: 09/11/2018)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 9/11/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                        Brief re 4 MOTION for Order to Show Cause MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Roche Diabetes Care Inc, Roche Diagnostics Corporation. (Canupp, David) (Entered: 09/11/2018)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 9/11/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                          AFFIDAVIT in Support re 4 MOTION for Order to Show Cause MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order MOTION for Preliminary Injunction - Declaration of Robert E. Haley, III filed by Roche Diabetes Care Inc, Roche Diagnostics Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Exhibit 7, # 8 Exhibit 8, # 9 Exhibit 9, # 10 Exhibit 10, # 11 Exhibit 11, # 12 Exhibit 12, # 13 Exhibit 13, # 14 Exhibit 14, # 15 Exhibit 15, # 16 Exhibit 16, # 17 Exhibit 17, # 18 Exhibit 18, # 19 Exhibit 19, # 20 Exhibit 20, # 21 Exhibit 21)(Canupp, David) (Entered: 09/11/2018)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 9/11/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                            AFFIDAVIT in Support re 4 MOTION for Order to Show Cause MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order MOTION for Preliminary Injunction - Declaration of Geoffrey Potter filed by Roche Diabetes Care Inc, Roche Diagnostics Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Errata 7, # 8 Exhibit 8, # 9 Exhibit 9, # 10 Exhibit 10, # 11 Exhibit 11, # 12 Exhibit 12, # 13 Exhibit 13, # 14 Exhibit 14, # 15 Exhibit 15, # 16 Exhibit 16, # 17 Exhibit 17, # 18 Exhibit 18, # 19 Exhibit 19, # 20 Exhibit 20, # 21 Exhibit 21, # 22 Exhibit 22, # 23 Exhibit 23, # 24 Exhibit 24, # 25 Exhibit 25, # 26 Exhibit 26, # 27 Exhibit 27, # 28 Exhibit 28)(Canupp, David) (Entered: 09/11/2018)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 9/11/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                              AFFIDAVIT in Support re 4 MOTION for Order to Show Cause MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order MOTION for Preliminary Injunction - Declaration of Kelly Clawson filed by Roche Diabetes Care Inc, Roche Diagnostics Corporation. (Canupp, David) (Entered: 09/11/2018)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 9/11/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                AFFIDAVIT in Support re 4 MOTION for Order to Show Cause MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order MOTION for Preliminary Injunction - Declaration of Kerri McAleavey filed by Roche Diabetes Care Inc, Roche Diagnostics Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5)(Canupp, David) (Entered: 09/11/2018)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 9/11/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                  AFFIDAVIT in Support re 4 MOTION for Order to Show Cause MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order MOTION for Preliminary Injunction - Declaration of Kimberly Ober filed by Roche Diabetes Care Inc, Roche Diagnostics Corporation. (Canupp, David) (Entered: 09/11/2018)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 9/11/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                    MOTION for Order to Show Cause, MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order, MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by Roche Diabetes Care Inc, Roche Diagnostics Corporation. (Canupp, David) (Entered: 09/11/2018)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 9/11/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                      NOTICE OF REASSIGNMENT - The above-styled civil action has been reassigned to the Honorable Karon O. Bowdre. Please use case number 2:18-cv-1479-KOB on all subsequent pleadings. (KEK) (Entered: 09/11/2018)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 9/11/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                        NOTICE of Corporate Disclosure by Roche Diabetes Care Inc, Roche Diagnostics Corporation. (KEK) (Entered: 09/11/2018)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 9/11/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                          COMPLAINT against Amory Discount Pharmacy LLC, Amory Priority Care Pharmacy LLC, William H Austin, B&K Express Care Pharmacy LLC, B&K Priority Care Pharmacy LLC, Daniel Baker, Bowies Express Care Pharmacy LLC, Bowies Priority Care Pharmacy LLC, Burns Discount Drug Store LLC, Burns Drugstore Inc, Carbon Hill Express Care Pharmacy LLC, Kimberly P Carson, Samuel Phillip Carson, Jasper Express Care Pharmacy LLC, Christopher Daniel Knotts, Main Street Drugs LLC, Medical Park Discount Pharmacy LLC, Medical Park Pharmacy Inc, Medpoint Advantage LLC, Medpoint Pharmacy Benefit Managers, Konie Minga, Phillip Anthony Minga, Wesley Minga, Geneva Oswalt, Ozark Family Pharmacy LLC, Priority Care Medical Supply LLC, Priority Care Pharmacy 2 LLC, Priority Care Pharmacy LLC, Priority Care Pharmacy Services LLC, Priority Care Pharmacy Solutions LLC, Priority Care Pharmacy at Cotton Gin Point LLC, Priority Healthcare Corporation, Melissa Sheffield, Ashley Tigrett, Tombigbee Pharmacy LLC, Vickers Priority Care Pharmacy LLC, Vincent Express Care Pharmacy LLC, Vincent Priority Care Pharmacy LLC, filed by Roche Diabetes Care Inc, Roche Diagnostics Corporation.(KEK) (Entered: 09/11/2018)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                            Statistics

                                                            This case has been viewed 18 times.

                                                            No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                            Space
                                                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                             
                                                            PlainSite
                                                            Sign Up
                                                            Need Password Help?