Michael Cutts v. Richland Holdings, Inc.
Appeal Court of Appeals for the Ninth Circuit, Case No. 18-15377

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated June 16, 2019 at 11:24 PM DT (1.9 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Nature of Suit 3480 - Consumer Credit
  Entries (6) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 3/28/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
MEDIATION CONFERENCE SCHEDULED - Assessment Conference, 04/18/2018, 1:00 p.m. PACIFIC Time. The briefing schedule previously set by the court remains in effect. See order for instructions and details. [10815410] (VS) [Entered: 03/28/2018 09:39 AM]
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 3/16/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
    Filed (ECF) Appellant Michael Cutts Mediation Questionnaire. Date of service: 03/16/2018. [10801930] [18-15377] (Skalak, John) [Entered: 03/16/2018 02:27 PM]
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 3/16/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
      Added attorney John P. Skalak for Michael Cutts, in case 18-15377. [10801044] (NAC) [Entered: 03/16/2018 10:31 AM]
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 3/16/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
        Filed (ECF) notice of appearance of John P. Skalak for Appellant Michael Cutts. Date of service: 03/16/2018. [10800982] [18-15377] (Skalak, John) [Entered: 03/16/2018 10:10 AM]
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 3/15/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
          MEDIATION ORDER FILED: The court of appeals' records do not indicate that appellant has filed a mediation questionnaire in accordance with Cir. R. 3-4. Within seven (7) days of the filing date of this order, appellant shall file a Mediation Questionnaire...dismiss the appeal voluntarily... or show cause in writing why this appeal should not be dismissed. Failure to comply with this order will result in dismissal pursuant to Ninth Cir. R. 42-1. [10798952] (LW) [Entered: 03/15/2018 08:16 AM]
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 3/7/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
            DOCKETED CAUSE AND ENTERED APPEARANCES OF COUNSEL. SEND MQ: Yes. The schedule is set as follows: Mediation Questionnaire due on 03/14/2018. Appellant Michael Cutts opening brief due 05/07/2018. Appellees Caleb J. Langsdale, Clifford Molin and Richland Holdings, Inc. answering brief due 06/04/2018. Appellant's optional reply brief is due 21 days after service of the answering brief. [10789198] (JBS) [Entered: 03/07/2018 10:06 AM]
              Request RequestSpace LREF

              Statistics

              This case has been viewed 18 times.

              No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
              Space
              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
               
              PlainSite
              Sign Up
              Need Password Help?