DEMOCRACY FORWARD FOUNDATION et al v. POMPEO et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit District Of Columbia District Court, Case No. 1:19-cv-01773-TNM
District Judge Trevor N. McFadden, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated July 23, 2020 at 11:35 AM DT (10 months ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo American Oversight, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Democracy Forward Foundation

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Benjamin M. Seel +1 202 701 1793 bseel@democracyforward.org
Space Nitin Shah +1 202 448 9090 nshah@democracyforward.org
Democracy Forward Foundation Democracy Forward Foundation, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Democracy Forward Foundation

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Benjamin M. Seel +1 202 701 1793 bseel@democracyforward.org
Space Nitin Shah +1 202 448 9090 nshah@democracyforward.org
v.
No Logo DAVID FERRIERO, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Kathryn L. Wyer +1 202 616 8475 kathryn.wyer@usdoj.gov
Pompeo, Michael Richard Pompeo, Michael Richard, Defendant
Officially listed as "MICHAEL RICHARD POMPEO"

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Kathryn L. Wyer +1 202 616 8475 kathryn.wyer@usdoj.gov
National Archives & Records Administration National Archives & Records Administration, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Kathryn L. Wyer +1 202 616 8475 kathryn.wyer@usdoj.gov
United States Department of State United States Department of State, Defendant
Officially listed as "U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE"

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Kathryn L. Wyer +1 202 616 8475 kathryn.wyer@usdoj.gov
Office Washington, DC
Filed 6/18/2019
Jury Demand None
Demand
Nature of Suit 899 - Other Statutes: Administrative Procedures Act/Review or Appeal of Agency Decision
Cause Section 05 U.S.C. § 551 Administrative Procedure Act
Jurisdiction U.S. Government Defendant
Disposition
County 11001
Terminated
Origin 1
Reopened
Lead Case
None
Related Case
None
Other Court Case None
Defendant Custody Status
Flag TYPE-C
  Entries (35) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 7/23/2020, Entered: None Order
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 7/23/2020, Entered: None Memorandum & Opinion
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 7/22/2020, Entered: None Notice of Withdrawal of Appearance
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 6/5/2020, Entered: None Transcript
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Blank  Order on Motion to Dismiss
          Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Trevor N. McFadden: Motion Hearing held on 12/11/2019. For reasons stated on the record, Government's [9] Motion to Dismiss is denied. Government's answer to Plaintiff's Complaint due by 1/10/2020. Government's Record and Motion for Summary Judgment due by 3/13/2020. Plaintiff's Opposition to Government's Motion and Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment due by 4/10/2020. Government's Opposition to Plaintiff's Cross-Motion and Reply due by 5/1/2020. Plaintiff's Reply due by 5/22/2020. (Court Reporter: Crystal Pilgrim.) (hmc)
            LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 5/22/2020, Entered: None Reply to opposition to Motion
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Blank  set/reset hearings
              Set/Reset Hearings: Motion Hearing set for 12/11/2019 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 2 before Judge Trevor N. McFadden. (hmc)
                LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 5/1/2020, Entered: None Memorandum in Opposition to Motion
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Blank  Order
                  MINUTE ORDER. It is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall appear for a hearing on the Defendants' [9] Motion to Dismiss on December 11, 2019, at 10:00 a.m. in Courtroom 2, before Judge Trevor N. McFadden. Signed by Judge Trevor N. McFadden on 11/14/2019. (lctnm1)
                    LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 5/1/2020, Entered: None Reply to opposition to Motion
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document 13 Filed: 10/31/2019, Entered: 10/31/2019 Reply to opposition to Motion
                      REPLY to opposition to motion re [9] MOTION to Dismiss filed by DAVID FERRIERO, NATIONAL ARCHIVES AND RECORDS ADMINISTRATION, MICHAEL RICHARD POMPEO, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE. (Wyer, Kathryn)
                        LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 10/28/2019, Entered: 10/28/2019, Terminated: 10/28/2019 motion for extension of time to file response/reply
                        Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to [9] MOTION to Dismiss by DAVID FERRIERO, NATIONAL ARCHIVES AND RECORDS ADMINISTRATION, MICHAEL RICHARD POMPEO, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order)(Wyer, Kathryn)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 4/10/2020, Entered: None SUMMARY JUDGMENT
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Blank  ***Set/Reset Deadlines
                            Set/Reset Deadlines: Defendants' Reply due by 10/31/2019. (hmc)
                              LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 4/9/2020, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Blank  Order on motion for extension of time to file Response/Reply
                                MINUTE ORDER. Upon consideration of the Defendants' [12] Consent Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply, the request for an extension is DENIED. The Defendants shall file a Reply by October 31, 2019. Signed by Judge Trevor N. McFadden on 10/28/2019. (lctnm1)
                                  LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 3/13/2020, Entered: None SUMMARY JUDGMENT
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 10/24/2019, Entered: 10/24/2019 Response to motion
                                    RESPONSE re [9] MOTION to Dismiss filed by AMERICAN OVERSIGHT, DEMOCRACY FORWARD FOUNDATION. (Shah, Nitin)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 3/13/2020, Entered: None Administrative Record
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Blank  ***Set/Reset Deadlines
                                        Set/Reset Deadlines: Plaintiffs' response to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss due by 10/24/2019. (hmc)
                                          LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 1/10/2020, Entered: None Answer
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Blank  Order on Motion for Extension of Time to
                                            MINUTE ORDER granting [10] Plaintiffs' Motion for Extension of Time. Plaintiffs shall respond to Defendants' [9] Motion to Dismiss on or before October 24, 2019. Further extension requests will be disfavored. Signed by Judge Trevor N. McFadden on 9/25/19. (lctnm1)
                                              LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 9/24/2019, Entered: 9/24/2019, Terminated: 9/25/2019 Motion for Extension of Time to
                                              Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Plaintiffs' Memorandum in Opposition to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss by AMERICAN OVERSIGHT, DEMOCRACY FORWARD FOUNDATION (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order)(Seel, Benjamin)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 9/20/2019, Entered: 9/20/2019, Terminated: 12/11/2019 Motion to Dismiss
                                                MOTION to Dismiss by DAVID FERRIERO, NATIONAL ARCHIVES AND RECORDS ADMINISTRATION, MICHAEL R. POMPEO, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE (Attachments: # (1) Memorandum in Support, # (2) Text of Proposed Order)(Wyer, Kathryn)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Blank  ***Set/Reset Deadlines
                                                  Set/Reset Deadlines: Answer to the Complaint due by 9/20/2019. (tg)
                                                    LREF
                                                    Blank  Order on Motion for extension of time to answer
                                                    MINUTE ORDER granting in part [8] Defendants' Motion for Extension of Time. The Defendants shall respond to the Plaintiffs' Complaint on or before September 20, 2019. Further extension requests will be disfavored. Signed by Judge Trevor N. McFadden on 8/15/2019. (lctnm1)
                                                      LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 8/14/2019, Entered: 8/14/2019, Terminated: 8/15/2019 motion for extension of time to file answer
                                                      Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re [1] Complaint, or Otherwise Respond by DAVID FERRIERO, NATIONAL ARCHIVES AND RECORDS ADMINISTRATION, MICHAEL R. POMPEO, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order)(Wyer, Kathryn)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 8/14/2019, Entered: 8/14/2019 Notice of appearance
                                                        NOTICE of Appearance by Kathryn L. Wyer on behalf of DAVID FERRIERO, NATIONAL ARCHIVES AND RECORDS ADMINISTRATION, MICHAEL R. POMPEO, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE (Wyer, Kathryn)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 6/24/2019, Entered: 6/24/2019 Summons Returned Executed as to US Attorney
                                                          RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 6/24/2019. ( Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 8/23/2019.), RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 6/24/19., RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. DAVID FERRIERO served on 6/21/2019; NATIONAL ARCHIVES AND RECORDS ADMINISTRATION served on 6/21/2019; MICHAEL R. POMPEO served on 6/24/2019; U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE served on 6/24/2019 (Attachments: # (1) Declaration)(Shah, Nitin)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 6/24/2019, Entered: 6/24/2019 LCvR 26.1 Certificate of Disclosure - Corporate Affiliations/Financial Interests
                                                            LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by AMERICAN OVERSIGHT (Shah, Nitin)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 6/24/2019, Entered: 6/24/2019 LCvR 26.1 Certificate of Disclosure - Corporate Affiliations/Financial Interests
                                                              LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by DEMOCRACY FORWARD FOUNDATION (Shah, Nitin)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 6/19/2019, Entered: 6/19/2019 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                STANDING ORDER establishing procedures for cases before Judge Trevor N. McFadden. The parties are directed to read and strictly comply with the attached Order. Signed by Judge Trevor N. McFadden on 6/19/2019. (lctnm1)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 6/19/2019, Entered: 6/19/2019 Summons Issued Electronically as to AUSA
                                                                  SUMMONS (6) Issued Electronically as to DAVID FERRIERO, NATIONAL ARCHIVES AND RECORDS ADMINISTRATION, MICHAEL R. POMPEO, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. (Attachments: # (1) Notice and Consent)(zef, )
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Blank  Case Assigned/Reassigned
                                                                    Case Assigned to Judge Trevor N. McFadden. (zef, )
                                                                      LREF
                                                                      Legal Document 1 Filed: 6/18/2019, Entered: 6/18/2019 Complaint
                                                                      COMPLAINT against DAVID FERRIERO, NATIONAL ARCHIVES AND RECORDS ADMINISTRATION, MICHAEL R. POMPEO, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-6195576) filed by AMERICAN OVERSIGHT, DEMOCRACY FORWARD FOUNDATION. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A, # (2) Exhibit B, # (3) Civil Cover Sheet, # (4) Summons, # (5) Summons, # (6) Summons, # (7) Summons, # (8) Summons, # (9) Summons)(Shah, Nitin)
                                                                        LREF

                                                                        Statistics

                                                                        This case has been viewed 31 times.

                                                                        No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                        Space
                                                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                         
                                                                        PlainSite
                                                                        Sign Up
                                                                        Need Password Help?