Henderson v. Greenbrier VMC, LLC
Federal Civil Lawsuit West Virginia Southern District Court, Case No. 5:16-cv-06307
District Judge David A. Faber, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated June 23, 2019 at 12:42 AM DT (1.9 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Lisa Y. Henderson, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Feinstein Doyle Payne & Kravec, LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Stephen M. Pincus +1 412 281 8400 +1 412 281 1007 spincus@fdpklaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by National Labor Relations Board

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Aaron B. Sukert +1 216 303 7389 +1 216 522 2418 aaron.sukert@nlrb.gov
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Joel Ruben White +1 336 991 8377 +1 336 631 5201 joel.white@nlrb.gov
No Logo National Labor Relations Board, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Feinstein Doyle Payne & Kravec, LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Stephen M. Pincus +1 412 281 8400 +1 412 281 1007 spincus@fdpklaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by National Labor Relations Board

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Aaron B. Sukert +1 216 303 7389 +1 216 522 2418 aaron.sukert@nlrb.gov
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Joel Ruben White +1 336 991 8377 +1 336 631 5201 joel.white@nlrb.gov
v.
No Logo Greenbrier VMC, LLC, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Bryan T. Carmody +1 203 249 9287 bryancarmody@bellsouth.net

Toggle Switch Represented by Flaherty Sensabaugh & Bonasso PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY W. E. Sam Fox, II +1 304 345 0200 +1 304 345 0260 sfox@fsblaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by flahertylegal.com Law Firm Placeholder

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY W. Scott Evans +1 304 345 0200 +1 304 345 0260 wsevans@flahertylegal.com
Citation Section 29 U.S.C. § 160(1)
Nature of Suit 720 - Labor: Labor/Management Relations
  Entries (33) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 10/22/2018, Entered: None Mandate
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 8/28/2018, Entered: None Notice of Judgment
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 8/28/2018, Entered: None
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 8/28/2018, Entered: None Opinion
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 4/15/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
          IMPORTANT NOTICE: The United States District Court for the Southern District of West Virginia (WVSD) will be upgrading its current CM/ECF system to the Next Generation of CM/ECF (NextGen CM/ECF) on Monday, June 11, 2018. Complete information regarding the WVSD NextGen CM/ECF implementation can be found at h ttp://www.wvsd.uscourts.gov/nextgen-information. Currently, many attorneys within a firm may share a single PACER account. This will no longer be allowed with the new WVSD NextGen CM/ECF system because each attorney must have an individual upgraded PACER account that will be linked to their e-filing account. Shared PACER accounts cannot be used by WVSD e-filing attorneys once the WVSD NextGen CM/ECF system is implemented. Preparing for NextGen CM/ECF is a two-step process. Step one is to upgrade your PACER account, and step two is to link your upgraded PACER account to the WVSD e-filing account in the upgraded NextGen CM/ECF system. This notice only addresses the first step because the second step can't be completed until on or after June 11, 2018. The first step is to check and see if your PACER account is an "Upgraded" PACER account. Many PACER accounts have already been upgraded. If any of the following is true, you have an upgraded PACER account and no action is required until after the WVSD NextGen CM/ECF upgrade on June 11, 2018: 1) You have an upgraded PACER account for another NextGen court; or, 2) Your PACER account was created after August 10, 2014. If none of these are true, you must upgrade your legacy PACER account before you will be able to link your PACER account to your current WVSD CM/ECF account for your new NextGen CM/ECF account. Additional notices will be sent at a later date on how to handle the second step in this process. If you still have questions please contact the PACER Service Center at 800-676-6856 or the WVSD Clerk's Office CM/ECF Help Desk at (304)-347-3111. (mwk) (ADI)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 11/18/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
            ORDER OF 4CCA as to 22 Notice of Appeal to 4CCA in 4CCA Case No. 16-2332. The court consolidates Case No. 16-2331 (1:16-cv-06305)(L) and Case No. 16-2332. Entry of appearance forms and disclosure statements filed by counsel and parties to the lead case are deemed filed in the secondary case (msa)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 11/18/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
              NOTICE OF APPELLATE CASE OPENING BY 4CCA re: 22 Notice of Appeal to 4CCA in 4CCA Case No. 16-2332. Case Manager: Cathy Poulsen. (msa)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 11/18/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                TRANSMITTAL OF NOTICE OF APPEAL TO 4CCA via NOTICE OF APPELLATE ACTION re: 23 Notice of Appeal as to 20 Memorandum Opinion and Order to 4CCA. (slr) Modified on 11/18/2016 to correct text (slr).
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 11/17/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                  NOTICE OF APPEAL WITH NO FEE REQUIRED by National Labor Relations Board as to 20 Memorandum Opinion and Order. (Attachment: # 1 Certificate of Service)(White, Joel) (Modified on 11/19/2016 to add link to #20 memorandum opinion and order) (skh).
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 9/22/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                    TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS of Hearing on Petition for Temporary Injunction held on September 13, 2016, before Judge David A. Faber. Court Reporter Lisa Cook, Telephone number 304-254-8053. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Notice of Intent to Redact due 10/3/2016. Redaction Request due 10/13/2016. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 10/24/2016. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 12/21/2016. (lac)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 9/20/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                      MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER: The Court DENIES Plaintiff's 1 PETITION for Preliminary Injunction without prejudice. Signed by Judge David A. Faber on 9/20/2016. (cc: attys; any unrepresented party) (slr)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 9/13/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                        MOTION HEARING held by Judge David A. Faber on 9/13/2016 MOTION for Temporary Injunction Court Reporter: Lisa Cook.. (cel) (Entered: 09/14/2016)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 9/12/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                          DISCLOSURE STATEMENT PURSUANT TO RULE 7.1, Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, by Defendant Greenbrier VMC, LLC (Evans, W.)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 9/9/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                            NOTICE to Court of Recent Authority by Lisa Y. Henderson, National Labor Relations Board (White, Joel) (Modified on 9/9/2016 to add party filer) (skh).
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 9/2/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                              ORDER: The Court SCHEDULES a Hearing on Petitioner's 1 Petition for a Temporary Injunction for 9/13/2016 at 10:30 AM in Charleston before Judge David A. Faber. Signed by Judge David A. Faber on 9/2/2016. (cc: attys; any unrepresented party) (slr)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 8/23/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                REPLY by Lisa Y. Henderson, National Labor Relations Board to 14 Memorandum In Opposition. (White, Joel) (Modified on 8/23/2016 to add party filer) (skh).
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 8/16/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                  MEMORANDUM by Greenbrier VMC, LLC in opposition to 1 Petition for Injunction Under Section 10(j) of the National Labor Relations Act, as Amended (Attachment: # 1 Exhibit)(Fox, W.) (Modified on 8/17/2016 to remove link to #13 order and to add link to #1 petition) (rea).
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 8/11/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                    ORDER: The Court GRANTS Respondent's 10 MOTION for Leave to File a Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Opposition to the Petition for Temporary Injunction in part, allowing respondent to file a memorandum in opposition, but DENIES its request for 30 days to file the memorandum. Respondent shall submit any response to petitioner's memorandum of points and authorities by 8/16/2016; Petitioner shall submit any reply to respondent's response by 8/26/2016. Signed by Judge David A. Faber on 8/11/2016. (cc: attys; any unrepresented party) (slr)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 8/9/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                      REPLY by Greenbrier VMC, LLC to 11 RESPONSE by Lisa Y. Henderson, National Labor Relations Board to 10 MOTION by Greenbrier VMC, LLC for Leave to File a Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Opposition to Petition for Temporary Injunction. (Fox, W.)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 8/5/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                        RESPONSE by Lisa Y. Henderson, National Labor Relations Board to 10 MOTION by Greenbrier VMC, LLC for Leave to File a Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Opposition to Petition for Temporary Injunction (White, Joel) (Modified on 8/6/2016 to add party filer) (skh).
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 8/4/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                          MOTION by Greenbrier VMC, LLC for Leave to File a Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Opposition to Petition for Temporary Injunction (Fox, W.)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 8/4/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                            ANSWER TO 1 Petition for Injunction by Greenbrier VMC, LLC.(Fox, W.)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 8/1/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                              NOTICE OF DOCKET CORRECTION re: 8 PRO HAC VICE FEE. ERROR: Docketed in wrong case. CORRECTION: Image deleted. (cds)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 8/1/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                IMAGE DELETED - DOCKETED IN WRONG CASE. (Entered: 08/02/2016)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 8/1/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                  STATEMENT OF VISITING ATTORNEY from Bryan T. Carmody on behalf of Greenbrier VMC, LLC. Local counsel: W. Sam Fox. Fee $50.00. Receipt # 0425-4758146. (Fox, W.)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 8/1/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                    NOTICE OF DOCKET CORRECTION re: 6 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by National Labor Relations Board for Proof of Service for Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support of Petition for Injunction Under Section 10(j) of the National Labor Relations Act. ERROR: Style of case and civil action number omitted. CORRECTION: Style of case and civil action number added and image replaced. (taq)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 7/27/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                      CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by National Labor Relations Board for Proof of Service for Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support of Petition for Injunction Under Section 10(j) of the National Labor Relations Act(White, Joel) (Modified on 8/1/2016 to replace incomplete image) (taq).
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 7/26/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                        MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES by National Labor Relations Board in support of 1 Petition for Injunction (Attachments: # 1 Exhibits 1-5, # 2 Affidavits Referenced by Memorandum)(White, Joel)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 7/26/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                          ORDER: It is ORDERED that this civil action be REASSIGNED to Judge David A. Faber for all further proceedings. Signed by Judge Irene C. Berger on 7/26/2016. (cc: Judge Berger, Judge Faber, attys; any unrepresented party) (slr)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 7/18/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                            PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Lisa Y. Henderson for Petition for Injunction, Order Granting Temporary Injunction, and Order to Show Cause(White, Joel) (Modified text on 7/19/2016 to conform to filed document) (taq).
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 7/14/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                              STANDING ORDER IN RE: ASSIGNMENT AND REFERRAL OF CIVIL ACTIONS AND MATTERS TO MAGISTRATE JUDGES ENTERED JANUARY 4, 2016. Discovery referred to Magistrate Judge Aboulhosn. (cc:attys; any unrepresented party) (slr)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 7/13/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                CASE assigned to Judge Irene C. Berger. (skh)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 7/13/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                  PETITION FOR INJUNCTION Under Section 10(j) of the National Labor Relations Act, as Amended (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Proposed Order Granting Injunction, # 3 Proposed Order to Show Cause) (slr) (Entered: 07/14/2016)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                    Statistics

                                                                    This case has been viewed 9 times.

                                                                    No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                    Space
                                                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                     
                                                                    PlainSite
                                                                    Sign Up
                                                                    Need Password Help?