District Appellate Supreme
Federal
California Central District Court Court of Appeals for the Ninth Circuit
  1. Case No. 15-56434
    Filed 9/18/2015
  2. Case No. 17-56297
    Filed 8/28/2017
United States Supreme Court

Jenny Flores v. William Barr, et al
Appeal Court of Appeals for the Ninth Circuit, Case No. 17-56297

Tags
Last Updated June 22, 2019 at 1:38 PM EDT (2.4 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Space Space

No Logo Elaine C. Duke, Acting Secretary Of Homeland Security, Defendant - Appellant,

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Vinita Andrapalliyal
Space Sarah B. Fabian +1 202 532 4824 +1 202 879 5200 sarah.b.fabian@usdoj.gov
Space August E. Flentje
Space Nicole N. Murley
Sessions, Jefferson Beauregard, III Sessions, Jefferson Beauregard, III, Defendant - Appellant,
Officially listed as "Jefferson B. Sessions Iii, Attorney General"
United States Department of Justice Attorney General, United States Department of Justice, February 9, 2017 - November 7, 2018
United States of America Attorney General, United States of America, February 9, 2017 - November 7, 2018
No Logo Matthew G. Whitaker, Acting Attorney General, Defendant - Appellant,
United States Customs & Border Protection United States Customs & Border Protection, Defendant - Appellant,
Officially listed as "U.s. Customs And Border Protection"

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Vinita Andrapalliyal
Space Sarah B. Fabian +1 202 532 4824 +1 202 879 5200 sarah.b.fabian@usdoj.gov
Space August E. Flentje
Space Nicole N. Murley
United States Department of Homeland Security United States Department of Homeland Security, Defendant - Appellant,
Officially listed as "U.s. Department Of Homeland Security"

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Vinita Andrapalliyal
Space Sarah B. Fabian +1 202 532 4824 +1 202 879 5200 sarah.b.fabian@usdoj.gov
Space August E. Flentje
Space Nicole N. Murley
United States Department of Homeland Security, Immigration and Customs Enforcement United States Department of Homeland Security, Immigration and Customs Enforcement, Defendant - Appellant,
Officially listed as "U.s. Immigration And Customs Enforcement"

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Vinita Andrapalliyal
Space Sarah B. Fabian +1 202 532 4824 +1 202 879 5200 sarah.b.fabian@usdoj.gov
Space August E. Flentje
Space Nicole N. Murley
Barr, William P. Barr, William P., Defendant - Appellant,
Officially listed as "William P. Barr, Attorney General"
Officer/Director, BELL ATLANTIC CORP
Officer/Director, AOL Time Warner, Inc.
Officer/Director, Dominion Resources Inc /va/

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Vinita Andrapalliyal
Space Sarah B. Fabian +1 202 532 4824 +1 202 879 5200 sarah.b.fabian@usdoj.gov
Space August E. Flentje
Space Nicole N. Murley
No Logo Jenny Lisette Flores, Plaintiff - Appellee,

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Holly Stafford Cooper +1 530 754 4833
Space Carlos R. Holguin
Space Annette Kirkham +1 408 280 2410
Space Katherine Haas Manning +1 408 280 2437
Space Peter Anthony Schey
Space Steven H. Schulman +1 202 887 4000
Nature of Suit 2460 - Deportation
Case Type civil
Lower Court Case https://ecf.cacd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?caseNumber=2:85-cv-04544-DMG-AGR
Lower Court Case https://ecf.cacd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?caseNumber=2:85-cv-04544-DMG-AGR
  Entries (41) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 009031026121 Filed: 6/18/2019, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Filed Audio recording of oral argument.
Note: Video recordings of public argument calendars are available on the Court's website, at http://www.ca9.uscourts.gov/media/
[11338465] (DO)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Blank  Filed: 6/18/2019, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
    ARGUED AND SUBMITTED TO A. WALLACE TASHIMA, WILLIAM A. FLETCHER and MARSHA S. BERZON. [11336177] (JMR)
      LREF
      Blank  Filed: 6/12/2019, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
      Terminated Virginia Corrigan for Jenny Lisette Flores in 17-56297 [11328773] (NAC)
        LREF
        Blank  Filed: 6/12/2019, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
        Filed (ECF) Notice of withdrawal of counsel. Filed by Attorney Virginia Corrigan for Appellee Jenny Lisette Flores. Party proceeding without counsel: No. Date of service: 06/12/2019. [11328743] [17-56297] (Corrigan, Virginia)
          LREF
          Blank  Filed: 6/1/2019, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
          Filed (ECF) Acknowledgment of hearing notice by Attorney Sarah Fabian for Appellants William P. Barr, Elaine C. Duke, U.S. Customs and Border Protection, USDHS and U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement. Hearing in San Francisco on 06/18/2019 at 2:00 P.M. (Courtroom: Courtroom 3). Filer sharing argument time: No. (Argument minutes: 15.) Special accommodations: NO. Filer admission status: I certify that I am admitted to practice before this Court. Date of service: 06/01/2019. [11316429] [17-56297] (Fabian, Sarah)
            LREF
            Blank  Filed: 5/30/2019, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
            Filed (ECF) Acknowledgment of hearing notice by Attorney Mr. Peter Anthony Schey, Esquire for Appellee Jenny Lisette Flores. Hearing in San Francisco on 06/18/2019 at 2:00 P.M. (Courtroom: 3). Filer sharing argument time: No. (Argument minutes: 30.) Special accommodations: NO. Filer admission status: I certify that I am admitted to practice before this Court. Date of service: 05/30/2019. [11314275] [17-56297] (Schey, Peter)
              LREF
              Blank  Filed: 5/20/2019, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
              Notice of Oral Argument on Tuesday, June 18, 2019 - 2:00 P.M. - Courtroom 3 - San Francisco CA.

              View the Oral Argument Calendar for your case here.

              Be sure to review the GUIDELINES for important information about your hearing, including when to arrive (30 minutes before the hearing time) and when and how to submit additional citations (filing electronically as far in advance of the hearing as possible).

              If you are the specific attorney or self-represented party who will be arguing, use the ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF HEARING NOTICE filing type in CM/ECF no later than 21 days before Tuesday, June 18, 2019. No form or other attachment is required. If you will not be arguing, do not file an acknowledgment of hearing notice.[11302711] (AW)
                LREF
                Blank  Filed: 4/26/2019, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                Appellant Matthew G. Whitaker in 17-56297 substituted by Appellant William P. Barr in 17-56297 [11279282] (WL)
                  LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 009030897197 Filed: 4/26/2019, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Blank  Filed: 3/8/2019, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                    Terminated Kyra Kazantzis for Jenny Lisette Flores in 17-56297 (due to incorrect ECF contact information). [11222036] (RY)
                      LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 009030487745 Filed: 11/13/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                      Filed order (A. WALLACE TASHIMA, WILLIAM A. FLETCHER and MARSHA S. BERZON) This case, Flores v. Whitaker, No. 17-56297, is removed from the Monday, December 10, 2018, argument calendar to allow consolidation with a related appeal, Flores v. Whitaker, No. 18-56204, for which briefing is not yet completed. Oral argument for the consolidated appeals will be re-scheduled in a future order. [11084668] (OC)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Blank  Filed: 11/9/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                        Appellant Jefferson B. Sessions substituted by Appellant Matthew G. Whitaker in 17-56297. [11083911] (HH)
                          LREF
                          Blank  Filed: 9/30/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                          *** entry deleted - entered in error - exact date & time NOT YET SET ***
                          [11029670]--[Edited 10/01/2018 by AW] (AW)
                            LREF
                            Blank  Filed: 5/16/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                            Received 7 paper copies of Reply Brief [26] filed by Appellants. [10874555] (Sent to Panel) (RG)
                              LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 009030013520 Filed: 5/11/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                              Filed clerk order: The reply brief [26] submitted by Appellants is filed. Within 7 days of the filing of this order, filer is ordered to file 7 copies of the brief in paper format, accompanied by certification, attached to the end of each copy of the brief, that the brief is identical to the version submitted electronically. Cover color: gray. The paper copies shall be printed from the PDF version of the brief created from the word processing application, not from PACER or Appellate CM/ECF. [10870158] (GV)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 009030013063 Filed: 5/11/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                Submitted (ECF) Reply Brief for review. Submitted by Appellants Elaine C. Duke, Jefferson B. Sessions, III, U.S. Customs and Border Protection, U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement and USDHS. Date of service: 05/11/2018. [10869943] [17-56297] (Fabian, Sarah)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 009029990541 Filed: 5/3/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                  Filed clerk order (Deputy Clerk: OC): Oral argument will take place during the week of December 10, 2018, in San Francisco, California. The date and time will be determined by separate order. For further information or special requests regarding scheduling, please contact Deputy Clerk Paul Keller at paul_keller@ca9.uscourts.gov or (206) 224-2236. [10860094] (OC)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 009029936368 Filed: 4/13/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                    Filed order (A. WALLACE TASHIMA, WILLIAM A. FLETCHER and MARSHA S. BERZON): The panel (reconfigured) has retained jurisdiction of this appeal. Oral argument, if any, will be set in due course. [10836526] (AF)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Blank  Filed: 3/26/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                      Filed four paper copies of supplemental excerpts of record [18] in 2 volume(s) filed by Appellee Jenny Lisette Flores. [10812989] (GV)
                                        LREF
                                        Blank  Filed: 3/26/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                        Received 7 paper copies of Answering Brief [17] filed by Jenny Lisette Flores. [10812354] (RG)
                                          LREF
                                          Blank  Filed: 3/23/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                          Streamlined request [20] by Appellants Elaine C. Duke, Jefferson B. Sessions, III, U.S. Customs and Border Protection, USDHS and U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement to extend time to file the brief is approved. Streamlined requests allow for a 30 day extension of time to file the brief. Amended briefing schedule: the optional reply brief is due 05/11/2018. [10810362] (JN)
                                            LREF
                                            Blank  Filed: 3/23/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                            Filed (ECF) Streamlined request for extension of time to file Reply Brief by Appellants Elaine C. Duke, Jefferson B. Sessions, III, U.S. Customs and Border Protection, U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement and USDHS. New requested due date is 05/04/2018. [10810019] [17-56297] (Fabian, Sarah)
                                              LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 009029872629 Filed: 3/22/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                              Filed clerk order: The answering brief [17] submitted by Jenny Lisette Flores is filed. Within 7 days of the filing of this order, filer is ordered to file 7 copies of the brief in paper format, accompanied by certification, attached to the end of each copy of the brief, that the brief is identical to the version submitted electronically. Cover color: red. The paper copies shall be printed from the PDF version of the brief created from the word processing application, not from PACER or Appellate CM/ECF. The Court has reviewed the supplemental excerpts of record [18] submitted by Jenny Lisette Flores. Within 7 days of this order, filer is ordered to file 4 copies of the excerpts in paper format, with a white cover. The paper copies must be in the format described in 9th Circuit Rule 30-1.6. [10808575] (GV)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 009029871260 Filed: 3/21/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                Submitted (ECF) supplemental excerpts of record. Submitted by Appellee Jenny Lisette Flores. Date of service: 03/21/2018. [10807994] [17-56297] (Holguin, Carlos)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 009029871253 Filed: 3/21/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                  Submitted (ECF) Answering Brief for review. Submitted by Appellee Jenny Lisette Flores. Date of service: 03/21/2018. [10807992] [17-56297] (Holguin, Carlos)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 009029831010 Filed: 3/7/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                    Filed clerk order (Deputy Clerk: LKK): Granting Motion (ECF Filing) filed by Appellee Jenny Lisette Flores; Granting Motion (ECF Filing) motion . [15] to extend time to file brief filed by Appellee Jenny Lisette Flores Appellee Jenny Lisette Flores answering brief due 03/21/2018. The optional reply brief is due 21 days after service of the answering brief. [10790033] (LKK)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 009029828250 Filed: 3/6/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                      Filed (ECF) Appellee Jenny Lisette Flores Unopposed Motion to extend time to file Answering brief until 03/21/2018. Date of service: 03/06/2018. [10788816] [17-56297] (Holguin, Carlos)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Blank  Filed: 2/28/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                        Added attorney Nicole N. Murley for U.S. Customs and Border Protection Elaine C. Duke Jefferson B. Sessions III USDHS U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement. [10781668] (RL)
                                                          LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 009029811728 Filed: 2/28/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                          Filed (ECF) notice of appearance of Nicole N. Murley for Appellants Elaine C. Duke, Jefferson B. Sessions, III, U.S. Customs and Border Protection, U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement and USDHS. Date of service: 02/28/2018. [10781539] [17-56297] (Murley, Nicole)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Blank  Filed: 1/29/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                            Streamlined request [11] by Appellee Jenny Lisette Flores to extend time to file the brief is approved. Amended briefing schedule: Appellee Jenny Lisette Flores answering brief due 03/07/2018. The optional reply brief is due 21 days from the date of service of the answering brief. [10742913] (BG)
                                                              LREF
                                                              Blank  Filed: 1/29/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                              Filed (ECF) Streamlined request for extension of time to file Answering Brief by Appellee Jenny Lisette Flores. New requested due date is 02/28/2018. [10742551] [17-56297] (Holguin, Carlos)
                                                                LREF
                                                                Blank  Filed: 1/11/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                Received 7 paper copies of Opening Brief [6] filed by Elaine C. Duke, et al. [10723416] (RG)
                                                                  LREF
                                                                  Blank  Filed: 1/11/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                  Filed four paper copies of excerpts of record [7] in 4 volume(s) filed by Appellants Elaine C. Duke, et al. [10722232] (GV)
                                                                    LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 009029661982 Filed: 1/5/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                    Filed clerk order: The opening brief [6] submitted by Elaine C. Duke, et al., is filed. Within 7 days of the filing of this order, filer is ordered to file 7 copies of the brief in paper format, accompanied by certification, attached to the end of each copy of the brief, that the brief is identical to the version submitted electronically. Cover color: blue. The paper copies shall be printed from the PDF version of the brief created from the word processing application, not from PACER or Appellate CM/ECF. The Court has reviewed the excerpts of record [7] submitted by Elaine C. Duke, et al. Within 7 days of this order, filer is ordered to file 4 copies of the excerpts in paper format, with a white cover. The paper copies must be in the format described in 9th Circuit Rule 30-1.6. [10714717] (GV)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 009029661474 Filed: 1/5/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                      Submitted (ECF) excerpts of record. Submitted by Appellants Elaine C. Duke, Jefferson B. Sessions, III, U.S. Customs and Border Protection, U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement and USDHS. Date of service: 01/05/2018. [10714507] [17-56297] (Fabian, Sarah)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 009029661374 Filed: 1/5/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                        Submitted (ECF) Opening Brief for review. Submitted by Appellants Elaine C. Duke, Jefferson B. Sessions, III, U.S. Customs and Border Protection, U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement and USDHS. Date of service: 01/05/2018. [10714466] [17-56297] (Fabian, Sarah)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Blank  Filed: 12/4/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                          Streamlined request [4] by Appellants Jefferson B. Sessions, III, U.S. Customs and Border Protection, USDHS, U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement and Appellee Jenny Lisette Flores to extend time to file the brief is approved. Amended briefing schedule: Appellants Elaine C. Duke, Jefferson B. Sessions III, Attorney General, U.S. Customs and Border Protection, U.S. Department of Homeland Security and U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement opening brief due 01/05/2018. Appellee Jenny Lisette Flores answering brief due 02/05/2018. The optional reply brief is due 21 days from the date of service of the answering brief. [10676128] (JN)
                                                                            LREF
                                                                            Blank  Filed: 12/4/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                            Filed (ECF) Streamlined request for extension of time to file Opening Brief by Appellants Elaine C. Duke, Jefferson B. Sessions, III, U.S. Customs and Border Protection, U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement and USDHS. New requested due date is 01/05/2018. [10676043] [17-56297] (Fabian, Sarah)
                                                                              LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 009029363333 Filed: 9/15/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                              MEDIATION ORDER FILED: This case is NOT SELECTED for inclusion in the Mediation Program. Counsel may contact circuit mediator to discuss services available through the court's mediation program, to request a settlement assessment conf, or to request a stay of the appeal for settlement purposes. Also, upon agreement of the parties, the brfing sch can be modified or vacated to facilitate settlement discussions. Csl are requested to send copies of this order to their clients. Info regarding the mediation program may be found at www.ca9.uscourts.gov/mediation. [10582769] (BS)
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 009029333629 Filed: 9/5/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                Filed (ECF) Appellants Elaine C. Duke, Jefferson B. Sessions, III, U.S. Customs and Border Protection, U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement and USDHS Mediation Questionnaire. Date of service: 09/05/2017. [10569792] [17-56297] (Fabian, Sarah)
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 009029313644 Filed: 8/28/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                  DOCKETED CAUSE AND ENTERED APPEARANCES OF COUNSEL. SEND MQ: Yes. The schedule is set as follows: Mediation Questionnaire due on 09/05/2017. Transcript ordered by 09/27/2017. Transcript due 10/27/2017. Appellants Elaine C. Duke, Jefferson B. Sessions III, Attorney General, U.S. Customs and Border Protection, U.S. Department of Homeland Security and U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement opening brief due 12/06/2017. Appellee Jenny Lisette Flores answering brief due 01/08/2018. Appellant's optional reply brief is due 21 days after service of the answering brief. [10560844] (RT)
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                                    Statistics

                                                                                    This case has been viewed 68 times.

                                                                                    No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                    Space
                                                                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                     
                                                                                    PlainSite
                                                                                    Sign Up
                                                                                    Need Password Help?