GAYMON v. OFFICE OF PROSECUTOR
Federal Civil Lawsuit New Jersey District Court, Case No. 1:97-cv-06083-JEI

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo MARTHENIA "MARTI&quo GAYMON, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Robert R. McDaniel, II +1 850 432 5111 +1 850 432 5112 mcdanielmcdanielpa@yahoo.com
v.
No Logo OFFICE OF THE PROSECUTOR, COUNTY OF ATLANTIC, NEW JERSEY, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space WILLIAM A. GARRIGLE +1 856 427 9300 garrigle@aol.com
Office Camden
Filed 12/4/1997
Jury Demand Both
Demand $0
Nature of Suit 442 - Civil Rights: Employment
Cause Section 28 U.S.C. § 1331 Fed. Question
Jurisdiction Federal Question
Disposition Judgment - Motion Before Trial
County Cumberland
Terminated 2/17/1999
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flags 12BG, CLOSED, PRETRL
  Entries (53) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 37 Filed: 3/18/1999, Entered: 3/19/1999 OrderCourt Filing
ORDER denying [33-1] motion for attorney fees ( signed by Judge Joseph E. Irenas ) (jm1)
    LREF
    Blank 36 Filed: 3/18/1999, Entered: 3/19/1999 Minutes-MiscellaneousCourt Filing
    Minute entry: Proceedings recorded by ; Minutes of: 3.18.99; The following actions were taken, denying [33-1] motion for attorney fees; and terminating [33-2] hearing Motion set for 3/19/99 on [33-1] motion By Judge Joseph E. Irenas (jm1)
      LREF
      Blank -- Filed: 3/18/1999, Entered: 3/18/1999 Motions Referred
      Motion(s) referred: [33-1] motion for attorney fees referred to Judge Joseph E. Irenas (jm1)
        LREF
        Blank 35 Filed: 2/26/1999, Entered: 2/26/1999 Affidavit
        AFFIDAVIT of WILLIAM M. TAMBUSSI, ESQ. on behalf of OFFICE OF PROSECUTOR Re: [33-1] motion for attorney fees (jm1)
          LREF
          Blank 34 Filed: 2/26/1999, Entered: 2/26/1999 Certification
          CERTIFICATION of WILLIAM A. GARRIGLE, ESQ. on behalf of OFFICE OF PROSECUTOR Re: [33-1] motion for attorney fees (jm1)
            LREF
            Blank 33 Filed: 2/26/1999, Entered: 2/26/1999, Terminated: 3/18/1999 Motion for Attorney Fees
            Notice of MOTION for attorney fees by OFFICE OF PROSECUTOR Motion set for 3/19/99 on [33-1] motion . (Brief/PO Subm) (jm1) Modified on 03/18/1999
              LREF
              Blank -- Filed: 2/17/1999, Entered: 2/17/1999 Terminated Case
              Case closed (jm1)
                LREF
                Blank 32 Filed: 2/16/1999, Entered: 2/17/1999 Judgment*Court Filing
                JUDGMENT entered in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 50(a) that the complaint in the within matter is hereby DISMISSED with prejudice ( signed by Judge Joseph E. Irenas ) (jm1)
                  LREF
                  Blank 31 Filed: 2/16/1999, Entered: 2/17/1999 Minutes-MiscellaneousCourt Filing
                  Minute entry: Proceedings recorded by Ct-Reporter: S. DANER; Minutes of: 2.16.99; The following actions were taken, trial w/jury continued before the Hon. Joseph E. Irenas; hearing on application of defense for dismissal of case pursuant to Rule 50; Ordered application GRANTED; Ordered case dismissed By Judge Joseph E. Irenas (jm1)
                    LREF
                    Blank -- Filed: 2/16/1999, Entered: 2/17/1999 Jury Trial Held
                    Trial with jury concluded (jm1)
                      LREF
                      Blank 30 Filed: 2/11/1999, Entered: 2/16/1999 Minutes-MiscellaneousCourt Filing
                      Minute entry: Proceedings recorded by Ct-Reporter: S. DANER; Minutes of: 2.11.99; The following actions were taken, trial w/jury continued before the Hon. Joseph E. Irenas; trial w/jury continued to 2/16/99 @ 8:30 By Judge Joseph E. Irenas (er)
                        LREF
                        Blank -- Filed: 2/11/1999, Entered: 2/16/1999 Jury Trial Held
                        Trial with jury continued (er)
                          LREF
                          Blank 29 Filed: 2/9/1999, Entered: 2/9/1999 Minutes-MiscellaneousCourt Filing
                          Minute entry: Proceedings recorded by Ct-Reporter: S. DANER; Minutes of: 2.9.99; The following actions were taken, Trial w/jury continued before the Hon. Joseph E. Irenas; Trial w/jury continued to Thursday, 2/11/99 @ 8:30 a.m. By Judge Joseph E. Irenas (jm1)
                            LREF
                            Blank -- Filed: 2/9/1999, Entered: 2/9/1999 Jury Trial Held
                            Trial with jury continued (jm1)
                              LREF
                              Blank 28 Filed: 2/8/1999, Entered: 2/9/1999 Minutes-MiscellaneousCourt Filing
                              Minute entry: Proceedings recorded by Ct-Reporter: S. DANER; Minutes of: 2.8.99; The following actions were taken, Trial w/jury commenced before Hon. Joseph E. Irenas; Ordered jury panel drawn; Ordered jury panel sworn; Trial w/jury continued to Tuesday, 2/9/99 @ 8:30 By Judge Joseph E. Irenas (jm1)
                                LREF
                                Blank -- Filed: 2/8/1999, Entered: 2/9/1999 Jury Trial Held
                                Trial with jury begun (jm1)
                                  LREF
                                  Blank -- Filed: 1/29/1999, Entered: 1/29/1999 Settlement Conference
                                  Settlement conference held before Mag. Judge Joel B. Rosen on January 27, 1999. (jm1)
                                    LREF
                                    Blank 27 Filed: 1/27/1999, Entered: 1/29/1999 Letter
                                    LETTER by the Court Re: Final Pretrial Order (jm1)
                                      LREF
                                      Blank -- Filed: 12/30/1998, Entered: 12/30/1998 Status Conference
                                      Status conference held before Mag. Judge Joel B. Rosen on December 16, 1998. (jm1)
                                        LREF
                                        Blank 26 Filed: 12/23/1998, Entered: 12/28/1998 OrderCourt Filing
                                        ORDER that the deposition of Henry Warner scheduled for 12/17/98 @ 10:00 can be done via telephone conference hook up, etc. ( signed by Mag. Judge Joel B. Rosen ) (jm1)
                                          LREF
                                          Blank 25 Filed: 12/11/1998, Entered: 12/11/1998 Certification
                                          CERTIFICATION of WILLIAM A. GARRIGLE, ESQ. on behalf of OFFICE OF PROSECUTOR Re: Trial notice (jm1)
                                            LREF
                                            Blank -- Filed: 12/8/1998, Entered: 12/8/1998 Jury Trial Held
                                            Trial with jury set at 9:00 2/8/99 (dv)
                                              LREF
                                              Blank 24 Filed: 12/4/1998, Entered: 12/8/1998 Pretrial OrderCourt Filing
                                              JOINT FINAL PRETRIAL ORDER filed ( signed by Mag. Judge Joel B. Rosen ) (jm1)
                                                LREF
                                                Blank 23 Filed: 12/3/1998, Entered: 12/7/1998 OrderCourt Filing
                                                ORDER denying [18-1] motion to compel a physical examination and for the production of records, etc. ( signed by Mag. Judge Joel B. Rosen ) (jm1)
                                                  LREF
                                                  Blank 22 Filed: 12/3/1998, Entered: 12/3/1998 Minutes-MiscellaneousCourt Filing
                                                  Minute entry: Proceedings recorded by ; Minutes of: 12.3.98; The following actions were taken, denying [18-1] motion to compel a physical examination and for the production of records, etc.; and terminating [18-2] hearing Motion set for 12/4/98 on [18-1] motion By Mag. Judge Joel B. Rosen (jm1)
                                                    LREF
                                                    Blank 21 Filed: 12/1/1998, Entered: 12/1/1998 Trial Brief
                                                    TRIAL BRIEFS by MARTHENIA "MARTI" GAYMON (jm1)
                                                      LREF
                                                      Blank 20 Filed: 11/17/1998, Entered: 11/18/1998 Minutes-MiscellaneousCourt Filing
                                                      Minute entry: Proceedings recorded by Ct-Reporter: Tape #675; Minutes of: 11.17.98; The following actions were taken, Final pre-trial conference held on the record By Mag. Judge Joel B. Rosen (jm1)
                                                        LREF
                                                        Blank 19 Filed: 10/30/1998, Entered: 11/2/1998 Affidavit
                                                        AFFIDAVIT of WILLIAM A. GARRIGLE, ESQ. on behalf of OFFICE OF PROSECUTOR Re: [18-1] motion to compel a physical examination and for the production of records, etc. (jm1)
                                                          LREF
                                                          Blank 18 Filed: 10/30/1998, Entered: 11/2/1998, Terminated: 12/3/1998 Motion to CompelCourt Filing
                                                          Notice of MOTION to compel a physical examination and for the production of records, etc. by OFFICE OF PROSECUTOR [18-1] motion referred to Mag. Judge Joel B. Rosen, Motion set for 12/4/98 on [18-1] motion . (Memo./PO Subm) (jm1)
                                                            LREF
                                                            Blank 17 Filed: 8/10/1998, Entered: 8/11/1998 Scheduling OrderCourt Filing
                                                            SCHEDULING ORDER setting Discovery cutoff 10/16/98 ; Pretrial conference 11:00 11/17/98 ; Trial with jury 12/7/98 ; Pretrial order to be submitted on or before 11/17/98 ; ( signed by Mag. Judge Joel B. Rosen ) (jm1)
                                                              LREF
                                                              Blank -- Filed: 8/7/1998, Entered: 8/7/1998 Status Conference
                                                              Status conference held before Mag. Judge Joel B. Rosen on August 5, 1998. (jm1)
                                                                LREF
                                                                Blank 16 Filed: 7/24/1998, Entered: 7/24/1998, Terminated: 2/17/1999 Answer to Amended Complaint
                                                                ANSWER by OFFICE OF PROSECUTOR to amended complaint; jury demand (jm1)
                                                                  LREF
                                                                  Blank 15 Filed: 7/13/1998, Entered: 7/14/1998 Amended Complaint
                                                                  AMENDED COMPLAINT by MARTHENIA "MARTI" GAYMON , (Answer due 8/3/98 for OFFICE OF PROSECUTOR ) amending [1-1] complaint (jm1)
                                                                    LREF
                                                                    Blank 14 Filed: 7/13/1998, Entered: 7/14/1998 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                    CONSENT ORDER, for leave to file Amended Complaint, etc. ( signed by Mag. Judge Joel B. Rosen ) (jm1)
                                                                      LREF
                                                                      Blank -- Filed: 6/18/1998, Entered: 6/18/1998 Status Conference
                                                                      Status conference held before Mag. Judge Joel B. Rosen on June 17, 1998. (jm1)
                                                                        LREF
                                                                        Blank 13 Filed: 5/6/1998, Entered: 5/7/1998 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                        ORDER denying [8-1] motion for summary judgment and denying [7-1] motion for summary judgment ( signed by Judge Joseph E. Irenas ) (jm1)
                                                                          LREF
                                                                          Blank 12 Filed: 5/6/1998, Entered: 5/7/1998 Minutes-MiscellaneousCourt Filing
                                                                          Minute entry: Proceedings recorded by Ct-Reporter: S. DANER; Minutes of: 5.6.98; The following actions were taken, denying [7-1] motion for summary judgment; and terminating [7-2] hearing Motion hearing set for 4/17/98 on [7-1] motion By Judge Joseph E. Irenas (jm1)
                                                                            LREF
                                                                            Blank 11 Filed: 5/6/1998, Entered: 5/7/1998 Minutes-MiscellaneousCourt Filing
                                                                            Minute entry: Proceedings recorded by Ct-Reporter: S. DANER; Minutes of: 5/6/98; The following actions were taken, denying [8-1] motion for summary judgment; and terminating [8-2] hearing Motion hearing set for 5/1/98 on [8-1] motion By Judge Joseph E. Irenas (jm1)
                                                                              LREF
                                                                              Blank -- Filed: 5/1/1998, Entered: 5/1/1998 Motion Hearing
                                                                              Motion hearing re: [8-1] motion for summary judgment at 5/15/98, [7-1] motion for summary judgment at 5/15/98 (dv)
                                                                                LREF
                                                                                Blank -- Filed: 4/17/1998, Entered: 4/17/1998 Motion Hearing
                                                                                Motion hearing re: [7-1] motion for summary judgment at 5/1/98 (dv)
                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                  Blank 10 Filed: 4/8/1998, Entered: 4/13/1998 Substitution of Attorney
                                                                                  Substitute attorney for MARTHENIA "MARTI" GAYMON ; Terminated attorney ARTHUR N. MARTIN JR. for MARTHENIA "MARTI" GAYMON ; Added, RICHARD R. THOMAS II (jm1)
                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                    Blank 9 Filed: 4/7/1998, Entered: 4/8/1998 Scheduling OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                    SCHEDULING ORDER setting Discovery cutoff 8/31/98 ; Amending of pleadings on 5/1/98 ; Settlement conference 2:00 7/27/98 ; ( signed by Mag. Judge Joel B. Rosen ) (jm1)
                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                      Blank -- Filed: 4/3/1998, Entered: 4/3/1998 Scheduling Conference
                                                                                      Scheduling conference held before Mag. Judge Joel B. Rosen on March 2, 1998. (jm1)
                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                        Blank 8 Filed: 3/23/1998, Entered: 3/24/1998, Terminated: 5/6/1998 Motion for Summary Judgment
                                                                                        Notice of MOTION for summary judgment by OFFICE OF PROSECUTOR, Motion hearing set for 5/1/98 on [8-1] motion . (All Brief(s)/PO Subm) ORAL ARGUMENT REQUESTED (jm1)
                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                          Blank -- Filed: 3/17/1998, Entered: 3/18/1998 Status Conference
                                                                                          Status conference held before Mag. Judge Joel B. Rosen on 3/17/98. (er)
                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                            Blank 7 Filed: 3/9/1998, Entered: 3/9/1998, Terminated: 5/6/1998 Motion for Summary Judgment
                                                                                            Notice of MOTION for summary judgment by OFFICE OF PROSECUTOR, Motion hearing set for 4/17/98 on [7-1] motion . (Brief/PO Subm) (jm1)
                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                              Blank 6 Filed: 2/23/1998, Entered: 2/23/1998 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                              ORDER, setting scheduling conference for 11:30 4/2/98 ( signed by Mag. Judge Joel B. Rosen ) (jm1)
                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                Blank 5 Filed: 2/18/1998, Entered: 2/18/1998 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                Notice of Intent to submit a Dispositive motion by OFFICE OF PROSECUTOR (jm1)
                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                  Blank 4 Filed: 2/10/1998, Entered: 2/18/1998 Answer
                                                                                                  ANSWER to Complaint by OFFICE OF PROSECUTOR; with jury demand (mgr)
                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                    Blank 3 Filed: 1/5/1998, Entered: 1/5/1998 Waiver of Service Executed
                                                                                                    WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED as to OFFICE OF PROSECUTOR 12/22/97 Answer deadline projected for 2/20/98 for OFFICE OF PROSECUTOR (jm1)
                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                      Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                      Blank 2 Filed: 12/9/1997, Entered: 12/9/1997 Case Assigned/Reassigned
                                                                                                      NOTICE of Allocation and Assignment filed. Magistrate JOEL B. ROSEN (et)
                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                        Blank -- Filed: 12/9/1997, Entered: 12/9/1997 Summons Issued
                                                                                                        SUMMONS(ES) issued for OFFICE OF PROSECUTOR ( 20 Days) (Mailed to Counsel) (et)
                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                          Blank 1 Filed: 12/4/1997, Entered: 12/9/1997 Complaint
                                                                                                          COMPLAINT filed; jury demand FILING FEE $ 150.00 RECEIPT # 244698 (et)
                                                                                                            LREF

                                                                                                            Statistics

                                                                                                            This case has been viewed 37 times.

                                                                                                            No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                            Space
                                                                                                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                             
                                                                                                            PlainSite
                                                                                                            Sign Up
                                                                                                            Need Password Help?