UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. Manigault Newman
Federal Civil Lawsuit District Of Columbia District Court, Case No. 1:19-cv-01868-RJL
District Judge Richard J. Leon, presiding

Tags
Last Updated July 21, 2021 at 6:18 PM DT (2.2 months ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

United States of America United States of America, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Christopher M. Lynch +1 202 353 4537 +1 202 616 8470 christopher.m.lynch@usdoj.gov
v.
No Logo OMAROSA MANIGAULT NEWMAN, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space J. Wyndal Gordon +1 410 332 4121 jwgaattys@aol.com
Office Washington, DC
Filed 6/25/2019
Jury Demand None
Demand
Nature of Suit 890 - Other Statutes: Other Statutory Actions
Cause Section 28 U.S.C. § 1331 Fed. Question
Jurisdiction U.S. Government Plaintiff
Disposition
County 11001
Terminated
Origin 1
Reopened
Lead Case
None
Related Case
None
Other Court Case None
Defendant Custody Status
Flag TYPE-E
  Entries (48) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 7/21/2021, Entered: None Notice of Change of Address
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 7/20/2021, Entered: None Sealed Document
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 7/8/2021, Entered: None SEALED MOTION for Leave to File Document Under Seal
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 7/8/2021, Entered: None Memorandum
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 7/7/2021, Entered: None Response to Discovery Request
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 5/28/2021, Entered: None Status Report
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 5/28/2021, Entered: None Response to Order of the Court
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 4/6/2021, Entered: None Miscellaneous Relief
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 3/31/2021, Entered: None Status Report
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 3/17/2021, Entered: None Order on Motion to Compel
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 3/17/2021, Entered: None Memorandum & Opinion
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 2/25/2021, Entered: None Response to (non-motion) Document
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 2/19/2021, Entered: None Memorandum in Opposition to Motion
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 2/4/2021, Entered: None SUMMARY JUDGMENT
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 1/19/2021, Entered: None Reply to opposition to Motion
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 1/11/2021, Entered: None Response to Motion
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 1/3/2021, Entered: None Sealed Motion
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 12/21/2020, Entered: None Response to Motion
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 12/21/2020, Entered: None Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 12/8/2020, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 12/8/2020, Entered: None SEALED MOTION for Leave to File Document Under Seal
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 12/7/2020, Entered: None SUMMARY JUDGMENT
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 8/10/2020, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 7/8/2020, Entered: None Reply to opposition to Motion
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document 19 Filed: 7/1/2020, Entered: 7/1/2020 Response to motion
                                                  RESPONSE re [18] MOTION to Compel filed by OMAROSA MANIGAULT NEWMAN. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit "A", # (2) Exhibit "B")(Phillips, John)
                                                    LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 7/8/2020, Entered: None Reply to opposition to Motion
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 6/17/2020, Entered: 6/17/2020 Motion to compel
                                                      MOTION to Compel by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA (Attachments: # (1) Declaration of Christopher Lynch & Exhibits A-C, # (2) Text of Proposed Order)(Lynch, Christopher)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 7/1/2020, Entered: None Response to Motion
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 6/17/2020, Entered: 6/17/2020 Motion for protective order
                                                          MOTION for Protective Order Renewed by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA (Attachments: # (1) Declaration of Christopher Lynch & Exhibits A-I, # (2) Text of Proposed Order)(Lynch, Christopher)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 6/4/2020, Entered: 6/4/2020 Answer
                                                            ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by OMAROSA MANIGAULT NEWMAN.(Phillips, John)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Blank  Order on Motion to Dismiss
                                                              MINUTE ORDER. Upon consideration of [5] Defendant's Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Corrected Complaint, it is hereby ORDERED that the motion is DENIED. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Richard J. Leon on 05/20/2020. (lcrjl3)
                                                                LREF
                                                                Blank  Order on Motion for protective order
                                                                MINUTE ORDER. It is hereby ORDERED that both discovery and any further briefing be stayed until the Court's disposition of Defendant's motion to dismiss. In light of this order, it is further ORDERED that [13] Plaintiff's Motion for a Protective Order is DENIED AS MOOT. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Richard J. Leon on 12/6/2019. (lcrjl3)
                                                                  LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 12/2/2019, Entered: 12/2/2019 Reply to opposition to Motion
                                                                  REPLY to opposition to motion re [13] MOTION for Protective Order filed by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Lynch, Christopher)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 11/25/2019, Entered: 11/25/2019 Response to motion
                                                                    RESPONSE re [13] MOTION for Protective Order filed by OMAROSA MANIGAULT NEWMAN. (Phillips, John)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 11/13/2019, Entered: 11/13/2019, Terminated: 12/6/2019 Motion for protective order
                                                                      MOTION for Protective Order by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA (Attachments: # (1) Declaration of Christopher Lynch and Exhibits A-D, # (2) Text of Proposed Order)(Lynch, Christopher)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 10/29/2019, Entered: 10/29/2019 Notice of appearance
                                                                        NOTICE of Appearance by John M. Phillips on behalf of OMAROSA MANIGAULT NEWMAN (Phillips, John)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document 11 Filed: 10/28/2019, Entered: 10/28/2019 Meet and Confer Statement
                                                                          MEET AND CONFER STATEMENT. (Lynch, Christopher)
                                                                            LREF
                                                                            Legal Document 10 Filed: 10/10/2019, Entered: 10/10/2019 Substitution of Counsel
                                                                            NOTICE OF SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL by Christopher M. Lynch on behalf of All Plaintiffs Substituting for attorney Ashley Cheung (Lynch, Christopher)
                                                                              LREF
                                                                              Legal Document 9 Filed: 9/25/2019, Entered: 9/25/2019 Memorandum in opposition
                                                                              Memorandum in opposition to re [5] MOTION to Dismiss filed by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order)(Cheung, Ashley)
                                                                                LREF
                                                                                Legal Document 8 Filed: 9/13/2019, Entered: 9/13/2019 Notice of Proposed Order
                                                                                NOTICE of Proposed Order by OMAROSA MANIGAULT NEWMAN re [5] MOTION to Dismiss (Gordon, Jon)
                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document 7 Filed: 9/13/2019, Entered: 9/13/2019 Notice - other
                                                                                  NOTICE of FILING EXHIBITS A & B IN SUPPORT OF Df.'s MOTION TO DISMISS by OMAROSA MANIGAULT NEWMAN re [5] MOTION to Dismiss (Gordon, Jon)
                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document 6 Filed: 9/12/2019, Entered: 9/12/2019 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                    STANDING ORDER. Signed by Judge Richard J. Leon on 09/12/2019. (lcrjl3)
                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document 5 Filed: 9/11/2019, Entered: 9/11/2019, Terminated: 5/21/2020 Motion to Dismiss
                                                                                      MOTION to Dismiss by OMAROSA MANIGAULT NEWMAN (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit C: OMN Email (Mar. 26, 2018), # (2) Exhibit D: OMN Email (May 6, 2019), # (3) Exhibit E: Cheung, A. Email (May. 9, 2019), # (4) Exhibit F: Cheung, A. Email (May 10, 2019), # (5) Exhibit G: Phillips, J. Email (May 15, 2019), # (6) Exhibit H: Cheung, A. Email (May 28, 2019), # (7) Exhibit I: Pic of Gov. producing OMN property)(Gordon, Jon)
                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document 4 Filed: 8/23/2019, Entered: 8/23/2019 summons returned executed
                                                                                        RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. OMAROSA MANIGAULT NEWMAN served on 8/21/2019, answer due 9/11/2019 (Cheung, Ashley)
                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document 3 Filed: 7/2/2019, Entered: 7/2/2019 Summons Issued Electronically
                                                                                          SUMMONS (1) Issued Electronically as to OMAROSA MANIGAULT NEWMAN. (Attachment : # (1) Notice and Consent)(zeg)
                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                            Blank  Case Assigned/Reassigned
                                                                                            Case Assigned to Judge Richard J. Leon. (zeg)
                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document 2 Filed: 7/1/2019, Entered: 7/1/2019 Errata
                                                                                              ERRATA by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA [1] Complaint filed by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Attachments: # (1) Corrected Complaint)(Cheung, Ashley)
                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document 1 Filed: 6/25/2019, Entered: 6/25/2019 Complaint
                                                                                                COMPLAINT against Omarosa Manigault Newman (Fee Status:Filing Fee Waived) filed by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Attachments: # (1) Civil Cover Sheet, # (2) Summons)(Cheung, Ashley)
                                                                                                  LREF

                                                                                                  Statistics

                                                                                                  This case has been viewed 49 times.

                                                                                                  No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                  Space
                                                                                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                   
                                                                                                  PlainSite
                                                                                                  Sign Up
                                                                                                  Need Password Help?