McCarthy v. Tesla, Inc.
State Civil Lawsuit Superior Court of California, County of Alameda, Case No. RG19024488

Tags
Last Updated March 19, 2021 at 8:34 PM DT (1.7 months ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Mccarthy, Kevin B. Ii, Plaintiff
No Logo Mccarthy, Mary Claire, Plaintiff
No Logo Mccarthy, Moira G., Plaintiff
No Logo Mccarthy, Stacey, Plaintiff
v.
Tesla, Inc. Tesla, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Sanguinetti, Elise R, Attorney
Case Type Civil
Complaint Type Product Liability
Case Subtype General Civil
Filing Location Rene C. Davidson Alameda County Courthouse
  Entries (9) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 10/30/2019, Entered: None ?
Notice of Case Transferred Out of County Filed (2 Pages)
    Request RequestSpace
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 9/27/2019, Entered: None ?
    Notice of Case Transferred Out of County Filed (2 Pages)
      Request RequestSpace
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 7/25/2019, Entered: None ?
      Stipulation and Order Re: Transfer Out of County Granted (4 Pages)
        Request RequestSpace
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 7/24/2019, Entered: None ?
        Stipulation and Order Re: Transfer Out of County Filed for Tesla, Inc. (2 Pages)
          Request RequestSpace
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 6/26/2019, Entered: None ?Court Filing
          Notice of Assignment of Judge for All Purposes Issued (3 Pages)
            Request RequestSpace
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 6/26/2019, Entered: None ?
            Initial Case Management Conference 11/07/2019 09:00 AM D- 16 (2 Pages)
              Request RequestSpace
              Legal Document 3 Filed: 6/25/2019, Entered: None ?
              Summons on Complaint Issued and Filed (1 Page)
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 6/25/2019, Entered: None ?
                Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed for Stacey McCarthy (2 Pages)
                  Request RequestSpace
                  Legal Document 1 Filed: 6/25/2019, Entered: None ?
                  Complaint - Product Liability Filed (46 Pages)

                    Statistics

                    This case has been viewed 107 times.

                    No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                    Space
                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                     
                    PlainSite
                    Sign Up
                    Need Password Help?