Allstate Insurance Company v. Khotenok
Federal Civil Lawsuit New York Eastern District Court, Case No. 1:18-cv-05650
District Judge Jack B. Weinstein, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated June 28, 2019 at 12:31 AM DT (1.9 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Allstate Property & Casualty Insurance Company, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Morrison, Mahoney LLP-CT

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED James A McKenney +1 212 825 1212 +1 212 825 1313 jmckenney@morrisonmahoney.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Andrew Midgett +1 212 825 1212 +1 212 825 1313 amidgett@morrisonmahoney.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Lee Pinzow +1 212 825 1212 +1 212 825 1313 lpinzow@morrisonmahoney.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Robert A. Stern +1 212 825 1212 +1 212 825 1313 rstern@morrisonmahoney.com
No Logo Absolute Chiropractic & Wellness, P.C., Counter-Claimant

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices Of Mandell And Santora

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Eitan Nof +1 516 599 8866
No Logo JJ & R Chiropractic, P.C., Counter-Claimant

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices Of Mandell And Santora

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Eitan Nof +1 516 599 8866
No Logo Joseph R Gambino, D.C., Counter-Claimant

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices Of Mandell And Santora

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Eitan Nof +1 516 599 8866
v.
No Logo A.R.A. Medical Care, P.C., Defendant
No Logo ABC Corporations 1 through 20, Defendant
No Logo Ahmed Medical Care, P.C., Defendant
No Logo All Kind Physical Therapy P.C., Defendant
No Logo Bayview Medical Care, P.C., Defendant
No Logo Grace Ragues Maisel, MD, Defendant
No Logo John Does 1 through 20, Defendant
No Logo M.H.Z. Physical Therapy P.C., Defendant
No Logo Mark Mirvis, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Gary Tsirelman PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Nicholas Paul Bowers +1 718 438 1200 +1 718 438 8883 nbowers@gtmdjd.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Gary Tsirelman +1 718 438 1200 +1 718 438 8883 gtsirelman@gtmdjd.com
No Logo Mohamed Hamed Anter Zidan, P.T., Defendant
No Logo Pawel Gierucki, L.Ac., Defendant
No Logo Performance Plus Medical P.C., Defendant
No Logo Roger Fils Jacques, M.D., Defendant
No Logo Shaikh Jauhar Ahmed, M.D., Defendant
No Logo Silver Needle Acupuncture, P.C., Defendant
No Logo Suhel Hussain Ahmed, M.D., Defendant
No Logo Svetlana Khotenok, Defendant
No Logo Urbain Richard, Defendant
No Logo Allstate Fire & Casualty Insurance Company, Counter-Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Morrison, Mahoney LLP-CT

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED James A McKenney +1 212 825 1212 +1 212 825 1313 jmckenney@morrisonmahoney.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Andrew Midgett +1 212 825 1212 +1 212 825 1313 amidgett@morrisonmahoney.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Lee Pinzow +1 212 825 1212 +1 212 825 1313 lpinzow@morrisonmahoney.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Robert A. Stern +1 212 825 1212 +1 212 825 1313 rstern@morrisonmahoney.com
No Logo Allstate Indemnity Company, Counter-Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Morrison, Mahoney LLP-CT

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED James A McKenney +1 212 825 1212 +1 212 825 1313 jmckenney@morrisonmahoney.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Andrew Midgett +1 212 825 1212 +1 212 825 1313 amidgett@morrisonmahoney.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Lee Pinzow +1 212 825 1212 +1 212 825 1313 lpinzow@morrisonmahoney.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Robert A. Stern +1 212 825 1212 +1 212 825 1313 rstern@morrisonmahoney.com
No Logo AllState Insurance Company, Counter-Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Morrison, Mahoney LLP-CT

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED James A McKenney +1 212 825 1212 +1 212 825 1313 jmckenney@morrisonmahoney.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Andrew Midgett +1 212 825 1212 +1 212 825 1313 amidgett@morrisonmahoney.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Lee Pinzow +1 212 825 1212 +1 212 825 1313 lpinzow@morrisonmahoney.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Robert A. Stern +1 212 825 1212 +1 212 825 1313 rstern@morrisonmahoney.com
Citation Section 18 U.S.C. § 1964
Nature of Suit 470 - Civil (RICO) Racketeer/Corrupt Organization
  Entries (69) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 1/8/2019, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
ORDER granting 50 Motion for Extension of Time to File /serve the Summons and Complaint on Defendant Grace Ragues Maisel, M.D., by February 7, 2019. Further extensions unlikely. Counsel is reminded that the magistrate judges handle all pretrial matters in civil cases. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Ramon E. Reyes, Jr on 1/7/2019. (Vertus, Miriam)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 62 Filed: 1/7/2019, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
    Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT It appearing from the docket maintained in this action that defendant Performance Plus Medical P.C. has failed to appear or otherwise defend this action, the default of defendant Performance Plus Medical P.C. is hereby noted pursuant to Rule 55a of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure.(Poveda, J.) (Entered: 01/07/2019)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 61 Filed: 1/7/2019, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
      Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT It appearing from the docket maintained in this action that defendant Shaikh Jauhar Ahmed, MD has failed to appear or otherwise defend this action, the default of defendant Shaikh Jauhar Ahmed, MD is hereby noted pursuant to Rule 55a of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. (Poveda, J.) (Entered: 01/07/2019)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 60 Filed: 1/7/2019, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
        Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT It appearing from the docket maintained in this action that defendant Suhel Hussain Ahmed, M.D. has failed to appear or otherwise defend this action, the default of defendant Suhel Hussain Ahmed, M.D. is hereby noted pursuant to Rule 55a of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure.(Poveda, J.) (Entered: 01/07/2019)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 59 Filed: 1/7/2019, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
          Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT It appearing from the docket maintained in this action that defendant Silver Needle Acupuncture, P.C. has failed to appear or otherwise defend this action, the default of defendant Silver Needle Acupuncture, P.C. is hereby noted pursuant to Rule 55a of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. (Poveda, J.) (Entered: 01/07/2019)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 58 Filed: 1/7/2019, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
            Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT It appearing from the docket maintained in this action that defendant M.H.Z. Physical Therapy P.C. has failed to appear or otherwise defend this action, the default of defendant M.H.Z. Physical Therapy P.C. is hereby noted pursuant to Rule 55a of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. (Poveda, J.) (Entered: 01/07/2019)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 1/7/2019, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
              Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT It appearing from the docket maintained in this action that defendant Mohamed Hamed Anter Zidan, PT has failed to appear or otherwise defend this action, the default of defendant Mohamed Hamed Anter Zidan, PT is hereby noted pursuant to Rule 55a of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. (Poveda, J.) (Entered: 01/07/2019)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 1/7/2019, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT It appearing from the docket maintained in this action that defendant Urbain Richard has failed to appear or otherwise defend this action, the default of defendant Urbain Richard is hereby noted pursuant to Rule 55a of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. (Poveda, J.) (Entered: 01/07/2019)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 1/7/2019, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                  Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT It appearing from the docket maintained in this action that defendant Pawel Gierucki, L.Ac. has failed to appear or otherwise defend this action, the default of defendant Pawel Gierucki, L.Ac. is hereby noted pursuant to Rule 55a of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. (Poveda, J.) (Entered: 01/07/2019)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 1/7/2019, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                    Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT It appearing from the docket maintained in this action that defendant Svetlana Khotenok has failed to appear or otherwise defend this action, the default of defendant Svetlana Khotenok is hereby noted pursuant to Rule 55a of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. (Poveda, J.) (Entered: 01/07/2019)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 1/7/2019, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                      Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT It appearing from the docket maintained in this action that defendant A.R.A. Medical Care, P.C. has failed to appear or otherwise defend this action, the default of defendant A.R.A. Medical Care, P.C. is hereby noted pursuant to Rule 55a of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. (Poveda, J.) (Entered: 01/07/2019)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 1/7/2019, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                        Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT It appearing from the docket maintained in this action that defendant Ahmed Medical Care, P.C. has failed to appear or otherwise defend this action, the default of defendant Ahmed Medical Care, P.C. is hereby noted pursuant to Rule 55a of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. (Poveda, J.) (Entered: 01/07/2019)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 1/7/2019, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                          Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT It appearing from the docket maintained in this action that defendant All Kind Physical Therapy P.C. has failed to appear or otherwise defend this action, the default of defendant All Kind Physical Therapy P.C. is hereby noted pursuant to Rule 55a of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. (Poveda, J.) (Entered: 01/07/2019)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 1/4/2019, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                            MOTION for Extension of Time to File /serve the Summons and Complaint on Defendant Grace Ragues Maisel, M.D. by Allstate Fire & Casualty Insurance Company, Allstate Indemnity Company, Allstate Insurance Company, Allstate Property & Casualty Insurance Company. (Pinzow, Lee) (Entered: 01/04/2019)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 1/3/2019, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                              Request for Certificate of Default by Allstate Fire & Casualty Insurance Company, Allstate Indemnity Company, Allstate Insurance Company, Allstate Property & Casualty Insurance Company (McKenney, James) (Entered: 01/03/2019)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 1/3/2019, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                Request for Certificate of Default by Allstate Fire & Casualty Insurance Company, Allstate Indemnity Company, Allstate Insurance Company, Allstate Property & Casualty Insurance Company (McKenney, James) (Entered: 01/03/2019)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 1/3/2019, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                  Request for Certificate of Default by Allstate Fire & Casualty Insurance Company, Allstate Indemnity Company, Allstate Insurance Company, Allstate Property & Casualty Insurance Company (McKenney, James) (Entered: 01/03/2019)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 1/3/2019, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                    Request for Certificate of Default by Allstate Fire & Casualty Insurance Company, Allstate Indemnity Company, Allstate Insurance Company, Allstate Property & Casualty Insurance Company (McKenney, James) (Entered: 01/03/2019)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 1/3/2019, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                      Request for Certificate of Default by Allstate Fire & Casualty Insurance Company, Allstate Indemnity Company, Allstate Insurance Company, Allstate Property & Casualty Insurance Company (McKenney, James) (Entered: 01/03/2019)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 1/3/2019, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                        Request for Certificate of Default by Allstate Fire & Casualty Insurance Company, Allstate Indemnity Company, Allstate Insurance Company, Allstate Property & Casualty Insurance Company (McKenney, James) (Entered: 01/03/2019)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 1/3/2019, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                          Request for Certificate of Default by Allstate Fire & Casualty Insurance Company, Allstate Indemnity Company, Allstate Insurance Company, Allstate Property & Casualty Insurance Company (McKenney, James) (Entered: 01/03/2019)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 1/3/2019, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                            Request for Certificate of Default by Allstate Fire & Casualty Insurance Company, Allstate Indemnity Company, Allstate Insurance Company, Allstate Property & Casualty Insurance Company (McKenney, James) (Entered: 01/03/2019)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 1/3/2019, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                              Request for Certificate of Default by Allstate Fire & Casualty Insurance Company, Allstate Indemnity Company, Allstate Insurance Company, Allstate Property & Casualty Insurance Company (McKenney, James) (Entered: 01/03/2019)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 1/3/2019, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                Request for Certificate of Default by Allstate Fire & Casualty Insurance Company, Allstate Indemnity Company, Allstate Insurance Company, Allstate Property & Casualty Insurance Company (McKenney, James) (Entered: 01/03/2019)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 1/3/2019, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                  Request for Certificate of Default by Allstate Fire & Casualty Insurance Company, Allstate Indemnity Company, Allstate Insurance Company, Allstate Property & Casualty Insurance Company (McKenney, James) (Entered: 01/03/2019)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 1/3/2019, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                    Request for Certificate of Default by Allstate Fire & Casualty Insurance Company, Allstate Indemnity Company, Allstate Insurance Company, Allstate Property & Casualty Insurance Company (McKenney, James) (Entered: 01/03/2019)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 12/30/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                      NOTICE of Appearance by Gary Tsirelman on behalf of Mark Mirvis (aty to be noticed) (Tsirelman, Gary) (Entered: 12/30/2018)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 12/28/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                        ANSWER to 1 Complaint,, by Mark Mirvis. (Bowers, Nicholas) (Entered: 12/28/2018)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 12/28/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                          NOTICE of Appearance by Nicholas Paul Bowers on behalf of Mark Mirvis (aty to be noticed) (Bowers, Nicholas) (Entered: 12/28/2018)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 12/27/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                            ORDER granting 34 Motion to Adjourn Conference. No further adjournments for any reason. The 1/16/2019 Initial Conference is rescheduled for 2/21/2019 at 10:30 AM in Courtroom 2E North before Magistrate Judge Ramon E. Reyes, Jr. The parties' proposed Case Management Statement must be completed and filed on ECF no later than 1/15/2019. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Ramon E. Reyes, Jr on 12/26/2018. (Vertus, Miriam) Text ADDED on 12/27/2018 (Vertus, Miriam).
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 12/27/2018, Entered: None Order on Motion to Adjourn Conference
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 12/26/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                Letter MOTION to Adjourn Conference by Allstate Fire & Casualty Insurance Company, Allstate Indemnity Company, Allstate Insurance Company, Allstate Property & Casualty Insurance Company. (McKenney, James) (Entered: 12/26/2018)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 12/17/2018, Entered: None answer to counterclaim
                                                                  ANSWER to 32 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim by All Plaintiffs. (Pinzow, Lee) (Entered: 12/17/2018)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 12/4/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                    ANSWER to 1 Complaint,,, COUNTERCLAIM against All Plaintiffs by Absolute Chiropractic & Wellness, P.C., JJ & R Chiropractic, P.C., Joseph R Gambino, D.C.. (Nof, Eitan) (Entered: 12/04/2018)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 11/30/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                      SUMMONS Returned Executed by Allstate Fire & Casualty Insurance Company, Allstate Insurance Company, Allstate Indemnity Company, Allstate Property & Casualty Insurance Company. Roger Fils Jacques, MD served on 11/27/2018, answer due 12/18/2018. (Pinzow, Lee) (Entered: 11/30/2018)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 11/29/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                        ORDER granting 30 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Defendant Mark Mirvis answer is due 12/28/2018. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Ramon E. Reyes, Jr on 11/29/2018. (Vertus, Miriam)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 11/29/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                          MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 1 Complaint,, Solely as to Defendant Mark Mirvis by Allstate Fire & Casualty Insurance Company, Allstate Indemnity Company, Allstate Insurance Company, Allstate Property & Casualty Insurance Company. (Pinzow, Lee) (Entered: 11/29/2018)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 11/27/2018, Entered: None summons returned executed
                                                                            SUMMONS Returned Executed by Allstate Fire & Casualty Insurance Company, Allstate Insurance Company, Allstate Indemnity Company, Allstate Property & Casualty Insurance Company. Mohamed Hamed Anter Zidan, PT served on 11/16/2018, answer due 12/7/2018. (Pinzow, Lee) (Entered: 11/27/2018)
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 11/27/2018, Entered: None summons returned executed
                                                                              SUMMONS Returned Executed by Allstate Fire & Casualty Insurance Company, Allstate Insurance Company, Allstate Indemnity Company, Allstate Property & Casualty Insurance Company. Svetlana Khotenok served on 11/16/2018, answer due 12/7/2018. (Pinzow, Lee) (Entered: 11/27/2018)
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 11/15/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                AMENDED ORDER re 12 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Defendants Absolute Chiropractic & Wellness, P.C., Joseph R Gambino, D.C., and JJ & R Chiropractic, P.C., answers are due 12/28/2018. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Ramon E. Reyes, Jr on 11/15/2018. (Vertus, Miriam)
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 11/15/2018, Entered: None summons returned executed
                                                                                  SUMMONS Returned Executed by Allstate Fire & Casualty Insurance Company, Allstate Insurance Company, Allstate Indemnity Company, Allstate Property & Casualty Insurance Company. Joseph R Gambino, D.C. served on 11/12/2018, answer due 12/28/2019. (Pinzow, Lee) (Entered: 11/15/2018)
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 11/15/2018, Entered: None summons returned executed
                                                                                    SUMMONS Returned Executed by Allstate Fire & Casualty Insurance Company, Allstate Insurance Company, Allstate Indemnity Company, Allstate Property & Casualty Insurance Company. Mark Mirvis served on 11/12/2018, answer due 12/3/2018. (Pinzow, Lee) (Entered: 11/15/2018)
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 11/15/2018, Entered: None summons returned executed
                                                                                      SUMMONS Returned Executed by Allstate Fire & Casualty Insurance Company, Allstate Insurance Company, Allstate Indemnity Company, Allstate Property & Casualty Insurance Company. Silver Needle Acupuncture, P.C. served on 11/8/2018, answer due 11/29/2018. (Pinzow, Lee) (Entered: 11/15/2018)
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 11/15/2018, Entered: None summons returned executed
                                                                                        SUMMONS Returned Executed by Allstate Fire & Casualty Insurance Company, Allstate Insurance Company, Allstate Indemnity Company, Allstate Property & Casualty Insurance Company. Performance Plus Medical P.C. served on 11/8/2018, answer due 11/29/2018. (Pinzow, Lee) (Entered: 11/15/2018)
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 11/15/2018, Entered: None summons returned executed
                                                                                          SUMMONS Returned Executed by Allstate Fire & Casualty Insurance Company, Allstate Insurance Company, Allstate Indemnity Company, Allstate Property & Casualty Insurance Company. M.H.Z. Physical Therapy P.C. served on 11/8/2018, answer due 11/29/2018. (Pinzow, Lee) (Entered: 11/15/2018)
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 11/15/2018, Entered: None summons returned executed
                                                                                            SUMMONS Returned Executed by Allstate Fire & Casualty Insurance Company, Allstate Insurance Company, Allstate Indemnity Company, Allstate Property & Casualty Insurance Company. JJ & R Chiropractic, P.C. served on 11/8/2018, answer due 12/28/2019. (Pinzow, Lee) (Entered: 11/15/2018)
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 11/15/2018, Entered: None summons returned executed
                                                                                              SUMMONS Returned Executed by Allstate Fire & Casualty Insurance Company, Allstate Insurance Company, Allstate Indemnity Company, Allstate Property & Casualty Insurance Company. Bayview Medical Care, P.C. served on 11/8/2018, answer due 11/29/2018. (Pinzow, Lee) (Entered: 11/15/2018)
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 11/15/2018, Entered: None summons returned executed
                                                                                                SUMMONS Returned Executed by Allstate Fire & Casualty Insurance Company, Allstate Insurance Company, Allstate Indemnity Company, Allstate Property & Casualty Insurance Company. All Kind Physical Therapy P.C. served on 11/8/2018, answer due 11/29/2018. (Pinzow, Lee) (Entered: 11/15/2018)
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 11/15/2018, Entered: None summons returned executed
                                                                                                  SUMMONS Returned Executed by Allstate Fire & Casualty Insurance Company, Allstate Insurance Company, Allstate Indemnity Company, Allstate Property & Casualty Insurance Company. Ahmed Medical Care, P.C. served on 11/8/2018, answer due 11/29/2018. (Pinzow, Lee) (Entered: 11/15/2018)
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 11/15/2018, Entered: None summons returned executed
                                                                                                    SUMMONS Returned Executed by Allstate Fire & Casualty Insurance Company, Allstate Insurance Company, Allstate Indemnity Company, Allstate Property & Casualty Insurance Company. Absolute Chiropractic & Wellness, P.C. served on 11/8/2018, answer due 12/28/2019. (Pinzow, Lee) (Entered: 11/15/2018)
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 11/15/2018, Entered: None summons returned executed
                                                                                                      SUMMONS Returned Executed by Allstate Fire & Casualty Insurance Company, Allstate Insurance Company, Allstate Indemnity Company, Allstate Property & Casualty Insurance Company. A.R.A. Medical Care, P.C. served on 11/8/2018, answer due 11/29/2018. (Pinzow, Lee) (Entered: 11/15/2018)
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 11/15/2018, Entered: None summons returned executed
                                                                                                        SUMMONS Returned Executed by Allstate Fire & Casualty Insurance Company, Allstate Insurance Company, Allstate Indemnity Company, Allstate Property & Casualty Insurance Company. Suhel Hussain Ahmed, M.D. served on 11/8/2018, answer due 11/29/2018. (Pinzow, Lee) (Entered: 11/15/2018)
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 11/15/2018, Entered: None summons returned executed
                                                                                                          SUMMONS Returned Executed by Allstate Fire & Casualty Insurance Company, Allstate Insurance Company, Allstate Indemnity Company, Allstate Property & Casualty Insurance Company. Urbain Richard served on 11/8/2018, answer due 11/29/2018. (Pinzow, Lee) (Entered: 11/15/2018)
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 11/15/2018, Entered: None summons returned executed
                                                                                                            SUMMONS Returned Executed by Allstate Fire & Casualty Insurance Company, Allstate Insurance Company, Allstate Indemnity Company, Allstate Property & Casualty Insurance Company. Pawel Gierucki, L.Ac. served on 11/5/2018, answer due 11/26/2018. (Pinzow, Lee) (Entered: 11/15/2018)
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 11/15/2018, Entered: None summons returned executed
                                                                                                              SUMMONS Returned Executed by Allstate Fire & Casualty Insurance Company, Allstate Insurance Company, Allstate Indemnity Company, Allstate Property & Casualty Insurance Company. Shaikh Jauhar Ahmed, MD served on 11/3/2018, answer due 11/26/2018. (Pinzow, Lee) (Entered: 11/15/2018)
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 11/9/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                ORDER granting 12 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Defendants Absolute Chiropractic & Wellness, P.C., Joseph R Gambino, D.C., and JJ & R Chiropractic, P.C., answers are due 12/28/2019. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Ramon E. Reyes, Jr on 11/9/2018. (Vertus, Miriam)
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 11/9/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                  MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 1 Complaint,, Solely as to Defendants Joseph Robert Gambino, D.C., Absolute Chiropractic & Wellness, P.C., and JJ & R Chiropractic P.C. by Allstate Fire & Casualty Insurance Company, Allstate Indemnity Company, Allstate Insurance Company, Allstate Property & Casualty Insurance Company. (Pinzow, Lee) (Entered: 11/09/2018)
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 11/8/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                    NOTICE of Appearance by Andrew Midgett on behalf of All Plaintiffs (aty to be noticed) (Midgett, Andrew) (Entered: 11/08/2018)
                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 11/7/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                      NOTICE of Appearance by Eitan Nof on behalf of Absolute Chiropractic & Wellness, P.C., Joseph R Gambino, D.C., JJ & R Chiropractic, P.C. (aty to be noticed) (Nof, Eitan) (Entered: 11/07/2018)
                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 10/26/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                        Court Order on Case Filing: Treat under Local Rule 72.2. SO Ordered by Judge Jack B. Weinstein on 10/23/2018. (Ramesar, Thameera) (Entered: 10/26/2018)
                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 10/26/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                          NOTICE of Appearance by James A McKenney on behalf of All Plaintiffs (aty to be noticed) (McKenney, James) (Entered: 10/26/2018)
                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 10/26/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                            SCHEDULING ORDER: Initial Conference set for 1/16/2019 at 11:30 AM in Courtroom 2E North before Magistrate Judge Ramon E. Reyes Jr., located in the United States Eastern District of New York Courthouse, 225 Cadman Plaza East, Brooklyn, New York 11201. All counsel are required to attend, and plaintiff's counsel is directed to ensure that all counsel are aware of their obligation to appear. Any requests for adjournment must be made in writing on notice to opposing parties, and must disclose whether all parties consent. No request for adjournment will be considered unless made at least forty-eight (48) hours before the scheduled conference. Prior to the conference, the parties are to comply with the requirements of Rule 26(f) of the Fed. R. Civ. P. (See attached blank document) Case Management Statement must be completed and filed on ECF no later than 1/11/2019. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Ramon E. Reyes, Jr on 10/26/2018. (Vertus, Miriam) (Entered: 10/26/2018)
                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 10/16/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                              NOTICE of Appearance by Robert A. Stern on behalf of All Plaintiffs (aty to be noticed) (Stern, Robert) (Entered: 10/16/2018)
                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 10/10/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (Bowens, Priscilla) (Entered: 10/10/2018)
                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 10/10/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                  In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Bowens, Priscilla) (Entered: 10/10/2018)
                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 10/10/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                    Summons Issued as to A.R.A. Medical Care, P.C., Absolute Chiropractic & Wellness, P.C., Shaikh Jauhar Ahmed, MD, Ahmed Medical Care, P.C., Suhel Hussain Ahmed, M.D., All Kind Physical Therapy P.C., Bayview Medical Care, P.C., Joseph R Gambino, D.C., Pawel Gierucki, L.Ac., JJ & R Chiropractic, P.C., Roger Fils Jacques, MD, Svetlana Khotenok, M.H.Z. Physical Therapy P.C., Grace Ragues Maisel, MD, Mark Mirvis, Performance Plus Medical P.C., Urbain Richard, Silver Needle Acupuncture, P.C., Mohamed Hamed Anter Zidan, PT. (Bowens, Priscilla) (Entered: 10/10/2018)
                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 10/10/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                      Case assigned to Judge Jack B. Weinstein and Magistrate Judge Ramon E. Reyes, Jr. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Bowens, Priscilla)
                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 10/10/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                        DISCLOSURE of Interested Parties by Allstate Fire & Casualty Insurance Company, Allstate Insurance Company, Allstate Indemnity Company, Allstate Property & Casualty Insurance Company. (Bowens, Priscilla) (Entered: 10/10/2018)
                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 10/10/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                          COMPLAINT against All Defendants filing fee $ 400, receipt number ANYEDC-10807717 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -YES,, filed by Allstate Fire & Casualty Insurance Company, Allstate Insurance Company, Allstate Indemnity Company, Allstate Property & Casualty Insurance Company. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Proposed Summons, # 3 Rule 7.1 Disclosure, # 4 Appendix, # 5 Exhibit A, # 6 Exhibit B, # 7 Exhibit C, # 8 Exhibit D) (Pinzow, Lee) (Entered: 10/10/2018)
                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                                                                                            Statistics

                                                                                                                                            This case has been viewed 7 times.

                                                                                                                                            No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                            Space
                                                                                                                                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                             
                                                                                                                                            PlainSite
                                                                                                                                            Sign Up
                                                                                                                                            Need Password Help?