COMMITTEE ON WAYS AND MEANS, UNITED STATES HOUSE OF REPRESENTATIVES v. UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF THE TREASURY et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit District Of Columbia District Court, Case No. 1:19-cv-01974-TNM
District Judge Trevor N. McFadden, presiding

Tags
Last Updated September 17, 2021 at 3:48 PM DT (1.1 weeks ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

United States House of Representatives, Ways And Means Committee United States House of Representatives, Ways And Means Committee, Plaintiff
Officially listed as "COMMITTEE ON WAYS AND MEANS, UNITED STATES HOUSE OF REPRESENTATIVES"

Toggle Switch Represented by United States House of Representatives

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Megan Barbero +1 202 225 9700 megan.barbero@mail.house.gov
Space Sarah Clouse +1 202 225 9700 sarah.clouse@mail.house.gov
Space Brooks M. Hanner +1 202 225 9700 brooks.hanner@mail.house.gov
Space Douglas N. Letter +1 202 225 9700 douglas.letter@mail.house.gov
Space Josephine Thacher Morse +1 202 225 9700 jodie.morse@mail.house.gov
Space Todd Barry Tatelman +1 202 225 9700 +1 202 226 1360 todd.tatelman@mail.house.gov
v.
No Logo CHARLES P. RETTIG, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Andrew Marshall Bernie +1 202 616 8488 +1 202 616 8470 andrew.m.bernie@usdoj.gov
Space James Mahoney Burnham +1 202 353 5049 james.burnham@usdoj.gov
Space James J. Gilligan +1 202 514 3358 +1 202 616 8470 james.gilligan@usdoj.gov
Space Cristen C. Handley +1 202 305 2677 cristen.handley@usdoj.gov
Space David Michael Morrell +1 202 514 2331 david.m.morrell@usdoj.gov
Space Steven A. Myers +1 202 305 8648 +1 202 616 8460 steven.a.myers@usdoj.gov
Space Serena M. Orloff +1 202 616 3619 +1 202 514 9163 serena.m.orloff@usdoj.gov
United States Department of the Treasury, Internal Revenue Service United States Department of the Treasury, Internal Revenue Service, Defendant
Officially listed as "INTERNAL REVENUE SERVICE"

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Andrew Marshall Bernie +1 202 616 8488 +1 202 616 8470 andrew.m.bernie@usdoj.gov
Space James Mahoney Burnham +1 202 353 5049 james.burnham@usdoj.gov
Space James J. Gilligan +1 202 514 3358 +1 202 616 8470 james.gilligan@usdoj.gov
Space Cristen C. Handley +1 202 305 2677 cristen.handley@usdoj.gov
Space David Michael Morrell +1 202 514 2331 david.m.morrell@usdoj.gov
Space Steven A. Myers +1 202 305 8648 +1 202 616 8460 steven.a.myers@usdoj.gov
Space Serena M. Orloff +1 202 616 3619 +1 202 514 9163 serena.m.orloff@usdoj.gov
Mnuchin, Steven Mnuchin, Steven, Defendant
Officially listed as "STEVEN T. MNUCHIN"

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Andrew Marshall Bernie +1 202 616 8488 +1 202 616 8470 andrew.m.bernie@usdoj.gov
Space James Mahoney Burnham +1 202 353 5049 james.burnham@usdoj.gov
Space James J. Gilligan +1 202 514 3358 +1 202 616 8470 james.gilligan@usdoj.gov
Space Cristen C. Handley +1 202 305 2677 cristen.handley@usdoj.gov
Space David Michael Morrell +1 202 514 2331 david.m.morrell@usdoj.gov
Space Steven A. Myers +1 202 305 8648 +1 202 616 8460 steven.a.myers@usdoj.gov
Space Serena M. Orloff +1 202 616 3619 +1 202 514 9163 serena.m.orloff@usdoj.gov
United States Department of the Treasury United States Department of the Treasury, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space James Mahoney Burnham +1 202 353 5049 james.burnham@usdoj.gov
Space David Michael Morrell +1 202 514 2331 david.m.morrell@usdoj.gov

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Andrew Marshall Bernie +1 202 616 8488 +1 202 616 8470 andrew.m.bernie@usdoj.gov
Space James J. Gilligan +1 202 514 3358 +1 202 616 8470 james.gilligan@usdoj.gov
Space Cristen C. Handley +1 202 305 2677 cristen.handley@usdoj.gov
Space Steven A. Myers +1 202 305 8648 +1 202 616 8460 steven.a.myers@usdoj.gov
Space Serena M. Orloff +1 202 616 3619 +1 202 514 9163 serena.m.orloff@usdoj.gov
No Logo CHARLES TIEFER, Amicus

Toggle Switch Represented by Robbins Rusell Englert Orseck Untereiner & Sauber, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Wendy Liu +1 202 471 3045 wliu@robbinsrussell.com
Space Lawrence Saul Robbins +1 202 775 4501 +1 202 775 4510 lrobbins@robbinsrussell.com
Space David Hunter Smith +1 203 787 3513 +1 203 789 1605 hsmith@robbinsrussell.com
No Logo CONSTITUTIONAL LAW SCHOLARS, Amicus

Toggle Switch Represented by Gupta Wessler PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Deepak Gupta +1 202 888 1741 deepak@guptawessler.com

Toggle Switch Represented by President and Fellows of Harvard College

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Laurence H. Tribe +1 617 495 4621 larry@tribelaw.com
No Logo Duane Morley Cox, Amicus
No Logo GERALDINE R. GENNET, Amicus

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Wendy Liu +1 202 471 3045 wliu@robbinsrussell.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Robbins Rusell Englert Orseck Untereiner & Sauber, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Lawrence Saul Robbins +1 202 775 4501 +1 202 775 4510 lrobbins@robbinsrussell.com
Space David Hunter Smith +1 203 787 3513 +1 203 789 1605 hsmith@robbinsrussell.com
No Logo IRVIN B. NATHAN, Amicus

Toggle Switch Represented by Robbins Rusell Englert Orseck Untereiner & Sauber, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Wendy Liu +1 202 471 3045 wliu@robbinsrussell.com
Space Lawrence Saul Robbins +1 202 775 4501 +1 202 775 4510 lrobbins@robbinsrussell.com
Space David Hunter Smith +1 203 787 3513 +1 203 789 1605 hsmith@robbinsrussell.com
No Logo KERRY W. KIRCHER, Amicus

Toggle Switch Represented by Robbins Rusell Englert Orseck Untereiner & Sauber, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Wendy Liu +1 202 471 3045 wliu@robbinsrussell.com
Space Lawrence Saul Robbins +1 202 775 4501 +1 202 775 4510 lrobbins@robbinsrussell.com
Space David Hunter Smith +1 203 787 3513 +1 203 789 1605 hsmith@robbinsrussell.com
No Logo THOMAS J. SPULAK, Amicus

Toggle Switch Represented by Robbins Rusell Englert Orseck Untereiner & Sauber, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Wendy Liu +1 202 471 3045 wliu@robbinsrussell.com
Space Lawrence Saul Robbins +1 202 775 4501 +1 202 775 4510 lrobbins@robbinsrussell.com
Space David Hunter Smith +1 203 787 3513 +1 203 789 1605 hsmith@robbinsrussell.com
No Logo WILLIAM PITTARD, Amicus

Toggle Switch Represented by Robbins Rusell Englert Orseck Untereiner & Sauber, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Wendy Liu +1 202 471 3045 wliu@robbinsrussell.com
Space Lawrence Saul Robbins +1 202 775 4501 +1 202 775 4510 lrobbins@robbinsrussell.com
Space David Hunter Smith +1 203 787 3513 +1 203 789 1605 hsmith@robbinsrussell.com
No Logo DJT Holdings, LLC, Intervenor Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Consovoy McCarthy PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space William S. Consovoy +1 703 243 4923 will@consovoymccarthy.com
Space Cameron Thomas Norris +1 865 257 0859 cam@consovoymccarthy.com
No Logo DJT HOLDINGS MANAGING MEMBER, LLC, Intervenor Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Consovoy McCarthy PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space William S. Consovoy +1 703 243 4923 will@consovoymccarthy.com
Space Cameron Thomas Norris +1 865 257 0859 cam@consovoymccarthy.com
Trump, Donald J. Trump, Donald J., Intervenor Defendant
Officially listed as "DONALD J. TRUMP"
Officer/Director, Riviera Holdings Corp

Toggle Switch Represented by Consovoy McCarthy PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space William S. Consovoy +1 703 243 4923 will@consovoymccarthy.com
Space Cameron Thomas Norris +1 865 257 0859 cam@consovoymccarthy.com
No Logo Donald J. Trump Revocable Trust, Intervenor Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Consovoy McCarthy PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space William S. Consovoy +1 703 243 4923 will@consovoymccarthy.com
Space Cameron Thomas Norris +1 865 257 0859 cam@consovoymccarthy.com
DTTM Operations LLC DTTM Operations LLC, Intervenor Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Consovoy McCarthy PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space William S. Consovoy +1 703 243 4923 will@consovoymccarthy.com
Space Cameron Thomas Norris +1 865 257 0859 cam@consovoymccarthy.com
No Logo DTTM OPERATIONS MANAGING MEMBER CORP., Intervenor Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Consovoy McCarthy PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space William S. Consovoy +1 703 243 4923 will@consovoymccarthy.com
Space Cameron Thomas Norris +1 865 257 0859 cam@consovoymccarthy.com
No Logo LAMINGTON FARM CLUB, LLC, Intervenor Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Consovoy McCarthy PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space William S. Consovoy +1 703 243 4923 will@consovoymccarthy.com
Space Cameron Thomas Norris +1 865 257 0859 cam@consovoymccarthy.com
No Logo LFB ACQUISITION LLC, Intervenor Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Consovoy McCarthy PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space William S. Consovoy +1 703 243 4923 will@consovoymccarthy.com
Space Cameron Thomas Norris +1 865 257 0859 cam@consovoymccarthy.com
No Logo LFB ACQUISITION MEMBER CORP., Intervenor Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Consovoy McCarthy PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space William S. Consovoy +1 703 243 4923 will@consovoymccarthy.com
Space Cameron Thomas Norris +1 865 257 0859 cam@consovoymccarthy.com
Office Washington, DC
Filed 7/2/2019
Jury Demand None
Demand
Nature of Suit 890 - Other Statutes: Other Statutory Actions
Cause Section 28 U.S.C. § 1331 Fed. Question
Jurisdiction U.S. Government Plaintiff
Disposition
County 11001
Terminated
Origin 1
Reopened
Lead Case
None
Related Case
None
Other Court Case None
Defendant Custody Status
Flags STAYED,TYPE-E
  Entries (166) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document 94 Filed: 8/28/2020, Entered: 8/28/2020 Response to motion
RESPONSE re [93] MOTION to Lift Stay filed by CHARLES P. RETTIG, INTERNAL REVENUE SERVICE, STEVEN T. MNUCHIN, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF THE TREASURY. (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order, # (2) Exhibit A (correspondence among counsel regarding accommodation))(Orloff, Serena)
    LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 93 Filed: 8/14/2020, Entered: 8/14/2020 Motion to Lift Stay
    MOTION to Lift Stay by COMMITTEE ON WAYS AND MEANS, UNITED STATES HOUSE OF REPRESENTATIVES (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order)(Letter, Douglas)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 92 Filed: 6/5/2020, Entered: 6/5/2020 transcriptCourt Filing
      TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS before Judge Trevor N. McFadden held on 03/05/2020; Page Numbers: 1-24. Date of Issuance:06/05/2020. Court Reporter/Transcriber Crystal M. Pilgrim, Telephone number 202.354.3127, Transcripts may be ordered by submitting the Transcript Order FormFor the first 90 days after this filing date, the transcript may be viewed at the courthouse at a public terminal or purchased from the court reporter referenced above. After 90 days, the transcript may be accessed via PACER. Other transcript formats, (multi-page, condensed, CD or ASCII) may be purchased from the court reporter.NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have twenty-one days to file with the court and the court reporter any request to redact personal identifiers from this transcript. If no such requests are filed, the transcript will be made available to the public via PACER without redaction after 90 days. The policy, which includes the five personal identifiers specifically covered, is located on our website at www.dcd.uscourts.gov. Redaction Request due 6/26/2020. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 7/6/2020. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 9/3/2020.(Pilgrim, Crystal)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 128 Filed: 9/17/2021, Entered: None Amicus Brief
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 91 Filed: 3/20/2020, Entered: 3/20/2020 OrderCourt Filing
          ORDER. This matter is STAYED pending further order of the Court. See attached Order for details. Signed by Judge Trevor N. McFadden on 3/20/2020. (lctnm2)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 127 Filed: 9/15/2021, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Blank  Case Stayed
              Case Stayed. (hmc)
                LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 126 Filed: 9/15/2021, Entered: None Leave to File Document
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 90 Filed: 3/17/2020, Entered: 3/17/2020 Notice of appearance
                  NOTICE of Appearance by Joshua Adam Matz on behalf of CONSTITUTIONAL LAW SCHOLARS (Matz, Joshua)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 125 Filed: 9/10/2021, Entered: None Appear Pro Hac Vice
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 89 Filed: 3/16/2020, Entered: 3/16/2020 Notice of Supplemental Authority
                      NOTICE OF SUPPLEMENTAL AUTHORITY by COMMITTEE ON WAYS AND MEANS, UNITED STATES HOUSE OF REPRESENTATIVES (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit)(Letter, Douglas)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 124 Filed: 9/10/2021, Entered: None Dismiss
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 88 Filed: 3/12/2020, Entered: 3/12/2020 Status report
                          Joint STATUS REPORT by CHARLES P. RETTIG, INTERNAL REVENUE SERVICE, STEVEN T. MNUCHIN, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF THE TREASURY. (Myers, Steven)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 123 Filed: 9/9/2021, Entered: None Dismiss
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Blank  Order on Motion to Lift Stay
                              Minute entry for proceedings held before Judge Trevor N. McFadden: Motion Hearing held on 3/5/2020. Plaintiff's [79] Motion to Lift Stay, denied as moot. Stay is lifted. Joint Status Report due in one week. (Court Reporter: Crystal Pilgrim.) (hmc)
                                LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 122 Filed: 9/9/2021, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 87 Filed: 3/4/2020, Entered: 3/4/2020 Memorandum in opposition
                                  Memorandum in opposition to re [86] MOTION to Vacate Hearing (Joint Opposition of Defendants and Defendant-Intervenors) filed by CHARLES P. RETTIG, INTERNAL REVENUE SERVICE, STEVEN T. MNUCHIN, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF THE TREASURY. (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order)(Myers, Steven)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 121 Filed: 8/16/2021, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 86 Filed: 3/4/2020, Entered: 3/4/2020, Terminated: 3/4/2020 Motion to vacate
                                      MOTION to Vacate Hearing by COMMITTEE ON WAYS AND MEANS, UNITED STATES HOUSE OF REPRESENTATIVES (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order)(Letter, Douglas). Added MOTION for Leave to File on 3/12/2020 (znmw).
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 120 Filed: 8/9/2021, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Blank  order on motion to vacate
                                          MINUTE ORDER denying Plaintiff's [86] Motion to Vacate Hearing. The hearing remains scheduled for March 5, 2020, at 11:00 a.m. in Courtroom 2, before Judge Trevor N. McFadden. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Trevor N. McFadden on 3/4/2020. (lctnm2)
                                            LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 119 Filed: 8/6/2021, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 85 Filed: 3/2/2020, Entered: 3/2/2020 Notice of appearance
                                              NOTICE of Appearance by David Michael Morrell on behalf of All Defendants (Morrell, David)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 118 Filed: 8/6/2021, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 84 Filed: 3/2/2020, Entered: 3/2/2020 Notice of Supplemental Authority
                                                  NOTICE OF SUPPLEMENTAL AUTHORITY by CHARLES P. RETTIG, INTERNAL REVENUE SERVICE, STEVEN T. MNUCHIN, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF THE TREASURY (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A - Committee on the Judiciary v. McGahn)(Myers, Steven)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 117 Filed: 8/5/2021, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Blank  set/reset hearings
                                                      Set/Reset Hearings: Motion Hearing set for 3/5/2020 at 11:00 AM in Courtroom 2 before Judge Trevor N. McFadden. (hmc)
                                                        LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 116 Filed: 8/5/2021, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 83 Filed: 2/29/2020, Entered: 2/29/2020 Notice of appearance
                                                          NOTICE of Appearance by Cameron Thomas Norris on behalf of DTTM OPERATIONS LLC, DJT HOLDINGS LLC, DJT HOLDINGS MANAGING MEMBER, LLC, DONALD J. TRUMP REVOCABLE TRUST, DTTM OPERATIONS MANAGING MEMBER CORP., LAMINGTON FARM CLUB, LLC, LFB ACQUISITION LLC, LFB ACQUISITION MEMBER CORP., DONALD J. TRUMP (Norris, Cameron)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 115 Filed: 8/5/2021, Entered: None Dismiss
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Blank  Order
                                                              MINUTE ORDER. It is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall appear for a hearing on the Plaintiff's [79] Motion to Lift Stay, on March 5, 2020, at 11:00 a.m. in Courtroom 2, before Judge Trevor N. McFadden. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Trevor N. McFadden on 2/28/2020. (lctnm2)
                                                                LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 114 Filed: 8/5/2021, Entered: None Status Report
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 82 Filed: 2/15/2020, Entered: 2/15/2020 Reply to opposition to Motion
                                                                  REPLY to opposition to motion re [79] MOTION to Lift Stay filed by COMMITTEE ON WAYS AND MEANS, UNITED STATES HOUSE OF REPRESENTATIVES. (Letter, Douglas)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 113 Filed: 8/4/2021, Entered: None Counterclaim
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 81 Filed: 2/11/2020, Entered: 2/11/2020 Response to motion
                                                                      RESPONSE re [79] MOTION to Lift Stay of Defendants and Defendant-Intervenors filed by CHARLES P. RETTIG, INTERNAL REVENUE SERVICE, STEVEN T. MNUCHIN, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF THE TREASURY. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A (status conference transcript), # (2) Exhibit B (correspondence of counsel), # (3) Proposed Order)(Orloff, Serena)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 112 Filed: 7/31/2021, Entered: None ERRATA
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Blank  Order on Motion to withdraw as attorney
                                                                          MINUTE ORDER granting the [80] Motion to Withdraw Appearance. James Burnham is hereby granted leave to withdraw as counsel for Defendants. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Trevor N. McFadden on 2/5/2020. (lctnm2)
                                                                            LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 111 Filed: 7/30/2021, Entered: None Status Report
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 80 Filed: 2/4/2020, Entered: 2/4/2020, Terminated: 2/5/2020 Motion to withdraw as attorney
                                                                              MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by CHARLES P. RETTIG, INTERNAL REVENUE SERVICE, STEVEN T. MNUCHIN, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF THE TREASURY (Burnham, James)
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 110 Filed: 7/9/2021, Entered: None Notice of Withdrawal of Appearance
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 79 Filed: 1/28/2020, Entered: 1/28/2020, Terminated: 3/5/2020 Motion to Lift Stay
                                                                                  MOTION to Lift Stay by COMMITTEE ON WAYS AND MEANS, UNITED STATES HOUSE OF REPRESENTATIVES (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order)(Letter, Douglas)
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 109 Filed: 7/2/2021, Entered: None Status Report
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 78 Filed: 1/17/2020, Entered: 1/17/2020 transcriptCourt Filing
                                                                                      TRANSCRIPT OF TELEPHONE CONFERENCE before Judge Trevor N. McFadden held on 1-14-20; Page Numbers: 1-15; Date of Issuance: 1-17-20; Court Reporter: Timothy R. Miller, Telephone number (202) 354-3111. Transcripts may be ordered by submitting the Transcript Order FormFor the first 90 days after this filing date, the transcript may be viewed at the courthouse at a public terminal or purchased from the court reporter referenced above. After 90 days, the transcript may be accessed via PACER. Other transcript formats, (multi-page, condensed, CD or ASCII) may be purchased from the court reporter.NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have twenty-one days to file with the court and the court reporter any request to redact personal identifiers from this transcript. If no such requests are filed, the transcript will be made available to the public via PACER without redaction after 90 days. The policy, which includes the five personal identifiers specifically covered, is located on our website at www.dcd.uscourts.gov. Redaction Request due 2/7/2020. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 2/17/2020. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 4/16/2020.(Miller, Timothy)
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 108 Filed: 5/28/2021, Entered: None Status Report
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Blank  Case Stayed
                                                                                          Case Stayed. (hmc)
                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 107 Filed: 4/30/2021, Entered: None Status Report
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Blank  Telephone Conference
                                                                                              Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Trevor N. McFadden: Telephone Conference held on 1/14/2020. (Court Reporter: Tim Miller.) (hmc)
                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 106 Filed: 3/31/2021, Entered: None Status Report
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Blank  Order
                                                                                                  MINUTE ORDER. For the reasons stated on the record during the Telephone Conference on January 14, 2020, this case is hereby STAYED pending a decision in Committee on the Judiciary, U.S. House of Representatives v. McGahn, No. 19-5331 (D.C. Cir.). SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Trevor N. McFadden on 1/14/2020. (lctnm2)
                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 105 Filed: 3/3/2021, Entered: None Status Report
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Blank  Order
                                                                                                      MINUTE ORDER setting a telephone conference for January 14, 2020, at 3:00 p.m. in Chambers before Judge Trevor N. McFadden. Dial-in information will be emailed to counsel. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Trevor N. McFadden on 1/14/2020. (lctnm2)
                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 104 Filed: 2/24/2021, Entered: None Transcript
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Blank  Order on Motion for reconsideration
                                                                                                          MINUTE ORDER. Mr. Cox's [77] Motion for Reconsideration is DENIED. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Trevor N. McFadden on 12/9/2019. (lctnm2)
                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 103 Filed: 2/4/2021, Entered: None Notice of Withdrawal of Appearance
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 76 Filed: 12/3/2019, Entered: 12/3/2019 Response to Document
                                                                                                              RESPONSE re [75] NOTICE OF SUPPLEMENTAL AUTHORITY (Defendants' and Defendant-Intervenors') filed by CHARLES P. RETTIG, INTERNAL REVENUE SERVICE, STEVEN T. MNUCHIN, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF THE TREASURY. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A - D.C. Circuit Order)(Myers, Steven)
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 102 Filed: 2/3/2021, Entered: None Status Report
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 77 Filed: 12/2/2019, Entered: 12/5/2019 Motion for reconsideration
                                                                                                                  MOTION for Reconsideration re Minute Order filed on 9/12/2019, by DUANE MORLEY COX. (Attachment: # (1) Exhibit - Attachments) (ztth)
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 101 Filed: 1/19/2021, Entered: None Notice of Withdrawal of Appearance
                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 75 Filed: 11/26/2019, Entered: 11/26/2019 Notice of Supplemental Authority
                                                                                                                      NOTICE OF SUPPLEMENTAL AUTHORITY by COMMITTEE ON WAYS AND MEANS, UNITED STATES HOUSE OF REPRESENTATIVES (Letter, Douglas)
                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 100 Filed: 1/19/2021, Entered: None Telephone Conference
                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 74 Filed: 11/19/2019, Entered: 11/19/2019 Response to Document
                                                                                                                          RESPONSE re [71] Memorandum (Defendants' and Defendant-Intervenors' Response to Plaintiff's Supplemental Memorandum) filed by CHARLES P. RETTIG, INTERNAL REVENUE SERVICE, STEVEN T. MNUCHIN, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF THE TREASURY. (Myers, Steven)
                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 99 Filed: 1/19/2021, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                              Blank  order on motion for leave to file
                                                                                                                              MINUTE ORDER denying Mr. Cox's [73] Motion for Leave to File. The time for filing an amicus brief has long since passed. See 9/12/19 Minute Order. While the Court has been liberal in allowing Mr. Cox to supplement his [45] Amicus Brief, the Court believes that yet additional supplements are unnecessary at this time. There shall be no further briefing from Mr. Cox or any other amici in this matter unless otherwise invited by the Court. See LCvR 7(o)(2). SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Trevor N. McFadden on 11/18/2019. (lctnm2)
                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                Blank  order on motion for leave to file
                                                                                                                                MINUTE ORDER denying Mr. Cox's [73] Motion for Leave to File. The time for filing an amicus brief has long since passed. See 9/12/19 Minute Order. While the Court has been liberal in allowing Mr. Cox to supplement his [45] Amicus Brief, the Court believes that yet additional supplements are unnecessary at this time. There shall be no further briefing from Mr. Cox or any other amici in this matter unless otherwise invited by the Court. See LCvR 7(o)(2). SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Trevor N. McFadden on 11/18/2019. (lctnm2)
                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 98 Filed: 1/19/2021, Entered: None Appear Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 72 Filed: 11/13/2019, Entered: 11/13/2019 Notice - other
                                                                                                                                    NOTICE of intent to respond by CHARLES P. RETTIG, INTERNAL REVENUE SERVICE, STEVEN T. MNUCHIN, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF THE TREASURY re [71] Memorandum (Myers, Steven)
                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 97 Filed: 9/11/2020, Entered: None Notice of Withdrawal of Appearance
                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 73 Filed: 11/12/2019, Entered: 11/15/2019 motion for leave to file
                                                                                                                                        MOTION for Leave to File by DUANE MORLEY COX. (Attachment: # (1) Exhibit - Recommendations from Hearing) (ztth)
                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 96 Filed: 9/4/2020, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 71 Filed: 11/12/2019, Entered: 11/12/2019 MEMORANDUM
                                                                                                                                            SUPPLEMENTAL MEMORANDUM by COMMITTEE ON WAYS AND MEANS, UNITED STATES HOUSE OF REPRESENTATIVES. (Letter, Douglas); Modified text and event on 11/13/2019 (ztth).
                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 95 Filed: 9/1/2020, Entered: None NOTICE OF SUPPLEMENTAL AUTHORITY
                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 70 Filed: 11/12/2019, Entered: 11/12/2019 transcriptCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                TRANSCRIPT OF MOTION HEARING before Judge Trevor N. McFadden held on November 6, 2019; Page Numbers: 1-151. Date of Issuance: November 12, 2019. Court Reporter/Transcriber Lisa Edwards. Telephone number (202) 354-3269. Transcripts may be ordered by submitting the Transcript Order FormFor the first 90 days after this filing date, the transcript may be viewed at the courthouse at a public terminal or purchased from the court reporter referenced above. After 90 days, the transcript may be accessed via PACER. Other transcript formats, (multi-page, condensed, CD or ASCII) may be purchased from the court reporter.NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have twenty-one days to file with the court and the court reporter any request to redact personal identifiers from this transcript. If no such requests are filed, the transcript will be made available to the public via PACER without redaction after 90 days. The policy, which includes the five personal identifiers specifically covered, is located on our website at www.dcd.uscourts.gov. Redaction Request due 12/3/2019. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 12/13/2019. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 2/10/2020.(Edwards, Lisa)
                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 69 Filed: 11/6/2019, Entered: 11/7/2019 Supplemental Memorandum
                                                                                                                                                  SUPPLEMENTAL MEMORANDUM to re [65] Amicus Brief, [45] Amicus Brief filed by DUANE MORLEY COX. (ztth)
                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Blank  order on motion for leave to file
                                                                                                                                                    MINUTE ORDER granting Mr. Cox's [68] Motion for Leave to File. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Trevor N. McFadden on 11/6/2019. (lctnm2)
                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Blank  Motion Hearing
                                                                                                                                                      Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Trevor N. McFadden: Motion Hearing held on 11/6/2019 re [44] MOTION to Dismiss (joint motion of Defendants and Defendant-Intervenors) filed by INTERNAL REVENUE SERVICE, STEVEN T. MNUCHIN, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF THE TREASURY, CHARLES P. RETTIG. Arguments heard and taken under advisement. (Court Reporter: Lisa Edwards.) (hmc)
                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 67 Filed: 11/1/2019, Entered: 11/1/2019 Notice of appearance
                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE of Appearance by Deepak Gupta on behalf of CONSTITUTIONAL LAW SCHOLARS (Gupta, Deepak)
                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 68 Filed: 10/31/2019, Entered: 11/5/2019 motion for leave to file
                                                                                                                                                          MOTION for Leave to File by DUANE MORLEY COX. (Attachment: # (1) Exhibit - Supplement to Amicus Pleadings) (ztth)
                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 66 Filed: 10/29/2019, Entered: 10/29/2019 MEMORANDUM
                                                                                                                                                            SUPPLEMENTAL MEMORANDUM re Order by COMMITTEE ON WAYS AND MEANS, UNITED STATES HOUSE OF REPRESENTATIVES. (Letter, Douglas); Modified event and text on 10/31/2019 (ztth).
                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 65 Filed: 10/23/2019, Entered: 10/24/2019 Amicus Brief
                                                                                                                                                              AMICUS BRIEF by DUANE MORLEY COX. (ztth)
                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Blank  order on motion for leave to file
                                                                                                                                                                MINUTE ORDER granting Mr. Cox's [64] Motion for Leave to File Brief. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Trevor N. McFadden on 10/23/2019. (lctnm2)
                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 63 Filed: 10/22/2019, Entered: 10/22/2019 MEMORANDUM
                                                                                                                                                                  SUPPLEMENTAL MEMORANDUM by CHARLES P. RETTIG, INTERNAL REVENUE SERVICE, STEVEN T. MNUCHIN, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF THE TREASURY. (Bernie, Andrew); Modified event and text on 10/23/2019 (ztth).
                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 64 Filed: 10/18/2019, Entered: 10/22/2019 motion for leave to file
                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION for Leave to File by DUANE MORLEY COX. (Attachment: # (1) Exhibit) (ztth)
                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Blank  Order on Motion to withdraw as attorney
                                                                                                                                                                      MINUTE ORDER granting the [62] Motion to Withdraw Appearance. Joshua Matz is hereby granted leave to withdraw as counsel for Amici Curiae, Constitutional Law Scholars. The Court directs amici's attention to Local Civil Rule 83.2(c)(1): "An attorney who is a member in good standing of the bar of any United States Court or of the highest court of any State, but who is not a member of the Bar of this Court, may file papers in this Court only if such attorney joins of record a member in good standing of the Bar of this Court. All papers submitted by non-members of the Bar of this Court must be signed by such counsel and by a member of the Bar of this Court joined in compliance with this Rule." SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Trevor N. McFadden on 10/17/2019. (lctnm2)
                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 62 Filed: 10/15/2019, Entered: 10/15/2019, Terminated: 10/17/2019 Motion to withdraw as attorney
                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney , by Joshua Matz by CONSTITUTIONAL LAW SCHOLARS (Matz, Joshua)
                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                          Blank  ***Set/Reset Deadlines
                                                                                                                                                                          Set/Reset Deadlines: Defendants and Defendant-Intervenors' supplemental brief due by 10/22/2019. Plaintiff's supplemental brief due by 10/29/2019. (hmc)
                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                            Blank  Order
                                                                                                                                                                            MINUTE ORDER. The parties are hereby invited to file supplemental briefing on the [44] Motion to Dismiss, in light of the D.C. Circuit's recent decision in Trump v. Mazars USA, LLP, No. 19-5142, 2019 WL 5089748 (D.C. Cir. Oct. 11, 2019). Defendants and Defendant-Intervenors shall file on or before October 22, 2019. If Defendants and Defendant-Intervenors file separately, their briefs shall not exceed ten pages each. If Defendants and Defendant-Intervenors file jointly, their brief shall not exceed 15 pages. Plaintiff shall file its brief on or before October 29, 2019. Plaintiff's brief shall not exceed 15 pages. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Trevor N. McFadden on 10/15/2019. (lctnm2)
                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 61 Filed: 10/3/2019, Entered: 10/4/2019 Response to Document
                                                                                                                                                                              RESPONSE re [57] Amicus Brief, [56] Amicus Brief filed by DUANE MORLEY COX. (See Docket Entry [60] to view document). (ztth)
                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 60 Filed: 10/3/2019, Entered: 10/4/2019 Memorandum in oppositionCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                Memorandum in opposition to re [44] MOTION to Dismiss (joint motion of Defendants and Defendant-Intervenors) filed by DUANE MORLEY COX. "Leave to file GRANTED" by Judge Trevor N. McFadden on 10/3/2019. (ztth)
                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank  set/reset hearings
                                                                                                                                                                                  Set/Reset Hearings: Motion Hearing set for 11/6/2019 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 2 before Judge Trevor N. McFadden. (hmc)
                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank  Order
                                                                                                                                                                                    MINUTE ORDER. It is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall appear for a hearing on the [44] Joint Motion to Dismiss filed by Defendants and Defendant-Intervenors, on November 6, 2019, at 10:00 a.m. in Courtroom 2, before Judge Trevor N. McFadden. Signed by Judge Trevor N. McFadden on 10/1/2019. (lctnm2)
                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 59 Filed: 9/30/2019, Entered: 9/30/2019 Reply to opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                      REPLY to opposition to motion re [44] MOTION to Dismiss (joint motion of Defendants and Defendant-Intervenors) filed by CHARLES P. RETTIG, INTERNAL REVENUE SERVICE, STEVEN T. MNUCHIN, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF THE TREASURY. (Myers, Steven)
                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 58 Filed: 9/27/2019, Entered: 9/27/2019, Terminated: 9/27/2019 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages
                                                                                                                                                                                        Consent MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages for Consolidated Reply Memorandum on behalf of Defendants and Defendant-Intervenors due September 30 by CHARLES P. RETTIG, INTERNAL REVENUE SERVICE, STEVEN T. MNUCHIN, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF THE TREASURY (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order)(Myers, Steven)
                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank  Order on Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages
                                                                                                                                                                                          MINUTE ORDER. Upon consideration of the Defendants' and Defendant-Intervenors' [58] Consent Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages, it is hereby ordered that the motion is granted. It is further ordered that the Defendants' and Defendant-Intervenors' forthcoming consolidated Reply Memorandum in support of their Motion to Dismiss may be up to 40 pages in length. Signed by Judge Trevor N. McFadden on 09/27/2019. (lctnm2)
                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 9/23/2019, Entered: 9/24/2019 Amicus Brief
                                                                                                                                                                                            AMICUS BRIEF by CONSTITUTIONAL LAW SCHOLARS. (ztd)
                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 9/23/2019, Entered: 9/24/2019 Amicus Brief
                                                                                                                                                                                              AMICUS BRIEF by GERALDINE R. GENNET, KERRY W. KIRCHER, IRVIN B. NATHAN, WILLIAM PITTARD, THOMAS J. SPULAK, CHARLES TIEFER. (ztd)
                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 9/23/2019, Entered: 9/23/2019 Memorandum in opposition
                                                                                                                                                                                                Memorandum in opposition to re [44] MOTION to Dismiss (joint motion of Defendants and Defendant-Intervenors) filed by COMMITTEE ON WAYS AND MEANS, UNITED STATES HOUSE OF REPRESENTATIVES. (Letter, Douglas)
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank  order on motion for leave to file
                                                                                                                                                                                                  MINUTE ORDER granting [54] Motion for Leave to File Amicus Brief. Signed by Judge Trevor N. McFadden on 09/23/2019. (lctnm2)
                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank  order on motion for leave to file
                                                                                                                                                                                                    MINUTE ORDER granting the [52] Motion for Leave to File Amicus Brief. Signed by Judge Trevor N. McFadden on 09/23/2019. (lctnm2)
                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank  Order on Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                      MINUTE ORDER granting [53] Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Laurence H. Tribe shall promptly register for this Court's CM/ECF system. Signed by Judge Trevor N. McFadden on 09/23/2019. (lctnm2)
                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 9/20/2019, Entered: 9/20/2019, Terminated: 9/23/2019 motion for leave to file
                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION for Leave to File Amicus Brief by Constitutional Law Scholars (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A - Amicus Brief, # (2) Exhibit B - Proposed Order)(Matz, Joshua)
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 9/20/2019, Entered: 9/20/2019, Terminated: 9/23/2019 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Laurence H. Tribe, :Firm- Harvard Law School, :Address- 1575 Massachussetts Avenue, Cambridge, MA 02138. Phone No. - 617-495-1767. Fax No. - 617-496-4947 Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0090-6391192. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by Constitutional Law Scholars (Attachments: # (1) Declaration of Laurence H. Tribe, # (2) Text of Proposed Order)(Matz, Joshua)
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 9/20/2019, Entered: 9/20/2019, Terminated: 9/23/2019 motion for leave to file
                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION for Leave to File Brief as Amici Curiae by Geraldine R. Gennet, Kerry W. Kircher, Irvin B. Nathan, William Pittard, Thomas J. Spulak, Charles Tiefer (Attachments: # (1) Brief of Amici Curiae, # (2) Text of Proposed Order)(Robbins, Lawrence)
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 9/20/2019, Entered: 9/20/2019 Notice of appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE of Appearance by David Hunter Smith on behalf of Geraldine R. Gennet, Kerry W. Kircher, Irvin B. Nathan, William Pittard, Thomas J. Spulak, Charles Tiefer (Smith, David)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 9/20/2019, Entered: 9/20/2019 Notice of appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE of Appearance by Wendy Liu on behalf of Geraldine R. Gennet, Kerry W. Kircher, Irvin B. Nathan, William Pittard, Thomas J. Spulak, Charles Tiefer (Liu, Wendy)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 9/20/2019, Entered: 9/20/2019 Notice of appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of Appearance by Lawrence Saul Robbins on behalf of Geraldine R. Gennet, Kerry W. Kircher, Irvin B. Nathan, William Pittard, Thomas J. Spulak, Charles Tiefer (Robbins, Lawrence)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 9/19/2019, Entered: 9/19/2019, Terminated: 9/19/2019 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Consent MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages by COMMITTEE ON WAYS AND MEANS, UNITED STATES HOUSE OF REPRESENTATIVES (Letter, Douglas)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank  ***Set/Reset Deadlines
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Set/Reset Deadlines: Plaintiff's opposition to the Motion to Dismiss due by 9/23/2019. Defendants' and Defendant-Intervenors' replies due by 9/30/2019. (hmc)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank  Order on Motion for Scheduling Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MINUTE ORDER. Upon consideration of the parties' [46] Joint Motion for Scheduling Order and the Plaintiff's [48] Consent Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages, it is hereby ordered that both motions are granted. It is further ordered that the Plaintiff's opposition to the [44] Motion to Dismiss is due on or before September 23, 2019. It is further ordered that the Plaintiff's forthcoming opposition may be up to 65 pages in length. It is further ordered that the Defendants' and Defendant-Intervenors' replies are due on or before September 30, 2019. Signed by Judge Trevor N. McFadden on 09/19/2019. (lctnm2)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 47 Filed: 9/18/2019, Entered: 9/18/2019 Notice - other
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE of filing of Supplemental Declaration of Frederick W. Vaughan by CHARLES P. RETTIG, INTERNAL REVENUE SERVICE, STEVEN T. MNUCHIN, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF THE TREASURY (Attachments: # (1) Declaration (Supplemental) of Frederick W. Vaughan)(Myers, Steven)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 46 Filed: 9/18/2019, Entered: 9/18/2019, Terminated: 9/19/2019 Motion to modify
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Joint MOTION to Modify Scheduling Order by COMMITTEE ON WAYS AND MEANS, UNITED STATES HOUSE OF REPRESENTATIVES (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order)(Letter, Douglas) Modified event on 9/19/2019 (znmw).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank  ***Set/Reset Deadlines
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Set/Reset Deadlines: Amicus Brief due by 9/20/2019. (hmc)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank  Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MINUTE ORDER. Any amicus brief shall be filed on or before September 20, 2019. Any amicus brief shall include a statement certifying that the amicus has attempted not to duplicate arguments presented in a party's brief and shall be no longer than 15 pages. Signed by Judge Trevor N. McFadden on 9/12/19. (lctnm1)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 45 Filed: 9/9/2019, Entered: 9/12/2019 Amicus Brief
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  AMICUS BRIEF by DUANE MORLEY COX. (ztth)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank  order on motion for miscellaneous relief
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MINUTE ORDER. Upon consideration of the Defendants' [43] Motion to Excuse Filing of a Certified List of Contents of the Administrative Record, it is hereby ordered that the motion is granted. The Defendant is directed to file the certified index with the Court within 7 days of a ruling on the [44] Motion to Dismiss. This Order is without prejudice to the Defendant-Intervenors' ability to file a motion for discovery after the Court's decision on the Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Judge Trevor N. McFadden on 09/09/2019. (lctnm2)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 44 Filed: 9/6/2019, Entered: 9/6/2019 Motion to Dismiss
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION to Dismiss (joint motion of Defendants and Defendant-Intervenors) by CHARLES P. RETTIG, INTERNAL REVENUE SERVICE, STEVEN T. MNUCHIN, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF THE TREASURY (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A. 1960 House Memo, # (2) Exhibit B. Transcript of Trump v. Committee on Ways and Means, # (3) Declaration of Frederick Vaughan and Exhibits, # (4) Declaration of Sunita Lough and Exhibits, # (5) Text of Proposed Order)(Myers, Steven); Modified event and text on 9/9/2019 (ztth).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 43 Filed: 9/6/2019, Entered: 9/6/2019, Terminated: 9/9/2019 motion for miscellaneous relief
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION to excuse filing of certified list of contents of administrative record by CHARLES P. RETTIG, INTERNAL REVENUE SERVICE, STEVEN T. MNUCHIN, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF THE TREASURY (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order)(Myers, Steven)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank  Order on motion to amend/correct
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MINUTE ORDER. The Court denied Duane Morley Cox's [10] Motion to Intervene. See Order, ECF No. [39]. Mr. Cox's [42] Motion to Amend his proposed Answer in Intervention therefore is denied as moot. Mr. Cox may, however, file an amicus brief, which shall not exceed fifteen pages. Signed by Judge Trevor N. McFadden on 09/06/2019. (lctnm2)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank  ***Set/Reset Deadlines
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Set/Reset Deadlines: Amicus brief in support of the Administration or President Trump due by 9/6/2019. Amicus brief in support of the Committee due by 9/20/2019. (hmc)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 41 Filed: 9/4/2019, Entered: 9/4/2019, Terminated: 9/4/2019 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Consent MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages by CHARLES P. RETTIG, INTERNAL REVENUE SERVICE, STEVEN T. MNUCHIN, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF THE TREASURY (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order)(Bernie, Andrew)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 40 Filed: 9/4/2019, Entered: 9/4/2019 Notice of appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE of Appearance by Andrew Marshall Bernie on behalf of All Defendants (Bernie, Andrew)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 39 Filed: 9/4/2019, Entered: 9/4/2019 Order on motion to interveneCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER denying [10] Motion to Intervene. See attached Order for details. Signed by Judge Trevor N. McFadden on 9/4/2019. (lctnm1)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank  Order on Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MINUTE ORDER. Upon consideration of the Defendants' and Defendant-Intervenors' [41] Motion for Leave to Exceed Page Limit, it is hereby ordered that the motion is granted. It is further ordered that the Defendants' and Defendant-Intervenors' forthcoming consolidated Memorandum of Law in support of their Motion to Dismiss may be up to 60 pages in length. Signed by Judge Trevor N. McFadden on 09/04/2019. (lctnm2)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank  Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MINUTE ORDER. Any amicus brief in support of the Administration or President Trump shall be filed on or before September 6, 2019. Any amicus brief in support of the Committee shall be filed on or before September 20, 2019. Any amicus brief shall include a statement certifying that the amicus has attempted not to duplicate arguments presented in a party's brief and shall be no longer than 15 pages. Signed by Judge Trevor N. McFadden on 9/4/2019. (lctnm1)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 42 Filed: 9/3/2019, Entered: 9/5/2019 motion to amend/correct
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION to Amend/Correct by DUANE MORLEY COX. (ztth)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank  ***Set/Reset Deadlines
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Set/Reset Deadlines: Any responsive pleading(s) to the Complaint, by the Administration and President Trump, is due by 9/6/2019. (hmc)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 38 Filed: 8/29/2019, Entered: 8/29/2019 Order on motion for summary judgmentCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER denying [29] Motion for Summary Judgment as premature; denying [30] Motion to Expedite; denying [33] Motion to Hold Motion for Summary Judgment in Abeyance as moot. See attached order for details. Signed by Judge Trevor N. McFadden on 08/29/2019. (lctnm2)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 37 Filed: 8/27/2019, Entered: 8/29/2019 Notice - other
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE by DUANE MORLEY COX. (ztth)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 36 Filed: 8/26/2019, Entered: 8/27/2019 Reply to opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                REPLY to opposition to motion re [29] MOTION for Summary Judgment , [30] MOTION to Expedite Consideration of this Case MOTION for Briefing Schedule filed by COMMITTEE ON WAYS AND MEANS, UNITED STATES HOUSE OF REPRESENTATIVES. (See Docket Entry [35] to view document). (ztth)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 35 Filed: 8/26/2019, Entered: 8/26/2019 Memorandum in opposition
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Memorandum in opposition to re [33] MOTION to Hold in Abeyance re [29] MOTION for Summary Judgment (Defendants' and Defendant-Intervenors' Consolidated Motion to Hold Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment in Abeyance Pending Resolution of Defendants) filed by COMMITTEE ON WAYS AND MEANS, UNITED STATES HOUSE OF REPRESENTATIVES. (Letter, Douglas)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank  Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MINUTE ORDER. It is hereby ordered that the Plaintiff's [29] Motion for Summary Judgment is held in abeyance pending the Court's ruling on the [30] Motion to Expedite Consideration of this Case. Signed by Judge Trevor N. McFadden on 08/21/2019. (lctnm2)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 34 Filed: 8/20/2019, Entered: 8/20/2019 Memorandum in opposition
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Memorandum in opposition to re [30] MOTION to Expedite Consideration of this Case MOTION for Briefing Schedule (Defendants' and Defendant-Intervenors' Consolidated Motion to Hold Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment in Abeyance Pending Resolution of Defendants' and Defendant-Intervenors' Forthcoming Motion(s) To Dismiss and Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion for Concurrent Briefing) filed by CHARLES P. RETTIG, INTERNAL REVENUE SERVICE, STEVEN T. MNUCHIN, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF THE TREASURY. (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order)(Gilligan, James)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 33 Filed: 8/20/2019, Entered: 8/20/2019, Terminated: 8/29/2019 Motion to Hold in Abeyance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION to Hold in Abeyance re [29] MOTION for Summary Judgment (Defendants' and Defendant-Intervenors' Consolidated Motion to Hold Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment in Abeyance Pending Resolution of Defendants' and Defendant-Intervenors' Forthcoming Motion(s) To Dismiss and Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion for Concurrent Briefing) by CHARLES P. RETTIG, INTERNAL REVENUE SERVICE, STEVEN T. MNUCHIN, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF THE TREASURY (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order)(Gilligan, James)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 8/20/2019, Entered: 8/20/2019 Notice of appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE of Appearance by James J. Gilligan on behalf of All Defendants (Gilligan, James)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 8/20/2019, Entered: 8/20/2019 Notice of appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE of Appearance by James Mahoney Burnham on behalf of All Defendants (Burnham, James)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 30 Filed: 8/20/2019, Entered: 8/20/2019, Terminated: 8/29/2019 Motion to Expedite
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION to Expedite Consideration of this Case, MOTION for Briefing Schedule by COMMITTEE ON WAYS AND MEANS, UNITED STATES HOUSE OF REPRESENTATIVES (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order)(Letter, Douglas)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 29 Filed: 8/20/2019, Entered: 8/20/2019, Terminated: 8/29/2019 Motion for summary judgment
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION for Summary Judgment by COMMITTEE ON WAYS AND MEANS, UNITED STATES HOUSE OF REPRESENTATIVES (Attachments: # (1) Statement of Facts, # (2) Memorandum in Support, # (3) Declaration of Todd B. Tatelman, # (4) Exhibit A to Decl., # (5) Exhibit B to Decl., # (6) Exhibit C to Decl., # (7) Exhibit D to Decl., # (8) Exhibit E to Decl., # (9) Exhibit F to Decl., # (10) Exhibit G to Decl., # (11) Exhibit H to Decl., # (12) Exhibit I to Decl., # (13) Exhibit J to Decl., # (14) Exhibit K to Decl., # (15) Exhibit L to Decl., # (16) Exhibit M to Decl., # (17) Exhibit N to Decl., # (18) Exhibit O to Decl., # (19) Exhibit P to Decl., # (20) Exhibit Q to Decl., # (21) Exhibit R to Decl., # (22) Exhibit S to Decl., # (23) Exhibit T to Decl., # (24) Exhibit U to Decl., # (25) Exhibit V to Decl., # (26) Exhibit W to Decl., # (27) Exhibit X to Decl., # (28) Exhibit Y to Decl., # (29) Exhibit Z to Decl., # (30) Exhibit AA to Decl., # (31) Exhibit BB to Decl., # (32) Exhibit CC to Decl., # (33) Exhibit DD to Decl., # (34) Exhibit EE to Decl., # (35) Exhibit FF to Decl., # (36) Exhibit GG to Decl., # (37) Exhibit HH to Decl., # (38) Exhibit II to Decl., # (39) Exhibit JJ to Decl., # (40) Exhibit KK to Decl., # (41) Exhibit LL to Decl., # (42) Exhibit MM to Decl., # (43) Exhibit NN to Decl., # (44) Exhibit OO to Decl., # (45) Exhibit PP to Decl., # (46) Exhibit QQ to Decl., # (47) Exhibit RR to Decl., # (48) Exhibit SS to Decl., # (49) Exhibit TT to Decl., # (50) Exhibit UU to Decl., # (51) Exhibit VV to Decl., # (52) Exhibit WW to Decl., # (53) Exhibit XX to Decl., # (54) Text of Proposed Order)(Letter, Douglas)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank  Order on Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MINUTE ORDER. Upon consideration of the Plaintiff's [28] Motion for Leave to Exceed Page Limit, it is hereby ordered that the Plaintiff's motion is granted. It is further ordered that the Plaintiff's forthcoming Memorandum of Law in support of its Motion for Summary Judgment may be up to 55 pages in length. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Trevor N. McFadden on 8/16/2019. (lctnm2)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 28 Filed: 8/15/2019, Entered: 8/15/2019, Terminated: 8/16/2019 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Consent MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages by COMMITTEE ON WAYS AND MEANS, UNITED STATES HOUSE OF REPRESENTATIVES (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order)(Letter, Douglas)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 27 Filed: 8/9/2019, Entered: 8/13/2019 Reply to opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      REPLY to opposition to motion re [10] MOTION to Intervene filed by DUANE MORLEY COX. (ztd)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 24 Filed: 8/9/2019, Entered: 8/9/2019 Notice of appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE of Appearance by Todd Barry Tatelman on behalf of COMMITTEE ON WAYS AND MEANS, UNITED STATES HOUSE OF REPRESENTATIVES (Tatelman, Todd)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 23 Filed: 8/9/2019, Entered: 8/9/2019 Notice of appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE of Appearance by Sarah Edith Clouse on behalf of COMMITTEE ON WAYS AND MEANS, UNITED STATES HOUSE OF REPRESENTATIVES (Clouse, Sarah)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 22 Filed: 8/9/2019, Entered: 8/9/2019 Notice of appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE of Appearance by Megan Barbero on behalf of COMMITTEE ON WAYS AND MEANS, UNITED STATES HOUSE OF REPRESENTATIVES (Barbero, Megan)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 21 Filed: 8/9/2019, Entered: 8/9/2019 Notice of appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE of Appearance by Josephine T. Morse on behalf of COMMITTEE ON WAYS AND MEANS, UNITED STATES HOUSE OF REPRESENTATIVES (Morse, Josephine)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 20 Filed: 8/9/2019, Entered: 8/9/2019 Notice of appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE of Appearance by Douglas N. Letter on behalf of COMMITTEE ON WAYS AND MEANS, UNITED STATES HOUSE OF REPRESENTATIVES (Letter, Douglas)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 19 Filed: 8/9/2019, Entered: 8/9/2019 Notice of appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of Appearance by Brooks McKinly Hanner on behalf of COMMITTEE ON WAYS AND MEANS, UNITED STATES HOUSE OF REPRESENTATIVES (Hanner, Brooks)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 26 Filed: 8/6/2019, Entered: 8/12/2019 Notice - other
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE by DUANE MORLEY COX re [10] MOTION to Intervene. (tth)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 25 Filed: 8/6/2019, Entered: 8/12/2019 Reply to opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      AMENDED REPLY to opposition to motion re [10] MOTION to Intervene filed by DUANE MORLEY COX. (tth) Modified event title on 8/14/2019 (znmw).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 7/25/2019, Entered: 7/25/2019 Notice of appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE of Appearance by Cristen Cori Handley on behalf of CHARLES P. RETTIG, INTERNAL REVENUE SERVICE, STEVEN T. MNUCHIN, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF THE TREASURY (Handley, Cristen)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 7/25/2019, Entered: 7/25/2019 Notice of appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE of Appearance by Serena Maya Schulz Orloff on behalf of All Defendants (Orloff, Serena)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 16 Filed: 7/25/2019, Entered: 7/25/2019 Memorandum in opposition
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Memorandum in opposition to re [10] MOTION to Intervene filed by Duane Morley Cox filed by CHARLES P. RETTIG, INTERNAL REVENUE SERVICE, STEVEN T. MNUCHIN, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF THE TREASURY. (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order)(Myers, Steven)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 15 Filed: 7/25/2019, Entered: 7/25/2019 Notice of appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE of Appearance by Steven A. Myers on behalf of CHARLES P. RETTIG, INTERNAL REVENUE SERVICE, STEVEN T. MNUCHIN, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF THE TREASURY (Myers, Steven)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 14 Filed: 7/18/2019, Entered: 7/18/2019 Order on motion to interveneCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER granting [12] Unopposed Motion to Intervene. Upon consideration of the Proposed Defendant-Intervenors' [12] Motion to Intervene, it is hereby ordered that the motion is granted. The Clerk of Court shall add the movants as Intervenor-Defendants to the case. See attached Order for further details. Signed by Judge Trevor N. McFadden on 07/18/2019. (lctnm2)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 13 Filed: 7/18/2019, Entered: 7/18/2019 LCvR 26.1 Certificate of Disclosure - Corporate Affiliations/Financial Interests
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by DTTM OPERATIONS LLC, DJT HOLDINGS MANAGING MEMBER, LLC, DTTM OPERATIONS MANAGING MEMBER CORP., LAMINGTON FARM CLUB, LLC D/B/A TRUMP NATIONAL GOLF CLUB-BEDMINSTER, LFB ACQUISITION LLC, LFB ACQUISITION MEMBER CORP. (Consovoy, William)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 12 Filed: 7/17/2019, Entered: 7/17/2019, Terminated: 7/18/2019 Motion to intervene
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Unopposed MOTION to Intervene by DTTM OPERATIONS LLC, DJT HOLDINGS LLC, DJT HOLDINGS MANAGING MEMBER, LLC, DTTM OPERATIONS MANAGING MEMBER CORP., LAMINGTON FARM CLUB, LLC D/B/A TRUMP NATIONAL GOLF CLUB-BEDMINSTER, LFB ACQUISITION LLC, LFB ACQUISITION MEMBER CORP., THE DONALD J. TRUMP REVOCABLE TRUST, DONALD J. TRUMP (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order)(Consovoy, William)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 11 Filed: 7/17/2019, Entered: 7/17/2019 Notice of appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE of Appearance by William S. Consovoy on behalf of DONALD J. TRUMP, THE DONALD J. TRUMP REVOCABLE TRUST, DJT HOLDINGS LLC, DJT HOLDINGS MANAGING MEMBER, LLC, DTTM OPERATIONS LLC, DTTM OPERATIONS MANAGING MEMBER CORP., LFB ACQUISITION LLC, LFB ACQUISITION MEMBER CORP., LAMINGTON FARM CLUB, LLC D/B/A TRUMP NATIONAL GOLF CLUB-BEDMINSTER (Consovoy, William)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 7/16/2019, Entered: 7/16/2019 Summons Returned Executed as to Federal Defendant
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF THE TREASURY served on 7/10/2019 (Letter, Douglas)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 7/16/2019, Entered: 7/16/2019 Summons Returned Executed as to Federal Defendant
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. CHARLES P. RETTIG served on 7/9/2019 (Letter, Douglas)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 7/16/2019, Entered: 7/16/2019 Summons Returned Executed as to Federal Defendant
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. STEVEN T. MNUCHIN served on 7/10/2019 (Letter, Douglas)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 7/16/2019, Entered: 7/16/2019 Summons Returned Executed as to Federal Defendant
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. INTERNAL REVENUE SERVICE served on 7/9/2019 (Letter, Douglas)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 7/16/2019, Entered: 7/16/2019 Summons Returned Executed as to U.S. Attorney General
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 07/10/2019. (Letter, Douglas)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 10 Filed: 7/11/2019, Entered: 7/16/2019 Motion to intervene
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION to Intervene by DUANE MORLEY COX. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit - Answer in Intervention, # (2) Exhibit - Notice of Appearance, # (3) Text of Proposed Order) (tth)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 4 Filed: 7/8/2019, Entered: 7/8/2019 Summons Returned Executed as to US Attorney
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 7/8/2019. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 9/6/2019. (Letter, Douglas)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 3 Filed: 7/8/2019, Entered: 7/8/2019 Summons Issued Electronically as to AUSA
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      SUMMONS (6) Issued Electronically as to CHARLES P. RETTIG, INTERNAL REVENUE SERVICE, STEVEN T. MNUCHIN, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF THE TREASURY, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: # (1) Notice and Consent)(zsb)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 2 Filed: 7/3/2019, Entered: 7/3/2019 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        STANDING ORDER Establishing Procedures for Cases Before Judge Trevor N. McFadden. The parties are hereby ORDERED to read and comply with the directives in the attached standing order. Signed by Judge Trevor N. McFadden on 07/03/2019. (lctnm2)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank  Case Assigned/Reassigned
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Case Assigned to Judge Trevor N. McFadden. (zsb)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 1 Filed: 7/2/2019, Entered: 7/2/2019 Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            COMPLAINT against CHARLES P. RETTIG, INTERNAL REVENUE SERVICE, STEVEN T. MNUCHIN, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF THE TREASURY (Fee Status:Filing Fee Waived) filed by COMMITTEE ON WAYS AND MEANS, UNITED STATES HOUSE OF REPRESENTATIVES. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A, # (2) Exhibit B, # (3) Exhibit C, # (4) Exhibit D, # (5) Exhibit E, # (6) Exhibit F, # (7) Exhibit G, # (8) Exhibit H, # (9) Exhibit I, # (10) Exhibit J, # (11) Exhibit K, # (12) Exhibit L, # (13) Exhibit M, # (14) Exhibit N, # (15) Exhibit O, # (16) Exhibit P, # (17) Civil Cover Sheet, # (18) Summons, # (19) Summons, # (20) Summons, # (21) Summons, # (22) Summons, # (23) Summons)(Letter, Douglas)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              This case has been viewed 227 times.

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                               
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Need Password Help?