Hoffenberg v. Epstein et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit New York Southern District Court, Case No. 1:16-cv-03989-RJS
District Judge Richard J. Sullivan, presiding

Tags
Last Updated July 10, 2019 at 11:46 AM EDT (2.4 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Space Space

No Logo Hoffenberg, Steven Jude, Plaintiff
Officially listed as "Steven Jude Hoffenberg"

Toggle Switch Represented by mintzfraade.com Law Firm Placeholder

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Alan Peter Fraade +1 212 486 2500 +1 212 486 0701 apf@mintzfraade.com
v.
No Logo ABC, Inc., Defendant
Officer/Director, DC Holdco, Inc.
Officer/Director, ABC Radio Holdings, Inc.
Disney Enterprises, Inc. Officer/Director, Disney Enterprises, Inc.
Officer/Director, A.b.c. Enterprises, Inc.
Officer/Director, ABC Holding CO Inc.
Epstein, Jeffrey E. Epstein, Jeffrey E., Defendant
Officially listed as "Jeffrey E. Epstein"
Officer/Director, Priceline.com Inc.
Officer/Director, Advo, Inc.
Officer/Director, Mdc Communications Corp
Officer/Director, Ozark Holding Inc.
Officer/Director, Shutterstock, Inc.
Officer/Director, Twilio, Inc.
Officer/Director, Poshmark, Inc.

Toggle Switch Represented by Troutman Sanders, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Bennet Jerome Moskowitz +1 212 704 6087 +1 212 704 6288 bennet.moskowitz@troutmansanders.com
Space Stephen George Rinehart +1 212 704 6305 +1 212 704 6288 stephen.rinehart@troutmansanders.com
No Logo The Financial Trust Company, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Troutman Sanders, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Bennet Jerome Moskowitz +1 212 704 6087 +1 212 704 6288 bennet.moskowitz@troutmansanders.com
Space Stephen George Rinehart +1 212 704 6305 +1 212 704 6288 stephen.rinehart@troutmansanders.com
No Logo Xyz Corp., Defendant
Office Foley Square
Filed 5/27/2016
Jury Demand Plaintiff
Demand
Nature of Suit 370 - Fraud or Truth-In-Lending
Cause Section 28 U.S.C. § 1331tt Fed. Question
Jurisdiction Federal Question
Disposition Dismissed - Voluntarily
County NewYork
Terminated 7/5/2016
Origin 1
Reopened
Lead Case
None
Related Case
None
Other Court Case None
Defendant Custody Status
Flags CLOSED,ECF
  Entries (31) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 7/5/2016, Entered: 7/6/2016 Order of DismissalCourt Filing
ORDER: The Court is in receipt of a letter from Plaintiff, dated July 1, 2016, stating that he is withdrawing his complaint with prejudice pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(a)(2). (Doc. No. 22.) Accordingly, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED THAT this case is dismissed with prejudice but without costs. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED THAT all conferences and deadlines are adjourned indefinitely. The Clerk of the Court is respectfully requested to close this case. (Signed by Judge Richard J. Sullivan on 7/5/2016) (mro)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 7/1/2016, Entered: 7/1/2016 Response to motionCourt Filing
    LETTER RESPONSE to Motion addressed to Judge Richard J. Sullivan from Alan P. Fraade dated July 1, 2016 re: [19] LETTER MOTION for Conference /Pre-Motion Conference addressed to Judge Richard J. Sullivan from Bennet J. Moskowitz dated June 28, 2016. . Document filed by Steven Jude Hoffenberg, Steven Jude Hoffenberg. (Fraade, Alan)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 6/30/2016, Entered: 6/30/2016 Order on Motion for conferenceCourt Filing
      MEMO ENDORSEMENT on [20] filed by Steven Jude Hoffenberg, Steven Jude Hoffenberg terminating [19] Letter Motion for Conference filed by Jeffrey E. Epstein, Jeffrey E. Epstein, The Financial Trust Company. ENDORSEMENT: Plaintiff's request is denied. As required under Rule 2.A. of the Court's Individual Practices, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED THAT Plaintiff shall submit a response to Defendants' pre-motion letter by July 1, 2016. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED THAT the initial conference scheduled for July 15, 2016 at 10 a.m. shall also serve as a pre-motion conference on Defendants' contemplated motion to dismiss. (Signed by Judge Richard J. Sullivan on 6/30/2016) (mro)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Blank  set/reset hearings
        Set/Reset Hearings: Pre-Motion Conference set for 7/15/2016 at 10:00 AM before Judge Richard J. Sullivan. (mro)
          LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 6/29/2016, Entered: 6/29/2016 Response to motionCourt Filing
          LETTER RESPONSE to Motion addressed to Judge Richard J. Sullivan from Alan P. Fraade dated June 29, 2016 re: [19] LETTER MOTION for Conference /Pre-Motion Conference addressed to Judge Richard J. Sullivan from Bennet J. Moskowitz dated June 28, 2016. . Document filed by Steven Jude Hoffenberg, Steven Jude Hoffenberg. (Fraade, Alan)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 6/28/2016, Entered: 6/28/2016, Terminated: 6/30/2016 Motion for ConferenceCourt Filing
            LETTER MOTION for Conference /Pre-Motion Conference addressed to Judge Richard J. Sullivan from Bennet J. Moskowitz dated June 28, 2016. Document filed by Jeffrey E. Epstein, Jeffrey E. Epstein, The Financial Trust Company.(Moskowitz, Bennet)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 6/22/2016, Entered: 6/22/2016 Request for Issuance of Amended Summons
              REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF AMENDED SUMMONS as to Lieutenant Governor of the U.S. Virgin Islands on behalf of The Financial Trust Company, re: [1] Complaint. Document filed by Steven Jude Hoffenberg, Steven Jude Hoffenberg. (Fraade, Alan)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 6/22/2016, Entered: 6/22/2016, Terminated: 6/22/2016 Motion to appear pro hac vice
                FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - MOTION for Gary H. Baise to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number 0208-12453061. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Steven Jude Hoffenberg, Steven Jude Hoffenberg. (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order Order for Admission Pro Hac Vice)(Fraade, Alan) Modified on 6/22/2016 (wb).
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Blank  Notice Regarding Deficient Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice
                  >>>NOTICE REGARDING DEFICIENT MOTION TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE. Notice to RE-FILE Document No. [17] MOTION for Gary H. Baise to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number 0208-12453061. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff... The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): missing Certificate of Good Standing from Supreme Court of Indiana and District of Columbia;. Re-file the motion as a Corrected Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice - attach the correct signed PDF - select the correct named filer/filers - attach valid Certificates of Good Standing issued within the past 30 days - attach Proposed Order.. (wb)
                    LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 6/20/2016, Entered: 6/20/2016 Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement
                    RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by The Financial Trust Company.(Moskowitz, Bennet)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 6/16/2016, Entered: 6/16/2016 Notice of appearance
                      NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Stephen George Rinehart on behalf of Jeffrey E. Epstein, Jeffrey E. Epstein, The Financial Trust Company. (Rinehart, Stephen)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 6/16/2016, Entered: 6/16/2016 Notice of appearance
                        NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Bennet Jerome Moskowitz on behalf of Jeffrey E. Epstein, Jeffrey E. Epstein, The Financial Trust Company. (Moskowitz, Bennet)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 6/16/2016, Entered: 6/16/2016 Affidavit of Service Other
                          AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Notice of Entry served on Jeffrey E. Epstein/ Financial Trust Company on 6/16/16. Service was made by Mail. Document filed by Steven Jude Hoffenberg, Steven Jude Hoffenberg. (Fraade, Alan)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 6/13/2016, Entered: 6/13/2016 Order for Initial Pretrial ConferenceCourt Filing
                            ORDER: Now before the Court is a letter from Plaintiff asking the Court to transfer this case to Judge Sweet as related to a criminal case, United States v. Steven Hoffenberg, 94-cr-213 (RWS) and 95-cr-321 (RWS). However, Local Rule 13(a)(2)(C) clearly provides that "[c]riminal cases are not treated as related to civil cases." The Court thus declines to transfer the case. Accordingly, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED THAT the parties shall appear for an initial status conference on Friday, July 15, 2016 at 10 a.m. in Courtroom 905 of the Thurgood Marshall United States Courthouse, 40 Foley Square, New York, New York. Initial Conference set for 7/15/2016 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 905, 40 Centre Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Richard J. Sullivan. (Signed by Judge Richard J. Sullivan on 6/13/2016) (mro)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 6/9/2016, Entered: 6/9/2016 Affidavit of Service Complaints
                              AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint. Jeffrey E. Epstein served on 6/2/2016, answer due 6/29/2016; Jeffrey E. Epstein served on 6/2/2016, answer due 6/29/2016; The Financial Trust Company served on 6/2/2016, answer due 6/29/2016. Service was made by Mail. Document filed by Steven Jude Hoffenberg; Steven Jude Hoffenberg. (Fraade, Alan)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 6/9/2016, Entered: 6/9/2016 Affidavit of Service Complaints
                                AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. Jeffrey E. Epstein served on 6/8/2016, answer due 6/29/2016; Jeffrey E. Epstein served on 6/8/2016, answer due 6/29/2016; The Financial Trust Company served on 6/8/2016, answer due 6/29/2016. Service was made by Mail. Document filed by Steven Jude Hoffenberg; Steven Jude Hoffenberg. (Fraade, Alan)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 6/7/2016, Entered: 6/7/2016 LetterCourt Filing
                                  FIRST LETTER addressed to Judge Richard J. Sullivan from Alan P. Fraade dated June 7, 2016 re: Related Action to Hoffenberg v. Epstein, et al. Document filed by Steven Jude Hoffenberg, Steven Jude Hoffenberg.(Fraade, Alan)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 6/1/2016, Entered: 6/1/2016 Summons issued
                                    ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Jeffrey E. Epstein. (pc)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 6/1/2016, Entered: 6/1/2016 Summons issued
                                      ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to The Financial Trust Company. (pc)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Blank  Add Party for Pleading
                                        ADD PARTY FOR PLEADING. Defendants/Respondents ABC, Inc., Jeffrey E. Epstein, The Financial Trust Company, XYZ Corp., Jeffrey E. Epstein added. Party added pursuant to [1] Complaint. Document filed by Steven Jude Hoffenberg, Steven Jude Hoffenberg. Related document: [1] Complaint filed by Steven Jude Hoffenberg.(Fraade, Alan)
                                          LREF
                                          Blank  Case Designated ECF.
                                          Case Designated ECF. (pc)
                                            LREF
                                            Blank  Case Designation
                                            Magistrate Judge Debra C. Freeman is so designated. (pc)
                                              LREF
                                              Blank  Case Opening Initial Assignment Notice
                                              CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Richard J. Sullivan. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at http://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/District. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at http://nysd.uscourts.gov/ecf_filing.php. (pc)
                                                LREF
                                                Blank  Notice to Attorney Regarding Deficient Pleading
                                                ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT PLEADING. Notice to Attorney Alan Peter Fraade to re Document No. Notice to Attorney Regarding Party Modification, [1] Complaint. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): Add party Steven Jude Hoffenberg to CM ECF with the party text "as constructive trustee of the Noteholders and Bondholders of Towers Financial Corporation". Add party Jeffrey E. Epstein to CM ECF with the party text "as President and Chief Executive Officer of the Financial Trust Company". Use the event type "Add Party to Pleading". (pc)
                                                  LREF
                                                  Blank  Notice to Attorney Regarding Party Modification
                                                  ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Alan Peter Fraade. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: Steven Jude Hoffenberg and Jeffrey E. Epstein. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party text was omitted. (pc)
                                                    LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 5/31/2016, Entered: 5/31/2016 Civil Cover Sheet
                                                    CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Fraade, Alan)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 5/27/2016, Entered: 5/27/2016 Statement of Relatedness
                                                      STATEMENT OF RELATEDNESS re: that this action be filed as related to 94 CR 213 (RWS). Document filed by Steven Jude Hoffenberg.(Fraade, Alan)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 5/27/2016, Entered: 5/27/2016 Request for Issuance of Summons
                                                        REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to The Financial Trust Company, re: [1] Complaint. Document filed by Steven Jude Hoffenberg. (Fraade, Alan)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 5/27/2016, Entered: 5/27/2016 Request for Issuance of Summons
                                                          REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Jeffrey E. Epstein, re: [1] Complaint. Document filed by Steven Jude Hoffenberg. (Fraade, Alan)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 5/27/2016, Entered: 5/27/2016 Civil Cover Sheet
                                                            FILING ERROR PDF ERROR CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Fraade, Alan) Modified on 5/31/2016 (pc).
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document 1 Filed: 5/27/2016, Entered: 5/27/2016 Complaint
                                                              COMPLAINT against ABC, Inc., Jeffrey E. Epstein, The Financial Trust Company, XYZ Corp.. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number 0208-12354046)Document filed by Steven Jude Hoffenberg.(Fraade, Alan)
                                                                LREF

                                                                Statistics

                                                                This case has been viewed 127 times.

                                                                No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                Space
                                                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                 
                                                                PlainSite
                                                                Sign Up
                                                                Need Password Help?