REED et al v. BERNARD et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit Pennsylvania Eastern District Court, Case No. 2:19-cv-03110-HB
District Judge Harvey Bartle, III, presiding

Tags
Last Updated June 9, 2020 at 3:50 PM DT (1.1 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo PHILADELPHIA BAIL FUND, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space ROBERT D. FRIEDMAN +1 202 661 6599 rdf34@georgetown.edu
Space SHAWN SUMMERS +1 215 864 8347 summerss@ballardspahr.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Ballard Spahr LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space MICHAEL BERRY +1 215 988 9773 berrym@ballardspahr.com
Space PAUL J. SAFIER +1 215 988 9146 +1 215 864 8999 safierp@ballardspahr.com

Toggle Switch Represented by GEORGETOWN LAW

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Nicolas Riley nr537@georgetown.edu
v.
No Logo FRANCIS BERNARD, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Supreme Court of Pennsylvania, AOPC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space DAVID M. DONALDSON +1 215 560 6300 +1 215 560 6315 legaldepartment@pacourts.us
No Logo James O'Brien, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Supreme Court of Pennsylvania, AOPC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space DAVID M. DONALDSON +1 215 560 6300 +1 215 560 6315 legaldepartment@pacourts.us
No Logo JANE RICE, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Supreme Court of Pennsylvania, AOPC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space DAVID M. DONALDSON +1 215 560 6300 +1 215 560 6315 legaldepartment@pacourts.us
No Logo JEWELL WILLIAMS, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Direct: 215-683-5142

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space AMY MARIE KIRBY +1 215 683 3566 amy.kirby@phila.gov
Space SEAN J. MCGRATH +1 215 683 5444 sean.mcgrath@phila.gov
No Logo KEVIN DEVLIN, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Supreme Court of Pennsylvania, AOPC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space DAVID M. DONALDSON +1 215 560 6300 +1 215 560 6315 legaldepartment@pacourts.us
No Logo PATRICK DUGAN, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Supreme Court of Pennsylvania, AOPC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space DAVID M. DONALDSON +1 215 560 6300 +1 215 560 6315 legaldepartment@pacourts.us
No Logo ROBERT STACK, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Supreme Court of Pennsylvania, AOPC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space DAVID M. DONALDSON +1 215 560 6300 +1 215 560 6315 legaldepartment@pacourts.us
No Logo SHEILA BEDFORD, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Supreme Court of Pennsylvania, AOPC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space DAVID M. DONALDSON +1 215 560 6300 +1 215 560 6315 legaldepartment@pacourts.us
No Logo FRANCIS BERNARD, Cross Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Supreme Court of Pennsylvania, AOPC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space DAVID M. DONALDSON +1 215 560 6300 +1 215 560 6315 legaldepartment@pacourts.us
No Logo James O'Brien, Cross Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Supreme Court of Pennsylvania, AOPC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space DAVID M. DONALDSON +1 215 560 6300 +1 215 560 6315 legaldepartment@pacourts.us
No Logo JANE RICE, Cross Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Supreme Court of Pennsylvania, AOPC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space DAVID M. DONALDSON +1 215 560 6300 +1 215 560 6315 legaldepartment@pacourts.us
No Logo KEVIN DEVLIN, Cross Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Supreme Court of Pennsylvania, AOPC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space DAVID M. DONALDSON +1 215 560 6300 +1 215 560 6315 legaldepartment@pacourts.us
No Logo PATRICK DUGAN, Cross Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Supreme Court of Pennsylvania, AOPC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space DAVID M. DONALDSON +1 215 560 6300 +1 215 560 6315 legaldepartment@pacourts.us
No Logo ROBERT STACK, Cross Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Supreme Court of Pennsylvania, AOPC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space DAVID M. DONALDSON +1 215 560 6300 +1 215 560 6315 legaldepartment@pacourts.us
No Logo SHEILA BEDFORD, Cross Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Supreme Court of Pennsylvania, AOPC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space DAVID M. DONALDSON +1 215 560 6300 +1 215 560 6315 legaldepartment@pacourts.us
No Logo JEWELL WILLIAMS, Cross Claimant

Toggle Switch Represented by City of Philadelphia

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space AMY MARIE KIRBY +1 215 683 3566 amy.kirby@phila.gov
Space SEAN J. MCGRATH +1 215 683 5444 sean.mcgrath@phila.gov
Office Philadelphia
Filed 7/17/2019
Jury Demand None
Demand
Nature of Suit 950 - Other Statutes: Constitutionality of State Statutes
Cause Section 42 U.S.C. § 1983 Civil Rights Act
Jurisdiction Federal Question
Disposition
County Philadelphia
Terminated
Origin 1
Reopened
Lead Case
None
Related Case
None
Other Court Case None
Defendant Custody Status
Flag STANDARD
  Entries (59) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 59 Filed: 6/9/2020, Entered: None Status Report
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 58 Filed: 4/7/2020, Entered: None Order on Motion to Stay
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 4/7/2020, Entered: None Status Conference
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 4/3/2020, Entered: None Stay
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 3/24/2020, Entered: None USCA Notice of Docketing ROA
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 3/20/2020, Entered: None Notice of Appeal (Credit Card Payment)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document 52 Filed: 2/25/2020, Entered: 2/25/2020 Order (Memorandum and/or Opinion)
              MEMORANDUM AND ORDER THAT PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT IS GRANTED.DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT IS DENIED. DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT IS GRANTED. SIGNED BY HONORABLE HARVEY BARTLE, III ON 2/25/20. 2/25/20 ENTERED & E-MAILED.(fdc)
                LREF
                Legal Document 51 Filed: 2/25/2020, Entered: 2/25/2020 Memorandum and/or Opinion
                MEMORANDUM AND OPINION. SIGNED BY HONORABLE HARVEY BARTLE, III ON 2/25/20. 2/25/20 ENTERED & E-MAILED.(fdc)
                  LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 2/5/2020, Entered: 2/5/2020 Notice - other
                  NOTICE by PHILADELPHIA BAIL FUND of stipulation to substitute parties (RILEY, NICOLAS) Modified on 2/21/2020 (lvj, ). (FILED IN ERROR BY ATTORNEY; FORWARD TO JUDGE FOR APPROVAL)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 1/28/2020, Entered: 1/28/2020 Motion Hearing
                    Minute Entry for proceedings held before HONORABLE HARVEY BARTLE, III Motion Hearing held on 1/27/20 re [38] Cross MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by JEWELL WILLIAMS, [40] MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by PHILADELPHIA BAIL FUND, [39] MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by JANE RICE, SHEILA BEDFORD, FRANCIS BERNARD, ROBERT STACK, JAMES O'BRIEN, KEVIN DEVLIN, PATRICK DUGAN Court Reporter: ESR. (fdc, )
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 1/14/2020, Entered: 1/14/2020 Notice of hearing on motion
                      NOTICE of Hearing on Motion [38] Cross MOTION for Summary Judgment , [40] MOTION for Summary Judgment , [39] MOTION for Summary Judgment : MOTION HEARING SET FOR 1/27/2020 03:00 PM IN COURTROOM 16-A BEFORE HONORABLE HARVEY BARTLE III.(km, )
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 1/13/2020, Entered: 1/13/2020 Reply to Response to motion
                        REPLY to Response to Motion re [39] MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by SHEILA BEDFORD, FRANCIS BERNARD, KEVIN DEVLIN, PATRICK DUGAN, JAMES O'BRIEN, JANE RICE, ROBERT STACK. (DALEY, MICHAEL)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 1/13/2020, Entered: 1/13/2020 Reply to Response to motion
                          REPLY to Response to Motion re [40] MOTION for Summary Judgment with Certificate of Service filed by JEWELL WILLIAMS. (KIRBY, AMY)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 1/6/2020, Entered: 1/6/2020 response in opposition to motion
                            RESPONSE in Opposition re [38] Cross MOTION for Summary Judgment , [39] MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by PHILADELPHIA BAIL FUND. (RILEY, NICOLAS)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 1/6/2020, Entered: 1/6/2020 response in opposition to motion
                              RESPONSE in Opposition re [40] MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by JEWELL WILLIAMS. (MCGRATH, SEAN)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 1/6/2020, Entered: 1/6/2020 Response to motion
                                RESPONSE to Motion re [40] MOTION for Summary Judgment and Brief in Opposition filed by SHEILA BEDFORD, FRANCIS BERNARD, KEVIN DEVLIN, PATRICK DUGAN, JAMES O'BRIEN, JANE RICE, ROBERT STACK. (DALEY, MICHAEL)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 1/6/2020, Entered: 1/6/2020 stipulation
                                  STIPULATION Supplemental Stipulation of Facts by SHEILA BEDFORD, FRANCIS BERNARD, KEVIN DEVLIN, PATRICK DUGAN, JAMES O'BRIEN, JANE RICE, ROBERT STACK. (DALEY, MICHAEL)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 1/3/2020, Entered: 1/3/2020 response
                                    Response to Defendant Sheriff Jewell Wlliams' Crossclaim by SHEILA BEDFORD, FRANCIS BERNARD, KEVIN DEVLIN, PATRICK DUGAN, JAMES O'BRIEN, JANE RICE, ROBERT STACK. (DALEY, MICHAEL)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document 40 Filed: 12/20/2019, Entered: 12/20/2019, Terminated: 2/25/2020 Motion for summary judgment
                                      MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by PHILADELPHIA BAIL FUND. Memorandum & Certificate of Service.(RILEY, NICOLAS)
                                        LREF
                                        Legal Document 39 Filed: 12/20/2019, Entered: 12/20/2019, Terminated: 2/25/2020 Motion for summary judgment
                                        MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by SHEILA BEDFORD, FRANCIS BERNARD, KEVIN DEVLIN, PATRICK DUGAN, JAMES O'BRIEN, JANE RICE, ROBERT STACK.Memorandum, Exhibits and Certificate of Service.(DAVIS, MEGAN)
                                          LREF
                                          Legal Document 38 Filed: 12/20/2019, Entered: 12/20/2019, Terminated: 2/25/2020 Motion for summary judgment
                                          Cross MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by JEWELL WILLIAMS.Memorandum, Certificate of Service.(MCGRATH, SEAN)
                                            LREF
                                            Legal Document 37 Filed: 12/19/2019, Entered: 12/19/2019 ///Stipulation of Dismissal
                                            STIPULATION of Dismissal as to Plaintiff Merry Reed by PHILADELPHIA BAIL FUND, MERRY REED. (FRIEDMAN, ROBERT)
                                              LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 12/17/2019, Entered: 12/17/2019 Notice of hearing
                                              NOTICE of Hearing: TELEPHONE CONFERENCE SET FOR 12/17/2019 04:00 PM BEFORE HONORABLE HARVEY BARTLE III. CALL-IN INFORMATION HAS BEEN CIRCULATED BY CHAMBERS.(km, )
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document 35 Filed: 12/16/2019, Entered: 12/16/2019 Notice of appearance
                                                NOTICE of Appearance by SHAWN SUMMERS on behalf of PHILADELPHIA BAIL FUND, MERRY REED (SUMMERS, SHAWN)
                                                  LREF
                                                  Legal Document 34 Filed: 12/16/2019, Entered: 12/16/2019 Notice - other
                                                  NOTICE by PHILADELPHIA BAIL FUND of DECLARATION of Malik Neal in support of Plaintiffs' forthcoming summary-judgment motion (RILEY, NICOLAS)
                                                    LREF
                                                    Legal Document 33 Filed: 12/13/2019, Entered: 12/13/2019 Answer
                                                    Defendant Williams ANSWER to [1] Complaint with certificate of service, First CROSSCLAIM against SHEILA BEDFORD, FRANCIS BERNARD, KEVIN DEVLIN, PATRICK DUGAN, JAMES O'BRIEN, JANE RICE, ROBERT STACK by JEWELL WILLIAMS.(KIRBY, AMY)
                                                      LREF
                                                      Legal Document 32 Filed: 12/13/2019, Entered: 12/13/2019 Answer
                                                      ANSWER to [1] Complaint by SHEILA BEDFORD, FRANCIS BERNARD, KEVIN DEVLIN, PATRICK DUGAN, JAMES O'BRIEN, JANE RICE, ROBERT STACK.(DALEY, MICHAEL)
                                                        LREF
                                                        Legal Document 31 Filed: 12/11/2019, Entered: 12/11/2019 stipulation
                                                        STIPULATION OF FACTS for summary judgment motions by PHILADELPHIA BAIL FUND, MERRY REED. (RILEY, NICOLAS)
                                                          LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 12/6/2019, Entered: 12/6/2019 Order
                                                          ORDER THAT THE CROSS-MOTIONS FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT ARE DUE BY 12/20/19. SIGNED BY HONORABLE HARVEY BARTLE, III ON 12/6/19. 12/6/19 ENTERED & E-MAILED.(fdc)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 12/5/2019, Entered: 12/5/2019 Notice of hearing
                                                            NOTICE of Hearing: TELEPHONE CONFERENCE SET FOR 12/6/2019 09:00 AM BEFORE HONORABLE HARVEY BARTLE III. CALL-IN INFORMATION CONTAINED HEREIN.(km, )
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Blank 28 Filed: 12/2/2019, Entered: 12/2/2019 Transcript - No PDFCourt Filing
                                                              TRANSCRIPT of Oral Argument on Defendants' Motion to Dismiss held on 11/8/19 before Judge Bartle, III. Court Reporter: Jessica B. Cahill, Maukele Transcribers, LLC. (fdc)
                                                                LREF
                                                                Legal Document 27 Filed: 11/25/2019, Entered: 11/25/2019 Notice of hearing
                                                                NOTICE of Hearing: TELEPHONE CONFERENCE SET FOR 12/4/2019 08:45 AM BEFORE HONORABLE HARVEY BARTLE III. CALL-IN INFORMATION CONTAINED HEREIN.(km, )
                                                                  LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 11/20/2019, Entered: 11/20/2019 Notice of hearing
                                                                  NOTICE of Hearing: TELEPHONE CONFERENCE SET FOR 11/22/2019 09:00 AM BEFORE HONORABLE HARVEY BARTLE III. COUNSEL FOR THE PLAINTIFF WILL INITIATE THE CALL TO CHAMBERS.(km, )
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document 25 Filed: 11/13/2019, Entered: 11/13/2019 Order on Motion to dismiss for failure to state a claim
                                                                    ORDER THAT DEFENDANT JEWELL WILLIAMS' [16] MOTION TO DISMISS THE COMPLAINT UNDER RULE 12(B)(6) OF THE FRCP IS DENIED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. SIGNED BY HONORABLE HARVEY BARTLE, III ON 11/13/19.11/13/19 ENTERED & E-MAILED.(fdc)
                                                                      LREF
                                                                      Legal Document 24 Filed: 11/13/2019, Entered: 11/13/2019 Order on Motion to Dismiss
                                                                      ORDER THAT DEFENDANTS' [12] MOTION TO DISMISS IS DENIED. SIGNED BY HONORABLE HARVEY BARTLE, III ON 11/13/19.11/13/19 ENTERED & E-MAILED.(fdc)
                                                                        LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 11/12/2019, Entered: 11/12/2019 Motion Hearing
                                                                        Minute Entry for proceedings held before HONORABLE HARVEY BARTLE, IIIin Courtroom 16-A. Oral Argument held on 11/8/19 re [16] First MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by JEWELL WILLIAMS, [12] MOTION to Dismiss the Complaint filed by JANE RICE, FRANCIS BERNARD, ROBERT STACK, JAMES O'BRIEN, KEVIN DEVLIN, PATRICK DUGAN Court Reporter: ESR. (fdc)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 11/1/2019, Entered: 11/1/2019 Notice of hearing on motion
                                                                          NOTICE of Hearing on Motion [16] First MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM , [12] MOTION to Dismiss the Complaint : MOTION HEARING SET FOR 11/8/2019 02:00 PM IN COURTROOM 16-A BEFORE HONORABLE HARVEY BARTLE III. NOTE CHANGE IN TIME FROM 1:30 P.M. TO 2:00 P.M.(km, )
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 10/25/2019, Entered: 10/25/2019 Notice of hearing on motion
                                                                            NOTICE of Hearing on Motion [16] First MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM , [12] MOTION to Dismiss the Complaint : MOTION HEARING SET FOR 11/8/2019 01:30 PM IN COURTROOM 16-A BEFORE HONORABLE HARVEY BARTLE III.(km, )
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document 20 Filed: 10/23/2019, Entered: 10/23/2019 Reply to Response to motion
                                                                              REPLY to Response to Motion re [16] First MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by JEWELL WILLIAMS. (MCGRATH, SEAN)
                                                                                LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 10/23/2019, Entered: 10/23/2019 Reply to Response to motion
                                                                                REPLY to Response to Motion re [12] MOTION to Dismiss the Complaint Reply in Further Support of Their Motion to Dismiss filed by SHEILA BEDFORD, FRANCIS BERNARD, KEVIN DEVLIN, PATRICK DUGAN, JAMES O'BRIEN, JANE RICE. (DAVIS, MEGAN)
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 10/16/2019, Entered: 10/16/2019 response in opposition to motion
                                                                                  RESPONSE in Opposition re [16] First MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM , [12] MOTION to Dismiss the Complaint filed by PHILADELPHIA BAIL FUND, MERRY REED. (RILEY, NICOLAS)
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document 17 Filed: 10/15/2019, Entered: 10/15/2019 Stipulation and Order
                                                                                    STIPULATION AND ORDER THAT PLAINTIFFS' ARE GRANTED AN EXTENSION OF TIME, UNTIL 10/16/2019, TO FILE A CONSOLIDATED BRIEF IN OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS' MOTIONS TO DISMISS. SIGNED BY HONORABLE HARVEY BARTLE, III ON 10/15/2019. 10/15/2019 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(amas)
                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 9/18/2019, Entered: 9/18/2019, Terminated: 11/13/2019 Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim
                                                                                      First MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by JEWELL WILLIAMS.Memorandum, Certificate of Service.(MCGRATH, SEAN)
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 9/11/2019, Entered: 9/11/2019 Stipulation and Order
                                                                                        STIPULATION AND ORDER THAT PLAINTIFFS SHALL FILE A CONSOLIDATED BRIEF IN OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO DISMISS [12] ON OR BEFORE 10/9/19. SIGNED BY HONORABLE HARVEY BARTLE, III ON 9/10/19. 9/11/19 ENTERED & E-MAILED.(fdc)
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 9/6/2019, Entered: 9/6/2019 Notice of appearance
                                                                                          NOTICE of Appearance by SEAN J. MCGRATH on behalf of JEWELL WILLIAMS with Certificate of Service(MCGRATH, SEAN)
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 9/4/2019, Entered: 9/4/2019 Notice of appearance
                                                                                            NOTICE of Appearance by MEGAN LINSLEY DAVIS on behalf of SHEILA BEDFORD, FRANCIS BERNARD, KEVIN DEVLIN, PATRICK DUGAN, JAMES O'BRIEN, JANE RICE, ROBERT STACK with Certiicate of Service(DAVIS, MEGAN)
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document 12 Filed: 9/4/2019, Entered: 9/4/2019, Terminated: 11/13/2019 Motion to Dismiss
                                                                                              MOTION to Dismiss the Complaint filed by FRANCIS BERNARD, KEVIN DEVLIN, PATRICK DUGAN, JAMES O'BRIEN, JANE RICE, ROBERT STACK.Brief in Support and Certificate of Service.(DALEY, MICHAEL)
                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 9/3/2019, Entered: 9/3/2019 Order Setting Answer Deadline
                                                                                                STIPULATION AND ORDER THAT DEFENDANT JEWELL WILLIAMS HAS UNTIL 9/18/19 TO RESPOND TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT; ETC.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE HARVEY BARTLE, III ON 9/3/19. 9/3/19 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED AND E-MAILED.(jl, )
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 8/30/2019, Entered: 8/30/2019 Notice of appearance
                                                                                                  NOTICE of Appearance by AMY MARIE KIRBY on behalf of JEWELL WILLIAMS with Certificate of Service(KIRBY, AMY)
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 8/27/2019, Entered: 8/27/2019 Order on Motion for Pro Hac Vice (Credit Card Payment)
                                                                                                    ORDER THAT THE APPLICATION OF ROBERT D. FRIEDMAN, ESQ. TO PRACTICE IN THIS COURT PURSUANT TO LRCP 83.5.2(B) IS GRANTED. SIGNED BY HONORABLE HARVEY BARTLE, III ON 8/26/19. 8/27/19 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED AND E-MAILED. ECF APPLICATION MAILED TO FRIEDMAN. (fdc)
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 8/27/2019, Entered: 8/27/2019 Order on Motion for Pro Hac Vice (Credit Card Payment)
                                                                                                      ORDER THAT THE APPLICATION OF NICOLAS Y. RILEY, ESQ. TO PRACTICE IN THIS COURT PURSUANT TO LRCP 83.5.2(B) IS GRANTED. SIGNED BY HONORABLE HARVEY BARTLE, III ON 8/26/19.8/27/19 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED AND E-MAILED. ECF APPLICATION MAILED TO RILEY. (fdc)
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 8/23/2019, Entered: 8/23/2019, Terminated: 8/27/2019 Motion for Pro Hac Vice (Credit Card Payment)
                                                                                                        MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Admission of Robert D. Friedman ( Filing fee $ 40 receipt number 0313-13753689.) filed by PHILADELPHIA BAIL FUND, MERRY REED.Certificate of Service.(SAFIER, PAUL)
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 8/23/2019, Entered: 8/23/2019, Terminated: 8/27/2019 Motion for Pro Hac Vice (Credit Card Payment)
                                                                                                          MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Admission of Nicolas Y. Riley ( Filing fee $ 40 receipt number 0313-13753665.) filed by PHILADELPHIA BAIL FUND, MERRY REED.Certificate of Service.(SAFIER, PAUL)
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 8/14/2019, Entered: 8/14/2019 Certificate of service
                                                                                                            CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by PHILADELPHIA BAIL FUND, MERRY REED re [1] Complaint, Summons Issued served on defendant Sheriff Jewell Williams (BERRY, MICHAEL)
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 8/14/2019, Entered: 8/14/2019 Certificate of serviceCourt Filing
                                                                                                              CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by PHILADELPHIA BAIL FUND, MERRY REED re [1] Complaint, Summons Issued served on defendants Arraignment Court Magistrate Judges Francis Bernard, Sheila Bedford, Kevin Devlin, James O'Brien, Jane Rice, and Robert Stack, and President Judge Patrick Dugan (SAFIER, PAUL)
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 8/13/2019, Entered: 8/13/2019 Notice of appearance
                                                                                                                NOTICE of Appearance by PAUL J. SAFIER on behalf of PHILADELPHIA BAIL FUND, MERRY REED (SAFIER, PAUL)
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 7/17/2019, Entered: 7/17/2019 Disclosure Statement Form 7.1
                                                                                                                  Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 by PHILADELPHIA BAIL FUND.(ahf)
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document 1 Filed: 7/17/2019, Entered: 7/17/2019 Complaint
                                                                                                                    COMPLAINT against SHEILA BEDFORD, FRANCIS BERNARD, KEVIN DEVLIN, PATRICK DUGAN, JAMES O'BRIEN, JANE RICE, ROBERT STACK, JEWELL WILLIAMS ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 200577.), filed by MERRY REED, PHILADELPHIA BAIL FUND.(ahf)
                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                      Blank  Summons issued
                                                                                                                      Summons Issued as to SHEILA BEDFORD, FRANCIS BERNARD, KEVIN DEVLIN, PATRICK DUGAN, JAMES O'BRIEN, JANE RICE, ROBERT STACK, JEWELL WILLIAMS. 8 Given To: Counsel on 7/17/2019 (ahf)
                                                                                                                        LREF

                                                                                                                        Statistics

                                                                                                                        This case has been viewed 10 times.

                                                                                                                        No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                        Space
                                                                                                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                         
                                                                                                                        PlainSite
                                                                                                                        Sign Up
                                                                                                                        Need Password Help?