District Appellate Supreme
Federal
Michigan Eastern District Court Court of Appeals for the Sixth Circuit
  1. Case No. 19-1192
    Filed 2/27/2019
  2. Case No. 18-1634
    Filed 6/5/2018
  3. Case No. 18-1581
    Filed 5/31/2018
United States Supreme Court

Samantha Rajapakse v. Credit Acceptance Corporation, et al
Appeal Court of Appeals for the Sixth Circuit, Case No. 19-1192

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated July 19, 2019 at 1:17 PM DT (1.8 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Arthur Smith, Defendant - Appellee

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Stephen W. King +1 248 792 2398 +1 248 646 8277 sking@kingandmurray.com
No Logo Board Of Credit Acceptance Corporation, Defendant - Appellee

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Stephen W. King +1 248 792 2398 +1 248 646 8277 sking@kingandmurray.com
No Logo Brett A. Roberts, Defendant - Appellee

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Stephen W. King +1 248 792 2398 +1 248 646 8277 sking@kingandmurray.com
No Logo Charles A. Pierce, Defendant - Appellee

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Stephen W. King +1 248 792 2398 +1 248 646 8277 sking@kingandmurray.com
Credit Acceptance Corporation Credit Acceptance Corporation, Defendant - Appellee

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Stephen W. King +1 248 792 2398 +1 248 646 8277 sking@kingandmurray.com
No Logo Daniel A. Ulatowski, Defendant - Appellee

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Stephen W. King +1 248 792 2398 +1 248 646 8277 sking@kingandmurray.com
No Logo Douglas W. Busk, Defendant - Appellee

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Stephen W. King +1 248 792 2398 +1 248 646 8277 sking@kingandmurray.com
No Logo Glenda Flanagan, Defendant - Appellee

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Stephen W. King +1 248 792 2398 +1 248 646 8277 sking@kingandmurray.com
No Logo John S. Soave, Defendant - Appellee

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Stephen W. King +1 248 792 2398 +1 248 646 8277 sking@kingandmurray.com
No Logo Kenneth S. Booth, Defendant - Appellee

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Stephen W. King +1 248 792 2398 +1 248 646 8277 sking@kingandmurray.com
No Logo Sandy Pollack, Defendant - Appellee

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Stephen W. King +1 248 792 2398 +1 248 646 8277 sking@kingandmurray.com
No Logo Scott J. Vassauzzo, Defendant - Appellee

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Stephen W. King +1 248 792 2398 +1 248 646 8277 sking@kingandmurray.com
No Logo Steven M. Jones, Defendant - Appellee

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Stephen W. King +1 248 792 2398 +1 248 646 8277 sking@kingandmurray.com
No Logo Thomas N. Tryforus, Defendant - Appellee

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Stephen W. King +1 248 792 2398 +1 248 646 8277 sking@kingandmurray.com
No Logo Rajapakse, Samantha D., Plaintiff - Appellant
Officially listed as "Samantha Delane Rajapakse"

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Samantha Delane Rajapakse +1 901 237 0744
Nature of Suit 3450 - Interstate Commerce
Case Type Civil
Lower Court Case https://ecf.mied.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?caseNumber=4:17-cv-12970
Lower Court Case https://ecf.mied.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?caseNumber=4:17-cv-12970
  Entries (16) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 006013759750 Filed: 6/24/2019, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Appellant MOTION filed by Samantha Delane Rajapakse for immediate hearing for petition of writ of mandamus. Certificate of service: 06/24/2019. (RLJ)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 006013759744 Filed: 6/24/2019, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
    Financial Affidavit filed by Party Samantha Delane Rajapakse Certificate of Service: 06/18/2019. Note: first page was not enclosed with this documentation. (RLJ)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 006013759740 Filed: 6/24/2019, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
      Appellant MOTION filed by Samantha Delane Rajapakse to proceed in forma pauperis. Certificate of service: 06/18/2019. (RLJ)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 006013747166 Filed: 6/10/2019, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
        Supplemental pleading filed by Party Samantha Delane Rajapakse. Document: supplement to petition for writ of mandamus evidence on the record; motion to withdraw change of venue (RLJ)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 006013734395 Filed: 5/24/2019, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
          Appellant MOTION filed by Samantha Delane Rajapakse for petition for writ of mandamus, with miscellaneous creditor documentation and written correspondence from Shelby County Board of Commissioners. Certificate of service: 05/21/2019. (RLJ)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 006013715510 Filed: 5/3/2019, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
            Appellant MOTION filed by Samantha Delane Rajapakse to amend her record on appeal. Certificate of service: 04/30/2019. (RLJ)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 006013713826 Filed: 5/2/2019, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
              Appellant MOTION filed by Samantha Delane Rajapakse for record on appeal, suspension of the rules and injunctive or stay of property pending appeal. Certificate of service: 04/30/2019. (RLJ)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 006013696654 Filed: 4/15/2019, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                Appellant MOTION filed by Samantha Delane Rajapakse for change of venue / to present to the house judiciary committee. Certificate of service: 04/11/2019. (RLJ)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 006013692322 Filed: 4/9/2019, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                  Appellant MOTION filed by Samantha Delane Rajapakse for appointment of counsel. Certificate of service: 04/06/2019. (RLJ)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 006013692302 Filed: 4/9/2019, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                    Appellant MOTION filed by Samantha Delane Rajapakse to proceed in forma pauperis. Certificate of service: 04/06/2019. (RLJ)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 006013683845 Filed: 4/1/2019, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                      Financial Affidavit filed by Party Samantha Delane Rajapakse Certificate of Service: 02/27/2019. (RLJ)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 006013683837 Filed: 4/1/2019, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                        LETTER SENT to Samantha Delane Rajapakse, returning unfiled UNSIGNED motion for pauper status and reminder for appellant to put Sixth Circuit Court of Appeals Case Number on all information sent to the court. Appellant must return signed documet on or before 04/15/19. (RLJ)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 006013676954 Filed: 3/25/2019, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                          RULING LETTER SENT to extend time to pay fee of $505 to district court or renew motion for pauper status with the Sixth Circuit Court of Appeals on or before April 15, 2019. (RLJ)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 006013676945 Filed: 3/25/2019, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                            Copy of District Court Order filed 03/25/19 denying in forma pauperis. (RLJ)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Blank  Filed: 2/27/2019, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                              The case manager for this case is: Robin L. Johnson (RLJ)
                                LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 006013655355 Filed: 2/27/2019, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                Civil Case Docketed. Notice filed by Appellant Samantha Delane Rajapakse. Transcript needed: y. (RLJ)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF

                                  Statistics

                                  This case has been viewed 25 times.

                                  No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                  Space
                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                   
                                  PlainSite
                                  Sign Up
                                  Need Password Help?