District Appellate Supreme
Federal
Michigan Eastern District Court Court of Appeals for the Sixth Circuit
  1. Case No. 19-1192
    Filed 2/27/2019
  2. Case No. 18-1634
    Filed 6/5/2018
  3. Case No. 18-1581
    Filed 5/31/2018
United States Supreme Court

Samantha Rajapakse v. Credit Acceptance Corp, et al
Appeal Court of Appeals for the Sixth Circuit, Case No. 18-1634

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated July 19, 2019 at 1:18 PM DT (1.8 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo 1 Stop Auto Sales, Defendant
No Logo Arthur Smith, Defendant - Appellee

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Stephen W. King +1 248 792 2398 +1 248 646 8277 sking@kingandmurray.com
No Logo Board Of Credit Acceptance Corporation, Defendant - Appellee

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Stephen W. King +1 248 792 2398 +1 248 646 8277 sking@kingandmurray.com
No Logo Brett A. Roberts, Defendant - Appellee

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Stephen W. King +1 248 792 2398 +1 248 646 8277 sking@kingandmurray.com
No Logo Charles A. Pierce, Defendant - Appellee

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Stephen W. King +1 248 792 2398 +1 248 646 8277 sking@kingandmurray.com
Credit Acceptance Corporation Credit Acceptance Corporation, Defendant - Appellee

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Stephen W. King +1 248 792 2398 +1 248 646 8277 sking@kingandmurray.com
No Logo Daniel A. Ulatowski, Defendant - Appellee

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Stephen W. King +1 248 792 2398 +1 248 646 8277 sking@kingandmurray.com
No Logo Douglas W. Busk, Defendant - Appellee

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Stephen W. King +1 248 792 2398 +1 248 646 8277 sking@kingandmurray.com
No Logo Glenda Flanagan, Defendant - Appellee

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Stephen W. King +1 248 792 2398 +1 248 646 8277 sking@kingandmurray.com
No Logo John S. Soave, Defendant - Appellee

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Stephen W. King +1 248 792 2398 +1 248 646 8277 sking@kingandmurray.com
No Logo Kenneth S. Booth, Defendant - Appellee

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Stephen W. King +1 248 792 2398 +1 248 646 8277 sking@kingandmurray.com
No Logo Rob Williams, 1 Stop Auto Sales, Defendant - Appellee
No Logo Sandy Pollack, Defendant - Appellee

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Stephen W. King +1 248 792 2398 +1 248 646 8277 sking@kingandmurray.com
No Logo Scott J. Vassauzzo, Defendant - Appellee

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Stephen W. King +1 248 792 2398 +1 248 646 8277 sking@kingandmurray.com
No Logo Steven M. Jones, Defendant - Appellee

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Stephen W. King +1 248 792 2398 +1 248 646 8277 sking@kingandmurray.com
No Logo Thomas N. Tryforus, Defendant - Appellee

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Stephen W. King +1 248 792 2398 +1 248 646 8277 sking@kingandmurray.com
No Logo Rajapakse, Samantha D., Plaintiff - Appellant
Officially listed as "Samantha Delane Rajapakse"

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Samantha Delane Rajapakse +1 901 237 0744
Nature of Suit 3450 - Interstate Commerce
Case Type Civil
Lower Court Case https://ecf.mied.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?caseNumber=4:17-cv-12970
Lower Court Case https://ecf.mied.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?caseNumber=4:17-cv-12970
  Entries (10) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 006013455749 Filed: 7/11/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
ORDER filed granting motion to dismiss case - voluntarily [9] filed by Samantha Delane Rajapakse.. (MMD)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 006013446593 Filed: 6/28/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
    Appellant MOTION filed by Samantha Delane Rajapakse in 18-1581, 18-1634 to dismiss voluntarily pursuant to FRAP 42(b). Certificate of service: 06/26/2018. [18-1581, 18-1634] (MMD)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 006013436738 Filed: 6/20/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
      APPEARANCE filed for Appellees Board Of Credit Acceptance Corporation, Kenneth S. Booth, Douglas W. Busk, Credit Acceptance Corporation, Glenda Flanagan, Steven M. Jones, Charles A. Pierce, Sandy Pollack, Brett A. Roberts, Arthur Smith, John S. Soave, Thomas N. Tryforus, Daniel A. Ulatowski and Scott J. Vassauzzo by Stephen W. King. Certificate of Service: 06/20/2018. [18-1634] (SWK)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 006013435120 Filed: 6/19/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
        ORDER filed granting motion to dismiss party [6] filed by Samantha Delane Rajapakse.. (MMD)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 006013435080 Filed: 6/18/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
          Appellant MOTION filed by Samantha Delane Rajapakse to dismiss 1 Stop Auto Sales and Robert Williams as party to the appeal. Certificate of service:. (MMD)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 006013431258 Filed: 6/14/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
            Appellant MOTION of Submission Affidavit of Rob Williams of One Stop Auto Sales Before the Court of Appeals, filed by Samantha Delane Rajapakse. (AEG)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 006013429408 Filed: 6/13/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
              SIGNED NOTICE OF APPEAL filed by Samantha Delane Rajapakse. (AEG)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 006013421333 Filed: 6/5/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                LETTER SENT to Samantha Delane Rajapakse, directing that the enclosed notice of appeal be signed and returned to this court by 06/19/2018. (MMD)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Blank  Filed: 6/5/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                  The case manager for this case is: Michelle Davis (MMD)
                    LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 006013421289 Filed: 6/5/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                    Civil Case Docketed. Notice filed by Appellant Samantha Delane Rajapakse. Transcript needed: n. (MMD)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF

                      Statistics

                      This case has been viewed 27 times.

                      No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                      Space
                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                       
                      PlainSite
                      Sign Up
                      Need Password Help?