TRUMP v. COMMITTEE ON WAYS AND MEANS, UNITED STATES HOUSE OF REPRESENTATIVES et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit District Of Columbia District Court, Case No. 1:19-cv-02173-CJN
District Judge Carl J. Nichols, presiding

Tags
Last Updated July 9, 2021 at 7:34 PM DT (2.6 months ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Trump, Donald J. Trump, Donald J., Plaintiff
Officially listed as "DONALD J. TRUMP"
Officer/Director, Riviera Holdings Corp

Toggle Switch Represented by Consovoy McCarthy PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space William S. Consovoy +1 703 243 4923 will@consovoymccarthy.com
v.
United States House of Representatives, Ways And Means Committee United States House of Representatives, Ways And Means Committee, Defendant
Officially listed as "COMMITTEE ON WAYS AND MEANS, UNITED STATES HOUSE OF REPRESENTATIVES"
No Logo James, Letitia, Defendant
Officially listed as "LETITIA JAMES"
No Logo MICHAEL R SCHMIDT, Defendant
Office Washington, DC
Filed 7/23/2019
Jury Demand None
Demand
Nature of Suit 890 - Other Statutes: Other Statutory Actions
Cause Section 28 U.S.C. § 1331 Fed. Question
Jurisdiction U.S. Government Defendant
Disposition
County 11001
Terminated
Origin 1
Reopened
Lead Case
None
Related Case
None
Other Court Case None
Defendant Custody Status
  Entries (76) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document 45 Filed: 11/11/2019, Entered: 11/11/2019 Order on motion to dismiss/lack of jurisdictionCourt Filing
ORDER. Signed by Judge Carl J. Nichols on November 11, 2019. (lccjn1)
    LREF
    Legal Document 44 Filed: 11/11/2019, Entered: 11/11/2019 Memorandum and OpinionCourt Filing
    MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Judge Carl J. Nichols on November 11, 2019. (lccjn1)
      LREF
      Legal Document 43 Filed: 10/29/2019, Entered: 10/29/2019, Terminated: 10/29/2019 motion for extension of time to file response/reply
      MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to [42] MOTION to Dismiss MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by DONALD J. TRUMP (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order)(Consovoy, William)
        LREF
        Blank  set/reset deadlines/hearings
        Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings: Response to [42] due by 11/18/2019. Reply due by 12/9/2019. (zcdw)
          LREF
          Blank  Order on motion for extension of time to file Response/Reply
          MINUTE ORDER. Upon consideration of Plaintiff's [43] Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Congressional Defendants' Motion to Dismiss, it is hereby ORDERED that the Motion is GRANTED. It is further ORDERED that Plaintiff shall file his response to the Congressional Defendants' [42] Motion to Dismiss on or before November 18, 2019, and that the Congressional Defendants shall file their reply on or before December 9, 2019. Signed by Judge Carl J. Nichols on October 29, 2019. (lccjn1)
            LREF
            Legal Document 42 Filed: 10/21/2019, Entered: 10/21/2019 Motion to Dismiss
            MOTION to Dismiss , MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by COMMITTEE ON WAYS AND MEANS, UNITED STATES HOUSE OF REPRESENTATIVES, ANDREW GROSSMAN, RICHARD NEAL (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order)(Letter, Douglas)
              LREF
              Blank  Notice of QC
              NOTICE OF ERROR re [41] Supplemental Memorandum; emailed to andrew.amer@ag.ny.gov, cc'd 13 associated attorneys -- The PDF file you docketed contained errors: 1. DO NOT REFILE - Counsel should review LCvR 5.1 (a) CORRESPONDENCE WITH THE COURT (zjf, )
                LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 7/9/2021, Entered: None Notice of Withdrawal of Appearance
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document 41 Filed: 9/25/2019, Entered: 9/25/2019 Supplemental Memorandum
                  SUPPLEMENTAL MEMORANDUM to re [36] MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction MOTION to Dismiss for Improper Venue MOTION to Transfer Case by letter filed by LETITIA JAMES, MICHAEL R. SCHMIDT. (Amer, Andrew)
                    LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 4/12/2021, Entered: None Status Report
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 9/19/2019, Entered: 9/19/2019 transcript
                      TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS before the Honorable Carl J. Nichols held on 09/18/2019; Page Numbers: 1-83. Date of Issuance: 09/18/2019. Court Reporter: Nancy J. Meyer, Telephone Number: (202) 354-3118, Tape Number: N/A. Transcripts may be ordered by submitting the Transcript Order FormFor the first 90 days after this filing date, the transcript may be viewed at the courthouse at a public terminal or purchased from the court reporter referenced above. After 90 days, the transcript may be accessed via PACER. Other transcript formats, (multi-page, condensed, CD or ASCII) may be purchased from the court reporter.NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have twenty-one days to file with the court and the court reporter any request to redact personal identifiers from this transcript. If no such requests are filed, the transcript will be made available to the public via PACER without redaction after 90 days. The policy, which includes the five personal identifiers specifically covered, is located on our website at www.dcd.uscourts.gov. Redaction Request due 10/10/2019. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 10/20/2019. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 12/18/2019.(Meyer, Nancy)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 11/16/2020, Entered: None USCA Mandate
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Blank  Motion Hearing
                          Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Carl J. Nichols: Motion Hearing held on 9/18/2019 re [36] Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction; Motion to Dismiss for Improper Venue; Motion to Transfer Case. Motions heard and taken under advisement. (Court Reporter: Nancy Meyer) (zcdw)
                            LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 12/19/2019, Entered: None Transmission of Notice of Appeal and Docket Sheet to USCA
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document 39 Filed: 9/13/2019, Entered: 9/13/2019 Reply to opposition to Motion
                              REPLY to opposition to motion re [36] MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction MOTION to Dismiss for Improper Venue MOTION to Transfer Case filed by LETITIA JAMES, MICHAEL R. SCHMIDT. (Amer, Andrew)
                                LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 12/17/2019, Entered: None Notice of Interlocutory Appeal
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Blank  Order on Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice
                                  MINUTE ORDER. The Court having considered Plaintiff's [38] Motion For Admission Pro Hac Vice of Patrick Strawbridge, and it appearing to the Court that the attorney referenced therein meets the requirements for pro hac vice admission under Local Civil Rule 83.2(d), it is hereby ORDERED that the motion is GRANTED. It is further ORDERED that Patrick Strawbridge, Consovoy McCarthy PLLC, Ten Post Office Square, 8th Floor South PMB #706, Boston, Massachusetts 02109 is ADMITTED to practice before the Court pro hac vice. Signed by Judge Carl J. Nichols on September 11, 2019. (lccjn1)
                                    LREF
                                    Legal Document 52 Filed: 11/18/2019, Entered: None Order on Motion for Writ
                                      LREF
                                      Legal Document 38 Filed: 9/10/2019, Entered: 9/10/2019, Terminated: 9/11/2019 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice
                                      Unopposed MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Patrick Strawbridge, :Firm- Consovoy McCarthy PLLC, :Address- 1600 Wilson Blvd., Ste. 700, Arlington, VA 22209. Phone No. - 617-227-0548. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0090-6369632. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by DONALD J. TRUMP (Attachments: # (1) Affidavit, # (2) Text of Proposed Order)(Consovoy, William)
                                        LREF
                                        Legal Document 51 Filed: 11/18/2019, Entered: None Memorandum & Opinion
                                          LREF
                                          Legal Document 37 Filed: 9/9/2019, Entered: 9/9/2019 Memorandum in opposition
                                          Memorandum in opposition to re [36] MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction MOTION to Dismiss for Improper Venue MOTION to Transfer Case filed by DONALD J. TRUMP. (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order)(Consovoy, William)
                                            LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 11/18/2019, Entered: None Transcript
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document 36 Filed: 8/29/2019, Entered: 8/29/2019, Terminated: 11/11/2019 Motion to Dismiss
                                              MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction , MOTION to Dismiss for Improper Venue, MOTION to Transfer Case by LETITIA JAMES, MICHAEL R. SCHMIDT (Attachments: # (1) Memorandum in Support)(Amer, Andrew)
                                                LREF
                                                Legal Document 49 Filed: 11/18/2019, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                                                  LREF
                                                  Legal Document 35 Filed: 8/27/2019, Entered: 8/27/2019 stipulation
                                                  STIPULATION by DONALD J. TRUMP. (Consovoy, William)
                                                    LREF
                                                    Legal Document 48 Filed: 11/15/2019, Entered: None Reply to opposition to Motion
                                                      LREF
                                                      Legal Document 34 Filed: 8/27/2019, Entered: 8/27/2019 Waiver of Service
                                                      WAIVER OF SERVICE by DONALD J. TRUMP. ANDREW GROSSMAN waiver sent on 8/21/2019, answer due 10/20/2019. (Consovoy, William)
                                                        LREF
                                                        Legal Document 47 Filed: 11/13/2019, Entered: None Status Report
                                                          LREF
                                                          Legal Document 33 Filed: 8/27/2019, Entered: 8/27/2019 Waiver of Service
                                                          WAIVER OF SERVICE by DONALD J. TRUMP. RICHARD NEAL waiver sent on 8/21/2019, answer due 10/20/2019. (Consovoy, William)
                                                            LREF
                                                            Legal Document 46 Filed: 11/12/2019, Entered: None Memorandum in Opposition to Motion
                                                              LREF
                                                              Blank  Order
                                                              MINUTE ORDER. Upon consideration of the [35] Joint Stipulation of Plaintiff and Congressional Defendants, it is hereby ORDERED that Defendant Committee on Ways and Means, U.S. House of Representatives shall file its Answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's [30] Amended Complaint on or before October 21, 2019. Signed by Judge Carl J. Nichols on August 27, 2019. (lccjn1)
                                                                LREF
                                                                Legal Document 32 Filed: 8/21/2019, Entered: 8/21/2019 Summons Issued Electronically
                                                                SUMMONS (2) Issued Electronically as to ANDREW GROSSMAN, RICHARD NEAL. (jf)
                                                                  LREF
                                                                  Legal Document 31 Filed: 8/19/2019, Entered: 8/19/2019 Request for Summons to Issue
                                                                  REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO ISSUE filed by DONALD J. TRUMP. (Attachments: # (1) Summons)(Consovoy, William)
                                                                    LREF
                                                                    Legal Document 30 Filed: 8/19/2019, Entered: 8/19/2019 Amended Complaint
                                                                    AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by DONALD J. TRUMP.(Consovoy, William)
                                                                      LREF
                                                                      Blank  set/reset deadlines/hearings
                                                                      Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings: Plaintiff Amended Complaint due by 8/19/2019. New York Defendants Motion To Dismiss For Lack Of Personal Jurisdiction And/Or Improper Venue due by 8/29/2019. Plaintiff Opposition To The New York Defendants' Motion To Dismiss due by 9/9/2019. New York Defendants Reply In Support Of Their Motion To Dismiss due by 9/13/2019. Motion Hearing set for 9/18/2019 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 19 before Judge Carl J. Nichols. (mac)
                                                                        LREF
                                                                        Legal Document 29 Filed: 8/14/2019, Entered: 8/14/2019 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                        ORDER Adopting Proposed Briefing Schedule. Signed by Judge Carl J. Nichols on August 14, 2019. (lccjn1)
                                                                          LREF
                                                                          Legal Document 28 Filed: 8/14/2019, Entered: 8/14/2019 stipulation
                                                                          STIPULATION by DONALD J. TRUMP. (Consovoy, William)
                                                                            LREF
                                                                            Blank  set/reset deadlines/hearings
                                                                            Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings: Motion Hearing set for 9:30 AM on 8/29/2019 in Courtroom 19 before Judge Carl J. Nichols. Please note the change in start time. (zcdw)
                                                                              LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 8/9/2019, Entered: 8/9/2019 transcriptCourt Filing
                                                                              TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS before Judge Trevor N. McFadden, held on 7/25/2019. Page Numbers: 1-35. Date of Issuance: 8/9/19. Court Reporter: Sara Wick, telephone number 202-354-3284. Transcripts may be ordered by submitting the Transcript Order FormFor the first 90 days after this filing date, the transcript may be viewed at the courthouse at a public terminal or purchased from the court reporter referenced above. After 90 days, the transcript may be accessed via PACER. Other transcript formats, (multi-page, condensed, CD or ASCII) may be purchased from the court reporter.NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have twenty-one days to file with the court and the court reporter any request to redact personal identifiers from this transcript. If no such requests are filed, the transcript will be made available to the public via PACER without redaction after 90 days. The policy, which includes the five personal identifiers specifically covered, is located on our website at www.dcd.uscourts.gov. Redaction Request due 8/30/2019. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 9/9/2019. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 11/7/2019.(Wick, Sara)
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document 26 Filed: 8/9/2019, Entered: 8/9/2019, Terminated: 9/18/2019 Motion to Dismiss
                                                                                MOTION to Dismiss for Improper Venue, MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction , MOTION to Transfer Case by LETITIA JAMES, MICHAEL R. SCHMIDT (Attachments: # (1) Memorandum in Support)(Amer, Andrew)
                                                                                LREF
                                                                                Blank  set/reset deadlines/hearings
                                                                                Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings: New York Defendants Motion To Dismiss For Lack Of Personal Jurisdiction And/or Improper Venue due by 8/9/2019. Plaintiff Opposition To The New York Defendants' Motion To Dismiss due by 8/19/2019. New York Defendants Reply In Support Of Their Motion To Dismiss due by 8/23/2019. Motion Hearing set for 8/29/2019 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 19 before Judge Carl J. Nichols. (mac)
                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document 25 Filed: 8/1/2019, Entered: 8/1/2019 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                  ORDER. Signed by Judge Carl J. Nichols on August 1, 2019. (lccjn1)
                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 7/31/2019, Entered: 7/31/2019 transcriptCourt Filing
                                                                                    TRANSCRIPT OF 7/31/19 TELEPHONE CONFERENCE before Judge Carl J. Nichols held on July 31, 2019; Page Numbers: 1-18. Date of Issuance: 7/31/19. Court Reporter: Bryan A. Wayne. Transcripts may be ordered by submitting Transcript Order Form at www.dcd.uscourts.gov. For the first 90 days after this filing date, the transcript may be viewed at the courthouse at a public terminal or purchased from the court reporter referenced above. After 90 days, the transcript may be accessed via PACER. Other transcript formats may be purchased from the court reporter.NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have twenty-one days to file with the court and the court reporter any request to redact personal identifiers from this transcript. If no such requests are filed, the transcript will be made available to the public via PACER without redaction after 90 days. The policy, which includes the five personal identifiers specifically covered, is located on our website at www.dcd.uscourts.gov. Redaction Request due 8/21/2019. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 8/31/2019. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 10/29/2019.(Wayne, Bryan)
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 7/31/2019, Entered: 7/31/2019 transcriptCourt Filing
                                                                                      TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS before Judge Carl J. Nichols held on July 29, 2019; Page Numbers: 1-61. Date of Issuance:July 31, 2019. Court Reporter: Janice Dickman, Telephone number: 202-354-3267, Transcripts may be ordered by submitting the Transcript Order FormFor the first 90 days after this filing date, the transcript may be viewed at the courthouse at a public terminal or purchased from the court reporter referenced above. After 90 days, the transcript may be accessed via PACER. Other transcript formats, (multi-page, condensed, CD or ASCII) may be purchased from the court reporter.NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have twenty-one days to file with the court and the court reporter any request to redact personal identifiers from this transcript. If no such requests are filed, the transcript will be made available to the public via PACER without redaction after 90 days. The policy, which includes the five personal identifiers specifically covered, is located on our website at www.dcd.uscourts.gov. Redaction Request due 8/21/2019. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 8/31/2019. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 10/29/2019.(Dickman, Janice)
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Blank  Telephone Conference
                                                                                        Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Carl J. Nichols: Telephone Conference held on 7/31/2019. Court order to follow. (Court Reporter: Bryan Wayne) (zcdw)
                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                          Blank  Notice of hearing
                                                                                          NOTICE of Hearing: Telephone Conference set for 7/31/2019 at 2:30 PM in Courtroom 19 before Judge Carl J. Nichols. (zcdw)
                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document 22 Filed: 7/30/2019, Entered: 7/30/2019 Status report
                                                                                            Joint STATUS REPORT by DONALD J. TRUMP. (Consovoy, William)
                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document 21 Filed: 7/29/2019, Entered: 7/29/2019 Response to motion
                                                                                              RESPONSE re [6] Emergency MOTION for Writ filed by LETITIA JAMES, MICHAEL R. SCHMIDT. (Amer, Andrew)
                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document 20 Filed: 7/29/2019, Entered: 7/29/2019 Waiver of Service
                                                                                                WAIVER OF SERVICE by DONALD J. TRUMP. MICHAEL R. SCHMIDT waiver sent on 7/28/2019, answer due 9/26/2019. (Consovoy, William)
                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document 19 Filed: 7/29/2019, Entered: 7/29/2019 Waiver of Service
                                                                                                  WAIVER OF SERVICE by DONALD J. TRUMP. LETITIA JAMES waiver sent on 7/28/2019, answer due 9/26/2019. (Consovoy, William)
                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                    Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                    Legal Document 18 Filed: 7/29/2019, Entered: 7/29/2019 Waiver of Service
                                                                                                    WAIVER OF SERVICE by DONALD J. TRUMP. COMMITTEE ON WAYS AND MEANS, UNITED STATES HOUSE OF REPRESENTATIVES waiver sent on 7/28/2019, answer due 9/26/2019. (Consovoy, William)
                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                      Legal Document 17 Filed: 7/29/2019, Entered: 7/29/2019 Reply to opposition to Motion
                                                                                                      REPLY to opposition to motion re [6] Emergency MOTION for Writ filed by DONALD J. TRUMP. (Consovoy, William)
                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                        Blank  Order
                                                                                                        MINUTE ORDER. For the reasons stated at today's hearing on Plaintiff's [6] Emergency Application for Relief Under the All Writs Act, it is hereby ORDERED that the Parties shall meet and confer and file, by no later than 6 PM on July 30, 2019, a Joint Status Report setting forth any agreement they have reached--or in the event they are unable to reach agreement, their respective positions--regarding how this case should proceed. Signed by Judge Carl J. Nichols on July 29, 2019. (lccjn1)
                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                          Blank  Evidentiary Hearing
                                                                                                          Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Carl J. Nichols: Evidentiary Hearing held on 7/29/2019 re [6] Emergency Motion for Writ. Motion heard and taken under advisement. (Court Reporter: Janice Dickman) (zcdw)
                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                            Blank  set/reset deadlines/hearings
                                                                                                            Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings: Reply to [6] due by 10:00 AM on 7/29/2019. Motion Hearing re [6] set for 7/29/2019 at 4:00 PM in Courtroom 19 before Judge Carl J. Nichols. (zcdw)
                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                              Blank  Order
                                                                                                              MINUTE ORDER. It is hereby ORDERED that the Parties shall appear for a hearing on Plaintiff's [6] Emergency Application for Relief Under the All Writs Act on July 29, 2019, at 4 PM in Courtroom 19. It is further ORDERED that Plaintiff shall file its Reply, if any, to Defendant Committee on Ways and Means, United States House of Representatives's Response by 10 AM on July 29, 2019. Signed by Judge Carl J. Nichols on July 28, 2019. (lccjn1)
                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document 16 Filed: 7/26/2019, Entered: 7/26/2019 Case Assigned/ReassignedCourt Filing
                                                                                                                Case randomly reassigned to Judge Carl J. Nichols. Judge Trevor N. McFadden is no longer assigned to the case. (rj)
                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document 15 Filed: 7/25/2019, Entered: 7/25/2019 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                  MEMORANDUM AND ORDER transferring this case to the Calendar and Case Management Committee for random reassignment. See attached document for details. Signed by Judge Trevor N. McFadden on 7/25/2019. (lctnm1) (Main Document 15 replaced on 7/26/2019) (hmc).
                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document 14 Filed: 7/25/2019, Entered: 7/25/2019 Response to motion
                                                                                                                    RESPONSE re [6] Emergency MOTION for Writ filed by COMMITTEE ON WAYS AND MEANS, UNITED STATES HOUSE OF REPRESENTATIVES. (Letter, Douglas)
                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document 13 Filed: 7/25/2019, Entered: 7/25/2019 Reply to Document
                                                                                                                      REPLY re [2] Notice of Related Case filed by DONALD J. TRUMP. (Consovoy, William)
                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document 12 Filed: 7/25/2019, Entered: 7/25/2019 Response to Document
                                                                                                                        RESPONSE re [2] Notice of Related Case filed by LETITIA JAMES, MICHAEL R. SCHMIDT. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit Exh. A - TRUST Act)(Amer, Andrew)
                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document 11 Filed: 7/25/2019, Entered: 7/25/2019 Notice of appearance
                                                                                                                          NOTICE of Appearance by Brooks McKinly Hanner on behalf of COMMITTEE ON WAYS AND MEANS, UNITED STATES HOUSE OF REPRESENTATIVES (Hanner, Brooks)
                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document 10 Filed: 7/25/2019, Entered: 7/25/2019 Notice of appearance
                                                                                                                            NOTICE of Appearance by Josephine T. Morse on behalf of COMMITTEE ON WAYS AND MEANS, UNITED STATES HOUSE OF REPRESENTATIVES (Morse, Josephine)
                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document 9 Filed: 7/25/2019, Entered: 7/25/2019 Notice of appearance
                                                                                                                              NOTICE of Appearance by Megan Barbero on behalf of COMMITTEE ON WAYS AND MEANS, UNITED STATES HOUSE OF REPRESENTATIVES (Barbero, Megan)
                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                Legal Document 8 Filed: 7/25/2019, Entered: 7/25/2019 Notice of appearance
                                                                                                                                NOTICE of Appearance by Todd Barry Tatelman on behalf of COMMITTEE ON WAYS AND MEANS, UNITED STATES HOUSE OF REPRESENTATIVES (Tatelman, Todd)
                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 7 Filed: 7/25/2019, Entered: 7/25/2019 Notice of appearance
                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of Appearance by Andrew Stuart Amer on behalf of LETITIA JAMES, MICHAEL R. SCHMIDT (Amer, Andrew)
                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                    Blank  Status Conference
                                                                                                                                    Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Trevor N. McFadden: Case called for a Motion Hearing, but not held. Status Conference held on 7/25/2019. Order forthcoming. (Court Reporter: Sara Wick.) (hmc)
                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 6 Filed: 7/24/2019, Entered: 7/24/2019 motion for writ
                                                                                                                                      Emergency MOTION for Writ by DONALD J. TRUMP (Attachments: # (1) Memorandum in Support, # (2) Text of Proposed Order)(Consovoy, William)
                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 5 Filed: 7/24/2019, Entered: 7/24/2019 Notice of appearance
                                                                                                                                        NOTICE of Appearance by Douglas N. Letter on behalf of COMMITTEE ON WAYS AND MEANS, UNITED STATES HOUSE OF REPRESENTATIVES (Letter, Douglas)
                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                          Blank  Order
                                                                                                                                          MINUTE ORDER. For the reasons set forth during the July 24, 2019 telephone conference call, it is hereby ordered that the parties shall appear for a motion hearing on the Plaintiff's [6] Emergency Application for Relief before Judge Trevor N. McFadden at 3 PM in Courtroom 2 on July 25, 2019. The Committee on Ways and Means shall file its written opposition, if any, to the Plaintiff's motion before noon on July 25, 2019. The parties are also invited to submit briefs to the Court on whether this case properly is designated as related to No. 19-cv-01974 (Comm. on Ways & Means v. U.S. Dep't of Treasury) under Local Rule 40.5 by noon on July 25, 2019. Signed by Judge Trevor N. McFadden on 7/24/2019. (lctnm2)
                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                            Blank  Telephone Conference
                                                                                                                                            Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Trevor N. McFadden: Telephone Scheduling Conference held on 7/24/2019. The Committee on Ways and Means' Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion due by noon on 7/25/2019. All parties are invited to file briefs on whether this case properly is designated as related to 19-cv-01974 under LCvR 40.5 by noon on 7/25/2019. Motion Hearing set for 7/25/2019 at 3:00 PM in Courtroom 2 before Judge Trevor N. McFadden. (Court Reporter: Scott Wallace) (lctnm2)
                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 4 Filed: 7/23/2019, Entered: 7/23/2019 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                              STANDING ORDER Establishing Procedures for Cases Before Judge Trevor N. McFadden. The parties are hereby ORDERED to read and comply with the directives in the attached standing order. Signed by Judge Trevor N. McFadden on 07/23/2019. (lctnm1)
                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 3 Filed: 7/23/2019, Entered: 7/23/2019 Summons Issued Electronically
                                                                                                                                                SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to COMMITTEE ON WAYS AND MEANS, UNITED STATES HOUSE OF REPRESENTATIVES, LETITIA JAMES, MICHAEL R. SCHMIDT. (Attachment: # (1) Notice to Counsel/Party)(zeg)
                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 2 Filed: 7/23/2019, Entered: 7/23/2019 Notice of Related Case
                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE OF RELATED CASE by DONALD J. TRUMP. Case related to Case No. 19-cv-1974. (Consovoy, William)
                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 1 Filed: 7/23/2019, Entered: 7/23/2019 Complaint
                                                                                                                                                    COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-6272047) filed by DONALD J. TRUMP. (Attachments: # (1) Civil Cover Sheet, # (2) Summons to House Committee on Ways and Means, # (3) Summons to N.Y.S. Attorney General, # (4) Summons to N.Y.S. Tax Commissioner)(Consovoy, William)
                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Blank  Case Assigned/Reassigned
                                                                                                                                                      Case Assigned to Judge Trevor N. McFadden. (zeg)
                                                                                                                                                        LREF

                                                                                                                                                        Statistics

                                                                                                                                                        This case has been viewed 197 times.

                                                                                                                                                        No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                        Space
                                                                                                                                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                         
                                                                                                                                                        PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                        Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                        Need Password Help?