Nguyen v. Tesla, Inc.
Federal Civil Lawsuit California Central District Court, Case No. 8:19-cv-01422-JLS-JDE
District Judge Josephine L. Staton, presiding

Tags
Last Updated December 15, 2020 at 12:04 PM EST (11.7 months ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Space Space

No Logo Hugh Nguyen, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of Edward C. Chen

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Edward C Chen +1 949 287 4278 +1 949 287 4278 Edward.Chen@edchenlaw.com
v.
Tesla, Inc. Tesla, Inc., Defendant
  Entries (31) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 12/15/2020, Entered: None USCA Mandate
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 10/6/2020, Entered: None Status Report
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 10/6/2020, Entered: None Notice of Change of Attorney Business or Contact Information (G-06)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 8/26/2020, Entered: None USCA Notification of Case Number
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 8/25/2020, Entered: None Appeal to 9th Circuit Court of Appeals
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 7/24/2020, Entered: None Reconsideration
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document 27 Filed: 7/23/2020, Entered: None Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held
                LREF
                Legal Document 26 Filed: 7/11/2020, Entered: None Response in Support of Motion
                  LREF
                  Legal Document 25 Filed: 7/2/2020, Entered: None Response in Opposition to Motion
                    LREF
                    Legal Document 23 Filed: 5/5/2020, Entered: None Reconsideration
                      LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 4/6/2020, Entered: 4/6/2020 Order on motion to compel arbitrationCourt Filing
                      MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER GRANTING IN PART Defendant's Motion to Compel Arbitration and Staying Proceedings Pending Arbitration (Doc. [15]) by Judge Josephine L. Staton: The Court GRANTS IN PART Tesla's Motion to Compel, compelling arbitration of Plaintiffs' individual claims but declining to compel arbitration of Plaintiff Nguyen's requests for public injunctive relief. The Court also DISMISSES Plaintiffs' class claims and STAYS the proceedings pending arbitration. Plaintiffs must submit their individual, arbitrable claims against Tesla to binding arbitration. The parties are ORDERED to file a joint status report at the earlier of six (6) months from the date of this Order or within ten (10) days of completion of the arbitration proceedings. (MD JS-6. Case Terminated.) (jp)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 4/2/2020, Entered: 4/2/2020 Order on motion to compel arbitrationCourt Filing
                        MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER TAKING MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION UNDER SUBMISSION (Doc. 15) by Judge Josephine L. Staton. The Court finds this matter appropriate for decision without oral argument. See Fed. R. Civ. P. 78; C.D. Cal. R. 7-15. Accordingly, the hearing set for April 3, 2020, at 10:30 a.m., is VACATED, and the Court takes the matter UNDER SUBMISSION. (lom)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 1/31/2020, Entered: 1/31/2020 Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding heldCourt Filing
                          MINUTE (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER CONTINUING Hearing on Defendant's Motion to Compel Arbitration (Doc. [15] by Judge Josephine L. Staton: On the Court's own motion, the hearing on the Motion is CONTINUED to 4/3/2020 at 10:30 AM. (jp)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document 18 Filed: 1/17/2020, Entered: 1/17/2020 Reply (Motion related)
                            REPLY in Support NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Compel Arbitration NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case [15] filed by Defendant Tesla, Inc.. (Attachments: # (1) Declaration Michael Grimaldi, # (2) Exhibit A to Michael Grimaldi, # (3) Exhibit B to Michael Grimaldi, # (4) Declaration Lis Fraser, # (5) Exhibit 1 to Lis Fraser, # (6) Exhibit 2 to Lis Fraser, # (7) Declaration Jasjit Ahluwalia, # (8) Exhibit 14 to Jasjit Ahluwalia)(Kizirian, Eric)
                              LREF
                              Legal Document 17 Filed: 1/4/2020, Entered: 1/4/2020 Objection/Opposition (Motion related)
                              Opposition Motion to Compel Arbitration re: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Compel Arbitration NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case [15] filed by Plaintiffs E'rika Brock, Ian Ellwood, Hugh Nguyen, Todd Wolven. (Attachments: # (1) Declaration Declaration of Hugh Nguyen, # (2) Exhibit Exhibit A to Declaration of Hugh Nguyen)(Attorney Edward C Chen added to party E'rika Brock(pty:pla), Attorney Edward C Chen added to party Ian Ellwood(pty:pla), Attorney Edward C Chen added to party Todd Wolven(pty:pla))(Chen, Edward)
                                LREF
                                Blank 16 Filed: 12/5/2019, Entered: 12/5/2019 Text Only Scheduling Notice
                                TEXT ONLY ENTRY (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER CONTINUING HEARING: On the Court's own motion, the hearing on Defendant's Motion to Compel Arbitration/Dismiss [15], is ordered CONTINUED from 1/31/2020 to 2/14/2020 at 10:30 a.m. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (tg) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
                                  LREF
                                  Legal Document 15 Filed: 12/4/2019, Entered: 12/4/2019, Terminated: 4/6/2020 Motion to compel arbitrationCourt Filing
                                  NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Compel Arbitration, NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case filed by Defendant Tesla, Inc.. Motion set for hearing on 1/31/2020 at 10:30 AM before Judge Josephine L. Staton. (Attachments: # (1) Declaration Victor Barclay, # (2) Exhibit A to Victor Barclay Decl., # (3) Exhibit B to Victor Barclay Decl., # (4) Exhibit C to Victor Barclay Decl., # (5) Exhibit D. to Victor Barclay Decl., # (6) Exhibit E to Victor Barclay Decl., # (7) Declaration Jasjit Ahluwalia, # (8) Exhibit 1 to Jasjit Ahluwalia, # (9) Exhibit 2 to Jasjit Ahluwalia, # (10) Exhibit 3 to Jasjit Ahluwalia, # (11) Exhibit 4 to Jasjit Ahluwalia, # (12) Exhibit 5 to Jasjit Ahluwalia, # (13) Exhibit 6 to Jasjit Ahluwalia, # (14) Exhibit 7 to Jasjit Ahluwalia, # (15) Exhibit 8 to Jasjit Ahluwalia, # (16) Exhibit 9 to Jasjit Ahluwalia, # (17) Exhibit 10 to Jasjit Ahluwalia, # (18) Exhibit 11 to Jasjit Ahluwalia, # (19) Exhibit 11a to Jasjit Ahluwalia, # (20) Exhibit 12 to Jasjit Ahluwalia, # (21) Exhibit 13, # (22) Proposed Order) (Kizirian, Eric)
                                    LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 11/5/2019, Entered: 11/5/2019 Amended Complaint/Petition
                                    First AMENDED COMPLAINT against Defendant All Plaintiffs amending Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)[1], filed by Plaintiff Hugh Nguyen(Chen, Edward)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 10/11/2019, Entered: 10/11/2019 OrderCourt Filing
                                      ORDER by Judge Josephine L. Staton, Granting Stipulation for Extension of Time to File [12]. Plaintiff may file a First Amended Complaint on or before November 4, 2019; Tesla's response to Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint will be due on or before 12/4/19. SEE DOCUMENT FOR FURTHER INFORMATION. (twdb)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 10/1/2019, Entered: 10/1/2019 Stipulation for Extension of Time to File
                                        STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File For a New Deadline For Plaintiff to File a First Amended Complaint and for Setting a Briefing Schedule for Tesla, Inc.'s Anticipated Motion Responding to Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint filed by Defendant Tesla, Inc.. (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order)(Attorney Michael Keith Grimaldi added to party Tesla, Inc.(pty:dft))(Grimaldi, Michael)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 8/30/2019, Entered: 8/30/2019 Stipulation Extending Time to Answer (30 days or less)
                                          STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Tesla, Inc. answer now due 10/3/2019, re Service of Summons and Complaint Returned Executed (21 days), [10], Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)[1] filed by Plaintiff Hugh Nguyen.(Chen, Edward)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 8/21/2019, Entered: 8/21/2019 Service of Summons and Complaint Returned Executed (21 days)
                                            PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Hugh Nguyen, upon Defendant Tesla, Inc. served on 8/12/2019, answer due 9/3/2019. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Defendant Tesla, Inc. in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by service on a domestic corporation, unincorporated association, or public entity.Original Summons NOT returned. (Chen, Edward)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document 9 Filed: 7/26/2019, Entered: 7/26/2019 Initial Order upon Filing of Complaint - form only
                                              INITIAL STANDING ORDER FOR CASES ASSIGNED TO JUDGE JOSEPHINE L. STATON. (tg)
                                                LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 7/25/2019, Entered: 7/25/2019 Summons Issued (Attorney Civil Case Opening)
                                                21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)[1] as to Defendant Tesla, Inc. (jtil)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 7/24/2019, Entered: 7/24/2019 Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form
                                                  NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (jtil)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 7/24/2019, Entered: 7/24/2019 Notice of Assignment to United States Judges(CV-18) - optional html formCourt Filing
                                                    NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Josephine L. Staton and Magistrate Judge John D. Early. (jtil)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 7/24/2019, Entered: 7/24/2019 Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71)
                                                      AMENDED CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Hugh Nguyen. (Chen, Edward)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 7/23/2019, Entered: 7/23/2019 Summons Request
                                                        Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)[1] filed by Plaintiff Hugh Nguyen. (Chen, Edward)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document 3 Filed: 7/23/2019, Entered: 7/23/2019 Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties
                                                          NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Hugh Nguyen, (Chen, Edward)
                                                            LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 7/23/2019, Entered: 7/23/2019 Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71)
                                                            CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Hugh Nguyen. (Chen, Edward)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document 1 Filed: 7/23/2019, Entered: 7/23/2019 Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)
                                                              COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-24136607 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiff Hugh Nguyen. (Attorney Edward C Chen added to party Hugh Nguyen(pty:pla))(Chen, Edward)
                                                                LREF

                                                                Statistics

                                                                This case has been viewed 520 times.

                                                                No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                Space
                                                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                 
                                                                PlainSite
                                                                Sign Up
                                                                Need Password Help?