WAGNER-ZIMMERMAN v. TRUMP'S CASTLE, et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit New Jersey District Court, Case No. 1:98-cv-01755-JBS

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo JOAN WAGNER-ZIMMERMAN, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Console Law Offices LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Stephen G. Console +1 215 545 7676 +1 215 565 2850 console@consolelaw.com
v.
Trump Casino Services, LLC Trump Casino Services, LLC, Defendant
Officially listed as "TRUMP CASINO SERVICES, INC."

Toggle Switch Represented by Cooper Levenson April Niedelman & Wagenheim, PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space RUSSELL L. LICHTENSTEIN +1 609 344 3161 rlichtenstein@cooperlevenson.com
Trump's Castle Associates, LP Trump's Castle Associates, LP, Defendant
Officially listed as "TRUMP'S CASTLE ASSOCIATES"

Toggle Switch Represented by Cooper Levenson April Niedelman & Wagenheim, PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space RUSSELL L. LICHTENSTEIN +1 609 344 3161 rlichtenstein@cooperlevenson.com
Office Camden
Filed 4/15/1998
Jury Demand Both
Demand $0
Nature of Suit 442 - Civil Rights: Employment
Cause Section 28 U.S.C. § 1331 Fed. Question
Jurisdiction Federal Question
Disposition Dismissed - Settled
County Atlantic
Terminated 6/5/2000
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flags 12BG, CLOSED, PRETRL
  Entries (41) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 31 Filed: 6/5/2000, Entered: 6/5/2000 Minutes-MiscellaneousCourt Filing
Minute entry: Proceedings recorded by Ct-Reporter: none; Minutes of: 6/5/00; The following actions were taken, case settled 60 day orderd entered. By Judge Jerome B. Simandle (db)
    LREF
    Blank 30 Filed: 6/5/2000, Entered: 6/5/2000 OrderCourt Filing
    ORDER, dismissing this action as settled without prejudice and without costs. n.m. ( signed by Judge Jerome B. Simandle ) (db) Modified on 06/05/2000
      LREF
      Blank -- Filed: 6/5/2000, Entered: 6/5/2000 Terminated Case
      Case closed (db)
        LREF
        Blank 29 Filed: 5/24/2000, Entered: 5/30/2000 Minutes-MiscellaneousCourt Filing
        Minute entry: Proceedings recorded by Ct-Reporter: none; Minutes of: 05/24/00; The following actions were taken, set scheduling order deadlines: Trial with jury 9:00 6/6/00 ; Status phone conference 9:00 6/5/00. By Judge Jerome B. Simandle (db)
          LREF
          Blank 28 Filed: 5/12/2000, Entered: 5/15/2000 Letter
          LETTER by the Court setting trial date for JUNE 6, 2000; setting a Status Conference for May 24, 2000 in Courtroom 4A. (mgr)
            LREF
            Blank -- Filed: 5/12/2000, Entered: 5/15/2000 Set/Reset Deadlines:
            Deadline updated; reset scheduling order deadlines: Trial with jury 6/6/00 ; Status conference 5/24/00 ; (mgr)
              LREF
              Blank -- Filed: 4/27/2000, Entered: 4/27/2000 Remark
              TRIAL DATE SET FOR 6-5-00 AT 9:30/ SETTLEMENT CNF. SET FOR 5-24-00 AT 10:00 (dt)
                LREF
                Blank 27 Filed: 4/24/2000, Entered: 4/25/2000 Pretrial OrderCourt Filing
                JOINT FINAL PRETRIAL ORDER filed ( signed by Mag. Judge Joel B. Rosen ) (jm1)
                  LREF
                  Blank 26 Filed: 3/9/2000, Entered: 3/10/2000 OrderCourt Filing
                  ORDER granting in part, denying in part plaintiff's [22-1] motion to compel discovery purs. to Fed. R. Civ. P. 37 etc. ( signed by Mag. Judge Joel B. Rosen ) n.m. (lc)
                    LREF
                    Blank 25 Filed: 3/6/2000, Entered: 3/9/2000 Minutes-MiscellaneousCourt Filing
                    Minute entry: Proceedings recorded by Ct-Reporter: None; Minutes of: 3.6.00; The following actions were taken, granting in part, denying in part [22-1] motion to compel production of documents. Terminating [22-2] hearing Motion set for 2/18/00 on [22-1] motion. Order to be entered. By Mag. Judge Joel B. Rosen (lc)
                      LREF
                      Blank 24 Filed: 3/6/2000, Entered: 3/6/2000 ~Notice (other)
                      NOTICE of change of new address for Stephen G. Console, Esquire for JOAN WAGNER-ZIMMERMAN. (ar1)
                        LREF
                        Blank -- Filed: 2/29/2000, Entered: 2/29/2000 Settlement Conference
                        Settlement conference held before Mag. Judge Joel B. Rosen on 2.17.00. (lc)
                          LREF
                          Blank 23 Filed: 2/17/2000, Entered: 2/18/2000 Scheduling OrderCourt Filing
                          SCHEDULING ORDER setting Pretrial order to be submitted on or before 3/10/00 ; ( signed by Mag. Judge Joel B. Rosen )n.m. (lc)
                            LREF
                            Blank 22 Filed: 1/19/2000, Entered: 1/20/2000, Terminated: 3/9/2000 Motion to CompelCourt Filing
                            Notice of MOTION to compel production of documents by plaintiff, JOAN WAGNER-ZIMMERMAN. [22-1] motion referred to Mag. Judge Joel B. Rosen, Motion set for 2/18/00 on [22-1] motion (Certificate of Service) MEMORANDUM SUBMITTED. (lc)
                              LREF
                              Blank 21 Filed: 12/28/1999, Entered: 12/28/1999 Order
                              ORDER granting in part defendants' motion for summary judgment as to plaintiff's breach of contract claims against defendant Trump's Castle Associate, d/b/a Trump's Castle Casino Resort, and dismissing Count IV, and Count IV. And Granting in part as to plaintiff's discriminatory discharge and discriminatory failure to hire claims against defendant Trump Castle Associates, and dismissing all claims against defendant Trump's Castle Associates d/b/a Trump's Castle Casino Resort in Counts I, II, III. And denying defendant Trump's Casino Service, Inc.'s and plaintiff's cross-motions for summary judgment in all other respects and the question of whether defendant Trump Casino Services refused to hire plaintiff because of her gender and age as alleged in Counts I, II, and III shall be determined after a trial by jury on a date to be set the the Court. (Signed by Hon. Jerome B. Simandle ) n.m. (lc)
                                LREF
                                Blank 20 Filed: 12/28/1999, Entered: 12/28/1999 OrderCourt Filing
                                OPINION ( signed by Judge Jerome B. Simandle ) n.m. (lc)
                                  LREF
                                  Blank 19 Filed: 4/23/1999, Entered: 4/26/1999 Certification
                                  CERTIFICATION of Eileen Oakes Re: [17-1] motion for summary judgment (mgr)
                                    LREF
                                    Blank 18 Filed: 4/23/1999, Entered: 4/26/1999 Certification
                                    CERTIFICATION of Eileen Oakes Re: [17-1] motion for summary judgment (mgr)
                                      LREF
                                      Blank 17 Filed: 4/23/1999, Entered: 4/26/1999 Motion for Summary Judgment
                                      Notice of MOTION for summary judgment by deft.TRUMP'S CASTLE ASSOC. d/b/a TRUMP CASINO SERVICE, Motion set for 5/21/99 on [17-1] motion . (Motion Papers and Brief Subm pursuant to L.Civ.R. 7.1(b)) (mgr)
                                        LREF
                                        Blank 16 Filed: 4/23/1999, Entered: 4/26/1999 Motion for Summary Judgment
                                        Notice of MOTION for partial summary judgment by plaintiff JOAN WAGNER-ZIMMERMAN, Motion set for 5/21/99 on [16-1] motion . (Motion papers and Brief Subm pursuant to L.Civ.R. 7.1(b) ) (mgr)
                                          LREF
                                          Blank 15 Filed: 4/19/1999, Entered: 4/22/1999 Certification
                                          CERTIFICATION of Joseph T. Bambrick, Jr., Esq. (lc)
                                            LREF
                                            Blank -- Filed: 4/19/1999, Entered: 4/21/1999 Settlement Conference
                                            Settlement conference held before Mag. Judge Joel B. Rosen on 4.19.99. (lc)
                                              LREF
                                              Blank 14 Filed: 3/15/1999, Entered: 3/17/1999 Scheduling OrderCourt Filing
                                              AMENDED SCHEDULING ORDER; setting Dispositive Motion due on or before 3/15/99; Settlement conference 4/19/99 ; ( signed by Mag. Judge Joel B. Rosen ) (lc)
                                                LREF
                                                Blank 13 Filed: 2/18/1999, Entered: 2/19/1999 ~Notice (other)
                                                Notice of Intent to submit a Dispositive motion by JOAN WAGNER-ZIMMERMAN (Notice of Motion for Summary Judgment) (lc)
                                                  LREF
                                                  Blank 12 Filed: 1/20/1999, Entered: 1/20/1999 Amended Complaint
                                                  SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT by JOAN WAGNER-ZIMMERMAN , (Answer due 1/30/99 for TRUMP CASINO SERVICE, for TRUM'S CASTLE ASSOC. ) amending [1-1] complaint (lc)
                                                    LREF
                                                    Blank 11 Filed: 1/20/1999, Entered: 1/20/1999 Stipulation
                                                    STIPULATION to file a Second Amended Complaint. (lc)
                                                      LREF
                                                      Blank -- Filed: 12/29/1998, Entered: 12/29/1998 Status Conference
                                                      Status conference held before Mag. Judge Joel B. Rosen on 12.23.98. (lc)
                                                        LREF
                                                        Blank 10 Filed: 12/28/1998, Entered: 12/29/1998 Scheduling OrderCourt Filing
                                                        SCHEDULING ORDER setting Discovery cutoff 2/26/99 ; Dispositive Motion due on or before 3/15/99; Joint Final Pretrial order to be submitted on or before 2:00 4/19/99 ; ( signed by Mag. Judge Joel B. Rosen ) (lc)
                                                          LREF
                                                          Blank -- Filed: 10/13/1998, Entered: 10/20/1998 Status Conference
                                                          Status conference held before Mag. Judge Joel B. Rosen on 10.13.98. (lc)
                                                            LREF
                                                            Blank 9 Filed: 10/1/1998, Entered: 10/2/1998 Amended Complaint
                                                            AMENDED COMPLAINT by JOAN WAGNER-ZIMMERMAN , (Answer due 10/11/98 for TRUMP CASINO SERVICE, for TRUM'S CASTLE ASSOC. ) amending [1-1] complaint (lc)
                                                              LREF
                                                              Blank 8 Filed: 10/1/1998, Entered: 10/2/1998 Stipulation
                                                              STIPULATION to file an Amended Complaint. (lc)
                                                                LREF
                                                                Blank -- Filed: 10/1/1998, Entered: 10/8/1998 Status Conference
                                                                Status conference held before Mag. Judge Joel B. Rosen on 10/1/98. (er)
                                                                  LREF
                                                                  Blank 7 Filed: 9/10/1998, Entered: 9/14/1998 Scheduling OrderCourt Filing
                                                                  SCHEDULING ORDER setting Discovery cutoff 2/26/99 ; Status conference 9:00 12/14/98 ; ( signed by Mag. Judge Joel B. Rosen ) (er)
                                                                    LREF
                                                                    Blank -- Filed: 9/3/1998, Entered: 9/8/1998 Scheduling Conference
                                                                    Scheduling conference held before Mag. Judge Joel B. Rosen on 9.3.98. (lc)
                                                                      LREF
                                                                      Blank 6 Filed: 8/24/1998, Entered: 8/31/1998 Stipulation
                                                                      STIPULATION to amend caption to properly name defendants. (lc)
                                                                        LREF
                                                                        Blank 5 Filed: 7/29/1998, Entered: 7/29/1998 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                        ORDER, set scheduling conference for 11:00 9/3/98 (signed by Mag. Judge Joel B. Rosen ) (lc)
                                                                          LREF
                                                                          Blank 4 Filed: 7/29/1998, Entered: 7/29/1998 Answer
                                                                          ANSWER to Complaint by TRUMP'S CASTLE, TRUMP'S CASINO; jury demand (lc)
                                                                            LREF
                                                                            Blank 3 Filed: 6/25/1998, Entered: 6/25/1998 Waiver of Service Executed
                                                                            WAIVER OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint` RETURNED EXECUTED as to TRUMP'S CASTLE, TRUMP'S CASINO 4/27/98 Answer deadline projected for 6/26/98 for TRUMP'S CASINO, for TRUMP'S CASTLE (lc)
                                                                              LREF
                                                                              Blank 2 Filed: 4/15/1998, Entered: 4/15/1998 Case Assigned/ReassignedCourt Filing
                                                                              NOTICE of Allocation and Assignment filed. Magistrate Judge JOEL B. ROSEN (et)
                                                                                LREF
                                                                                Blank 1 Filed: 4/15/1998, Entered: 4/15/1998 Complaint
                                                                                COMPLAINT filed; jury demand FILING FEE $ 150.00 RECEIPT # 245100 (et)
                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                  Blank -- Filed: 4/15/1998, Entered: 4/15/1998 Summons Issued
                                                                                  SUMMONS(ES) issued for TRUMP'S CASTLE, TRUMP'S CASINO ( 20 Days) (Mailed to Counsel) (et)
                                                                                    LREF

                                                                                    Statistics

                                                                                    This case has been viewed 153 times.

                                                                                    No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                    Space
                                                                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                     
                                                                                    PlainSite
                                                                                    Sign Up
                                                                                    Need Password Help?