Bullock et al v. Internal Revenue Service et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit Montana District Court, Case No. 4:18-cv-00103-BMM
District Judge Brian Morris, presiding

Tags
Last Updated February 4, 2021 at 12:25 PM ST (6 months ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Montana Department of Revenue, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Gupta Wessler PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Deepak Gupta +1 202 888 1741 deepak@guptawessler.com
Space Matthew W.H. Wessler +1 202 888 1741 +1 202 888 7792 matt@guptawessler.com
Space Daniel Wilf-Townsend +1 202 888 1741 daniel@guptawessler.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Office of the Montana Attorney General

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Steve Bullock +1 406 444 2026 +1 406 444 3549 sbullock@mt.gov
Space Raphael Graybill +1 406 444 3179 raphael.graybill@mt.gov
No Logo STATE OF NEW JERSEY, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Office of the New Jersey Attorney General

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Katherine Anne Gregory +1 973 648 2500 Katherine.Gregory@law.njoag.gov
Space Glenn Joseph Moramarco +1 609 376 3235 glenn.moramarco@law.njoag.gov
No Logo Stephen C. Bullock, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Daniel Wilf-Townsend +1 202 888 1741 daniel@guptawessler.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Gupta Wessler PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Deepak Gupta +1 202 888 1741 deepak@guptawessler.com
Space Matthew W.H. Wessler +1 202 888 1741 +1 202 888 7792 matt@guptawessler.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Office of the Montana Attorney General

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Steve Bullock +1 406 444 2026 +1 406 444 3549 sbullock@mt.gov
Space Raphael Graybill +1 406 444 3179 raphael.graybill@mt.gov
v.
No Logo Charles P. Rettig, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Laura M. Conner +1 202 514 6438 laura.m.conner@usdoj.gov
Space Joseph Andrew Sergi +1 202 305 0868 +1 202 307 0054 Joseph.A.Sergi@usdoj.gov
Space Landon M. Yost +1 202 307 2144 landon.m.yost@usdoj.gov
United States Department of the Treasury, Internal Revenue Service United States Department of the Treasury, Internal Revenue Service, Defendant
Officially listed as "Internal Revenue Service"

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Laura M. Conner +1 202 514 6438 laura.m.conner@usdoj.gov
Space Joseph Andrew Sergi +1 202 305 0868 +1 202 307 0054 Joseph.A.Sergi@usdoj.gov
Space Landon M. Yost +1 202 307 2144 landon.m.yost@usdoj.gov
United States Department of the Treasury United States Department of the Treasury, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Laura M. Conner +1 202 514 6438 laura.m.conner@usdoj.gov
Space Joseph Andrew Sergi +1 202 305 0868 +1 202 307 0054 Joseph.A.Sergi@usdoj.gov
Space Landon M. Yost +1 202 307 2144 landon.m.yost@usdoj.gov
Office Great Falls
Filed 7/24/2018
Jury Demand None
Demand
Nature of Suit 899 - Other Statutes: Administrative Procedures Act/Review or Appeal of Agency Decision
Cause Section 05 U.S.C. § 702 Administrative Procedure Act
Jurisdiction U.S. Government Defendant
Disposition
County CASCADE
Terminated
Origin 1
Reopened
Lead Case
None
Related Case
None
Other Court Case None
Defendant Custody Status
  Entries (70) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 65 Filed: 2/4/2021, Entered: None Judgment - Clerk
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 64 Filed: 2/4/2021, Entered: None Order
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document 57 Filed: 7/30/2019, Entered: 7/30/2019 Order on motion to dismiss/lack of jurisdictionCourt Filing
      ORDER: Defendants' Motion to Dismiss [13] and Defendants' Motion to Dismiss [31] are DENIED. IT IS ORDERED that Plaintiffs' Motion for Summary Judgment [41] as to Count I of the Amended Complain is GRANTED. This Court holds unlawful and will set aside Revenue Procedure 2018-38 as adopted by the IRS. The IRS must follow the proper notice-and-comment procedures pursuant to the APA it if seeks to adopt a similar rule. Signed by Judge Brian Morris on 7/30/2019. (MMS)
        LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 63 Filed: 1/29/2021, Entered: None Notice of Substitution of Counsel - MT
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Blank 56 Filed: 6/5/2019, Entered: 6/5/2019 Motion HearingCourt Filing
          MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Judge Brian Morris: MOTION HEARING held 6/05/2019: Counsel Raphael Graybill, Daniel Wilf-Townsend, and Deepak Gupta appearing on behalf of Plaintiffs Bullock and Montana Department of Revenue; Counsel Glenn Moramarco appearing on behalf of Plaintiff State of New Jersey; and, Counsel Joseph Sergi, Laura Conner, and Landon Yost appearing on behalf of Federal Defendants. This hearing is with regard to Federal Defendants [13] and [31] Motions to Dismiss, and Plaintiffs [41] Motion for Summary Judgment. Court begins with Federal Defendants Motion to Dismiss. Counsel Sergi and Gupta w/argument. Court takes brief break; back on record at 3:14 p.m. Court turns to Plaintiffs Motion for Summary Judgment. Counsel Graybill and Counsel Sergi w/argument. Court takes motions under advisement. Hearing commenced at 1:30 p.m. and concluded at 3:55 p.m.. (Court Reporter Y. Heinze.) (Law Clerk: D. Frank and R. Douglas), (Hearing held in Charles Pray Courtroom, Great Falls, MT) (SLR)
            LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 62 Filed: 12/17/2020, Entered: None Notice of Substitution of Counsel - MT
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document 55 Filed: 6/3/2019, Entered: 6/3/2019 Notice - other
              NOTICE by Stephen C. Bullock, Montana Department of Revenue, State of New Jersey (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit Slip Opinion of Azar v. Allina Health Services et al.) (Gupta, Deepak)
                LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 61 Filed: 9/25/2020, Entered: None Status Report
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document 54 Filed: 5/22/2019, Entered: 5/22/2019 Reply to Response to motion
                  REPLY to Response to Motion re [41] MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by filed by Stephen C. Bullock, Montana Department of Revenue, State of New Jersey. (Gupta, Deepak)
                    LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 60 Filed: 9/16/2020, Entered: None Order
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Blank 53 Filed: 5/9/2019, Entered: 5/9/2019 Order Setting Hearing on MotionCourt Filing
                      TEXT ORDER Setting Hearing on Motion [41] MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by : IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the Motion Hearing is set for 6/5/2019 at 01:30 PM in Great Falls, MT before Judge Brian Morris. Signed by Judge Brian Morris on 5/9/2019. (SLL)
                        LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 5/8/2019, Entered: 5/8/2019 Statement of Disputed Facts
                        Statement of Disputed Facts re: [48] Statement of Undisputed Fact filed by Internal Revenue Service, David Kautter, Charles P. Rettig, United States Department of the Treasury. (Yost, Landon)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document 51 Filed: 5/8/2019, Entered: 5/8/2019 Reply to Response to motion
                          REPLY to Response to Motion re [31] Second MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and Failure to State a Claim , Combined with Response to Plaintiffs' Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Internal Revenue Service, David Kautter, Charles P. Rettig, United States Department of the Treasury. (Yost, Landon)
                            LREF
                            Blank 50 Filed: 4/25/2019, Entered: 4/25/2019 Order Setting Hearing on MotionCourt Filing
                            TEXT ORDER RESETTING Hearing on Motion [13] MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and Failure to State a Claim : IS RESET for 6/5/2019 at 01:30 PM in Great Falls, MT before Judge Brian Morris. Signed by Judge Brian Morris on 4/25/2019. (SLL)
                              LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 4/18/2019, Entered: 4/18/2019 notice of correction
                              Notice of Correction: re [43] Affidavit/Declaration,. The filing error relates to: Duplicate Filing. See the attached document for a brief description of the error made. (SLR)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 4/17/2019, Entered: 4/17/2019 Statement of Undisputed Fact
                                Statement of Undisputed Fact re: [41] MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by. (Gupta, Deepak)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 4/17/2019, Entered: 4/17/2019 Affidavit /Declaration
                                  AFFIDAVIT/DECLARATION of Gary Dallett re [41] MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by by Stephen C. Bullock, Montana Department of Revenue. (Gupta, Deepak) Modified on 4/18/2019 to add name of declarant. (SLR).
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 4/17/2019, Entered: 4/17/2019 Affidavit /Declaration
                                    AFFIDAVIT/DECLARATION of Paul R. Rodriguez re [41] MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by by Stephen C. Bullock, Montana Department of Revenue. (Gupta, Deepak) Modified on 4/18/2019 to add name of declarant. (SLR).
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 4/17/2019, Entered: 4/17/2019 Affidavit /Declaration
                                      AFFIDAVIT/DECLARATION of Gene Walborn re [41] MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by by Stephen C. Bullock, Montana Department of Revenue. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit Montana IRS Agreement) (Gupta, Deepak) Modified on 4/18/2019 to add name of declarant. (SLR).
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 4/17/2019, Entered: 4/17/2019 Affidavit /Declaration
                                        AFFIDAVIT/DECLARATION of Deepak Gupta re [41] MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by by Stephen C. Bullock, Montana Department of Revenue. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit Revenue Procedure 2018-38) (Gupta, Deepak) Modified on 4/18/2019 to add name of declarant. (SLR).
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 4/17/2019, Entered: 4/17/2019 Affidavit /Declaration
                                          DUPLICATE FILING with [44]. AFFIDAVIT/DECLARATION of Deepak Gupta re [41] MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by by Stephen C. Bullock, Montana Department of Revenue. (Gupta, Deepak) Modified on 4/18/2019 to add language at beginning of entry and name of declarant. (SLR).
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document 42 Filed: 4/17/2019, Entered: 4/17/2019 Response to motion
                                            COMBINED BRIEF IN SUPPORT OF [41] Motion for Summary Judgment and RESPONSE to [31] Second MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and Failure to State a Claim filed by Stephen C. Bullock, Montana Department of Revenue. (Gupta, Deepak) Modified on 4/18/2019 to clean up text. (SLR).
                                              LREF
                                              Legal Document 41 Filed: 4/17/2019, Entered: 4/17/2019, Terminated: 7/30/2019 Motion for summary judgment
                                              MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Deepak Gupta appearing for Plaintiffs Stephen C. Bullock, Montana Department of Revenue (Gupta, Deepak)
                                                LREF
                                                Blank 40 Filed: 4/10/2019, Entered: 4/10/2019 Order Setting Hearing on MotionCourt Filing
                                                TEXT ORDER Setting Hearing on Motion [31] Second MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and Failure to State a Claim and the expected Motion for Summary Judgment filed by the plaintiffs: Motion Hearing set for 6/5/2019 at 01:30 PM in Great Falls, MT before Judge Brian Morris. Signed by Judge Brian Morris on 4/10/2019. (SLL)
                                                  LREF
                                                  Blank 39 Filed: 4/10/2019, Entered: 4/10/2019 Status ConferenceCourt Filing
                                                  MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Judge Brian Morris: Status Conference held on 4/10/2019. (Law Clerk: D. Frank), (SLL)
                                                    LREF
                                                    Legal Document 38 Filed: 4/9/2019, Entered: 4/9/2019 Order SettingCourt Filing
                                                    Order Setting: Telephonic Scheduling Conference set for 4/10/2019 at 01:30 PM in Great Falls, MT before Judge Brian Morris. Signed by Judge Brian Morris on 4/9/2019. (ACC)
                                                      LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 4/1/2019, Entered: 4/1/2019 Notice of Acknowledgment of Pro Hac Vice Order
                                                      NOTICE of Acknowledgment of Pro Hac Vice Order by State of New Jersey (Moramarco, Glenn)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 3/29/2019, Entered: 3/29/2019 Notice of Acknowledgment of Pro Hac Vice Order
                                                        NOTICE of Acknowledgment of Pro Hac Vice Order by State of New Jersey (Gregory, Katherine)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 3/28/2019, Entered: 3/28/2019 Notice of Acknowledgment of Pro Hac Vice Order
                                                          NOTICE of Acknowledgment of Pro Hac Vice Order by Stephen C. Bullock, Montana Department of Revenue (Wessler, Matthew)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 3/28/2019, Entered: 3/28/2019 Notice of Acknowledgment of Pro Hac Vice Order
                                                            NOTICE of Acknowledgment of Pro Hac Vice Order by Stephen C. Bullock, Montana Department of Revenue (Wilf-Townsend, Daniel)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 3/28/2019, Entered: 3/28/2019 Notice of Acknowledgment of Pro Hac Vice Order
                                                              NOTICE of Acknowledgment of Pro Hac Vice Order by Stephen C. Bullock, Montana Department of Revenue (Gupta, Deepak)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document 32 Filed: 3/28/2019, Entered: 3/28/2019 BRIEF/MEMORANDUM in Support
                                                                Brief/Memorandum in Support re [31] Second MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and Failure to State a Claim filed by Internal Revenue Service, David Kautter, Charles P. Rettig, United States Department of the Treasury. (Attachments: # (1) Declaration of Phyllis Grimes, # (2) Exhibit 1, # (3) Exhibit 2, # (4) Exhibit 3, # (5) Exhibit 4, # (6) Exhibit 5, # (7) Exhibit 6, # (8) Exhibit 7, # (9) Exhibit 8) (Yost, Landon)
                                                                  LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 3/28/2019, Entered: 3/28/2019, Terminated: 7/30/2019 Motion to Dismiss
                                                                  Second MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and Failure to State a Claim Landon Monte Yost appearing for Defendants Internal Revenue Service, David Kautter, Charles P. Rettig, United States Department of the Treasury (Yost, Landon)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 3/28/2019, Entered: 3/28/2019 notice of correction
                                                                    Notice of Correction: re [29] Second MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and Failure to State a Claim. The filing error relates to: Chambers Request. See the attached document for a brief description of the error made. (SLR)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Blank  ***Set/Reset Deadlines
                                                                      Set/Reset Deadlines: Acknowledgment of PHV Order due by 4/4/2019, pursuant to Order [24]. (MMS)
                                                                        LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 3/27/2019, Entered: 3/27/2019, Terminated: 3/28/2019 Motion to Dismiss
                                                                        CORRECTLY FILED DOCUMENTS APPEAR AS [31] AND [32]. Second MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and Failure to State a Claim Landon Monte Yost appearing for Defendants Internal Revenue Service, David Kautter, Charles P. Rettig, United States Department of the Treasury (Attachments: # (1) Memorandum in Support, # (2) Declaration of Phyllis Grimes, # (3) Exhibit 1, # (4) Exhibit 2, # (5) Exhibit 3, # (6) Exhibit 4, # (7) Exhibit 5, # (8) Exhibit 6, # (9) Exhibit 7, # (10) Exhibit 8) (Yost, Landon) Modified on 3/28/2019 to add language at beginning of entry. (SLR).
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Blank 28 Filed: 3/25/2019, Entered: 3/25/2019 Remark
                                                                          Remark: Attorneys Mr. Moramarco and Ms. Gregory paid the Pro Have Vice Filing Fees. Receipt MTX400013489 $510.00. (MMS)
                                                                            LREF
                                                                            Blank 27 Filed: 3/21/2019, Entered: 3/21/2019 Remark
                                                                            Remark: Attorney Glenn Moramarco is now a registered user. (MMS)
                                                                              LREF
                                                                              Blank  Remark
                                                                              Remark: Attorney Katherine Gregory is now a registered user. (ACC)
                                                                                LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 3/20/2019, Entered: 3/20/2019 letter
                                                                                Letter from Tyler P. Gilman, Clerk of Court, to PHV Counsel Katherine Gregory re CM/ECF registration. Letter mailed to Counsel Gregory. (MMS)
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 3/20/2019, Entered: 3/20/2019 letter
                                                                                  Letter from Tyler P. Gilman, Clerk of Court, to PHV Counsel Glenn Moramarco re CM/ECF registration. Letter mailed to Counsel Moramarco. (MMS)
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document 24 Filed: 3/20/2019, Entered: 3/20/2019 Order on Motion for Leave to AppearCourt Filing
                                                                                    ORDER granting [15] Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Without Local Counsel. IT IS ALSO ORDERED that Mr. Moramarco and Ms. Gregory BOTH must pay the admission fee for Pro Hac Vice Admission to practice before this Court. Mr. Moramarco and Ms. Gegory shall file, within fifteen days from the date of this Order, an acknowledgment and acceptance of their admission under the terms set forth above. SEE ORDER FOR FULL DETAILS. Signed by Judge Brian Morris on 3/20/2019. (Copy of order mailed to counsel Moramarco and Gregory) (MMS)
                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                      Blank  Remark
                                                                                      Remark; PHV attorneys Deepak Gupta and Daniel Wilf-Townsend are now registered e-filers. (TLO)
                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 3/14/2019, Entered: 3/14/2019 letter
                                                                                        Letter from Tyler P. Gilman, Clerk of Court, to PHV Counsel Matthew Wessler re CM/ECF registration. Letter mailed to Counsel Wessler. (MMS)
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 3/14/2019, Entered: 3/14/2019 letter
                                                                                          Letter from Tyler P. Gilman, Clerk of Court, to PHV Counsel Daniel Wilf-Townsend re CM/ECF registration. Letter mailed to Counsel Wilf-Townsend. (MMS)
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 3/14/2019, Entered: 3/14/2019 letter
                                                                                            Letter from Tyler P. Gilman, Clerk of Court, to PHV Counsel Deepak Gupta re CM/ECF registration. Letter mailed to Counsel Gupta. (MMS)
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document 20 Filed: 3/14/2019, Entered: 3/14/2019 Order on Motion to appear pro hac viceCourt Filing
                                                                                              ORDER granting [17] Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Deepak Gupta ; granting [18] Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Daniel Wilf-Townsend ; granting [19] Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Matthew Wessler. Acknowledgment of PHV Order due by 3/29/2019. Signed by Judge Brian Morris on 3/14/2019. (copy of order mailed to counsel) (MMS)
                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 3/13/2019, Entered: 3/13/2019, Terminated: 3/14/2019 Motion to appear pro hac vice
                                                                                                MOTION Matthew Wessler to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 255 receipt number 0977-2277393.) Raphael Graybill appearing for Plaintiff Stephen C. Bullock (Graybill, Raphael)
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 3/13/2019, Entered: 3/13/2019, Terminated: 3/14/2019 Motion to appear pro hac vice
                                                                                                  MOTION Daniel Wilf-Townsend to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 255 receipt number 0977-2277392.) Raphael Graybill appearing for Plaintiff Stephen C. Bullock (Graybill, Raphael)
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 3/13/2019, Entered: 3/13/2019, Terminated: 3/14/2019 Motion to appear pro hac vice
                                                                                                    MOTION Deepak Gupta to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 255 receipt number 0977-2277391.) Raphael Graybill appearing for Plaintiff Stephen C. Bullock (Graybill, Raphael)
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 3/13/2019, Entered: 3/13/2019 Amended Complaint
                                                                                                      AMENDED COMPLAINT against Internal Revenue Service, David Kautter, United States Department of the Treasury, filed by Stephen C. Bullock, Montana Department of Revenue. (Graybill, Raphael)
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 3/13/2019, Entered: 3/13/2019, Terminated: 3/20/2019 Motion for Leave to Appear
                                                                                                        MOTION for the State of New Jersey to Proceed Without Local Counsel and for its Counsel to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Attachments: # (1) Declaration, # (2) Text of Proposed Order) (MMS)
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Blank 14 Filed: 3/11/2019, Entered: 3/11/2019 Order Setting Hearing on MotionCourt Filing
                                                                                                          TEXT ORDER Setting Hearing on Motion [13] MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and Failure to State a Claim : Motion Hearing set for 4/30/2019 at 01:30 PM in Great Falls, MT before Judge Brian Morris. Signed by Judge Brian Morris on 3/11/2019. (SLL)
                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                            Blank  Remark
                                                                                                            Remark: With regard to [13] Motion to Dismiss, Counsel is reminded that pursuant to L.R. 7.1(d)(1)(A), "... Briefs in support of a motion must be filed separately from the motion". Counsel is also requested to review L.R. 7.1(c)(1). This remark is for future reference; the documents do not need to be refiled. Thank you. (SLR)
                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 2/20/2019, Entered: 2/20/2019, Terminated: 7/30/2019 Motion to Dismiss
                                                                                                              MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and Failure to State a Claim Landon Monte Yost appearing for Defendants Internal Revenue Service, David Kautter, United States Department of the Treasury (Attachments: # (1) Declaration of Phyllis Grimes, # (2) Exhibit 1, # (3) Exhibit 2, # (4) Exhibit 3, # (5) Exhibit 4) (Yost, Landon)
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 2/13/2019, Entered: 2/13/2019 order on motion for miscellaneous reliefCourt Filing
                                                                                                                ORDER granting [11] Motion to Reset Time to Respond to Complaint Following Lapse in Appropriations. The Court hereby GRANTS this motion and ORDERS that the deadline for defendants to respond to the Complaint is reset for February 20, 2019. Signed by Judge Brian Morris on 2/13/2019. (SLR)
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Blank  ***Set/Reset Deadlines
                                                                                                                  Set/Reset Deadlines: All Defendants - answer to Complaint ddl 2/20/19. (SLR)
                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 1/31/2019, Entered: 1/31/2019, Terminated: 2/13/2019 motion for miscellaneous relief
                                                                                                                    MOTION to Reset Time to Respond to Complaint following Lapse in Appropriations Landon Monte Yost appearing for Defendants Internal Revenue Service, David Kautter, United States Department of the Treasury (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order) (Yost, Landon)
                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 1/8/2019, Entered: 1/8/2019 Order on Motion for extension of time to answerCourt Filing
                                                                                                                      ORDER: For good cause shown, the Court hereby GRANTS [9] motion for extension of time to answer and ORDERS that counsel for the defendants will notify the Court as soon as Congress has appropriated funds for the Department. At that point, all current deadlines for the parties will be extended commensurate with the duration of the lapse in appropriations. Signed by Judge Brian Morris on 1/8/2019. (ACC)
                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 1/4/2019, Entered: 1/4/2019, Terminated: 1/8/2019 motion for extension of time to file answer
                                                                                                                        MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer Landon Monte Yost appearing for Defendants Internal Revenue Service, David Kautter, United States Department of the Treasury (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order) (Yost, Landon)
                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 10/22/2018, Entered: 10/22/2018 Order on Motion for extension of time to answerCourt Filing
                                                                                                                          ORDER granting [7] Motion for Extension of Time to Answer All Defendants. The deadline for all the defendants to serve their response is January 14, 2019. Signed by Judge Brian Morris on 10/22/2018. (MMS)
                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 10/19/2018, Entered: 10/19/2018, Terminated: 10/22/2018 motion for extension of time to file answer
                                                                                                                            Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer Landon Monte Yost appearing for Defendants Internal Revenue Service, David Kautter, United States Department of the Treasury (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order) (Yost, Landon)
                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 9/27/2018, Entered: 9/27/2018 Affidavit of Service
                                                                                                                              AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and Complaint served on Department of Treasury on September 17, 2018, filed by Stephen C. Bullock. (Graybill, Raphael)
                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 9/27/2018, Entered: 9/27/2018 Affidavit of Service
                                                                                                                                AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and Complaint served on David Kautter on August 23, 2018, filed by Stephen C. Bullock. (Graybill, Raphael)
                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 9/27/2018, Entered: 9/27/2018 Affidavit of Service
                                                                                                                                  AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and Complaint served on Internal Revenue Service on August 23, 2018, filed by Stephen C. Bullock. (Graybill, Raphael)
                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                    Blank  ***Set/Reset Deadlines
                                                                                                                                    Set Deadlines: Internal Revenue Service answer due 10/22/2018; David Kautter answer due 10/22/2018; United States Department of the Treasury answer due 11/16/2018. (SLR)
                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 7/24/2018, Entered: 7/24/2018 Notice of change of address
                                                                                                                                      NOTICE of Change of Address by Raphael Graybill (Graybill, Raphael)
                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 7/24/2018, Entered: 7/24/2018 Summons Issued as to USA
                                                                                                                                        Summonses Issued as to Internal Revenue Service, David Kautter, United States Department of the Treasury (Attachments: # (1) Summons Issued Kautter, # (2) Summons Issued U.S. Department of Treasury) originals mailed to counsel Graybill and Bullock (TLO)
                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 1 Filed: 7/24/2018, Entered: 7/24/2018 Complaint
                                                                                                                                          COMPLAINT against Internal Revenue Service, David Kautter, United States Department of the Treasury, filed by Stephen C. Bullock, Montana Department of Revenue. (Attachments: # (1) Civil Cover Sheet, # (2) Summons IRS, # (3) Summons Kautter, # (4) Summons U.S. Department of the Treasury) (TLO)
                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                            Blank  Filing Fee Received
                                                                                                                                            Filing fee: $400, receipt number 0977-2168511 (TLO)
                                                                                                                                              LREF

                                                                                                                                              Statistics

                                                                                                                                              This case has been viewed 25 times.

                                                                                                                                              No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                              Space
                                                                                                                                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                               
                                                                                                                                              PlainSite
                                                                                                                                              Sign Up
                                                                                                                                              Need Password Help?