HASSEY v. SILVER EAGLE MANUFAC
Federal Civil Lawsuit New Jersey District Court, Case No. 1:98-cv-02604-SMO

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo HARRY R. HASSEY, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space GLEN L. SCHEMANSKI +1 856 795 6360
v.
No Logo Silver Eagle Manufacturing Company, Defendant
Officially listed as "SILVER EAGLE MANUFACTURING CO."

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space WILLIAM A. GARRIGLE +1 856 427 9300 garrigle@aol.com
Office Camden
Filed 6/3/1998
Jury Demand Both
Demand $0
Nature of Suit 365 - Personal Injury: Product Liability
Cause Section 28 U.S.C. § 1332 Diversity-Product Liability
Jurisdiction Diversity
Disposition Judgment - Jury Verdict
County Monmouth
Terminated 12/21/2001
Origin 4
Reopened 11/29/1999
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flags 12BJ, CLKSNOTE, CLOSED, PRETRL
  Entries (56) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 40 Filed: 12/21/2001, Entered: 12/21/2001 Judgment*Court Filing
JUDGMENT OF GENERAL VERDICT of no cause for action for deft. SILVER EAGLE MANUFACTURING CO. against pltf. HARRY R. HASSEY. (signed by Judge Stephen M. Orlofsky) (NM) (ar1)
    LREF
    Blank -- Filed: 12/21/2001, Entered: 12/21/2001 Terminated Case
    Case closed (ar1)
      LREF
      Blank 39 Filed: 12/20/2001, Entered: 12/21/2001 Jury Verdict
      JURY VERDICT SHEET filed. (ar1)
        LREF
        Blank 38 Filed: 12/20/2001, Entered: 12/21/2001 Minutes-MiscellaneousCourt Filing
        Minute entry: Proceedings recorded by Ct-Reporter: Ted Formaroli; Minutes of: 12/20/01; The following actions were taken, Trial with jury continued before the Hon. Stephen M. Orlofsky. Out of the presence of the jury. Charge conference continued. Jury returns. Charge by the Court. Jury retires to deliberate at 1:30pm. Jury returns with a verdict at 2:30pm. VERDICT: No cause for action in favor of deft. and against pltf. Order to be submitted. Ordered trial with jury concluded. By Judge Stephen M. Orlofsky (ar1)
          LREF
          Blank -- Filed: 12/20/2001, Entered: 12/21/2001 Jury Trial Held
          Trial with jury concluded (ar1)
            LREF
            Blank 37 Filed: 12/19/2001, Entered: 12/19/2001 Minutes-MiscellaneousCourt Filing
            Minute entry: Proceedings recorded by Ct-Reporter: Ted Formaroli; Minutes of: 12/19/01; The following actions were taken, Trial with jury continued before the Hon. Stephen M. Orlofsky. Defendant Rests. Both Sides Rest. Ordered trial with jury adjourned until December 20, 2001 at 9:30am. Out of the presence of the jury. Charge Conference held. By Judge Stephen M. Orlofsky (ar1)
              LREF
              Blank -- Filed: 12/19/2001, Entered: 12/19/2001 Jury Trial Held
              Trial with jury continued. (ar1)
                LREF
                Blank 36 Filed: 12/18/2001, Entered: 12/18/2001 Minutes-MiscellaneousCourt Filing
                Minute entry: Proceedings recorded by Ct-Reporter: Ted Formaroli; Minutes of: 12/18/01; The following actions were taken, Trial with jury continued before the Hon. Stephen M. Orlofsky. Ordered trial with jury adjourned until December 19, 2001 at 9:30am. By Judge Stephen M. Orlofsky (ar1) Modified on 12/18/2001
                  LREF
                  Blank -- Filed: 12/18/2001, Entered: 12/18/2001 Jury Trial Held
                  Trial with jury continued. (ar1)
                    LREF
                    Blank 35 Filed: 12/17/2001, Entered: 12/18/2001 Minutes-MiscellaneousCourt Filing
                    Minute entry: Proceedings recorded by Ct-Reporter: Ted Formaroli; Minutes of: 12/17/01; The following actions were taken, Trial with jury continued before the Hon. Stephen M. Orlofsky. Requests for admissions read to the jury by pltf. Certain portions of depositions read to the jury. Stipulation between the parties read to the jury. Plaintiff Rests. Out of the presence of the jury. Hrg. on oral appl. by deft. for judgment as a matter of law. Oral opinion read into the record. Ordered appl. denied. Jury returns. Ordered trial with jury continued until December 18, 2001 at 9:30a.m. By Judge Stephen M. Orlofsky (ar1)
                      LREF
                      Blank -- Filed: 12/17/2001, Entered: 12/18/2001 Jury Trial Held
                      Trial with jury continued. (ar1)
                        LREF
                        Blank 34 Filed: 12/12/2001, Entered: 12/12/2001 Minutes-MiscellaneousCourt Filing
                        Minute entry: Proceedings recorded by Ct-Reporter: Ted Formaroli; Minutes of: 12/12/01; The following actions were taken, Trial with jury continued before the Hon. Stephen M. Orlofsky. Out of the presence of the jury. Continued hrg. on appl. of deft. to exclude introduction of certain evidence. Ordered appl. denied. Jury returns. Out of the presence of the jury. Hrg. on appl. by deft. to preclude certain witness testimony. Oral Opinion read into the record. Ordered appl. granted. Ordered jury excused at 3:00pm. Ordered trial with jury continued until December 17, 2001 at 9:30am. By Judge Stephen M. Orlofsky (ar1)
                          LREF
                          Blank -- Filed: 12/12/2001, Entered: 12/12/2001 Jury Trial Held
                          Trial with jury continued. (ar1)
                            LREF
                            Blank 33 Filed: 12/11/2001, Entered: 12/12/2001 Minutes-MiscellaneousCourt Filing
                            Minute entry: Proceedings recorded by Ct-Reporter: Ted Formaroli; Minutes of: 12/11/01; The following actions were taken, Trial with jury continued before the Hon. Stephen M. Orlofsky. Out of the presence of the jury. Hrg. on application by deft. to preclude introduction of certain evidence. Ordered decision reserved. Jury returns. Hrg. on application by deft. to strike testimony of certain witness. Sidebar Conference held. Ordered appl. denied. Ordered trial with jury continued until December 12, 2001 at 9:30am. By Judge Stephen M. Orlofsky (ar1)
                              LREF
                              Blank -- Filed: 12/11/2001, Entered: 12/12/2001 Jury Trial Held
                              Trial with jury continued. (ar1)
                                LREF
                                Blank 32 Filed: 12/10/2001, Entered: 12/11/2001 Minutes-MiscellaneousCourt Filing
                                Minute entry: Proceedings recorded by Ct-Reporter: Ted Formaroli; Minutes of: 12/10/01; The following actions were taken, Pre-trial conference held. Trial with jury commenced before the Hon. Stephen M. Orlofsky. Hrg. on pltf's in limine motions. Ordered motions granted in part and denied in part. Ordered jury panel sworn. Preliminary Charge by the Court. Ordered jury excused at 4:30pm. Ordered trial with jury continued until December 11, 2001 at 9:30am. By Judge Stephen M. Orlofsky (ar1)
                                  LREF
                                  Blank -- Filed: 12/10/2001, Entered: 12/11/2001 Jury Trial Held
                                  Trial with jury begun. (ar1)
                                    LREF
                                    Blank 31 Filed: 10/19/2001, Entered: 10/22/2001 Proposed Jury Instructions
                                    Proposed Jury instructions by HARRY R. HASSEY. (ar1)
                                      LREF
                                      Blank 30 Filed: 10/19/2001, Entered: 10/22/2001 Motion in Limine
                                      Notice of MOTION in limine to read to the jury certain admissions by pltf. HARRY R. HASSEY, Motion set for 11/16/01 on [30-1] motion . (Trial Brief/PO Submitted, etc.) (Certificate of Service Annexed) (ar1)
                                        LREF
                                        Blank 29 Filed: 8/23/2001, Entered: 8/23/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                        ORDER that defense counsel within ten (10) days of the completion of Wilder's testimony, pay him for each hour ( or portion thereof) spent testifying at deposition, the sum of $300. (signed by Mag. Judge Robert B. Kugler)(NM) (er)
                                          LREF
                                          Blank 28 Filed: 7/19/2001, Entered: 7/26/2001 Pretrial OrderCourt Filing
                                          JOINT FINAL PRETRIAL ORDER filed. (signed by Mag. Judge Robert B. Kugler) (NM) (ar1)
                                            LREF
                                            Blank 27 Filed: 3/1/2001, Entered: 3/6/2001 Scheduling OrderCourt Filing
                                            AMENDED SCHEDULING ORDER setting Pretrial conference 3:00 7/19/01. n.m. ( signed by Mag. Judge Robert B. Kugler ) (ar1)
                                              LREF
                                              Blank 26 Filed: 1/17/2001, Entered: 1/17/2001 Scheduling OrderCourt Filing
                                              AMENDED SCHEDULING ORDER setting Pretrial conference 3:30 5/16/01. n.m. ( signed by Mag. Judge Robert B. Kugler ) (ar1)
                                                LREF
                                                Blank -- Filed: 11/28/2000, Entered: 11/28/2000 Status Conference
                                                Status conference held before Mag. Judge Robert B. Kugler on 11/27/00. (ar1)
                                                  LREF
                                                  Blank 25 Filed: 11/27/2000, Entered: 11/27/2000 Letter
                                                  LETTER By plaintiff's counsel for HARRY R. HASSEY; Re: Change of Address. (ar1)
                                                    LREF
                                                    Blank 24 Filed: 11/8/2000, Entered: 11/9/2000 Scheduling OrderCourt Filing
                                                    SCHEDULING ORDER setting Discovery cutoff 12/29/00 ; Pretrial conference 3:00 4/4/01. n.m. ( signed by Mag. Judge Robert B. Kugler ) (ar1)
                                                      LREF
                                                      Blank -- Filed: 11/6/2000, Entered: 11/6/2000 Scheduling Conference
                                                      Scheduling conference held before Mag. Judge Joel B. Rosen on 10/31/00. (ar1)
                                                        LREF
                                                        Blank 23 Filed: 9/26/2000, Entered: 9/26/2000 OrderCourt Filing
                                                        ORDER, setting scheduling conference for 11:30 10/31/00. n.m. signed by Mag. Judge Robert B. Kugler ) (ar1)
                                                          LREF
                                                          Blank 22 Filed: 9/26/2000, Entered: 9/26/2000, Terminated: 12/21/2001 Case Assigned/ReassignedCourt Filing
                                                          NOTICE of Allocation and Assignment filed. Magistrate Judge ROBERT B. KUGLER (ar1)
                                                            LREF
                                                            Blank 21 Filed: 9/7/2000, Entered: 9/14/2000 OrderCourt Filing
                                                            ORDER granting Silver Eagle's unopposed [20-1] motion for change of venue from Newark to Camden ( signed by Chief Judge Anne E. Thompson ) n/m (ar)
                                                              LREF
                                                              Blank 20 Filed: 7/10/2000, Entered: 7/12/2000, Terminated: 9/7/2000 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
                                                              Notice of MOTION for change of venue from Newark to Camden by SILVER EAGLE MANUFAC, Motion set for 9/11/00 on [20-1] motion w/Cert of William A. Garrigle in support w/brief and cert of svc. (PO Subm) (ar)
                                                                LREF
                                                                Blank -- Filed: 5/2/2000, Entered: 5/2/2000 Case No Longer Referred to Arbitration
                                                                CASE WITHDRAWN from Arbitration. (cc)
                                                                  LREF
                                                                  Blank 19 Filed: 2/16/2000, Entered: 2/16/2000 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                  ORDER GRANTING pla's motion to admit Andrew F. Mimnaugh pro hac vice etc. ( signed by Mag. Judge G. D. Haneke ) n/m (ar)
                                                                    LREF
                                                                    Blank 18 Filed: 2/14/2000, Entered: 2/16/2000 Minutes-MiscellaneousCourt Filing
                                                                    Minute entry: Proceedings recorded by Ct-Reporter: none; Minutes of: 2/14/00; The following actions were taken, [15-1] motion for Glen L. Schemanski, Esq. to appear pro hac vice taken under advisement - RULE 78. By Mag. Judge G. D. Haneke (ar)
                                                                      LREF
                                                                      Blank 17 Filed: 1/31/2000, Entered: 2/1/2000 Answer to Amended Complaint
                                                                      ANSWER by SILVER EAGLE MANUFAC to amended complaint; jury demand (ar)
                                                                        LREF
                                                                        Blank 16 Filed: 1/7/2000, Entered: 1/10/2000 Certificate Of Service.
                                                                        CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of pla's Motion to admit Andrew F. Mimnaugh pro hac vice. by HARRY R. HASSEY (ar)
                                                                          LREF
                                                                          Blank 15 Filed: 12/30/1999, Entered: 1/4/2000 Motion for Limited Admission
                                                                          Notice of MOTION for Glen L. Schemanski, Esq. to appear pro hac vice by HARRY R. HASSEY, Motion set for 2/14/00 on [15-1] motion CILB, w/evidence of service. (sr)
                                                                            LREF
                                                                            Blank 14 Filed: 12/27/1999, Entered: 12/28/1999 Amended Complaint
                                                                            AMENDED COMPLAINT by HARRY R. HASSEY , amending [1-1] complaint w/cert svc. (ar)
                                                                              LREF
                                                                              Blank 13 Filed: 11/30/1999, Entered: 12/1/1999 Scheduling OrderCourt Filing
                                                                              AMD PRETRIAL SCHEDULING ORDER setting Discovery cutoff 5/30/00 ; Status conference 4:00 5/31/00 ; Settlement conference 4:00 5/31/00 ; ( signed by Judge Joseph A. Greenaway, Jr. ) (ar)
                                                                                LREF
                                                                                Blank -- Filed: 11/30/1999, Entered: 11/30/1999 Set/Reset Deadlines:
                                                                                Deadline updated; reset scheduling order deadlines: Discovery deadline on 5/30/00 Settlement conference 4:00 5/31/00 ; (ar)
                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                  Blank 12 Filed: 11/29/1999, Entered: 11/30/1999 Minutes-MiscellaneousCourt Filing
                                                                                  Minute entry: Proceedings recorded by Ct-Reporter: none; Minutes of: 11/23/99; The following actions were taken: SCHEDULING CONFERENCE Fact & Expert Discovery 5/30/00; Settlement conference set for 5/31/00 at 4:00 pm By Judge Joseph A. Greenaway, Jr. (ar)
                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                    Blank -- Filed: 11/29/1999, Entered: 11/29/1999 Case Reopened
                                                                                    Case reopened (ar)
                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                      Blank 11 Filed: 11/24/1999, Entered: 11/29/1999 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                      ORDER GRANTING pla's appeal from Magistrate Haneke's Order etc.; GRANTING pla leave to file amended complaint w/in (30) days; VACATING 6/15/98 Order dismissing complaint( signed by Judge Joseph A. Greenaway, Jr. ) n/m (ar)
                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                        Blank 10 Filed: 1/11/1999, Entered: 1/12/1999 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                        LETTER ORDER GRANTING deft's application for ext of time to respond to pla's appeal from mag order w/consent etc ( signed by Judge Joseph A. Greenaway, Jr. ) (ar) Modified on 11/29/1999
                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                          Blank 9 Filed: 12/2/1998, Entered: 12/2/1998, Terminated: 12/21/2001 Appeal of Magistrate Judge Decision to District Co
                                                                                          NOTICE of APPEAL by HARRY R. HASSEY of Magistrate decision to District Court RE: [8-1] order Hearing on magistrate appeal set for 12/28/98 (ar)
                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                            Blank 8 Filed: 11/19/1998, Entered: 11/20/1998 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                            ORDER denying reconsideration of order of 11/27/98 order denying a motion to vacate and amend ( signed by Mag. Judge G. D. Haneke ) (DD)
                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                              Blank 7 Filed: 10/27/1998, Entered: 10/28/1998 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                              ORDER denying [4-1] motion to vacate [3-1] order dismissing cmp for lack of jurisdiction etc. ( signed by Mag. Judge G. D. Haneke ) n/m (ar)
                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                Blank 6 Filed: 10/26/1998, Entered: 10/27/1998 Minutes-MiscellaneousCourt Filing
                                                                                                Minute entry: Proceedings recorded by Ct-Reporter: none; Minutes of: 10/26/98; The following actions were taken, [4-1] motion to vacate [3-1] order dismissing cmp for lack of jurisdiction etc. taken under advisement RULE 78. By Mag. Judge G. D. Haneke (ar)
                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                  Blank 5 Filed: 10/14/1998, Entered: 10/15/1998 Letter
                                                                                                  LETTER from out of state counsel re change of address: Andrew F. Mimnaugh, Esq. 2430 Aspen Street, Philadelphia, PA 19130 - (215)765-0379 Fax (609)822-3626 By HARRY R. HASSEY (ar)
                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                    Blank 4 Filed: 6/22/1998, Entered: 6/23/1998, Terminated: 10/27/1998 Motion to Vacate
                                                                                                    Notice of MOTION to vacate [3-1] order dismissing cmp for lack of jurisdiction etc. by HARRY R. HASSEY, Motion hearing set for 7/27/98 on [4-1] motion w/cert of svc. (Brief/PO Subm) (ar)
                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                      Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                      Blank -- Filed: 6/16/1998, Entered: 6/16/1998 Terminated Case
                                                                                                      Case closed (cs)
                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                        Blank 3 Filed: 6/15/1998, Entered: 6/16/1998 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                        ORDER, dismissing cmp for lack of jurisdiction ( signed by Judge Joseph A. Greenaway, Jr. ) n/m (cs)
                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                          Blank -- Filed: 6/11/1998, Entered: 6/11/1998 Summons Issued
                                                                                                          SUMMONS(ES) issued for SILVER EAGLE MANUFAC ( 20 Days) (Counsel Pickup) (ar)
                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                            Blank 2 Filed: 6/3/1998, Entered: 6/5/1998 Case Assigned/ReassignedCourt Filing
                                                                                                            NOTICE of Allocation and Assignment filed. Magistrate Judge G. DONALD HANEKE (dr)
                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                              Blank 1 Filed: 6/3/1998, Entered: 6/5/1998 Complaint
                                                                                                              COMPLAINT filed; jury demand FILING FEE $ 150.00 RECEIPT # 251951 (dr)
                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                Blank -- Filed: 6/3/1998, Entered: 6/5/1998 Case Referred to Arbitration
                                                                                                                CASE REFERRED to arbitration (dr)
                                                                                                                  LREF

                                                                                                                  Statistics

                                                                                                                  This case has been viewed 41 times.

                                                                                                                  No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                  Space
                                                                                                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                   
                                                                                                                  PlainSite
                                                                                                                  Sign Up
                                                                                                                  Need Password Help?