STEVENSON v. AMERICAN ANGLIAN
Federal Civil Lawsuit New Jersey District Court, Case No. 1:98-cv-02784-JEI

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Space Space

No Logo CLIFTON STEVENSON, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by BOCHETTO AND LENTZ, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space GAVIN P. LENTZ +1 856 722 9595 +1 215 735 2455 glentz@bochettoandlentz.com
v.
No Logo AMERICAN ANGLIAN ENVIRONMENTAL TECHNOLOGIES, INC., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Dechert LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space MATTHEW V. DELDUCA +1 609 620 3200 mdelduca@dechert.com
Office Camden
Filed 6/12/1998
Jury Demand Plaintiff
Demand $0
Nature of Suit 190 - Contract: Other Contract Actions
Cause Section 28 U.S.C. § 1332 Diversity-Insurance Contract
Jurisdiction Diversity
Disposition Dismissed - Settled
County Camden
Terminated 8/19/1999
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flags 12BJ, CLOSED, PRETRL
  Entries (35) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 26 Filed: 8/24/1999, Entered: 8/24/1999 Stipulation of Dismissal
STIPULATION of dismissal with prejudice (jm1)
    LREF
    Blank 25 Filed: 8/19/1999, Entered: 8/19/1999 OrderCourt Filing
    ORDER, dismissing matter as settled without cost and without prejudice ( signed by Judge Joseph E. Irenas ) (jm1)
      LREF
      Blank -- Filed: 8/19/1999, Entered: 8/19/1999 Terminated Case
      Case closed (jm1)
        LREF
        Blank -- Filed: 7/28/1999, Entered: 7/28/1999 Jury Trial Held
        Trial with jury set at 9:00 9/20/99 (dv)
          LREF
          Blank -- Filed: 7/21/1999, Entered: 7/21/1999 Pretrial Conference - Initial
          Final Pre-trial conference held before Mag. Judge Robert B. Kugler on July 13, 1999. (jm1)
            LREF
            Blank 24 Filed: 7/16/1999, Entered: 7/20/1999 Pretrial OrderCourt Filing
            JOINT FINAL PRETRIAL ORDER filed ( signed by Mag. Judge Robert B. Kugler ) (jm1)
              LREF
              Blank 23 Filed: 6/22/1999, Entered: 6/24/1999 OrderCourt Filing
              ORDER denying [16-1] motion for summary judgment ( signed by Judge Joseph E. Irenas ) (jm1)
                LREF
                Blank 22 Filed: 6/22/1999, Entered: 6/24/1999 OrderCourt Filing
                OPINION ( signed by Judge Joseph E. Irenas ) (jm1)
                  LREF
                  Blank 21 Filed: 6/22/1999, Entered: 6/24/1999 Minutes-MiscellaneousCourt Filing
                  Minute entry: Proceedings recorded by ; Minutes of: 6.22.99; The following actions were taken, denying [16-1] motion for summary judgment; and terminating [16-2] hearing Motion set for 6/4/99 on [16-1] motion By Judge Joseph E. Irenas (jm1)
                    LREF
                    Blank -- Filed: 6/18/1999, Entered: 6/18/1999 Motion Hearing
                    Motion hearing re: [16-1] motion for summary judgment at 7/2/99 (dv)
                      LREF
                      Blank -- Filed: 6/4/1999, Entered: 6/4/1999 Motion Hearing
                      Motion hearing re: [16-1] motion for summary judgment at 6/18/99 (dv)
                        LREF
                        Blank 20 Filed: 5/3/1999, Entered: 5/3/1999 Certification
                        CERTIFICATION of DAVID ZATUCHNI, ESQ. on behalf of AMERICAN ANGLIAN Re: [16-1] motion for summary judgment (jm1)
                          LREF
                          Blank 19 Filed: 5/3/1999, Entered: 5/3/1999 Certification
                          CERTIFICATION of BILL DOUGLASS on behalf of AMERICAN ANGLIAN Re: [16-1] motion for summary judgment (jm1)
                            LREF
                            Blank 18 Filed: 5/3/1999, Entered: 5/3/1999 Certification
                            CERTIFICATION of WILLARD S. DETWEILER on behalf of AMERICAN ANGLIAN Re: [16-1] motion for summary judgment (jm1)
                              LREF
                              Blank 17 Filed: 5/3/1999, Entered: 5/3/1999 Miscellaneous Document
                              STATEMENT of Material Uncontested Facts by AMERICAN ANGLIAN (jm1)
                                LREF
                                Blank 16 Filed: 5/3/1999, Entered: 5/3/1999, Terminated: 6/22/1999 Motion for Summary Judgment
                                Notice of MOTION for summary judgment by AMERICAN ANGLIAN, Motion set for 6/4/99 on [16-1] motion . (All Brief(s)/PO Subm) ORAL ARGUMENT REQUESTED (jm1)
                                  LREF
                                  Blank 15 Filed: 4/6/1999, Entered: 4/12/1999 ~Notice (other)
                                  Notice of Intent to submit a Dispositive motion by AMERICAN ANGLIAN (jm1)
                                    LREF
                                    Blank 14 Filed: 4/1/1999, Entered: 4/6/1999 OrderCourt Filing
                                    ORDER, that plaintiff shall be made available for telephone deposition within 10 days of the date of this Order, etc. ( signed by Judge Joseph E. Irenas ) (jm1)
                                      LREF
                                      Blank -- Filed: 3/5/1999, Entered: 3/5/1999 Case No Longer Referred to Arbitration
                                      CASE WITHDRAWN from Arbitration. (Per Judge Irenas) (AC)
                                        LREF
                                        Blank 13 Filed: 3/4/1999, Entered: 3/8/1999 Scheduling OrderCourt Filing
                                        FIRST AMENDED SCHEDULING ORDER setting Pretrial conference 6/3/99 ; Pretrial order to be submitted on or before 2:45 6/3/99 ; Dispositive Motion due on or before 4/5/99 ( signed by Judge Joseph E. Irenas ) (jm1)
                                          LREF
                                          Blank 12 Filed: 12/21/1998, Entered: 12/21/1998 Scheduling OrderCourt Filing
                                          SCHEDULING ORDER setting Status conference 4:30 2/25/99 ; ( signed by Judge Joseph E. Irenas ) (jm1)
                                            LREF
                                            Blank 11 Filed: 9/15/1998, Entered: 9/16/1998 OrderCourt Filing
                                            ORDER granting [6-1] motion for JEROME A. HOFFMAN, ESQ. to appear pro hac vice ( signed by Mag. Judge Robert B. Kugler ) (jm1)
                                              LREF
                                              Blank 10 Filed: 9/15/1998, Entered: 9/16/1998 Minutes-MiscellaneousCourt Filing
                                              Minute entry: Proceedings recorded by ; Minutes of: 8.15.98; The following actions were taken, granting [6-1] motion for JEROME A. HOFFMAN, ESQ. to appear pro hac vice; and terminating [6-2] hearing Motion set for 9/18/98 on [6-1] motion By Mag. Judge Robert B. Kugler (jm1)
                                                LREF
                                                Blank 9 Filed: 9/11/1998, Entered: 9/14/1998 Scheduling OrderCourt Filing
                                                SCHEDULING ORDER setting Discovery cutoff 12/31/98 ; ( signed by Mag. Judge Robert B. Kugler ) (jm1)
                                                  LREF
                                                  Blank -- Filed: 9/10/1998, Entered: 9/10/1998 Scheduling Conference
                                                  Scheduling conference held before Mag. Judge Robert B. Kugler on September 8, 1998. (jm1)
                                                    LREF
                                                    Blank 8 Filed: 8/21/1998, Entered: 8/24/1998 Affidavit
                                                    AFFIDAVIT of MATTHEW V. DELDUCA, ESQ. on behalf of AMERICAN ANGLIAN Re: [6-1] motion for JEROME A. HOFFMAN, ESQ. to appear pro hac vice (jm1)
                                                      LREF
                                                      Blank 7 Filed: 8/21/1998, Entered: 8/24/1998 Certification
                                                      CERTIFICATION of JEROME A. HOFFMAN, ESQ. on behalf of AMERICAN ANGLIAN Re: [6-1] motion for JEROME A. HOFFMAN, ESQ. to appear pro hac vice (jm1)
                                                        LREF
                                                        Blank 6 Filed: 8/21/1998, Entered: 8/24/1998, Terminated: 9/15/1998 Motion for Limited AdmissionCourt Filing
                                                        Notice of MOTION for JEROME A. HOFFMAN, ESQ. to appear pro hac vice by AMERICAN ANGLIAN [6-1] motion referred to Mag. Judge Robert B. Kugler, Motion set for 9/18/98 on [6-1] motion . (PO Subm) (jm1)
                                                          LREF
                                                          Blank 5 Filed: 8/3/1998, Entered: 8/3/1998 OrderCourt Filing
                                                          ORDER, setting scheduling conference for 12:00 9/1/98 ( signed by Mag. Judge Robert B. Kugler ) (jm1)
                                                            LREF
                                                            Blank 4 Filed: 8/3/1998, Entered: 8/3/1998, Terminated: 8/19/1999 Answer
                                                            ANSWER to Complaint by AMERICAN ANGLIAN (jm1)
                                                              LREF
                                                              Blank 3 Filed: 7/10/1998, Entered: 7/10/1998 Application and Clerk's Order to extend time to an
                                                              APPLICATION by AMERICAN ANGLIAN and Clerk's Order extending time to answer. Answer due 7/28/98 for AMERICAN ANGLIAN (jm1)
                                                                LREF
                                                                Blank 2 Filed: 6/16/1998, Entered: 6/16/1998 Case Assigned/ReassignedCourt Filing
                                                                NOTICE of Allocation and Assignment filed. Magistrate Judge ROBERT B. KUGLER (et)
                                                                  LREF
                                                                  Blank -- Filed: 6/16/1998, Entered: 6/16/1998 Case Referred to Arbitration
                                                                  CASE REFERRED to arbitration (et)
                                                                    LREF
                                                                    Blank -- Filed: 6/16/1998, Entered: 6/16/1998 Summons Issued
                                                                    SUMMONS(ES) issued for AMERICAN ANGLIAN ( 20 Days) (Mailed to Counsel) (et)
                                                                      LREF
                                                                      Blank 1 Filed: 6/12/1998, Entered: 6/16/1998 Complaint
                                                                      COMPLAINT filed; jury demand FILING FEE $ 150.00 RECEIPT # 245378 (et)
                                                                        LREF

                                                                        Statistics

                                                                        This case has been viewed 45 times.

                                                                        No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                        Space
                                                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                         
                                                                        PlainSite
                                                                        Sign Up
                                                                        Need Password Help?