J & J SNACK FOODS v. BISCOMERICA CORP.
Federal Civil Lawsuit New Jersey District Court, Case No. 1:98-cv-04565-JBS

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo J & J Snack Foods Corporation, 6000 Central Highway, Plaintiff
Officially listed as "J & J SNACK FOODS CORP."

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space CARLO SCARAMELLA +1 856 914 0114 lawofcs@comcast.net
v.
No Logo BISCOMERICA CORP., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space WILLIAM A. GARRIGLE +1 856 427 9300 garrigle@aol.com
Office Camden
Filed 10/1/1998
Jury Demand Both
Demand $0
Nature of Suit 840 - Property Rights: Trademark
Cause Section 15 U.S.C. § 1051 Trademark Infringement
Jurisdiction Federal Question
Disposition Dismissed - Settled
County Camden
Terminated 11/30/1999
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flags 12BG, CLOSED, SCHEDO
  Entries (26) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 20 Filed: 12/9/1999, Entered: 12/10/1999 Miscellaneous Document
Consent Decree. (Signed by Hon. Jerome B. Simandle) n.m. (lc)
    LREF
    Blank 19 Filed: 11/30/1999, Entered: 11/30/1999 OrderCourt Filing
    ORDER dismissing action without prejudice and without costs. ( signed by Judge Jerome B. Simandle ) n.m. (lc)
      LREF
      Blank -- Filed: 11/30/1999, Entered: 11/30/1999 Terminated Case
      Case closed (Settled) (lc)
        LREF
        Blank 18 Filed: 11/17/1999, Entered: 11/17/1999 Scheduling OrderCourt Filing
        AMENDED SCHEDULING ORDER setting Discovery cutoff 12/15/99 (signed by Mag. Judge Joel B. Rosen) (lc)
          LREF
          Blank 17 Filed: 10/21/1999, Entered: 10/25/1999 Scheduling OrderCourt Filing
          SCHEDULING ORDER setting Dispositive Motion due on or before 2/1/00; Joint Final Pretrial order to be submitted on or before 9:30 2/29/00 ; Settlement conference 1/3/00 ; Trial with jury 3/13/00 ; ( signed by Mag. Judge Joel B. Rosen ) (lc)
            LREF
            Blank -- Filed: 10/21/1999, Entered: 10/25/1999 Status Conference
            Status conference held before Mag. Judge Joel B. Rosen on 10.21.99. (lc)
              LREF
              Blank 16 Filed: 9/2/1999, Entered: 9/3/1999 Scheduling OrderCourt Filing
              SCHEDULING ORDER setting Discovery cutoff 11/1/99 ; Status conference 10:30 10/21/99 ; ( signed by Mag. Judge Joel B. Rosen ) (lc)
                LREF
                Blank 15 Filed: 9/1/1999, Entered: 9/2/1999 OrderCourt Filing
                REVISED ORDER compelling discovery from defendant, Biscomerica. ( signed by Mag. Judge Joel B. Rosen ) (lc)
                  LREF
                  Blank -- Filed: 9/1/1999, Entered: 9/3/1999 Status Conference
                  Status conference held before Mag. Judge Joel B. Rosen on 9.1.99. (lc)
                    LREF
                    Blank 14 Filed: 5/13/1999, Entered: 5/14/1999 OrderCourt Filing
                    PROTECTIVE ORDER (signed by Mag. Judge Joel B. Rosen) (lc)
                      LREF
                      Blank 13 Filed: 3/31/1999, Entered: 4/5/1999 Scheduling OrderCourt Filing
                      SCHEDULING ORDER setting Discovery cutoff 2:30 8/31/99 ; Status conference 2:30 8/30/99 ; ( signed by Mag. Judge Joel B. Rosen ) (lc)
                        LREF
                        Blank -- Filed: 3/31/1999, Entered: 4/5/1999 Status Conference
                        Status conference held before Mag. Judge Joel B. Rosen on 3.31.99. (lc)
                          LREF
                          Blank -- Filed: 3/11/1999, Entered: 3/11/1999 Scheduling Conference
                          Scheduling conference held before Mag. Judge Joel B. Rosen on 3.3.99. (lc)
                            LREF
                            Blank 12 Filed: 3/4/1999, Entered: 3/9/1999 Scheduling OrderCourt Filing
                            SCHEDULING ORDER setting Discovery cutoff 8/31/99 ; Settlement conference 3/31/99 ; ( signed by Mag. Judge Joel B. Rosen ) (lc)
                              LREF
                              Blank 11 Filed: 1/25/1999, Entered: 1/29/1999 Minutes-MiscellaneousCourt Filing
                              Minute entry: Proceedings recorded by Ct-Reporter: None; Minutes of: 1.25.99; The following actions were taken, granting [4-1] motion for an order admitting J. Rodman Steele, Jr. to appear pro hac vice on behalf of plaintiff. Terminating [4-2] hearing Motion set for 1/22/98 on [4-1] motion By Mag. Judge Joel B. Rosen (lc)
                                LREF
                                Blank 10 Filed: 1/25/1999, Entered: 1/26/1999 OrderCourt Filing
                                ORDER granting [4-1] motion for an order admitting J. Rodman Steele, Jr. to appear pro hac vice on behalf of plaintiff. Terminating [4-2] hearing Motion set for 1/22/98 on [4-1] motion. ( signed by Mag. Judge Joel B. Rosen ) (lc)
                                  LREF
                                  Blank 9 Filed: 1/21/1999, Entered: 1/21/1999 OrderCourt Filing
                                  ORDER, set scheduling conference for 11:00 3/3/99 (signed by Mag. Judge Joel B. Rosen ) (lc)
                                    LREF
                                    Blank 8 Filed: 1/21/1999, Entered: 1/21/1999, Terminated: 11/30/1999 Answer
                                    ANSWER to Complaint by BISCOMERICA CORP.; jury demand. (lc)
                                      LREF
                                      Blank 7 Filed: 12/3/1998, Entered: 12/7/1998 Certificate Of Service.
                                      CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE [4-1] motion etc. (lc)
                                        LREF
                                        Blank 6 Filed: 12/3/1998, Entered: 12/7/1998 Miscellaneous Document
                                        DECLARATION of J. Rodman Steele, Jr. on Re: [4-1] motion for an order admitting J. Rodman Steele, Jr. to appear pro hac vice on behalf of plaintiff. (lc)
                                          LREF
                                          Blank 5 Filed: 12/3/1998, Entered: 12/7/1998 Miscellaneous Document
                                          DECLARATION of Carlo Scaramella on Re: [4-1] motion for an order admitting J. Rodman Steele, Jr. to appear pro hac vice on behalf of plaintiff. (lc)
                                            LREF
                                            Blank 4 Filed: 12/3/1998, Entered: 12/7/1998, Terminated: 1/25/1999 Motion for Limited AdmissionCourt Filing
                                            Notice of MOTION for an order admitting J. Rodman Steele, Jr. to appear pro hac vice on behalf of plaintiff. by J & J SNACK FOODS [4-1] motion referred to Mag. Judge Joel B. Rosen, Motion set for 1/22/98 on [4-1] motion (lc)
                                              LREF
                                              Blank -- Filed: 10/14/1998, Entered: 10/14/1998 Summons Issued
                                              SUMMONS(ES) issued for BISCOMERICA CORP. ( 20 Days) (Mailed to Counsel) (lc)
                                                LREF
                                                Blank 3 Filed: 10/8/1998, Entered: 10/14/1998 Letter
                                                LETTER requesting an issuance of Summons. (lc)
                                                  LREF
                                                  Blank 2 Filed: 10/2/1998, Entered: 10/2/1998 Case Assigned/ReassignedCourt Filing
                                                  NOTICE of Allocation and Assignment filed. Magistrate Judge JOEL B. ROSEN (et)
                                                    LREF
                                                    Blank 1 Filed: 10/1/1998, Entered: 10/2/1998 Complaint
                                                    COMPLAINT filed; jury demand FILING FEE $ 150.00 RECEIPT # 245980 (et)
                                                      LREF

                                                      Statistics

                                                      This case has been viewed 98 times.

                                                      No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                      Space
                                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                       
                                                      PlainSite
                                                      Sign Up
                                                      Need Password Help?