STRZOK v. BARR et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit District Of Columbia District Court, Case No. 1:19-cv-02367-ABJ
District Judge Amy Berman Jackson, presiding

Tags
Last Updated August 11, 2021 at 11:41 AM DT (1.5 months ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo PETER STRZOK, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by HELLER, HURON, CHERTKOF, LERNER, SIMON & SALMAN

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Julia Theresa Quinn +1 202 293 8090 +1 202 293 7110 jtq@hellerhuron.com
Space Richard A. Salzman +1 202 293 8090 +1 202 293 7110 salzman@hellerhuron.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Zuckerman Spaeder LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Aitan Dror Goelman +1 202 778 1996 +1 202 822 8106 agoelman@zuckerman.com
v.
No Logo CHRISTOPHER A. WRAY, Defendant
Federal Bureau of Investigation Federal Bureau of Investigation, Defendant
United States Department of Justice United States Department of Justice, Defendant
Barr, William P. Barr, William P., Defendant
Officially listed as "WILLIAM F. BARR"
Officer/Director, BELL ATLANTIC CORP
Officer/Director, AOL Time Warner, Inc.
Officer/Director, Dominion Resources Inc /va/
No Logo DAVID ANDREW CHRISTENSON, Movant
Office Washington, DC
Filed 8/6/2019
Jury Demand Plaintiff
Demand
Nature of Suit 440 - Civil Rights: Other
Cause Section 28 U.S.C. § 1331 Fed. Question
Jurisdiction U.S. Government Defendant
Disposition
County 88888
Terminated
Origin 1
Reopened
Lead Case
None
Related Case
None
Other Court Case None
Defendant Custody Status
Flags APPEAL,JURY,TYPE-L
  Entries (69) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 68 Filed: 8/11/2021, Entered: None Extension of Time to Complete Discovery
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 67 Filed: 5/1/2021, Entered: None Transcript
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 66 Filed: 4/29/2021, Entered: None Status Report
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 65 Filed: 4/26/2021, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 64 Filed: 2/3/2021, Entered: None Notice of Withdrawal of Motion
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 63 Filed: 2/2/2021, Entered: None Supplemental Memorandum
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 62 Filed: 1/26/2021, Entered: None Response to Motion
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 61 Filed: 1/25/2021, Entered: None Show Cause
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 60 Filed: 1/19/2021, Entered: None Notice of Withdrawal of Appearance
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 1/8/2021, Entered: None Motion for Order
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 1/8/2021, Entered: None Protective Order
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 12/18/2020, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 11/12/2020, Entered: None Order
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 11/2/2020, Entered: None Meet and Confer Statement
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 10/22/2020, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 10/17/2020, Entered: None Answer
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 10/9/2020, Entered: None Status Report
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 10/6/2020, Entered: None Extension of Time to File Answer
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 9/30/2020, Entered: None Transcript
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 4/8/2020, Entered: None Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 3/31/2020, Entered: None Response to Motion
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 3/27/2020, Entered: None Intervene
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 3/26/2020, Entered: None Response to Motion
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 3/14/2020, Entered: None Consolidate Cases
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 2/18/2020, Entered: None USCA Mandate
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 1/31/2020, Entered: None Surreply
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 1/21/2020, Entered: None Leave to File Document
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 1/18/2020, Entered: None Reply to opposition to Motion
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 1/17/2020, Entered: None File Excess Pages
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 12/30/2019, Entered: None Memorandum in Opposition to Motion
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 12/19/2019, Entered: None Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 12/16/2019, Entered: None Notice of Withdrawal of Appearance
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 11/22/2019, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 11/21/2019, Entered: None ERRATA
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 11/19/2019, Entered: None ERRATA
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 11/18/2019, Entered: None Dismiss
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 11/15/2019, Entered: None Extension of Time to File Answer
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 11/6/2019, Entered: None Extension of Time to File Answer
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 10/22/2019, Entered: None Extension of Time to File Answer
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 10/10/2019, Entered: None Leave to File Denied
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document 22 Filed: 9/23/2019, Entered: 9/23/2019 transmission of notice of appeal and docket sheet to USCA
                                                                                  Transmission of the Notice of Appeal, Document Appealed, and Docket Sheet to US Court of Appeals. The fee remains to be paid and another notice will be transmitted when the fee has been paid in the District Court re [21] Notice of Appeal. (jf)
                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 10/7/2019, Entered: None Order on Motion to Intervene
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document 21 Filed: 9/19/2019, Entered: 9/23/2019 Notice of appeal
                                                                                      NOTICE OF APPEAL as to [20] Leave to File Denied, [19] Leave to File Denied, by DAVID ANDREW CHRISTENSON. Fee Status: No Fee Paid. Parties have been notified. (jf)
                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 10/5/2019, Entered: None Leave to File Denied
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 9/17/2019, Entered: 9/20/2019 Leave to File Denied
                                                                                          LEAVE TO FILE DENIED- Amicus/Notice submitted by David Andrew Christenson. This document is unavailable as the Court denied its filing. "Leave to file DENIED" Signed by Amy B. Jackson, USDJ on 09/17/2019. (jf)
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 10/1/2019, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 9/12/2019, Entered: 9/16/2019 Leave to File Denied
                                                                                              LEAVE TO FILE DENIED- Amicus/Notice66 submitted by David Andrew Christenson. This document is unavailable as the Court denied its filing. "Leave to file DENIED. Movants Motion to Intervene has not yet been granted" Signed by Amy B. Jackson, USDJ on 09/12/2019. (jf)
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 9/9/2019, Entered: 9/12/2019 Leave to File DeniedCourt Filing
                                                                                                LEAVE TO FILE DENIED- Notices submitted by David Andrew Christenson. This document is unavailable as the Court denied its filing. "Leave to file DENIED, Motion to Intervene Still Pending" Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 09/09/2019. (Attachments: # (1) Additional Filing) (zjf)
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document 16 Filed: 9/3/2019, Entered: 9/3/2019 Summons Returned Executed as to US Attorney
                                                                                                  RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 8/28/2019. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 10/27/2019. (Goelman, Aitan)
                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document 15 Filed: 8/27/2019, Entered: 8/27/2019 Summons Issued Electronically as to AUSA
                                                                                                    SUMMONS (1) Issued Electronically as to U.S. Attorney (zjf)
                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                      Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 8/26/2019, Entered: 9/4/2019 Leave to File DeniedCourt Filing
                                                                                                      LEAVE TO FILE DENIED- Friend Of The Court Brief submitted by David Andrew Christenson. This document is unavailable as the Court denied its filing. "Leave to file in this case denied unless and until motion to intervene is granted" Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 08/26/2019. (jf)
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document 14 Filed: 8/23/2019, Entered: 8/23/2019 Request for Summons to Issue
                                                                                                        REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO ISSUE U.S. Attorney for the District of Columbia filed by PETER STRZOK.(Goelman, Aitan)
                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                          Blank  Order on Motion for reconsideration
                                                                                                          MINUTE ORDER striking [13] Motion for Reconsideration. The movant has filed a motion to intervene in this case which is still pending. Unless and until it has been ruled upon in the movant's favor, he may not file pleadings on the docket absent leave of this court to do so. Moreover, a motion for reconsideration is inappropriate at this time since the court has not issued any rulings in this matter that could be reconsidered. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 8/23/2019. (lcabj2)
                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document 13 Filed: 8/20/2019, Entered: 8/22/2019 Motion for reconsideration
                                                                                                            STRICKEN PURSUANT TO MINUTE ORDER FILED 08/23/19.....MOTION for Reconsideration by DAVID ANDREW CHRISTENSON (jf) Modified on 8/23/2019 (jth).
                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 8/15/2019, Entered: 8/19/2019 Leave to File DeniedCourt Filing
                                                                                                              LEAVE TO FILE DENIED- Attachment Z to the Motion to Intervene filed by DAVID ANDREW CHRISTENSON. This document is unavailable as the Court denied its filing.. "Leave to file Attachment Z, Copies of pleadings file in other cases DENIED" Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 08/15/2019. (jf)
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document 11 Filed: 8/15/2019, Entered: 8/19/2019 Motion to interveneCourt Filing
                                                                                                                MOTION to Intervene by DAVID ANDREW CHRISTENSON, "Leave to file GRANTED. Only 3 pages Motion to Intervene (not the attachments) " "Leave to file Attachment Z, Copies of pleadings file in other cases DENIED" Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 08/15/2019 (jf)
                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document 10 Filed: 8/13/2019, Entered: 8/13/2019 Summons Returned Executed as to Federal Defendant
                                                                                                                  RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION served on 8/8/2019 (Goelman, Aitan)
                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document 9 Filed: 8/13/2019, Entered: 8/13/2019 Summons Returned Executed as to Federal Defendant
                                                                                                                    RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. CHRISTOPHER A. WRAY served on 8/8/2019 (Goelman, Aitan)
                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document 8 Filed: 8/13/2019, Entered: 8/13/2019 Summons Returned Executed as to Federal Defendant
                                                                                                                      RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE served on 8/8/2019 (Goelman, Aitan)
                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document 7 Filed: 8/13/2019, Entered: 8/13/2019 Summons Returned Executed as to U.S. Attorney General
                                                                                                                        RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 08/08/2019. (Goelman, Aitan)
                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document 6 Filed: 8/12/2019, Entered: 8/12/2019 Notice of appearance
                                                                                                                          NOTICE of Appearance by Richard A. Salzman on behalf of PETER STRZOK (Salzman, Richard)
                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                            Sealed Legal Document 5 Filed: 8/9/2019, Entered: 8/9/2019 Sealed document
                                                                                                                            SEALED DOCUMENT filed by PETER STRZOK re Order,, Set Deadlines, (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.)(Quinn, Julia)
                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document 4 Filed: 8/9/2019, Entered: 8/9/2019 Notice of appearance
                                                                                                                              NOTICE of Appearance by Julia Theresa Quinn on behalf of PETER STRZOK (Quinn, Julia)
                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                Blank  Order
                                                                                                                                MINUTE ORDER. The Minute Order of August 8, 2019 is amended as follows: plaintiff should not provide his home address to the Clerk's office. Instead, plaintiff must file a notice under seal containing plaintiff's home address by August 12, 2019. Such information shall remain under seal and withheld from disclosure until otherwise directed by this Court. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 8/9/2019. (lcabj2)
                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                  Blank  order on motion for miscellaneous relief
                                                                                                                                  AMENDED PURSUANT TO MINUTE ORDER FILED 08/09/19.....MINUTE ORDER granting [2] Motion to Deviate from Local Civil Rule 5.1(c). Plaintiff may omit his home address from the complaint, but he must provide this information to the Clerk's Office. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 8/8/2019. lcabj2) Modified on 8/9/2019 (jth).
                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 3 Filed: 8/7/2019, Entered: 8/7/2019 Summons Issued Electronically
                                                                                                                                    SUMMONS (4) Issued Electronically as to WILLIAM F. BARR, FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, CHRISTOPHER A. WRAY. (Attachment: # (1) Notice and Consent)(zjd)
                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                      Blank  Case Assigned/Reassigned
                                                                                                                                      Case Assigned to Judge Amy Berman Jackson. (zjd)
                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 2 Filed: 8/6/2019, Entered: 8/6/2019, Terminated: 8/8/2019 motion for miscellaneous relief
                                                                                                                                        MOTION to Deviate From Local Civil Rule 5.1(c) by PETER STRZOK (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order)(Goelman, Aitan)
                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 1 Filed: 8/6/2019, Entered: 8/6/2019 Complaint
                                                                                                                                          COMPLAINT against WILLIAM F. BARR, FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, CHRISTOPHER A. WRAY with Jury Demand ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-6303726) filed by PETER STRZOK. (Attachments: # (1) Civil Cover Sheet, # (2) Summons to Attorney General William F. Barr, # (3) Summons to United States Department of Justice, # (4) Summons to FBI Director Christopher A. Wray, # (5) Summons to Federal Bureau of Investigation)(Goelman, Aitan)
                                                                                                                                            LREF

                                                                                                                                            Statistics

                                                                                                                                            This case has been viewed 69 times.

                                                                                                                                            No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                            Space
                                                                                                                                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                             
                                                                                                                                            PlainSite
                                                                                                                                            Sign Up
                                                                                                                                            Need Password Help?