District Appellate Supreme
Federal
District Of Columbia District Court Court of Appeals for the D.C. Circuit United States Supreme Court

COMMITTEE ON THE JUDICIARY OF THE U.S. HOUSE OF REPRESENTIVES v. MCGAHN II
Federal Civil Lawsuit District Of Columbia District Court, Case No. 1:19-cv-02379-KBJ
District Judge Ketanji Brown Jackson, presiding

Tags
Last Updated July 16, 2021 at 10:46 AM DT (2.4 months ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

United States House of Representatives Committee On The Judiciary United States House of Representatives Committee On The Judiciary, Plaintiff
Officially listed as "COMMITTEE ON THE JUDICIARY OF THE U.S. HOUSE OF REPRESENTIVES"

Toggle Switch Represented by GEORGETOWN LAW

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Joshua Geltzer +1 202 662 9042 jg1861@law.georgetown.edu

Toggle Switch Represented by United States House of Representatives

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Douglas N. Letter +1 202 225 9700 douglas.letter@mail.house.gov
v.
No Logo DONALD F. MCGAHN II, Defendant
Office Washington, DC
Filed 8/7/2019
Jury Demand None
Demand
Nature of Suit 890 - Other Statutes: Other Statutory Actions
Cause Section 28 U.S.C. § 1331 Fed. Question
Jurisdiction U.S. Government Plaintiff
Disposition
County 11001
Terminated
Origin 1
Reopened
Lead Case
None
Related Case
119-gj-00048-BAH
Other Court Case None
Defendant Custody Status
Flag TYPE-E
  Entries (71) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document 49 Filed: 11/26/2019, Entered: 11/26/2019 Motion To Stay
MOTION to Stay re [47] Order, [46] Memorandum & Opinion (Motion for Stay Pending Appeal and for Immediate Administrative Stay) by DONALD F. MCGAHN II (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order)(Myers, Steven)
    LREF
    Legal Document 48 Filed: 11/26/2019, Entered: 11/26/2019 Notice of Appeal to DC Circuit Court
    NOTICE OF APPEAL TO DC CIRCUIT COURT as to [47] Order, [46] Memorandum & Opinion by DONALD F. MCGAHN II. Fee Status: No Fee Paid. Parties have been notified. (Myers, Steven)
      LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 59 Filed: 7/16/2021, Entered: None USCA Mandate
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document 47 Filed: 11/25/2019, Entered: 11/25/2019 OrderCourt Filing
        ORDER GRANTING [22] Plaintiffs Motion for Expedited Partial Summary Judgment, and DENYING [32] Defendants Motion for Summary Judgment. See attached Order for details. Signed by Judge Ketanji Brown Jackson on 11/25/2019. (jag)
          LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 58 Filed: 7/9/2021, Entered: None Notice of Withdrawal of Appearance
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document 46 Filed: 11/25/2019, Entered: 11/25/2019 Memorandum and OpinionCourt Filing
            MEMORANDUM OPINION GRANTING [22] Plaintiffs Motion for Expedited Partial Summary Judgment, and DENYING [32] Defendants Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge Ketanji Brown Jackson on 11/25/2019. (jag)
              LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 1/19/2021, Entered: None Withdraw as Attorney
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document 45 Filed: 11/19/2019, Entered: 11/19/2019 Notice - other
                NOTICE by COMMITTEE ON THE JUDICIARY OF THE U.S. HOUSE OF REPRESENTATIVES (Letter, Douglas)
                  LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 1/19/2021, Entered: None Notice of Withdrawal of Appearance
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Blank  Order
                    MINUTE ORDER. This Court held a Motion Hearing on October 31, 2019, during which it noted that either party could file a notice if an expedited ruling on the pending cross-motions for summary judgment became necessary. Having received such a notice from Plaintiff (see ECF No. [45]), the Court hereby notifies the parties that it will issue its Memorandum Opinion and Order in this matter on or before the close of business on Monday, November 25, 2019, absent unforeseen circumstances. Signed by Judge Ketanji Brown Jackson on 11/19/2019. (jag)
                      LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 10/7/2020, Entered: None Notice of Withdrawal of Appearance
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 11/4/2019, Entered: 11/4/2019 transcriptCourt Filing
                        TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS before Judge Ketanji Brown Jackson held on 10/31/2019; Page Numbers: 1-163. Date of Issuance: 11/01/2019. Court Reporter: Nancy J. Meyer. Telephone Number: (202) 354-3118, Tape Number: N/A. Transcripts may be ordered by submitting the Transcript Order FormFor the first 90 days after this filing date, the transcript may be viewed at the courthouse at a public terminal or purchased from the court reporter referenced above. After 90 days, the transcript may be accessed via PACER. Other transcript formats, (multi-page, condensed, CD or ASCII) may be purchased from the court reporter.NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have 21 days to file with the court and the court reporter any request to redact personal identifiers from this transcript. If no such requests are filed, the transcript will be made available to the public via PACER without redaction after 90 days. The policy, which includes the five personal identifiers specifically covered, is located on our website at www.dcd.uscourts.gov. Redaction Request due 11/25/2019. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 12/5/2019. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 2/2/2020.(Meyer, Nancy)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 2/4/2020, Entered: None Withdraw as Attorney
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document 43 Filed: 10/31/2019, Entered: 10/31/2019 Response to Document
                            RESPONSE re [41] Notice (Other) Regarding Status of Accommodation Process filed by DONALD F. MCGAHN II. (Orloff, Serena)
                              LREF
                              Legal Document 53 Filed: 12/2/2019, Entered: None Order on Motion to Stay
                                LREF
                                Blank  Motion Hearing
                                Minute Entry for Motion Hearing held on 10/31/2019 before Judge Ketanji Brown Jackson re [22] MOTION for Preliminary Injunction or, in the alternative MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment (expedited) [32] MOTION for Summary Judgment. Oral Arguments heard and taken under advisement. Court Reporter Nancy Meyer. (zjch)
                                  LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 11/27/2019, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Blank  Notice of QC
                                    NOTICE OF ERROR re [42] Notice (Other); emailed to serena.m.orloff@usdoj.gov, cc'd 20 associated attorneys -- The PDF file you docketed contained errors: 1. Incorrect event used, 2. Please refile document, 3. Refile document using the event Response to (non-motion) Document found under Opposition and Replies and link it to doc. 41. (ztd, )
                                      LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 11/26/2019, Entered: None Memorandum in Opposition to Motion
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document 42 Filed: 10/30/2019, Entered: 10/30/2019 Notice - other
                                        ENTERED IN ERROR. . . . .NOTICE of Defendant's Response to Plaintiff's Notice Regarding Status of Accommodation Process, ECF No. 41 by DONALD F. MCGAHN II (Orloff, Serena) Modified on 10/31/2019 (ztd).
                                          LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 11/26/2019, Entered: None Transmission of Notice of Appeal and Docket Sheet to USCA
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document 41 Filed: 10/29/2019, Entered: 10/29/2019 Notice - other
                                            NOTICE by COMMITTEE ON THE JUDICIARY OF THE U.S. HOUSE OF REPRESENTATIVES re [37] Memorandum in Opposition, (Letter, Douglas)
                                              LREF
                                              Legal Document 40 Filed: 10/25/2019, Entered: 10/25/2019 Reply to opposition to Motion
                                              REPLY to opposition to motion re [32] MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by DONALD F. MCGAHN II. (Orloff, Serena)
                                                LREF
                                                Blank  Order on Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages
                                                MINUTE ORDER granting [39] Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. It is hereby ORDERED that Defendant may file a reply in support of its motion that is no more than 45 pages in length. Signed by Judge Ketanji Brown Jackson on 10/24/2019. (jag)
                                                  LREF
                                                  Legal Document 39 Filed: 10/23/2019, Entered: 10/23/2019, Terminated: 10/24/2019 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages
                                                  Consent MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages for reply memorandum due October 25, 2019 by DONALD F. MCGAHN II (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order)(Myers, Steven)
                                                    LREF
                                                    Legal Document 38 Filed: 10/16/2019, Entered: 10/16/2019 Reply to opposition to Motion
                                                    REPLY to opposition to motion re [22] MOTION for Preliminary Injunction or, in the alternative MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment (expedited) filed by COMMITTEE ON THE JUDICIARY OF THE U.S. HOUSE OF REPRESENTATIVES. (Letter, Douglas)
                                                      LREF
                                                      Legal Document 37 Filed: 10/16/2019, Entered: 10/16/2019 Memorandum in opposition
                                                      Memorandum in opposition to re [32] MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by COMMITTEE ON THE JUDICIARY OF THE U.S. HOUSE OF REPRESENTATIVES. (Attachments: # (1) Statement of Facts (Response to Def.'s Statement of Facts))(Letter, Douglas)
                                                        LREF
                                                        Legal Document 36 Filed: 10/15/2019, Entered: 10/15/2019, Terminated: 10/15/2019 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages
                                                        Consent MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages by COMMITTEE ON THE JUDICIARY OF THE U.S. HOUSE OF REPRESENTATIVES (Letter, Douglas)
                                                          LREF
                                                          Blank  Order on Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages
                                                          MINUTE ORDER granting [36] Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. It is hereby ORDERED that Plaintiff may file a consolidated reply in support of its motion and opposition to Defendant's cross-motion that is no more than 65 pages in length. Signed by Judge Ketanji Brown Jackson on 10/15/2019. (jag)
                                                            LREF
                                                            Legal Document 33 Filed: 10/1/2019, Entered: 10/1/2019 Response to motion
                                                            RESPONSE re [22] MOTION for Preliminary Injunction or, in the alternative MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment (expedited) filed by DONALD F. MCGAHN II. (Attachments: # (1) Statement of Fact, # (2) Response to Statement of Fact, # (3) Purpura Declaration, # (4) Lassiter Declaration, # (5) Orloff Declaration, # (6) Proposed Order)(Orloff, Serena)
                                                              LREF
                                                              Legal Document 32 Filed: 10/1/2019, Entered: 10/1/2019, Terminated: 11/25/2019 Motion for summary judgment
                                                              MOTION for Summary Judgment by DONALD F. MCGAHN II (Attachments: # (1) Statement of Fact, # (2) Response to Statement of Fact, # (3) Purpura Declaration, # (4) Lassiter Declaration, # (5) Orloff Declaration, # (6) Proposed Order)(Orloff, Serena)
                                                                LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 9/30/2019, Entered: 10/2/2019 Leave to File DeniedCourt Filing
                                                                LEAVE TO FILE DENIED- Cover Letter. This document is unavailable as the Court denied its filing. "LEAVE TO FILE DENIED" Signed by Judge Ketanji Brown Jackson on 09/30/2019. (jf)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 9/30/2019, Entered: 10/2/2019 Leave to File DeniedCourt Filing
                                                                  LEAVE TO FILE DENIED- Letter. This document is unavailable as the Court denied its filing. "LEAVE TO FILE DENIED" Signed by Judge Ketanji Brown Jackson on 09/30/2019. (jf)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Blank  Order on Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages
                                                                    MINUTE ORDER granting [31] Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. It is hereby ORDERED that Defendant may file a consolidated opposition to Plaintiff's motion and cross-motion for summary judgment that is no more than 70 pages in length. This Court will entertain motions for leave to file excess pages with respect to the remaining briefs in this case on an as-needed basis. Signed by Judge Ketanji Brown Jackson on 9/30/2019. (lckbj1)
                                                                      LREF
                                                                      Legal Document 31 Filed: 9/27/2019, Entered: 9/27/2019, Terminated: 9/30/2019 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages
                                                                      Consent MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages by DONALD F. MCGAHN II (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order)(Orloff, Serena)
                                                                        LREF
                                                                        Legal Document 30 Filed: 9/27/2019, Entered: 9/27/2019 Notice of appearance
                                                                        NOTICE of Appearance by Serena Maya Schulz Orloff on behalf of DONALD F. MCGAHN II (Orloff, Serena)
                                                                          LREF
                                                                          Legal Document 29 Filed: 9/10/2019, Entered: 9/10/2019 Notice of appearance
                                                                          NOTICE of Appearance by James J. Gilligan on behalf of DONALD F. MCGAHN II (Gilligan, James)
                                                                            LREF
                                                                            Blank  set/reset hearings
                                                                            Set/Reset Hearings: Motion Hearing set for 10/31/2019 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 17 before Judge Ketanji Brown Jackson. (zgdf)
                                                                              LREF
                                                                              Blank  Order
                                                                              MINUTE ORDER ADOPTING the Parties' [28] Joint Scheduling Proposal. As discussed during the teleconference that this Court held on 9/3/2019, it is hereby ORDERED that the Plaintiff's [22] Motion will be treated as a Motion for Expedited Partial Summary Judgment, and that the following briefing deadlines are set: Defendant shall file his Opposition and Cross-Motion on or before 10/1/2019 at 3:00 PM; Plaintiff shall file its Reply and Cross-Motion Opposition on or before 10/16/2019; and Defendant shall file his Cross-Motion Reply on or before 10/25/2019. It is FURTHER ORDERED that a Motion Hearing is set for 10/31/2019 at 2:00 PM in Courtroom 17 before Judge Ketanji Brown Jackson. Signed by Judge Ketanji Brown Jackson on 9/3/2019. (lckbj1)
                                                                                LREF
                                                                                Legal Document 28 Filed: 8/30/2019, Entered: 8/30/2019 Proposed Briefing Schedule
                                                                                PROPOSED BRIEFING SCHEDULE re [22] MOTION for Preliminary Injunction or, in the alternative MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment (expedited) (Joint) by COMMITTEE ON THE JUDICIARY OF THE U.S. HOUSE OF REPRESENTATIVES. (Letter, Douglas)
                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 8/30/2019, Entered: 8/30/2019 Notice of appearance
                                                                                  NOTICE of Appearance by Andrew Marshall Bernie on behalf of DONALD F. MCGAHN II (Bernie, Andrew)
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document 26 Filed: 8/30/2019, Entered: 8/30/2019 Notice of appearance
                                                                                    NOTICE of Appearance by Steven A. Myers on behalf of DONALD F. MCGAHN II (Myers, Steven)
                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document 25 Filed: 8/28/2019, Entered: 8/28/2019 Notice of appearance
                                                                                      NOTICE of Appearance by Seth Wayne on behalf of COMMITTEE ON THE JUDICIARY OF THE U.S. HOUSE OF REPRESENTATIVES (Wayne, Seth)
                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document 24 Filed: 8/28/2019, Entered: 8/28/2019 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                        GENERAL ORDER AND GUIDELINES REGARDING MOTIONS FOR A PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION. Signed by Judge Ketanji Brown Jackson on 8/28/2019. (lckbj1)
                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 8/27/2019, Entered: 8/27/2019 Notice of appearance
                                                                                          NOTICE of Appearance by James Mahoney Burnham on behalf of All Defendants (Burnham, James)
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document 22 Filed: 8/26/2019, Entered: 8/26/2019, Terminated: 11/25/2019 Motion for preliminary injunction
                                                                                            MOTION for Preliminary Injunction or, in the alternative, MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment (expedited) by COMMITTEE ON THE JUDICIARY OF THE U.S. HOUSE OF REPRESENTIVES (Attachments: # (1) Memorandum in Support, # (2) Declaration, # (3) Declaration, # (4) Statement of Facts, # (5) Text of Proposed Order)(Letter, Douglas)
                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document 21 Filed: 8/26/2019, Entered: 8/26/2019 Notice of appearance
                                                                                              NOTICE of Appearance by Adam Anderson Grogg on behalf of COMMITTEE ON THE JUDICIARY OF THE U.S. HOUSE OF REPRESENTIVES (Grogg, Adam)
                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 8/21/2019, Entered: 8/21/2019 Summons Returned Executed as to Federal Defendant
                                                                                                RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. DONALD F. MCGAHN II served on 8/7/2019 (Letter, Douglas)
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 8/21/2019, Entered: 8/21/2019 Summons Returned Executed as to US Attorney
                                                                                                  RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 8/9/2019. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 10/8/2019. (Letter, Douglas)
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document 18 Filed: 8/15/2019, Entered: 8/15/2019 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                    GENERAL ORDER AND GUIDELINES FOR CIVIL CASES BEFORE JUDGE KETANJI BROWN JACKSON. The Court will hold the parties and counsel responsible for following these directives, and parties and counsel should pay particular attention to the Court's instructions for briefing motions and filing exhibits. Failure to adhere to this Order may, when appropriate, result the imposition of sanctions and/or sua sponte denial of non-conforming motions. Signed by Judge Ketanji Brown Jackson on 8/15/2019. (lckbj1)
                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                      Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                      Legal Document 17 Filed: 8/14/2019, Entered: 8/14/2019 Notice of appearance
                                                                                                      NOTICE of Appearance by Annie L. Owens on behalf of COMMITTEE ON THE JUDICIARY OF THE U.S. HOUSE OF REPRESENTIVES (Owens, Annie) (Main Document 17 replaced on 8/14/2019) (zjf).
                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document 16 Filed: 8/14/2019, Entered: 8/14/2019 Case Assigned/ReassignedCourt Filing
                                                                                                        Case randomly reassigned to Judge Ketanji Brown Jackson. Chief Judge Beryl A. Howell is no longer assigned to the case. (rj)
                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document 15 Filed: 8/14/2019, Entered: 8/14/2019 Memorandum and OpinionCourt Filing
                                                                                                          MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER regarding the plaintiff's [13] Response to Order to Show Cause Regarding Related Case Designation, and the defendant's [14] Objection to Plaintiff's Notice of Related Case. Signed by Chief Judge Beryl A. Howell on August 14, 2019. (lcbah3)
                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                            Blank  order on motion for miscellaneous relief
                                                                                                            MINUTE ORDER granting [3] Consent Motion for Use of Defendant's Business Address. Signed by Judge Ketanji Brown Jackson on 8/14/2019. (lckbj1)
                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document 14 Filed: 8/13/2019, Entered: 8/13/2019 Reply to Document
                                                                                                              RESPONSE re [2] Notice of Related Case Objections to Plaintiff's Response to Order to Show Cause Regarding Related Case Designation filed by DONALD F. MCGAHN II. (Handley, Cristen) Modified event title on 8/15/2019 (znmw).
                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document 13 Filed: 8/12/2019, Entered: 8/12/2019 Response to order to show cause
                                                                                                                RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by COMMITTEE ON THE JUDICIARY OF THE U.S. HOUSE OF REPRESENTIVES . (Letter, Douglas)
                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 8/9/2019, Entered: 8/9/2019 Notice of appearance
                                                                                                                  NOTICE of Appearance by Sarah Edith Clouse on behalf of COMMITTEE ON THE JUDICIARY OF THE U.S. HOUSE OF REPRESENTIVES (Clouse, Sarah)
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 8/9/2019, Entered: 8/9/2019 Notice of appearance
                                                                                                                    NOTICE of Appearance by Josephine T. Morse on behalf of COMMITTEE ON THE JUDICIARY OF THE U.S. HOUSE OF REPRESENTIVES (Morse, Josephine)
                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document 10 Filed: 8/9/2019, Entered: 8/9/2019 Notice of appearance
                                                                                                                      NOTICE of Appearance by Megan Barbero on behalf of COMMITTEE ON THE JUDICIARY OF THE U.S. HOUSE OF REPRESENTIVES (Barbero, Megan)
                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document 9 Filed: 8/9/2019, Entered: 8/9/2019 Notice of appearance
                                                                                                                        NOTICE of Appearance by Todd Barry Tatelman on behalf of COMMITTEE ON THE JUDICIARY OF THE U.S. HOUSE OF REPRESENTIVES (Tatelman, Todd)
                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document 8 Filed: 8/9/2019, Entered: 8/9/2019 Notice of appearance
                                                                                                                          NOTICE of Appearance by Douglas N. Letter on behalf of COMMITTEE ON THE JUDICIARY OF THE U.S. HOUSE OF REPRESENTIVES (Letter, Douglas)
                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document 7 Filed: 8/9/2019, Entered: 8/9/2019 Notice of appearance
                                                                                                                            NOTICE of Appearance by Elizabeth J. Shapiro on behalf of DONALD F. MCGAHN II (Shapiro, Elizabeth)
                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document 6 Filed: 8/9/2019, Entered: 8/9/2019 Notice of appearance
                                                                                                                              NOTICE of Appearance by Cristen Cori Handley on behalf of DONALD F. MCGAHN II (Handley, Cristen)
                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                Blank  ***Set/Reset Deadlines
                                                                                                                                Set/Reset Deadlines: Committee on the Judiciary's response to Show Cause due by noon on 8/12/2019; defendant may respond by noon on 8/13/2019. (tg)
                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                  Blank  ***Set/Reset Deadlines
                                                                                                                                  Set/Reset Deadlines: Committee on the Judiciary's response to Show Cause due by noon on 8/12/2019; defendant may respond by noon on 8/13/2019. (tg)
                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 5 Filed: 8/7/2019, Entered: 8/7/2019 Notice of appearance
                                                                                                                                    NOTICE of Appearance by Joshua Geltzer on behalf of COMMITTEE ON THE JUDICIARY OF THE U.S. HOUSE OF REPRESENTIVES (Geltzer, Joshua)
                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 8/7/2019, Entered: 8/7/2019 Summons Issued Electronically
                                                                                                                                      SUMMONS (1) Issued Electronically as to DONALD F. MCGAHN II. (Attachment: # (1) Notice and Consent)(zeg)
                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 3 Filed: 8/7/2019, Entered: 8/7/2019, Terminated: 8/14/2019 motion for miscellaneous relief
                                                                                                                                        Consent MOTION for Use of Defendant's Business Address by COMMITTEE ON THE JUDICIARY OF THE U.S. HOUSE OF REPRESENTIVES (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order)(Letter, Douglas)
                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 2 Filed: 8/7/2019, Entered: 8/7/2019 Notice of Related Case
                                                                                                                                          NOTICE OF RELATED CASE by COMMITTEE ON THE JUDICIARY OF THE U.S. HOUSE OF REPRESENTIVES. Case related to Case No. 1: 19-gj-00048-BAH. (Letter, Douglas)
                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 1 Filed: 8/7/2019, Entered: 8/7/2019 Complaint
                                                                                                                                            COMPLAINT against DONALD F. MCGAHN II (Fee Status:Filing Fee Waived) filed by COMMITTEE ON THE JUDICIARY OF THE U.S. HOUSE OF REPRESENTIVES. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A, # (2) Exhibit B, # (3) Exhibit C, # (4) Exhibit D, # (5) Exhibit E, # (6) Exhibit F, # (7) Exhibit G, # (8) Exhibit H, # (9) Exhibit I, # (10) Exhibit J, # (11) Exhibit K, # (12) Exhibit L, # (13) Exhibit M, # (14) Exhibit N, # (15) Exhibit O, # (16) Exhibit P, # (17) Exhibit Q, # (18) Exhibit R, # (19) Exhibit S, # (20) Exhibit T, # (21) Exhibit U, # (22) Exhibit V, # (23) Exhibit W, # (24) Exhibit X, # (25) Exhibit Y, # (26) Exhibit Z, # (27) Exhibit AA, # (28) Exhibit BB, # (29) Exhibit CC, # (30) Exhibit DD, # (31) Exhibit EE, # (32) Exhibit FF, # (33) Exhibit GG, # (34) Exhibit HH, # (35) Exhibit II, # (36) Exhibit JJ, # (37) Exhibit KK, # (38) Civil Cover Sheet, # (39) Summons)(Letter, Douglas)
                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                              Blank  Order
                                                                                                                                              MINUTE ORDER (paperless) DIRECTING, upon consideration of the Committee on the Judiciary's [2] Notice of Related Case, and to ensure that this matter is properly assigned, the Committee on the Judiciary to SHOW CAUSE, by noon on August 12, 2019, why this matter should be designated as related, pursuant to D.D.C. Local Civil Rule 40.5(a)(3), to In re Application of the Committee on the Judiciary, U.S. House of Representatives, for an Order Authorizing the Release of Certain Grand Jury Materials, 19-gj-48. The defendant may respond by noon on August 13, 2019 expressing his view on whether and, if so, why the cases should be treated as related. Although the Committee on the Judiciary filed 19-gj-48 with a Notice of Related Case to In re Application for an Order Authorizing the Release of Grand Jury Material Cited, Quoted, or Referenced in the Report of Special Counsel Robert S. Mueller III, 19-mc-45, both 19-gj-48 and 19-mc-45 were directly assigned to the Chief Judge because both seek the release of grand jury materials. See D.D.C. LCrR 6.1 (providing that a "motion or application filed in connection with a grand jury subpoena or other matter occurring before a grand jury . . . shall . . . be assigned to the Chief Judge"). Signed by Chief Judge Beryl A. Howell on August 7, 2019. (lcbah3)
                                                                                                                                                LREF

                                                                                                                                                Statistics

                                                                                                                                                This case has been viewed 59 times.

                                                                                                                                                No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                Space
                                                                                                                                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                 
                                                                                                                                                PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                Need Password Help?