USA v. Fowler
Federal Court Proceeding Arizona District Court, Case No. 2:19-mj-09181-ESW

Tags
Last Updated February 15, 2021 at 4:07 PM ST (4 months ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo USA, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Ronald Ray Gallegos - Inactive +1 602 514 7500 +1 602 514 7760 USAAZ.DepartedAUSAs@usdoj.gov
Space Gary Michael Restaino +1 602 514 7756 +1 602 514 7450 Gary.Restaino@usdoj.gov
Reginald Fowler (1)
Office Phoenix Division
Filed 4/30/2019
County XX US, Outside State
Terminated 5/10/2019
Reopened
Other Court Case 19 CRIM 254 Southern District of New York
Complaint
Citation
Offense Level 4
(1) 181349, Conspiracy to Committ Bank Fraud (2) 181344 & 2, Bank Fraud (3) 18 1960, Conspiracy to Operate an Unlicensed Money Transmitting Business (4) 18:1960 & 2, Operation of an Unlicensed Money Transmitting Business
Defendant Custody Status Released
Interpreter
Flags CLOSED,PASSPORT
  Entries (17) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document 21 Filed: 7/25/2019, Entered: 8/7/2019 transcriptCourt Filing
NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of DETENTION HEARING proceedings as to Reginald Fowler held on 05/09/2019, before Magistrate Judge MICHELLE H. BURNS. [Transcriber: Laurie A. Adams, RMR, CRR, Telephone number (602) 322-7256]. The ordering party will have electronic access to the transcript immediately. All others may view the transcript at the court public terminal or it may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber by filing a Transcript Order Form on the docket before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 8/15/2019. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 8/26/2019. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 10/23/2019. (RAP)
    LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 7/25/2019, Entered: 8/7/2019 transcriptCourt Filing
    NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of DETENTION HEARING and STATUS HEARING RE: IDENTIFICATION proceedings as to Reginald Fowler held on 05/02/2019, before Magistrate Judge EILEEN S. WILLETT. [Transcriber: Laurie A. Adams, RMR, CRR, Telephone number (602) 322-7256]. The ordering party will have electronic access to the transcript immediately. All others may view the transcript at the court public terminal or it may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber by filing a Transcript Order Form on the docket before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 8/15/2019. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 8/26/2019. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 10/23/2019. (RAP)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 7/25/2019, Entered: 8/7/2019 transcriptCourt Filing
      NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of INITIAL APPEARANCE proceedings as to Reginald Fowler held on 04/30/2019, before Magistrate Judge EILEEN S. WILLETT. [Transcriber: Laurie A. Adams, RMR, CRR, Telephone number (602) 322-7256]. The ordering party will have electronic access to the transcript immediately. All others may view the transcript at the court public terminal or it may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber by filing a Transcript Order Form on the docket before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 8/15/2019. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 8/26/2019. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 10/23/2019. (RAP)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document 18 Filed: 7/25/2019, Entered: 7/25/2019 Transcript RequestCourt Filing
        TRANSCRIPT REQUEST (3rd Party) by Galen Kast of Steptoe & Johnson, LLP as to Reginald Fowler for proceedings held on 04/30/19, 05/02/19, and 05/09/19, Magistrate Judge Michelle H Burns, Magistrate Judge Eileen S Willett hearing judge(s). (RAP)
          LREF
          Legal Document 17 Filed: 5/16/2019, Entered: 5/16/2019 Surrender/Return of Passport
          NOTICE re SURRENDER of Passport as to Reginald Fowler. Issued by USA. Defendant not permitted to apply for passport/passport card during the pendency of this action. (PTS-VE, )
            LREF
            Legal Document 16 Filed: 5/16/2019, Entered: 5/16/2019 Notice re passport
            NOTICE re: PASSPORT as to Reginald Fowler. Defendant is not permitted to apply for the issuance of a passport and/or passport card during the pendency of this action. (PTS-VE, )
              LREF
              Blank 15 Filed: 5/10/2019, Entered: 5/10/2019 Notice to Receiving District of Criminal Case Transfer
              Notice to Southern District of New York of a Rule 5 or Rule 32 Initial Appearance as to Reginald Fowler. Your case number is: 1:19-cr-00254-ALC-1. Please use PACER Court Links to access the public docket and documents. Any necessary sealed or ex parte documents will be sent in a separate e-mail. If you require the passport, please contact Pretrial Services at [azptdb_router_pts@azd.uscourts.gov]. For a bond transmittal, please contact our Finance Office at [azddb_finance@azd.uscourts.gov]. (If you wish to designate a different email address for future transfers, please send your request to the national list host at InterdistrictTransfer_TXND@txnd.uscourts.gov.) (KGM)
                LREF
                Legal Document 14 Filed: 5/10/2019, Entered: 5/10/2019 Order of Removal to Another District (Rule 5)Court Filing
                ORDER OF REMOVAL to District of Southern District of New York as to Reginald Fowler. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michelle H Burns on 5/10/2019.(KGM)
                  LREF
                  Legal Document 11 Filed: 5/9/2019, Entered: 5/10/2019 order setting conditions of releaseCourt Filing
                  ORDER Setting Conditions of Release as to Reginald Fowler. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michelle H Burns on 5/9/2019.(KGM)
                    LREF
                    Blank 10 Filed: 5/9/2019, Entered: 5/10/2019 Detention Hearing (Text Only)Court Filing
                    MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Michelle H Burns: Detention Hearing as to Reginald Fowler submitted on 5/9/2019. Defendant ordered released on bond with conditions. Defendant submits passport to Pretrial Services in open court. Appearances: AUSA Vincent Kirby for the Government, AFPD Gerald Williams for defendant. Defendant is present and in custody. (Recorded by COURTSMART.) Hearing held 2:06 PM to 2:15 PM. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (KGM)
                      LREF
                      Blank 9 Filed: 5/6/2019, Entered: 5/6/2019 set/reset hearingsCourt Filing
                      IT IS ORDERED the Detention Hearing set for 5/10/2019, as to Reginald Fowler, is RESET. Detention Hearing set for 5/9/2019 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 303, 401 West Washington Street, Phoenix, AZ 85003 before Magistrate Judge Michelle H Burns. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Michelle H Burns.(MHB, ec)(This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no pdf document associated with this entry.)
                        LREF
                        Blank 8 Filed: 5/2/2019, Entered: 5/2/2019 Identity/Removal Hearing - Rule 5(c)(3)Court Filing
                        MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Eileen S. Willett: Status Hearing re: Identity Hearing as to Reginald Fowler held on 5/2/2019. Defendant is placed under oath and WAIVES the Identity Hearing. THE COURT FINDS identity has been established. This is also the time set for a Detention Hearing. Upon request of defense counsel and time having been waived by the defendant, IT IS ORDERED continuing the Detention Hearing. Defendant temporarily detained pending further proceedings in this district. Appearances: AUSA Gary Restaino for the Government, AFPD Gerald Williams for defendant. Defendant is present and in custody. Detention Hearing reset for 5/10/2019 at 1:30 PM in Courtroom 303, 401 West Washington Street, Phoenix, AZ 85003 before Magistrate Judge Michelle H. Burns. (Recorded by COURTSMART.) Hearing held 3:38 PM to 3:41 PM. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MRH)
                          LREF
                          Legal Document 6 Filed: 5/1/2019, Entered: 5/1/2019 MEMORANDUM
                          MEMORANDUM by USA as to Reginald Fowler in support of detention. (Restaino, Gary)
                            LREF
                            Legal Document 5 Filed: 5/1/2019, Entered: 5/1/2019 Notice of Attorney Appearance/Substitution - USA
                            NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Gary M. Restaino appearing for USA . (Restaino, Gary)
                              LREF
                              Sealed Legal Document 3 Filed: 4/30/2019, Entered: 4/30/2019 Financial Affidavit - CJA 23
                              SEALED CJA 23 Financial Affidavit by Reginald Fowler. (MRH)
                                LREF
                                Blank 2 Filed: 4/30/2019, Entered: 4/30/2019 Initial Appearance - Rule 5.c.3Court Filing
                                MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Eileen S. Willett: Initial Appearance in Rule 5 Proceedings as to Reginald Fowler held on 4/30/2019. FINANCIAL AFFIDAVIT TAKEN. THE COURT FINDS the defendant is NOT indigent. The Court appoints AFPD Gerald Williams and advises the defendant that he will be responsible for reimbursement of the cost of defense. Counsel is directed to maintain a record of the hours expended on this case to facilitate calculation of the cost of defense. The Government is seeking detention. Upon request of defense counsel, the Court sets a Detention Hearing and Status Hearing re: Identity Hearing. Defendant temporarily detained pending further proceedings in this district. Appearances: AUSA Vincent Kirby for the Government, AFPD Gerald Williams for defendant. Defendant is present and in custody. Detention Hearing and Status Hearing re: Identity Hearing set for 5/2/2019 at 3:45 PM in Courtroom 305, 401 West Washington Street, Phoenix, AZ 85003 before Magistrate Judge Eileen S. Willett. (Recorded by COURTSMART.) Hearing held 3:24 PM to 3:28 PM. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. *Appearances section modified on 4/30/2019 to include Status Hearing re: Identity Hearing. (MRH)
                                  LREF
                                  Legal Document 1 Filed: 4/30/2019, Entered: 4/30/2019 Arrest - Rule 40
                                  Arrest (Rule 40) of Reginald Fowler. (MJF)
                                    LREF

                                    Statistics

                                    This case has been viewed 4 times.

                                    No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                    Space
                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                     
                                    PlainSite
                                    Sign Up
                                    Need Password Help?