McCabe v. BARR et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit District Of Columbia District Court, Case No. 1:19-cv-02399

Tags
Last Updated June 22, 2021 at 5:22 PM DT (3.2 months ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Andrew G. McCabe, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Murad Hussain +1 202 942 6143 +1 202 942 5999 murad.hussain@apks.com
v.
No Logo CHRISTOPHER A. WRAY, Defendant
Federal Bureau of Investigation Federal Bureau of Investigation, Defendant
United States Department of Justice United States Department of Justice, Defendant
Officially listed as "U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE"
Barr, William P. Barr, William P., Defendant
Officially listed as "WILLIAM P. BARR"
Officer/Director, BELL ATLANTIC CORP
Officer/Director, AOL Time Warner, Inc.
Officer/Director, Dominion Resources Inc /va/
Office Washington, DC
Filed 8/8/2019
Jury Demand None
Demand $0
Nature of Suit 440 - Civil Rights: Other
Cause Section 28 U.S.C. § 1331 Fed. Question
Jurisdiction U.S. Government Defendant
Disposition
County 88888
Terminated
Origin 1
Reopened
Lead Case
None
Related Case
None
Other Court Case None
Defendant Custody Status
  Entries (56) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 58 Filed: 6/22/2021, Entered: None Stay
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 6/9/2021, Entered: None Notice (Other)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 4/23/2021, Entered: None Stay
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 3/22/2021, Entered: None Transcript
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 3/17/2021, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 3/17/2021, Entered: None Extension of Time to Complete Discovery
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 3/15/2021, Entered: None Reply to opposition to Motion
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 3/12/2021, Entered: None Memorandum in Opposition to Motion
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 3/5/2021, Entered: None Compel
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 1/14/2021, Entered: None Order on Motion for Protective Order
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 1/14/2021, Entered: None Protective Order
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 1/6/2021, Entered: None Status Report
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 12/17/2020, Entered: None Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 12/16/2020, Entered: None Miscellaneous Relief
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 10/21/2020, Entered: None Meet and Confer Statement
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 10/19/2020, Entered: None Answer
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 10/7/2020, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 10/6/2020, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 10/5/2020, Entered: None Extension of Time to File Answer
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 10/2/2020, Entered: None Extension of Time to
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 9/26/2020, Entered: None Order
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 9/24/2020, Entered: None Order on Motion for Summary Judgment
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 9/24/2020, Entered: None Surreply
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 8/4/2020, Entered: None NOTICE OF SUPPLEMENTAL AUTHORITY
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 4/29/2020, Entered: None USCA Mandate
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 3/3/2020, Entered: None Response to Motion
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 2/19/2020, Entered: None Leave to File Document
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 1/23/2020, Entered: None Reply to opposition to Motion
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 1/21/2020, Entered: None File Excess Pages
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 1/10/2020, Entered: None Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 1/2/2020, Entered: None Miscellaneous Relief
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 12/24/2019, Entered: None Memorandum in Opposition to Motion
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 12/20/2019, Entered: None Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 11/14/2019, Entered: None Leave to File Denied
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 11/10/2019, Entered: None Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 11/1/2019, Entered: None SUMMARY JUDGMENT
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 10/17/2019, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 10/16/2019, Entered: None Leave to File Denied
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 10/14/2019, Entered: None Extension of Time to File Answer
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 10/10/2019, Entered: None Leave to File Denied
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 10/10/2019, Entered: None Transmission of Notice of Appeal and Docket Sheet to USCA
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 10/10/2019, Entered: None Notice of Interlocutory Appeal
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 10/10/2019, Entered: None Leave to File Denied
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 10/10/2019, Entered: None Leave to File Denied
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 10/10/2019, Entered: None Leave to File Denied
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 9/25/2019, Entered: None Leave to File Denied
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 9/20/2019, Entered: None Leave to File Denied
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 8/29/2019, Entered: None Leave to File Denied
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 8/23/2019, Entered: None Response to Motion
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 8/21/2019, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 8/19/2019, Entered: None Summons Returned Executed as to US Attorney
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 8/9/2019, Entered: None Standing Order
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 8/9/2019, Entered: None Electronic Summons Issued as to AUSA,USAG
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 8/9/2019, Entered: None SEALED MOTION for Leave to File Document Under Seal
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 8/9/2019, Entered: None Notice of Related Case
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document 1 Filed: 8/8/2019, Entered: 8/8/2019 Complaint
                                                                                                                COMPLAINT against WILLIAM P. BARR, FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, CHRISTOPHER A. WRAY ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-6309806) filed by Andrew G. McCabe. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A, # (2) Civil Cover Sheet, # (3) Notice of Other Cases, # (4) Summons, # (5) Summons, # (6) Summons, # (7) Summons, # (8) Summons)(Hussain, Murad)
                                                                                                                  LREF

                                                                                                                  Statistics

                                                                                                                  This case has been viewed 140 times.

                                                                                                                  No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                  Space
                                                                                                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                   
                                                                                                                  PlainSite
                                                                                                                  Sign Up
                                                                                                                  Need Password Help?