National Coalition for Advance v. EPA
Appeal Court of Appeals for the D.C. Circuit, Case No. 18-1118

Tags

Reality Check: Tesla, Inc.

This docket is featured in the January 7, 2020 article Reality Check: Tesla, Inc..

Last Updated August 11, 2019 at 7:45 PM DT (1.7 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo National Coalition For Advanced Transportation, Petitioner

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Steven Croley +1 202 637 2200 +1 202 637 2201 steven.croley@lw.com
Space Robert Wyman +1 213 485 1234 robert.wyman@lw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Latham & Watkins LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Devin M. O'Connor +1 202 637 2200 devin.o'connor@lw.com
United States Environmental Protection Agency United States Environmental Protection Agency, Respondent
Officially listed as "Environmental Protection Agency"

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Mark M. Kataoka +1 202 564 7606 +1 202 564 5603

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Eric Grant +1 202 514 0943 +1 202 514 0557 eric.grant@usdoj.gov

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Environmental Protection Agency

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space David Paul Wendelowsk Orlin +1 202 564 5603 orlin.david@epa.gov
No Logo Advanced Energy Economy, Amicus Curiae for Petitioner

Toggle Switch Represented by Covington & Burling, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Beth Susan Brinkmann +1 202 662 5312 bbrinkmann@cov.com
Space Thomas R Brugato +1 202 662 5515 +1 202 778 5515 tbrugato@cov.com
Space Gary S. Guzy +1 202 662 5978 +1 202 778 5978 gguzy@cov.com
No Logo Boulder County, Amicus Curiae

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Michael Burger, Attorney mhburger@gmail.com
No Logo City Of Ann Arbor, Amicus Curiae

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Michael Burger, Attorney mhburger@gmail.com
No Logo City of Baltimore, Amicus Curiae

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Michael Burger, Attorney mhburger@gmail.com
City of Chicago City of Chicago, Amicus Curiae

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Michael Burger, Attorney mhburger@gmail.com

Toggle Switch Represented by City of Chicago

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Edward N Siskel +1 312 744 0220 edward.siskel@cityofchicago.org
No Logo City Of Clarkston, Amicus Curiae

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Michael Burger, Attorney mhburger@gmail.com
No Logo City Of Coral Gables, Amicus Curiae

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Michael Burger, Attorney mhburger@gmail.com
City of Los Angeles City of Los Angeles, Amicus Curiae

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Michael Burger, Attorney mhburger@gmail.com
No Logo City Of Minneapolis, Amicus Curiae

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Michael Burger, Attorney mhburger@gmail.com
City of New York City of New York, Amicus Curiae

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Michael Burger, Attorney mhburger@gmail.com

Toggle Switch Represented by City of New York

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Susan Elizabeth Amron +1 212 788 1578 +1 212 788 1619 samron@law.nyc.gov
No Logo City Of Oakland, Amicus Curiae

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Michael Burger, Attorney mhburger@gmail.com
No Logo City of Pittsburgh, Amicus Curiae

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Michael Burger, Attorney mhburger@gmail.com
No Logo City Of San Francisco, Amicus Curiae

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Michael Burger, Attorney mhburger@gmail.com
No Logo City of Santa Monica, Amicus Curiae

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Michael Burger, Attorney mhburger@gmail.com
No Logo City of West Palm Beach, Amicus Curiae

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Michael Burger, Attorney mhburger@gmail.com
County Of Santa Clara County Of Santa Clara, Amicus Curiae

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Michael Burger, Attorney mhburger@gmail.com
No Logo King County, Amicus Curiae

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Michael Burger, Attorney mhburger@gmail.com

Toggle Switch Represented by KING COUNTY PROSECUTING ATTORNEY'S OFFICE (4TH AVE)

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jennifer Merrick Stacy +1 206 296 9015 + 206 296 0191 jennifer.stacy@kingcounty.gov
No Logo National League of Cities, Amicus Curiae

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Michael Burger, Attorney mhburger@gmail.com
No Logo U.s. Conference Of Mayors, Amicus Curiae

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Michael Burger, Attorney mhburger@gmail.com
Nature of Suit
Case Type Petition for Review
Lower Court Case
Lower Court Case
  Entries (110) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (1) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01208151962 Filed: 8/8/2019, Entered: None ?
ENTRY OF APPEARANCE [1801286] filed by Peter N. Surdo on behalf of Petitioner State of Minnesota in 18-1114. [18-1114, 18-1118, 18-1139, 18-1162] (Surdo, Peter)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01208151743 Filed: 8/7/2019, Entered: None ?
    LETTER [1801154] pursuant to FRAP 28j advising of additional authorities filed by State of California, State of Connecticut, State of Delaware, State of Illinois, State of Iowa, State of Maine, State of Maryland, State of Minnesota, State of New Jersey, State of New York, State of Oregon, State of Rhode Island, State of Vermont, State of Washington, Commonwealth of Massachusetts, Commonwealth of Pennsylvania, Commonwealth of Virginia and DC in 18-1114, National Coalition for Advanced Transportation in 18-1118, Environmental Defense Fund, Center for Biological Diversity, Conservation Law Foundation, Natural Resources Defense Council, Public Citizen, Inc., Sierra Club and Union of Concerned Scientists in 18-1139, Consolidated Edision Company of New York, Inc, National Grid USA, New York Power Authority and City of Seattle in 18-1162 [Service Date: 08/07/2019 ] [18-1114, 18-1118, 18-1139, 18-1162] (Forgie, Julia)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01208148287 Filed: 7/26/2019, Entered: None ?
      ENTRY OF APPEARANCE [1799256] filed by Robert Wyman, II and co-counsel Steven P. Croley on behalf of Petitioner National Coalition for Advanced Transportation in 18-1118. [18-1114, 18-1118, 18-1139, 18-1162] (Croley, Steven)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01208138510 Filed: 6/21/2019, Entered: None ?
        CLERK'S ORDER [1793919] filed scheduling oral argument on Friday, 09/06/2019. [18-1114, 18-1118, 18-1139, 18-1162]
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01208135529 Filed: 6/11/2019, Entered: None ?
          NOTICE [1792114] to withdraw attorney Joel C. Beauvais who represented National Coalition for Advanced Transportation in 18-1118 filed by National Coalition for Advanced Transportation in 18-1118 [Service Date: 06/11/2019 ] [18-1118, 18-1114, 18-1139, 18-1162] (Wyman, Robert)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01208132618 Filed: 5/31/2019, Entered: None ?
            SEPARATE STATUTORY ADDENDUM [1790520] filed by State of California, State of Connecticut, State of Delaware, State of Illinois, State of Iowa, State of Maine, State of Maryland, State of Minnesota, State of New Jersey, State of New York, State of Oregon, State of Rhode Island, State of Vermont, State of Washington, Commonwealth of Massachusetts, Commonwealth of Pennsylvania, Commonwealth of Virginia and DC in 18-1114 to Appellant/Petitioner final brief [1789881-2] [Service Date:05/31/2019 ] [18-1114, 18-1118, 18-1139, 18-1162] (Zaft, David)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01208132561 Filed: 5/31/2019, Entered: None ?
              NOTICE [1790489] to withdraw attorney , to substitute attorney Max Hollister Kieley substituted by Stacey W. Person filed by State of Minnesota in 18-1114 [Service Date: 05/31/2019 ] [18-1114, 18-1118, 18-1139, 18-1162] (Person, Stacey)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01208131424 Filed: 5/28/2019, Entered: None ?
                PETITIONER FINAL REPLY BRIEF [1789882] filed by State of California, State of Connecticut, State of Delaware, State of Illinois, State of Iowa, State of Maine, State of Maryland, State of Minnesota, State of New Jersey, State of New York, State of Oregon, State of Rhode Island, State of Vermont, State of Washington, Commonwealth of Massachusetts, Commonwealth of Pennsylvania, Commonwealth of Virginia and DC in 18-1114 [Service Date: 05/28/2019 ] Length of Brief: 5,089 words. [18-1114, 18-1118, 18-1139, 18-1162] (Forgie, Julia)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01208131421 Filed: 5/28/2019, Entered: None ?
                  PETITIONER FINAL BRIEF [1789881] filed by State of California, State of Connecticut, State of Delaware, State of Illinois, State of Iowa, State of Maine, State of Maryland, State of Minnesota, State of New Jersey, State of New York, State of Oregon, State of Rhode Island, State of Vermont, State of Washington, Commonwealth of Massachusetts, Commonwealth of Pennsylvania, Commonwealth of Virginia and DC in 18-1114 [Service Date: 05/28/2019 ] Length of Brief: 10,679 words. [18-1114, 18-1118, 18-1139, 18-1162] (Forgie, Julia)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01208131418 Filed: 5/28/2019, Entered: None ?
                    AMICUS FOR PETITIONER FINAL BRIEF [1789880] filed by Advanced Energy Economy in 18-1114, 18-1118, 18-1139, 18-1162 [Service Date: 05/28/2019 ] Length of Brief: 6,496 Words. [18-1114, 18-1118, 18-1139, 18-1162] (Guzy, Gary)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01208131358 Filed: 5/28/2019, Entered: None ?
                      PETITIONER FINAL REPLY BRIEF [1789861] filed by National Coalition for Advanced Transportation in 18-1118, Consolidated Edision Company of New York, Inc, National Grid USA, New York Power Authority and City of Seattle in 18-1162 [Service Date: 05/28/2019 ] Length of Brief: 1,932 Words. [18-1114, 18-1118, 18-1139, 18-1162] (Wyman, Robert)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01208131355 Filed: 5/28/2019, Entered: None ?
                        SEPARATE STATUTORY ADDENDUM [1789860] filed by National Coalition for Advanced Transportation in 18-1118, Consolidated Edision Company of New York, Inc, National Grid USA, New York Power Authority and City of Seattle in 18-1162 to Appellant/Petitioner final brief [1789858-2] [Service Date:05/28/2019 ] [18-1114, 18-1118, 18-1139, 18-1162] (Wyman, Robert)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01208131352 Filed: 5/28/2019, Entered: None ?
                          AMICUS FOR PETITIONER FINAL BRIEF [1789859] filed by Lyft, Inc. in 18-1114 [Service Date: 05/28/2019 ] Length of Brief: 2,692 Words. [18-1114, 18-1118, 18-1139, 18-1162] (Marx, Jared)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01208131349 Filed: 5/28/2019, Entered: None ?
                            PETITIONER FINAL BRIEF [1789858] filed by National Coalition for Advanced Transportation in 18-1118, Consolidated Edision Company of New York, Inc, National Grid USA, New York Power Authority and City of Seattle in 18-1162 [Service Date: 05/28/2019 ] Length of Brief: 3,523 Words. [18-1114, 18-1118, 18-1139, 18-1162]--[Edited 05/31/2019 by JAD] (Wyman, Robert)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01208131342 Filed: 5/28/2019, Entered: None ?
                              PETITIONER FINAL REPLY BRIEF [1789855] filed by Center for Biological Diversity, Conservation Law Foundation, Environmental Defense Fund, Natural Resources Defense Council, Public Citizen, Inc., Sierra Club and Union of Concerned Scientists in 18-1139 [Service Date: 05/28/2019 ] Length of Brief: 1962 words.. [18-1114, 18-1118, 18-1139, 18-1162]--[Edited 05/31/2019 by JAD] (Donahue, Sean)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01208131318 Filed: 5/28/2019, Entered: None ?
                                PETITIONER FINAL BRIEF [1789848] filed by Center for Biological Diversity, Conservation Law Foundation, Environmental Defense Fund, Natural Resources Defense Council, Public Citizen, Inc., Sierra Club and Union of Concerned Scientists in 18-1139 [Service Date: 05/28/2019 ] Length of Brief: 3794 words. [18-1114, 18-1118, 18-1139, 18-1162]--[Edited 05/31/2019 by JAD] (Donahue, Sean)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01208131231 Filed: 5/28/2019, Entered: None ?
                                  NOTICE [1789810] Notice of Errata Regarding Deferred Joint Appendix: Addition of two pages (JA080A, JA080B) and replacement of 34 pages (JA629-662) in Deferred Joint Appendix filed by State of California in 18-1114 [Service Date: 05/28/2019 ] [18-1114, 18-1118, 18-1139, 18-1162] (Forgie, Julia)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01208131221 Filed: 5/28/2019, Entered: None ?
                                    RESPONDENT FINAL BRIEF [1789798] filed by EPA and Andrew Wheeler in 18-1114, EPA in 18-1118, 18-1139, 18-1162 [Service Date: 05/28/2019 ] Length of Brief: 15,537 Words. [18-1114, 18-1118, 18-1139, 18-1162]--[Edited 05/30/2019 by JAD] (Hostetler, Eric)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01208129119 Filed: 5/20/2019, Entered: None ?
                                      JOINT APPENDIX [1788657] filed by State of California, State of Connecticut, State of Delaware, State of Illinois, State of Iowa, State of Maine, State of Maryland, State of Minnesota, State of New Jersey, State of New York, State of Oregon, State of Rhode Island, State of Vermont, State of Washington, Commonwealth of Massachusetts, Commonwealth of Pennsylvania, Commonwealth of Virginia, DC, EPA, Andrew Wheeler, Alliance of Automobile Manufacturers, Association of Global Automakers, Inc. and Advanced Energy Economy, Consumer Federation of America and South Coast Air Quality Management District in 18-1114, EPA, National Coalition for Advanced Transportation and Advanced Energy Economy in 18-1118, EPA, Environmental Defense Fund, Center for Biological Diversity, Natural Resources Defense Council, Sierra Club, Public Citizen, Inc., Conservation Law Foundation, Union of Concerned Scientists and Advanced Energy Economy in 18-1139, EPA, Consolidated Edision Company of New York, Inc, National Grid USA, New York Power Authority, City of Seattle and Advanced Energy Economy in 18-1162. [Volumes: 1] [Service Date: 05/20/2019 ] [18-1114, 18-1118, 18-1139, 18-1162] (Forgie, Julia)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01208125119 Filed: 5/6/2019, Entered: None ?
                                        APPELLANT REPLY BRIEF [1786309] filed by State of California, State of Connecticut, State of Delaware, DC, State of Illinois, State of Iowa, State of Maine, State of Maryland, Commonwealth of Massachusetts, State of Minnesota, State of New Jersey, State of New York, State of Oregon, Commonwealth of Pennsylvania, State of Rhode Island, State of Vermont, Commonwealth of Virginia and State of Washington in 18-1114 [Service Date: 05/06/2019 ] Length of Brief: 5,084 Words. [18-1114, 18-1118, 18-1139, 18-1162] (Zaft, David)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01208125097 Filed: 5/6/2019, Entered: None ?
                                          APPELLANT REPLY BRIEF [1786301] filed by Center for Biological Diversity, Conservation Law Foundation, Environmental Defense Fund, Natural Resources Defense Council, Public Citizen, Inc., Sierra Club and Union of Concerned Scientists in 18-1139 [Service Date: 05/06/2019 ] Length of Brief: 1963 words. [18-1114, 18-1118, 18-1139, 18-1162] (Donahue, Sean)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01208125088 Filed: 5/6/2019, Entered: None ?
                                            APPELLANT REPLY BRIEF [1786298] filed by National Coalition for Advanced Transportation in 18-1118, Consolidated Edision Company of New York, Inc, National Grid USA, New York Power Authority and City of Seattle in 18-1162 [Service Date: 05/06/2019 ] Length of Brief: 1,931 Words. [18-1114, 18-1118, 18-1139, 18-1162] (Wyman, Robert)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01208119982 Filed: 4/16/2019, Entered: None ?
                                              NOTICE [1783172] to substitute attorney Gerald D. Reid substituted by Mary M. Sauer and Laura E. Jensen filed by State of Maine [Service Date: 04/16/2019 ] [18-1114] (Jensen, Laura)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01208119565 Filed: 4/15/2019, Entered: None ?
                                                INTERVENOR FOR APPELLEE FINAL BRIEF [1782941] filed by Alliance of Automobile Manufacturers and Association of Global Automakers, Inc. in 18-1114 [Service Date: 04/15/2019 ] Length of Brief: 9,099 words. [18-1114, 18-1118, 18-1139, 18-1162] (Clement, Paul)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01208117575 Filed: 4/8/2019, Entered: None ?
                                                  APPELLEE BRIEF [1781696] filed by EPA and Andrew Wheeler in 18-1114, EPA in 18-1118, 18-1139, 18-1162 [Service Date: 04/08/2019 ] Length of Brief: 15,551 words. [18-1114, 18-1118, 18-1139, 18-1162] (Hostetler, Eric)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Blank  Filed: 2/27/2019, Entered: None ?
                                                    PER ABOVE ORDER lodged Amicus brief [1774301-2] is filed [18-1114, 18-1118, 18-1139, 18-1162]
                                                      LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01208106406 Filed: 2/27/2019, Entered: None ?
                                                      CLERK'S ORDER [1775115] filed granting the unopposed motion of Lyft, Inc. to participate as amicus curiae [1774300-2], The Clerk is directed to file the lodged Amicus brief [1774301-2] [18-1114, 18-1118, 18-1139, 18-1162]
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01208106288 Filed: 2/26/2019, Entered: None ?
                                                        CORRECTED APPELLANT BRIEF [1775045] filed by State of California, State of Connecticut, State of Delaware, State of Illinois, State of Iowa, State of Maine, State of Maryland, State of Minnesota, State of New Jersey, State of New York, State of Oregon, State of Rhode Island, State of Vermont, State of Washington, Commonwealth of Massachusetts, Commonwealth of Pennsylvania, Commonwealth of Virginia and DC in 18-1114 [Service Date: 02/26/2019 ] Length of Brief: 10,671 Words. [18-1114, 18-1118, 18-1139, 18-1162] (Zaft, David)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01208106285 Filed: 2/26/2019, Entered: None ?
                                                          LETTER [1775044] Regarding Corrected Version of the State Petitioners' Opening Brief filed by State of California, State of Connecticut, State of Delaware, State of Illinois, State of Maine, State of Maryland, State of Minnesota, State of New Jersey, State of New York, State of Oregon, State of Vermont, State of Washington, Commonwealth of Massachusetts, Commonwealth of Pennsylvania, Commonwealth of Virginia, DC, State of Iowa and State of Rhode Island in 18-1114 [Service Date: 02/26/2019 ] [18-1114, 18-1118, 18-1139, 18-1162] (Zaft, David)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01208106052 Filed: 2/26/2019, Entered: None ?
                                                            CORRECTED AMICUS FOR APPELLANT BRIEF [1774934] filed by Boulder County, City of Ann Arbor, City of Baltimore, City of Chicago, City of Clarkston, City of Coral Gables, City of Los Angeles, City of Minneapolis, City of New York, City of Oakland, City of Pittsburgh, City of San Francisco, City of Santa Monica, City of West Palm Beach, County of Santa Clara, King County, National League of Cities and U.S. Conference of Mayors in 18-1114, 18-1118, 18-1139, 18-1162 [Service Date: 02/26/2019 ] Length of Brief: 5933 words. [18-1114, 18-1118, 18-1139, 18-1162] (Burger, Michael)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01208105826 Filed: 2/25/2019, Entered: None ?
                                                              CORRECTED AMICUS FOR APPELLANT BRIEF [1774831] filed by Advanced Energy Economy [Service Date: 02/25/2019 ] Length of Brief: 6,495. [18-1114] (Guzy, Gary)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01208105823 Filed: 2/25/2019, Entered: None ?
                                                                LETTER [1774830] Regarding Corrected Version of the Opening Brief filed by Advanced Energy Economy filed by Advanced Energy Economy [Service Date: 02/25/2019 ] [18-1114] (Guzy, Gary)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01208105571 Filed: 2/25/2019, Entered: None ?
                                                                  CORRECTED APPELLANT BRIEF [1774688] filed by National Coalition for Advanced Transportation in 18-1118, Consolidated Edision Company of New York, Inc, National Grid USA, New York Power Authority and City of Seattle in 18-1162 [Service Date: 02/25/2019 ] Length of Brief: 3,523 Words. [18-1114, 18-1118, 18-1139, 18-1162] (Wyman, Robert)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01208105563 Filed: 2/25/2019, Entered: None ?
                                                                    LETTER [1774682] Regarding Corrected Version of the Opening Brief filed by National Coalition for Advanced Transportation in 18-1118, Consolidated Edision Company of New York, Inc, National Grid USA, New York Power Authority and City of Seattle in 18-1162 [Service Date: 02/25/2019 ] [18-1114, 18-1118, 18-1139, 18-1162] (O'Connor, Devin)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01208105356 Filed: 2/22/2019, Entered: None ?
                                                                      CORRECTED APPELLANT BRIEF [1774572] filed by Center for Biological Diversity, Environmental Defense Fund, Natural Resources Defense Council, Public Citizen, Inc., Sierra Club, Union of Concerned Scientists and Conservation Law Foundation in 18-1139 [Service Date: 02/22/2019 ] Length of Brief: 3796 words. [18-1114, 18-1118, 18-1139, 18-1162] (Donahue, Sean)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01208105353 Filed: 2/22/2019, Entered: None ?
                                                                        LETTER [1774571] letter concerning corrected brief. filed by Center for Biological Diversity, Conservation Law Foundation, Environmental Defense Fund, Natural Resources Defense Council, Union of Concerned Scientists, Sierra Club and Public Citizen, Inc. in 18-1139 [Service Date: 02/22/2019 ] [18-1114, 18-1118, 18-1139, 18-1162] (Donahue, Sean)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01208104959 Filed: 2/22/2019, Entered: None ?
                                                                          CORRECTED AMICUS FOR APPELLANT BRIEF [1774363] filed by Consumer Federation of America in 18-1114 [Service Date: 02/22/2019 ] Length of Brief: Revised Brief contains 4,229 words. [18-1114, 18-1118, 18-1139, 18-1162] (Palmore, Joseph)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01208104832 Filed: 2/21/2019, Entered: None ?
                                                                            AMICUS FOR APPELLANT BRIEF [1774301] lodged by Lyft, Inc. in 18-1114 [Service Date: 02/21/2019 ] Length of Brief: 2,683 Words. [18-1114, 18-1118, 18-1139, 18-1162]--[Edited 02/22/2019 by LMF] (Marx, Jared)
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01208104829 Filed: 2/21/2019, Entered: None ?
                                                                              MOTION [1774300] to participate as amicus curiae [Disclosure Listing: Attached] filed by Lyft, Inc. [Service Date: 02/21/2019 ] [18-1114, 18-1118, 18-1139, 18-1162] (Marx, Jared)
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01208104704 Filed: 2/21/2019, Entered: None ?
                                                                                LETTER [1774230] confirming its intent to file a revised Amicus Curiae Brief in light of the February 19, 2019 Letter to all Parties. filed by Consumer Federation of America in 18-1114 [Service Date: 02/21/2019 ] [18-1114, 18-1118, 18-1139, 18-1162] (Palmore, Joseph)
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01208104500 Filed: 2/20/2019, Entered: None ?
                                                                                  CORRECTED AMICUS FOR APPELLANT BRIEF [1774103] filed by South Coast Air Quality Management District in 18-1114 [Service Date: 02/20/2019 ] Length of Brief: 3,171 Words. [18-1114, 18-1118, 18-1139, 18-1162] (Tomasovic, Brian)
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01208103803 Filed: 2/19/2019, Entered: None ?
                                                                                    LETTER [1773728] sent to counsel concerning the use of uncommon acronyms and abbreviations in briefs. [18-1114, 18-1118, 18-1139, 18-1162]
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01208103422 Filed: 2/14/2019, Entered: None ?
                                                                                      AMICUS FOR APPELLANT BRIEF [1773518] filed by Advanced Energy Economy [Service Date: 02/14/2019 ] Length of Brief: 6,477. [18-1114] (Guzy, Gary)
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01208103405 Filed: 2/14/2019, Entered: None ?
                                                                                        MOTION [1773507] to participate as amicus curiae [Disclosure Listing: Attached] filed by Lyft, Inc. [Service Date: 02/14/2019 ] [18-1114, 18-1118, 18-1139, 18-1162]-[Edited 02/20/2019 by LMF] (Marx, Jared)
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01208103384 Filed: 2/14/2019, Entered: None ?
                                                                                          AMICUS FOR APPELLANT BRIEF [1773498] filed by State of Colorado [Service Date: 02/14/2019 ] Length of Brief: 1,868 Words. [18-1114] (Olson, Eric)
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01208103341 Filed: 2/14/2019, Entered: None ?
                                                                                            AMICUS FOR APPELLANT BRIEF [1773475] filed by South Coast Air Quality Management District in 18-1114 [Service Date: 02/14/2019 ] Length of Brief: 3,092 Words. [18-1114, 18-1118, 18-1139, 18-1162] (Tomasovic, Brian)
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01208103302 Filed: 2/14/2019, Entered: None ?
                                                                                              NOTICE [1773449] of intention to participate as amicus curiae [Disclosure Listing: Not Applicable to this Party] filed by State of Colorado [Service Date: 02/14/2019 ] [18-1114]--[Edited 02/14/2019 by LMF] (Olson, Eric)
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01208103242 Filed: 2/14/2019, Entered: None ?
                                                                                                AMICUS FOR APPELLANT BRIEF [1773421] filed by Boulder County, City of Ann Arbor, City of Baltimore, City of Chicago, City of Clarkston, City of Coral Gables, City of Los Angeles, City of Minneapolis, City of New York, City of Oakland, City of Pittsburgh, City of San Francisco, City of Santa Monica, City of West Palm Beach, County of Santa Clara, King County, National League of Cities and U.S. Conference of Mayors in 18-1114, 18-1162, 18-1139, 18-1118 [Service Date: 02/14/2019 ] Length of Brief: 5,883 words. [18-1114, 18-1162, 18-1139, 18-1118] (Burger, Michael)
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01208103187 Filed: 2/14/2019, Entered: None ?
                                                                                                  AMICUS FOR APPELLANT BRIEF [1773388] filed by Consumer Federation of America in 18-1114 [Service Date: 02/14/2019 ] Length of Brief: 4,170 Words. [18-1114, 18-1118, 18-1139, 18-1162] (Palmore, Joseph)
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01208101541 Filed: 2/7/2019, Entered: None ?
                                                                                                    APPELLANT BRIEF [1772468] filed by State of California, State of Connecticut, State of Delaware, State of Illinois, State of Iowa, State of Maine, State of Maryland, State of Minnesota, State of New Jersey, State of New York, State of Oregon, State of Rhode Island, State of Vermont, State of Washington, Commonwealth of Massachusetts, Commonwealth of Pennsylvania, Commonwealth of Virginia and DC in 18-1114 [Service Date: 02/07/2019 ] Length of Brief: 10,664 Words. [18-1114, 18-1118, 18-1139, 18-1162] (Zaft, David)
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01208101531 Filed: 2/7/2019, Entered: None ?
                                                                                                      APPELLANT BRIEF [1772465] filed by National Coalition for Advanced Transportation in 18-1118, Consolidated Edision Company of New York, Inc, National Grid USA, New York Power Authority and City of Seattle in 18-1162 [Service Date: 02/07/2019 ] Length of Brief: 3,519 Words. [18-1114, 18-1118, 18-1139, 18-1162] (Wyman, Robert)
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01208101508 Filed: 2/7/2019, Entered: None ?
                                                                                                        APPELLANT BRIEF [1772455] filed by Center for Biological Diversity, Conservation Law Foundation, Environmental Defense Fund, Natural Resources Defense Council, Public Citizen, Inc., Sierra Club and Union of Concerned Scientists in 18-1139 [Service Date: 02/07/2019 ] Length of Brief: 3798 words. [18-1114, 18-1118, 18-1139, 18-1162] (Donahue, Sean)
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01208101387 Filed: 2/7/2019, Entered: None ?
                                                                                                          CLERK'S ORDER [1772374] filed granting motion to participate as amicus curiae [1768190-2] [18-1114, 18-1118, 18-1139, 18-1162]
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01208097058 Filed: 1/24/2019, Entered: None ?
                                                                                                            ENTRY OF APPEARANCE [1770009] filed by Vera Pardee on behalf of Petitioner Sierra Club in 18-1139. [18-1139, 18-1114, 18-1118, 18-1162] (Pardee, Vera)
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01208096037 Filed: 1/22/2019, Entered: None ?
                                                                                                              ENTRY OF APPEARANCE [1769395] filed by Robert Wyman, II and co-counsel Joel C. Beauvais on behalf of Petitioner National Coalition for Advanced Transportation in 18-1118. [18-1114, 18-1118, 18-1139, 18-1162] (Beauvais, Joel)
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01208093736 Filed: 1/14/2019, Entered: None ?
                                                                                                                MOTION [1768190] to participate as amicus curiae [Disclosure Listing: Attached] filed by Advanced Energy Economy [Service Date: 01/14/2019 ] [18-1114, 18-1118, 18-1139, 18-1162]-[Edited 01/16/2019 by LMF] (Guzy, Gary)
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01208093646 Filed: 1/11/2019, Entered: None ?Court Filing
                                                                                                                  PER CURIAM ORDER [1768141] filed setting briefing schedule: PETITIONER Brief due 02/07/2019 not to exceed 18,000 words. AMICUS FOR PETITIONER Brief due 02/14/2019 not to exceed 6,500 words. RESPONDENT Brief due on 04/08/2019 not to exceed 18,000 words. INTERVENOR FOR RESPONDENT Brief due 04/15/2019 not to exceed 9,100 words. AMICUS FOR RESPONDENT Brief due 04/15/2019 not to exceed 6,500 words. PETITIONER Reply Brief due 05/06/2019 not to exceed 9,000 words. DEFERRED APPENDIX due 05/20/2019. FINAL BRIEFS due 05/28/2019. Before Judges: Henderson, Rogers and Wilkins. [18-1114, 18-1118, 18-1139, 18-1162]
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01208088991 Filed: 12/21/2018, Entered: None ?
                                                                                                                    JOINT UNOPPOSED MOTION [1765576] to establish briefing schedule, concerning briefing format filed by State of California, State of Connecticut, State of Delaware, State of Illinois, State of Iowa, State of Maine, State of Maryland, State of Minnesota, State of New Jersey, State of New York, State of Oregon, State of Rhode Island, State of Vermont, State of Washington, Commonwealth of Massachusetts, Commonwealth of Pennsylvania, Commonwealth of Virginia, DC, EPA, Andrew Wheeler and Alliance of Automobile Manufacturers and Association of Global Automakers, Inc. in 18-1114, National Coalition for Advanced Transportation and EPA in 18-1118, Environmental Defense Fund, Center for Biological Diversity, Natural Resources Defense Council, Sierra Club, Public Citizen, Inc., Conservation Law Foundation, Union of Concerned Scientists and EPA in 18-1139, Consolidated Edision Company of New York, Inc, National Grid USA, New York Power Authority, City of Seattle and EPA in 18-1162 [Service Date: 12/21/2018 ] Length Certification: 2,834 words. [18-1114, 18-1118, 18-1139, 18-1162] (Zaft, David)
                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01208087895 Filed: 12/19/2018, Entered: None ?
                                                                                                                      ENTRY OF APPEARANCE [1765046] filed by Maya Golden Krasner on behalf of Petitioner Center for Biological Diversity in 18-1139. [18-1139, 18-1114] (Golden-Krasner, Maya)
                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01208082223 Filed: 11/28/2018, Entered: None ?
                                                                                                                        NOTICE [1761976] to withdraw attorney Vera P. Pardee who represented Center for Biological Diversity in 18-1139 filed by Center for Biological Diversity [Service Date: 11/28/2018 ] [18-1139] (Crystal, Howard)
                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01208080457 Filed: 11/21/2018, Entered: None ?
                                                                                                                          CLERK'S ORDER [1761037] filed granting motion to participate as amicus curiae [1749205-2] [18-1114, 18-1118, 18-1139, 18-1162]
                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01208080409 Filed: 11/21/2018, Entered: None ?Court Filing
                                                                                                                            PER CURIAM ORDER [1760998] filed referring motions to dismiss case for lack of jurisdiction [1740047-2] [1739996-2 to the merits panel to which this case is assigned., ; directing party to file briefing format - Proposed formats due 12/21/2018. See order for further detail. Before Judges: Tatel, Griffith and Srinivasan. [18-1114, 18-1118, 18-1139, 18-1162]
                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01208071334 Filed: 10/19/2018, Entered: None ?
                                                                                                                              NOTICE [1756058] of intention to participate as amicus curiae [Disclosure Listing: Attached] filed by Consumer Federation of America [Service Date: 10/19/2018 ] [18-1114, 18-1118, 18-1139, 18-1162] (Palmore, Joseph)
                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01208071024 Filed: 10/18/2018, Entered: None ?
                                                                                                                                CLERK'S ORDER [1755923] filed granting motion for leave to intervene [1732897-2] in 18-1114, granting motion for leave to intervene [1732890-2] in 18-1114, 18-1118, 18-1139 [18-1114, 18-1118, 18-1139, 18-1162]
                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01208063618 Filed: 9/21/2018, Entered: None ?
                                                                                                                                  REPLY [1751977] filed by Alliance of Automobile Manufacturers and Association of Global Automakers, Inc. in 18-1114 to response [1748105-2], [1748102-2], [1748067-2] [Service Date: 09/21/2018 by CM/ECF NDA] Length Certification: 2,599 Words. [18-1114, 18-1118, 18-1139, 18-1162] (Clement, Paul)
                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01208063603 Filed: 9/21/2018, Entered: None ?
                                                                                                                                    REPLY [1751968] filed by EPA and Andrew Wheeler in 18-1114, EPA in 18-1118, 18-1139, 18-1162 to response [1748105-2], [1748067-2], [1748102-2] [Service Date: 09/21/2018 by CM/ECF NDA] Length Certification: 3839 words. [18-1114, 18-1118, 18-1139, 18-1162] (Hostetler, Eric)
                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01208062762 Filed: 9/19/2018, Entered: None ?Court Filing
                                                                                                                                      PER CURIAM ORDER [1751495] granting unopposed motion to exceed the word limit [1750623-2] in part. Respondents may file a reply in support of the motion to dismiss not to exceed 3,900 words. Before Judges: Henderson, Millett and Wilkins. [18-1114, 18-1118, 18-1139, 18-1162]
                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01208061220 Filed: 9/14/2018, Entered: None ?
                                                                                                                                        UNOPPOSED MOTION [1750623] to exceed reply filed by EPA and Andrew Wheeler in 18-1114, EPA in 18-1118, 18-1139, 18-1162 [Service Date: 09/14/2018 ] Length Certification: 412. [18-1114, 18-1118, 18-1139, 18-1162] (Hostetler, Eric)
                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01208058559 Filed: 9/6/2018, Entered: None ?
                                                                                                                                          CORRECTED MOTION [1749205] to participate as amicus curiae [Disclosure Listing: Attached] filed by Local Government Coalition [Service Date: 09/06/2018 ] [18-1114, 18-1118, 18-1139, 18-1162]--[Edited 09/07/2018 by LMF] (Burger, Michael)
                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01208057825 Filed: 9/4/2018, Entered: None ?
                                                                                                                                            MOTION [1748807] to participate as amicus curiae [Disclosure Listing: Attached] filed by Local Government Coalition [Service Date: 09/04/2018 ] [18-1114, 18-1118, 18-1139, 18-1162]--[Edited 09/06/2018 by LMF] (Burger, Michael)
                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01208056402 Filed: 8/29/2018, Entered: None ?
                                                                                                                                              RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION [1748105] to motion [1740047-2], motion [1739996-2] filed by Center for Biological Diversity, Conservation Law Foundation, Environmental Defense Fund, Natural Resources Defense Council, Public Citizen, Inc., Sierra Club and Union of Concerned Scientists in 18-1139 [Service Date: 08/29/2018 by CM/ECF NDA] Length Certification: 5042 words. [18-1139, 18-1114, 18-1118, 18-1162] (Donahue, Sean)
                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01208056392 Filed: 8/29/2018, Entered: None ?
                                                                                                                                                RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION [1748102] to motion to dismiss case for lack of jurisdiction [1739996-2], motion to dismiss case for lack of jurisdiction [1740047-2] filed by State of California, State of Connecticut, State of Delaware, State of Illinois, State of Iowa, State of Maine, State of Maryland, State of Minnesota, State of New Jersey, State of New York, State of Oregon, State of Rhode Island, State of Vermont, State of Washington, Commonwealth of Massachusetts, Commonwealth of Pennsylvania, Commonwealth of Virginia and DC in 18-1114 [Service Date: 08/29/2018 by CM/ECF NDA] Length Certification: 5,189 Words. [18-1114, 18-1118, 18-1139, 18-1162] (Zaft, David)
                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01208056300 Filed: 8/29/2018, Entered: None ?
                                                                                                                                                  RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION [1748067] to motion to dismiss case for lack of jurisdiction [1740047-2], motion to dismiss case for lack of jurisdiction [1739996-2] filed by National Coalition for Advanced Transportation in 18-1118, Consolidated Edision Company of New York, Inc, National Grid USA, New York Power Authority and City of Seattle in 18-1162 [Service Date: 08/29/2018 by CM/ECF NDA] Length Certification: 5193. [18-1114, 18-1118, 18-1139, 18-1162] (Wyman, Robert)
                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01208054073 Filed: 8/22/2018, Entered: None ?
                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE [1746878] to withdraw attorney Donald Lynn Ristow Jr. who represented City of Seattle, Consolidated Edision Company of New York, Inc, National Grid USA and New York Power Authority in 18-1162 filed by Consolidated Edision Company of New York, Inc, National Grid USA, New York Power Authority and City of Seattle in 18-1162 [Service Date: 08/22/2018 ] [18-1162, 18-1114, 18-1118, 18-1139] (Poloncarz, Kevin)
                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01208050363 Filed: 8/9/2018, Entered: None ?
                                                                                                                                                      CLERK'S ORDER [1744839] filed granting unopposed motion by the South Coast Air Quality Management District for leave to participate as amicus curiae in support of petitioners State of California, et al. [1743905-2] [18-1114, 18-1118, 18-1139, 18-1162]
                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01208049777 Filed: 8/8/2018, Entered: None ?
                                                                                                                                                        ENTRY OF APPEARANCE [1744479] filed by Travis Annatoyn on behalf of Petitioner Union of Concerned Scientists in 18-1139. [18-1139, 18-1114, 18-1118, 18-1162] (Annatoyn, Travis)
                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01208048717 Filed: 8/3/2018, Entered: None ?
                                                                                                                                                          MOTION [1743905] to participate as amicus curiae [Disclosure Listing: Not Applicable to this Party] filed by South Coast Air Quality Management District [Service Date: 08/03/2018 ] [18-1114, 18-1118, 18-1139, 18-1162]--[Edited 08/07/2018 by LMF] (Tomasovic, Brian)
                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01208043076 Filed: 7/16/2018, Entered: None ?
                                                                                                                                                            CERTIFICATE AS TO PARTIES, RULINGS AND RELATED CASES [1740813] filed by City of Seattle, Consolidated Edision Company of New York, Inc, National Grid USA and New York Power Authority in 18-1162 [Service Date: 07/16/2018 ] [18-1162, 18-1114, 18-1118, 18-1139] (Ristow, Donald)
                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01208043070 Filed: 7/16/2018, Entered: None ?
                                                                                                                                                              STATEMENT OF ISSUES [1740811] filed by City of Seattle, Consolidated Edision Company of New York, Inc, National Grid USA and New York Power Authority in 18-1162 [Service Date: 07/16/2018 ] [18-1162, 18-1114, 18-1118, 18-1139] (Poloncarz, Kevin)
                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01208043067 Filed: 7/16/2018, Entered: None ?
                                                                                                                                                                DOCKETING STATEMENT [1740810] filed by City of Seattle, Consolidated Edision Company of New York, Inc, National Grid USA and New York Power Authority in 18-1162 [Service Date: 07/16/2018 ] [18-1162, 18-1114, 18-1118, 18-1139] (Poloncarz, Kevin)
                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01208041774 Filed: 7/10/2018, Entered: None ?
                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION [1740047] to dismiss case for lack of jurisdiction (Response to Motion served by hand due on 07/20/2018). (Response to Motion served by mail due on 07/20/2018) filed by Alliance of Automobile Manufacturers and Association of Global Automakers, Inc. in 18-1114 (Service Date: 07/10/2018 by CM/ECF NDA) Length Certification: 5,119 Words. [18-1114, 18-1118, 18-1139, 18-1162] (Clement, Paul)
                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01208041677 Filed: 7/10/2018, Entered: None ?
                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION [1739996] to dismiss case for lack of jurisdiction (Response to Motion served by hand due on 07/20/2018). (Response to Motion served by mail due on 07/20/2018) filed by EPA and E. Scott Pruitt in 18-1114, EPA in 18-1118, 18-1139, 18-1162 (Service Date: 07/10/2018 by CM/ECF NDA) Length Certification: 4387 Words. [18-1114, 18-1118, 18-1139, 18-1162] (Hostetler, Eric)
                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01208039860 Filed: 7/3/2018, Entered: None ?
                                                                                                                                                                      ENTRY OF APPEARANCE [1738984] filed by Michael J. Myers on behalf of Petitioner State of New York in 18-1114. [18-1114, 18-1118, 18-1139, 18-1162] (Myers, Michael)
                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01208035442 Filed: 6/18/2018, Entered: None ?
                                                                                                                                                                        CERTIFICATE AS TO PARTIES, RULINGS AND RELATED CASES [1736496] filed by Center for Biological Diversity, Conservation Law Foundation, Environmental Defense Fund, Natural Resources Defense Council, Public Citizen, Inc., Sierra Club and Union of Concerned Scientists in 18-1139 [Service Date: 06/18/2018 ] [18-1139, 18-1114, 18-1118, 18-1162] (Donahue, Sean)
                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01208035437 Filed: 6/18/2018, Entered: None ?
                                                                                                                                                                          STATEMENT OF ISSUES [1736490] filed by Center for Biological Diversity, Conservation Law Foundation, Environmental Defense Fund, Natural Resources Defense Council, Public Citizen, Inc., Sierra Club and Union of Concerned Scientists in 18-1139 [Service Date: 06/18/2018 ] [18-1139, 18-1114, 18-1118, 18-1162] (Donahue, Sean)
                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01208035434 Filed: 6/18/2018, Entered: None ?
                                                                                                                                                                            DOCKETING STATEMENT [1736488] filed by Center for Biological Diversity, Conservation Law Foundation, Environmental Defense Fund, Natural Resources Defense Council, Public Citizen, Inc., Sierra Club and Union of Concerned Scientists in 18-1139 [Service Date: 06/18/2018 ] [18-1139, 18-1114, 18-1118, 18-1162] (Donahue, Sean)
                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01208035251 Filed: 6/18/2018, Entered: None ?
                                                                                                                                                                              CERTIFIED INDEX TO RECORD [1736370] filed by EPA and E. Scott Pruitt in 18-1114, EPA in 18-1118, 18-1139, 18-1162 [Service Date: 06/18/2018 ] [18-1114, 18-1118, 18-1139, 18-1162] (Hostetler, Eric)
                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01208035044 Filed: 6/15/2018, Entered: None ?
                                                                                                                                                                                CLERK'S ORDER [1736265] filed consolidating cases 18-1162 (Consolidation started 06/15/2018) with 18-1114; directing party to file in 18-1162 initial submissions: PETITIONER docketing statement due 07/16/2018. PETITIONER statement of issues due 07/16/2018 [18-1114, 18-1118, 18-1139, 18-1162]
                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01208034703 Filed: 6/15/2018, Entered: None ?
                                                                                                                                                                                  CLERK'S ORDER [1736112] filed considering motion to extend time [1735800-2]; PETITIONER, RESPONDENT dispositive motions, if any, due 07/10/2018; Response to Motion due on 08/29/2018. Reply due 09/21/2018 [18-1114, 18-1118, 18-1139]
                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01208034047 Filed: 6/13/2018, Entered: None ?
                                                                                                                                                                                    JOINT MOTION [1735800] to extend time to file motion to 07/10/2018 filed by Commonwealth of Massachusetts, Commonwealth of Pennsylvania, Commonwealth of Virginia, DC, State of California, State of Connecticut, State of Delaware, State of Illinois, State of Iowa, State of Maine, State of Maryland, State of Minnesota, State of New Jersey, State of New York, State of Oregon, State of Rhode Island, State of Vermont, State of Washington and EPA and E. Scott Pruitt in 18-1114, EPA and National Coalition for Advanced Transportation in 18-1118, Center for Biological Diversity, Conservation Law Foundation, Environmental Defense Fund, Natural Resources Defense Council, Public Citizen, Inc., Sierra Club, Union of Concerned Scientists and EPA in 18-1139 (Service Date: 06/13/2018 by CM/ECF NDA) Length Certification: 406 Words. [18-1114, 18-1118, 18-1139] (Zaft, David)
                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01208031205 Filed: 6/4/2018, Entered: None ?
                                                                                                                                                                                      ENTRY OF APPEARANCE [1734266] filed by Julia K. Forgie and co-counsel Gary E. Tavetian, David Zonana on behalf of Petitioner State of California in 18-1114. [18-1114, 18-1118, 18-1139] (Zaft, David)
                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01208031202 Filed: 6/4/2018, Entered: None ?
                                                                                                                                                                                        UNDERLYING DECISION IN CASE [1734265] submitted by State of California, State of Connecticut, State of Delaware, State of Illinois, State of Iowa, State of Maine, State of Maryland, State of Minnesota, State of New Jersey, State of New York, State of Oregon, State of Rhode Island, State of Vermont, State of Washington, Commonwealth of Massachusetts, Commonwealth of Pennsylvania, Commonwealth of Virginia and DC in 18-1114 [Service Date: 06/04/2018 ] [18-1114, 18-1118, 18-1139] (Zaft, David)
                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01208031199 Filed: 6/4/2018, Entered: None ?
                                                                                                                                                                                          STATEMENT OF ISSUES [1734264] filed by State of California, State of Connecticut, State of Delaware, State of Illinois, State of Iowa, State of Maine, State of Maryland, State of Minnesota, State of New Jersey, State of New York, State of Oregon, State of Rhode Island, State of Vermont, State of Washington, Commonwealth of Massachusetts, Commonwealth of Pennsylvania, Commonwealth of Virginia and DC in 18-1114 [Service Date: 06/04/2018 ] [18-1114, 18-1118] (Zaft, David)
                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01208031196 Filed: 6/4/2018, Entered: None ?
                                                                                                                                                                                            STATEMENT OF INTENT REGARDING APPENDIX DEFERRAL [1734263] filed by State of California, State of Connecticut, State of Delaware, State of Illinois, State of Iowa, State of Maine, State of Maryland, State of Minnesota, State of New Jersey, State of New York, State of Oregon, State of Rhode Island, State of Vermont, State of Washington, Commonwealth of Massachusetts, Commonwealth of Pennsylvania, Commonwealth of Virginia and DC in 18-1114 [Service Date: 06/04/2018 ] Intent: AppxDeferred [18-1114, 18-1118, 18-1139] (Zaft, David)
                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01208031193 Filed: 6/4/2018, Entered: None ?
                                                                                                                                                                                              DOCKETING STATEMENT [1734262] filed by State of California, State of Connecticut, State of Delaware, State of Illinois, State of Iowa, State of Maine, State of Maryland, State of Minnesota, State of New Jersey, State of New York, State of Oregon, State of Rhode Island, State of Vermont, State of Washington, Commonwealth of Massachusetts, Commonwealth of Pennsylvania, Commonwealth of Virginia and DC in 18-1114 [Service Date: 06/04/2018 ] [18-1114, 18-1118, 18-1139] (Zaft, David)
                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01208031190 Filed: 6/4/2018, Entered: None ?
                                                                                                                                                                                                CERTIFICATE AS TO PARTIES, RULINGS AND RELATED CASES [1734261] filed by State of California, State of Connecticut, State of Delaware, State of Illinois, State of Iowa, State of Maine, State of Maryland, State of Minnesota, State of New Jersey, State of New York, State of Oregon, State of Rhode Island, State of Vermont, State of Washington, Commonwealth of Massachusetts, Commonwealth of Pennsylvania, Commonwealth of Virginia and DC in 18-1114 [Service Date: 06/04/2018 ] [18-1114, 18-1118, 18-1139] (Zaft, David)
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01208030935 Filed: 6/4/2018, Entered: None ?
                                                                                                                                                                                                  UNDERLYING DECISION IN CASE [1734130] submitted by National Coalition for Advanced Transportation [Service Date: 06/04/2018 ] [18-1118] (Wyman, Robert)
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01208030930 Filed: 6/4/2018, Entered: None ?
                                                                                                                                                                                                    STATEMENT OF INTENT REGARDING APPENDIX DEFERRAL [1734127] filed by National Coalition for Advanced Transportation [Service Date: 06/04/2018 ] Intent: AppxDeferred [18-1118] (Wyman, Robert)
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01208030925 Filed: 6/4/2018, Entered: None ?
                                                                                                                                                                                                      DOCKETING STATEMENT [1734125] filed by National Coalition for Advanced Transportation [Service Date: 06/04/2018 ] [18-1118] (Wyman, Robert)
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01208030919 Filed: 6/4/2018, Entered: None ?
                                                                                                                                                                                                        STATEMENT OF ISSUES [1734124] filed by National Coalition for Advanced Transportation [Service Date: 06/04/2018 ] [18-1118] (Wyman, Robert)
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01208030916 Filed: 6/4/2018, Entered: None ?
                                                                                                                                                                                                          CERTIFICATE AS TO PARTIES, RULINGS AND RELATED CASES [1734122] filed by National Coalition for Advanced Transportation [Service Date: 06/04/2018 ] [18-1118] (Wyman, Robert)
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01208029501 Filed: 5/30/2018, Entered: None ?
                                                                                                                                                                                                            ENTRY OF APPEARANCE [1733336] filed by Vera P. Pardee and co-counsel Howard M. Crystal on behalf of Petitioner Center for Biological Diversity in 18-1139. [18-1114, 18-1118, 18-1139] (Crystal, Howard)
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01208028678 Filed: 5/25/2018, Entered: None ?
                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION [1732897] for leave to intervene [Disclosure Listing: Attached] filed by Association of Global Automakers, Inc. [Service Date: 05/25/2018 ] [18-1114]--[Edited 06/01/2018 by LMF] (Ludwiszewski, Raymond)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01208028667 Filed: 5/25/2018, Entered: None ?
                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION [1732890] for leave to intervene [Disclosure Listing: Attached] filed by Alliance of Automobile Manufacturers [Service Date: 05/25/2018 ] [18-1114, 18-1118, 18-1139]-[Edited 06/01/2018 by LMF] (Clement, Paul)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01208026622 Filed: 5/18/2018, Entered: None ?
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ENTRY OF APPEARANCE [1731749] filed by Valerie S. Edge on behalf of Petitioner State of Delaware. [18-1114] (Edge, Valerie)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01208026509 Filed: 5/18/2018, Entered: None ?
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    CLERK'S ORDER [1731695] filed consolidating cases 18-1118, 18-1139 (Consolidation started 05/18/2018) with 18-1114; directing party to file in 18-1139 initial submissions: PETITIONER docketing statement due 06/18/2018. PETITIONER statement of issues due 06/18/2018. [18-1114, 18-1118, 18-1139]
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01208022437 Filed: 5/4/2018, Entered: None ?
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      CLERK'S ORDER [1729508] filed directing party to file initial submissions: PETITIONER docketing statement due 06/04/2018. PETITIONER certificate as to parties due 06/04/2018. PETITIONER statement of issues due 06/04/2018. PETITIONER underlying decision due 06/04/2018. PETITIONER deferred appendix statement due 06/04/2018. PETITIONER procedural motions due 06/04/2018. PETITIONER dispositive motions due 06/18/2018; directing party to file initial submissions: RESPONDENT entry of appearance due 06/04/2018. RESPONDENT procedural motions due 06/04/2018. RESPONDENT certified index to record due 06/18/2018. RESPONDENT dispositive motions due 06/18/2018 [18-1118]
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01208022434 Filed: 5/4/2018, Entered: None ?
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        CERTIFIED COPY [1729507] of Petition for Review sent to respondent [1729505-2] [18-1118]
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 01208022431 Filed: 5/3/2018, Entered: None ?
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          PETITION FOR REVIEW [1729505] of a decision by federal agency filed by National Coalition for Advanced Transportation [Service Date: 05/03/2018 ] Disclosure Statement: Attached; Certificate of Parties: Not Applicable to this Filing. [18-1118]
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank  Filed: 5/3/2018, Entered: None ?
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            PETITION FOR REVIEW CASE docketed. [18-1118]
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF

                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                                                                              This case has been viewed 168 times.

                                                                                                                                                                                                                              No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                               
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Need Password Help?