Mantak v. Maxwell Technologies, Inc. et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit California Southern District Court, Case No. 3:19-cv-00451-LAB-JLB

Tags
Last Updated December 16, 2020 at 9:14 PM ST (6.2 months ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Jonathan Mantak, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by WeissLaw LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Joel E. Elkins +1 310 208 2880 jelkins@weisslawllp.com
v.
No Logo Burkhard Goeschel, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Wilson Sonsini Goodrich & Rosati, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space David J. Berger +1 650 493 9300 +1 650 493 6811 dberger@wsgr.com
Space Joni L. Ostler +1 650 493 9300 +1 650 565 5100 jostler@wsgr.com
No Logo Franz J. Fink, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Wilson Sonsini Goodrich & Rosati, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space David J. Berger +1 650 493 9300 +1 650 493 6811 dberger@wsgr.com
Space Joni L. Ostler +1 650 493 9300 +1 650 565 5100 jostler@wsgr.com
No Logo Ilya Golubovich, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Wilson Sonsini Goodrich & Rosati, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space David J. Berger +1 650 493 9300 +1 650 493 6811 dberger@wsgr.com
Space Joni L. Ostler +1 650 493 9300 +1 650 565 5100 jostler@wsgr.com
No Logo John Mutch, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Wilson Sonsini Goodrich & Rosati, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space David J. Berger +1 650 493 9300 +1 650 493 6811 dberger@wsgr.com
Space Joni L. Ostler +1 650 493 9300 +1 650 565 5100 jostler@wsgr.com
No Logo Jorg Buchheim, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Wilson Sonsini Goodrich & Rosati, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space David J. Berger +1 650 493 9300 +1 650 493 6811 dberger@wsgr.com
Space Joni L. Ostler +1 650 493 9300 +1 650 565 5100 jostler@wsgr.com
Maxwell Technologies, Inc. Maxwell Technologies, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Wilson Sonsini Goodrich & Rosati, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space David J. Berger +1 650 493 9300 +1 650 493 6811 dberger@wsgr.com
Space Joni L. Ostler +1 650 493 9300 +1 650 565 5100 jostler@wsgr.com
No Logo Richard Bergman, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Wilson Sonsini Goodrich & Rosati, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space David J. Berger +1 650 493 9300 +1 650 493 6811 dberger@wsgr.com
Space Joni L. Ostler +1 650 493 9300 +1 650 565 5100 jostler@wsgr.com
No Logo Steve Bilodeau, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Wilson Sonsini Goodrich & Rosati, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space David J. Berger +1 650 493 9300 +1 650 493 6811 dberger@wsgr.com
Space Joni L. Ostler +1 650 493 9300 +1 650 565 5100 jostler@wsgr.com
No Logo JAMES DUFFY, Movant

Toggle Switch Represented by MONTEVERDE & ASSOCIATES

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space David Eldridge Bower +1 310 446 6652 +1 310 210 0605 dbower@monteverdelaw.com
Office San Diego
Filed 3/7/2019
Jury Demand Plaintiff
Demand
Nature of Suit 850 - Other Statutes: Securities/Commodities/Exchange
Cause Section 15 U.S.C. § 0078m(a) Securities Exchange Act
Jurisdiction Federal Question
Disposition
County XX US, Outside State
Terminated
Origin 1
Reopened
Lead Case
319-cv-01094-LAB-JLB
Related Case
319-cv-00337-CAB-JLB
Other Court Case None
Defendant Custody Status
Flags .,CONSOL,LNO
  Entries (19) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 12/16/2020, Entered: None Judgment - Clerk
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 12/16/2020, Entered: None Order Dismissing Case
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 5/27/2020, Entered: None Order to Show Cause
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 9/26/2019, Entered: None Order of Judge Transfer
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 9/5/2019, Entered: 9/5/2019 Order on Motion to consolidate casesCourt Filing
          ORDER Granting [13] Motion to Consolidate Related Actions, for Appointment as Lead Plaintiff, and for Approval of Lead Counsel. Cases Consolidated, 19cv1094-LAB-JLB; All future docketing will be done in the lead case. The Court appoints James Duffy as lead plaintiff. The Court approves James Duffy's selection of Monteverde & Associates as Lead Counsel for the class. The hearing currently set for 10/7/2019 is vacated. The clerk is directed to file a copy of this order in Mantak v. Maxwell Technologies, Inc., 19-cv-0451-LAB (JLB). Signed by Chief Judge Larry Alan Burns on 9/4/2019. (jdt)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 8/13/2019, Entered: 8/14/2019 Order Setting Briefing ScheduleCourt Filing
            ORDER Setting Briefing Schedule re [13] MOTION to Consolidate Related Actions and for Appointment as Lead Plaintiff and Approval of Lead Counsel: Any opposition to Mr. Duffy's motion must be filed no later than 8/28/2019. Any reply must be filed no later than 9/4/2019. The clerk is directed to file a copy of this order in Mantak v. Maxwell Techs., Inc., 19cv451. Signed by Chief Judge Larry Alan Burns on 8/13/2019. (Order filed concurrently in Duffy v. Maxwell Technologies, Inc. et al, 19cv1094) (jdt)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 8/12/2019, Entered: 8/12/2019, Terminated: 9/5/2019 Motion to consolidate cases
              MOTION to Consolidate Related Actions and for Appointment as Lead Plaintiff and Approval of Lead Counsel by James Duffy. (Attachments: # (1) Memo of Points and Authorities in Support of James Duffy's Motion to Consolidate Related Actions and for Appointment as Lead Plaintiff and Approval of Lead Counsel, # (2) Declaration of David E. Bower in Support of James Duffy's Motion to Consolidate Related Actions and for Appointment as Lead Plaintiff and Approval of Lead Counsel, # (3) Exhibit A to Bower Declaration - PSLRA Notice, # (4) Exhibit B to Bower Declaration - Monteverde Firm Resume)(Bower, David)Attorney David E. Bower added to party James Duffy(pty:mov) (jdt). Modified on 9/5/2019 to correct motion event (jdt).
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 6/26/2019, Entered: 6/26/2019 Order on Motion for extension of time to answerCourt Filing
                ORDER Granting Joint Motion for Extension of Time (Dkt. [11]). Signed by Chief Judge Larry Alan Burns on 6/26/2019. (jdt)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 6/25/2019, Entered: 6/25/2019, Terminated: 6/26/2019 motion for extension of time to file answer
                  Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer Joint Motion Regarding the Anticipated Amended Pleading and Briefing Schedule by Richard Bergman, Steve Bilodeau, Jorg Buchheim, Franz J. Fink, Burkhard Goeschel, Ilya Golubovich, Maxwell Technologies, Inc., John Mutch. (Berger, David) (jdt).
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 6/21/2019, Entered: 6/21/2019 Notice of Related Case
                    NOTICE OF RELATED CASE(S) by Richard Bergman, Steve Bilodeau, Jorg Buchheim, Franz J. Fink, Burkhard Goeschel, Ilya Golubovich, Maxwell Technologies, Inc., John Mutch of case(s) 3:19-CV-00395 3:19-cv-00377; 3:19-cv-00413; 3:19-cv-01094; 1:19-cv-01927. (Berger, David) Modified on 6/21/2019 - LNO not prepared. Case already assigned to low-number judges (jdt).
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 5/24/2019, Entered: 5/28/2019 Order on Motion for extension of time to answerCourt Filing
                      ORDER Granting Extension of Time (Dkt. [8]). Defendants shall file their response by 6/28/2019. Signed by Chief Judge Larry Alan Burns on 5/24/2019. (jdt)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 5/23/2019, Entered: 5/23/2019, Terminated: 5/24/2019 motion for extension of time to file answer
                        Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer to Complaint by Richard Bergman, Steve Bilodeau, Jorg Buchheim, Franz J. Fink, Burkhard Goeschel, Ilya Golubovich, Maxwell Technologies, Inc., John Mutch. (Berger, David) (jdt).
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 5/23/2019, Entered: 5/23/2019 Corporate Disclosure Statement
                          Corporate Disclosure Statement by Richard Bergman, Steve Bilodeau, Jorg Buchheim, Franz J. Fink, Burkhard Goeschel, Ilya Golubovich, Maxwell Technologies, Inc., John Mutch identifying Corporate Parent Tesla, Inc. for Maxwell Technologies, Inc. (Ostler, Joni) (jdt). (jao).
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 5/23/2019, Entered: 5/23/2019 Notice of appearance
                            NOTICE of Appearance of Joni Ostler by Joni L. Ostler on behalf of Richard Bergman, Steve Bilodeau, Jorg Buchheim, Franz J. Fink, Burkhard Goeschel, Ilya Golubovich, Maxwell Technologies, Inc., John Mutch (Ostler, Joni)Attorney Joni L. Ostler added to party Richard Bergman(pty:dft), Attorney Joni L. Ostler added to party Steve Bilodeau(pty:dft), Attorney Joni L. Ostler added to party Jorg Buchheim(pty:dft), Attorney Joni L. Ostler added to party Franz J. Fink(pty:dft), Attorney Joni L. Ostler added to party Burkhard Goeschel(pty:dft), Attorney Joni L. Ostler added to party Ilya Golubovich(pty:dft), Attorney Joni L. Ostler added to party Maxwell Technologies, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Joni L. Ostler added to party John Mutch(pty:dft) (jdt).
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 5/23/2019, Entered: 5/23/2019 Notice of appearance
                              NOTICE of Appearance of David J. Berger by David J Berger on behalf of Richard Bergman, Steve Bilodeau, Jorg Buchheim, Franz J. Fink, Burkhard Goeschel, Ilya Golubovich, Maxwell Technologies, Inc., John Mutch (Berger, David)Attorney David J Berger added to party Richard Bergman(pty:dft), Attorney David J Berger added to party Steve Bilodeau(pty:dft), Attorney David J Berger added to party Jorg Buchheim(pty:dft), Attorney David J Berger added to party Franz J. Fink(pty:dft), Attorney David J Berger added to party Burkhard Goeschel(pty:dft), Attorney David J Berger added to party Ilya Golubovich(pty:dft), Attorney David J Berger added to party Maxwell Technologies, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney David J Berger added to party John Mutch(pty:dft) (jdt).
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 3/12/2019, Entered: 3/12/2019 Order of Transfer Pursuant to Low Number RuleCourt Filing
                                ORDER OF TRANSFER PURSUANT TO LOW NUMBER RULE. Case reassigned to Judge Larry Alan Burns and Magistrate Judge Jill L. Burkhardt for all further proceedings. Judge Cathy Ann Bencivengo, Magistrate Judge Barbara Lynn Major no longer assigned to case. Create association to 3:19-cv-00337-CAB-JLB. The new case number is 19-cv-0451-LAB-JLB.. Signed by Judge Cathy Ann Bencivengo on 3/11/2019. Signed by Judge Larry Alan Burns on 3/8/2019.(anh)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 3/7/2019, Entered: 3/7/2019 Notice of Related Case
                                  NOTICE OF RELATED CASE(S) by Jonathan Mantak of case(s) 19-cv-00377 re [1] Complaint,, [2] Summons Issued . (Elkins, Joel) (anh).
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 3/7/2019, Entered: 3/7/2019 Summons issued
                                    Summons Issued. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should print this summons and serve it in accordance with Rule 4, Fed.R.Civ.P and LR 4.1. (tcf) (jao).
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 3/7/2019, Entered: 3/7/2019 ComplaintCourt Filing
                                      COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Richard Bergman, Steve Bilodeau, Jorg Buchheim, Franz J. Fink, Burkhard Goeschel, Ilya Golubovich, Maxwell Technologies, Inc., John Mutch (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0974-12265835.), filed by Jonathan Mantak. (Attachments: # (1) Civil Cover Sheet, # (2) Certification Pursuant to Federal Securities Laws)The new case number is 3:19-cv-451-CAB-BLM. Judge Cathy Ann Bencivengo and Magistrate Judge Barbara Lynn Major are assigned to the case. (Elkins, Joel)(tcf) (jao).
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF

                                        Statistics

                                        This case has been viewed 26 times.

                                        No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                        Space
                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                         
                                        PlainSite
                                        Sign Up
                                        Need Password Help?