Duffy v. Maxwell Technologies, Inc. et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit California Southern District Court, Case No. 3:19-cv-01094-LAB-JLB

Tags
Last Updated February 4, 2020 at 4:23 PM ST (1.4 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo JAMES DUFFY, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by MONTEVERDE & ASSOCIATES

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space David Eldridge Bower +1 310 446 6652 +1 310 210 0605 dbower@monteverdelaw.com
No Logo Jonathan Mantak, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by WeissLaw LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Joel E. Elkins +1 310 208 2880 jelkins@weisslawllp.com
v.
No Logo Burkhard Goeschel, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Wilson Sonsini Goodrich & Rosati, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space David J. Berger +1 650 493 9300 +1 650 493 6811 dberger@wsgr.com
Space Joni L. Ostler +1 650 493 9300 +1 650 565 5100 jostler@wsgr.com
No Logo Franz J. Fink, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Wilson Sonsini Goodrich & Rosati, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space David J. Berger +1 650 493 9300 +1 650 493 6811 dberger@wsgr.com
Space Joni L. Ostler +1 650 493 9300 +1 650 565 5100 jostler@wsgr.com
No Logo Ilya Golubovich, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Wilson Sonsini Goodrich & Rosati, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space David J. Berger +1 650 493 9300 +1 650 493 6811 dberger@wsgr.com
Space Joni L. Ostler +1 650 493 9300 +1 650 565 5100 jostler@wsgr.com
No Logo John Mutch, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Wilson Sonsini Goodrich & Rosati, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space David J. Berger +1 650 493 9300 +1 650 493 6811 dberger@wsgr.com
Space Joni L. Ostler +1 650 493 9300 +1 650 565 5100 jostler@wsgr.com
No Logo Jorg Buchheim, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Wilson Sonsini Goodrich & Rosati, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space David J. Berger +1 650 493 9300 +1 650 493 6811 dberger@wsgr.com
Space Joni L. Ostler +1 650 493 9300 +1 650 565 5100 jostler@wsgr.com
Maxwell Technologies, Inc. Maxwell Technologies, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Wilson Sonsini Goodrich & Rosati, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space David J. Berger +1 650 493 9300 +1 650 493 6811 dberger@wsgr.com
Space Joni L. Ostler +1 650 493 9300 +1 650 565 5100 jostler@wsgr.com
No Logo Richard Bergman, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Wilson Sonsini Goodrich & Rosati, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space David J. Berger +1 650 493 9300 +1 650 493 6811 dberger@wsgr.com
Space Joni L. Ostler +1 650 493 9300 +1 650 565 5100 jostler@wsgr.com
No Logo Steve Bilodeau, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Wilson Sonsini Goodrich & Rosati, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space David J. Berger +1 650 493 9300 +1 650 493 6811 dberger@wsgr.com
Space Joni L. Ostler +1 650 493 9300 +1 650 565 5100 jostler@wsgr.com
Office San Diego
Filed 6/11/2019
Jury Demand Plaintiff
Demand
Nature of Suit 850 - Other Statutes: Securities/Commodities/Exchange
Cause Section 15 U.S.C. § 0078m(a) Securities Exchange Act
Jurisdiction Federal Question
Disposition
County Los Angeles
Terminated
Origin 1
Reopened
Lead Case
319-cv-01094-LAB-JLB
Related Case
319-cv-00377-LAB-JLB
Other Court Case None
Defendant Custody Status
Flags .,LEAD,LNO
  Entries (22) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 2/4/2020, Entered: None Order Dismissing Case
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 1/31/2020, Entered: None Notice of Voluntary Dismissal
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 1/8/2020, Entered: None Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 1/7/2020, Entered: None Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document 18 Filed: 12/3/2019, Entered: None Dismiss
          LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 11/21/2019, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 10/4/2019, Entered: None Notice (Other)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 9/26/2019, Entered: None Order of Judge Transfer
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document 14 Filed: 9/5/2019, Entered: 9/5/2019 Order on Motion to consolidate casesCourt Filing
                ORDER Granting Motion to Consolidate Related Actions, for Appointment as Lead Plaintiff, and for Approval of Lead Counsel (Dkt. [12]). Cases Consolidated, 19cv1094-LAB-JLB; All future docketing will be done in the lead case. The Court appoints James Duffy as lead plaintiff. The Court approves James Duffy's selection of Monteverde & Associates as Lead Counsel for the class. The hearing currently set for 10/7/2019 is vacated. The clerk is directed to file a copy of this order in Mantak v. Maxwell Technologies, Inc., 19-cv-0451-LAB (JLB). Signed by Chief Judge Larry Alan Burns on 9/4/2019.(jdt)
                  LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 8/13/2019, Entered: 8/14/2019 Order Setting Briefing ScheduleCourt Filing
                  ORDER Setting Briefing Schedule re [12] MOTION to Consolidate Related Actions and for Appointment as Lead Plaintiff and Approval of Lead Counsel : Any opposition to Mr. Duffy's motion must be filed no later than 8/28/2019. Any reply must be filed no later than 9/4/2019. The clerk is directed to file a copy of this order in Mantak v. Maxwell Techs., Inc., 19cv451. Signed by Chief Judge Larry Alan Burns on 8/13/2019. (jdt)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 8/12/2019, Entered: 8/12/2019, Terminated: 9/5/2019 Motion to consolidate cases
                    MOTION to Consolidate Related Actions and for Appointment as Lead Plaintiff and Approval of Lead Counsel by James Duffy. (Attachments: # (1) Memo of Points and Authorities in Support of James Duffy's Motion to Consolidate Related Actions and for Appointment as Lead Plaintiff and Approval of Lead Counsel, # (2) Declaration of David E. Bower in Support of James Duffy's Motion to Consolidate Related Actions and for Appointment as Lead Plaintiff and Approval of Lead Counsel, # (3) Exhibit A to Bower Declaration - PSLRA Notice, # (4) Exhibit B to Bower Declaration - Monteverde Firm Resume)(Bower, David) (jdt). Modified on 9/5/2019 to correct event (jdt).
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 6/28/2019, Entered: 6/28/2019 Order on Motion for extension of time to answerCourt Filing
                      ORDER Granting Joint Motion for Extension of Time (Dkt. [8]). Signed by Chief Judge Larry Alan Burns on 6/28/2019. (jdt)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 6/27/2019, Entered: 6/28/2019 Order of Transfer Pursuant to Low Number RuleCourt Filing
                        ORDER OF TRANSFER PURSUANT TO LOW NUMBER RULE. Case reassigned to Chief Judge Larry Alan Burns and Magistrate Judge Jill L. Burkhardt for all further proceedings. Judge John A. Houston, Magistrate Judge Barbara Lynn Major no longer assigned to case. Create association to 3:19-cv-00377-LAB-JLB. The new case number is 19CV1094-LAB(JLB).. Signed by Judge John A. Houston on 6/26/2019. Signed by Judge Larry Alan Burns on 6/24/2019.(jpp)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Blank 9 Filed: 6/24/2019, Entered: 6/24/2019 Order Reassigning CaseCourt Filing
                          MINUTE ORDER OF RECUSAL: Judge Marilyn L. Huff hereby recuses from this case and directs the Clerk to randomly reassign this matter to another district judge. This case has been randomly reassigned to Judge John A. Houston for all further proceedings. Judge Marilyn L. Huff is no longer assigned to this case. The new case number is 19-cv-1094-JAH-BLM. SO ORDERED by Judge Marilyn L. Huff on 6/24/2019. (no document attached) (smy)
                            LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 6/21/2019, Entered: 6/21/2019, Terminated: 6/28/2019 motion for extension of time to file answer
                            Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re [2] Summons Issued, [1] Complaint,, proposed order by James Duffy. (Bower, David) (jpp).
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 6/21/2019, Entered: 6/21/2019 Corporate Disclosure Statement
                              Corporate Disclosure Statement by Maxwell Technologies, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Tesla, Inc. for Maxwell Technologies, Inc... (Ostler, Joni) (jpp).
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 6/21/2019, Entered: 6/21/2019 Notice of appearance
                                NOTICE of Appearance by Joni L. Ostler on behalf of Richard Bergman, Steve Bilodeau, Jorg Buchheim, Franz J. Fink, Burkhard Goeschel, Ilya Golubovich, Maxwell Technologies, Inc., John Mutch (Ostler, Joni)Attorney Joni L. Ostler added to party Richard Bergman(pty:dft), Attorney Joni L. Ostler added to party Steve Bilodeau(pty:dft), Attorney Joni L. Ostler added to party Jorg Buchheim(pty:dft), Attorney Joni L. Ostler added to party Franz J. Fink(pty:dft), Attorney Joni L. Ostler added to party Burkhard Goeschel(pty:dft), Attorney Joni L. Ostler added to party Ilya Golubovich(pty:dft), Attorney Joni L. Ostler added to party Maxwell Technologies, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Joni L. Ostler added to party John Mutch(pty:dft) (jpp).
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 6/21/2019, Entered: 6/21/2019 Notice of Related Case
                                  NOTICE OF RELATED CASE(S) by Richard Bergman, Steve Bilodeau, Jorg Buchheim, Franz J. Fink, Burkhard Goeschel, Ilya Golubovich, Maxwell Technologies, Inc., John Mutch of case(s) 3:19-cv-00395-LAB-JLB; 3:19-cv-00377-LAB-JLB; 1:19-cv-01927-PGG; 3:19-cv-00413-LAB-JLB; 3:19-cv-00451-LAB-JLB . (Berger, David) (jpp).
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 6/21/2019, Entered: 6/21/2019 Notice of appearance
                                    NOTICE of Appearance by David J Berger on behalf of Richard Bergman, Steve Bilodeau, Jorg Buchheim, Franz J. Fink, Burkhard Goeschel, Ilya Golubovich, Maxwell Technologies, Inc., John Mutch (Berger, David)Attorney David J Berger added to party Richard Bergman(pty:dft), Attorney David J Berger added to party Steve Bilodeau(pty:dft), Attorney David J Berger added to party Jorg Buchheim(pty:dft), Attorney David J Berger added to party Franz J. Fink(pty:dft), Attorney David J Berger added to party Burkhard Goeschel(pty:dft), Attorney David J Berger added to party Ilya Golubovich(pty:dft), Attorney David J Berger added to party Maxwell Technologies, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney David J Berger added to party John Mutch(pty:dft) (jpp).
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Blank 3 Filed: 6/14/2019, Entered: 6/14/2019 Order of Judge TransferCourt Filing
                                      MINUTE ORDER OF RECUSAL. Judge Roger T. Benitez is no longer assigned. Case reassigned to Judge Marilyn L. Huff for all further proceedings. The new case number is 19cv1094-H-BLM.(no document attached) (anh)
                                        LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 6/12/2019, Entered: 6/12/2019 Summons issued
                                        Summons Issued. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should print this summons and serve it in accordance with Rule 4, Fed.R.Civ.P and LR 4.1. (als) (jao).
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document 1 Filed: 6/11/2019, Entered: 6/12/2019 ComplaintCourt Filing
                                          COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Richard Bergman, Steve Bilodeau, Jorg Buchheim, Franz J. Fink, Burkhard Goeschel, Ilya Golubovich, Maxwell Technologies, Inc., John Mutch ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0974-12607585.), filed by James Duffy. (Attachments: # (1) Civil Cover Sheet, # (2) Declaration Certificate of Plaintiff)The new case number is 3:19-cv-01094-BEN-BLM. Judge Roger T. Benitez and Magistrate Judge Barbara Lynn Major are assigned to the case. (Bower, David)(als) (jao).
                                          LREF

                                          Statistics

                                          This case has been viewed 174 times.

                                          No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                          Space
                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                           
                                          PlainSite
                                          Sign Up
                                          Need Password Help?