Johnson v. Tesla Inc, a Delaware corporation
State Civil Lawsuit Superior Court of California, County of Alameda, Case No. HG19030627

Tags
Last Updated March 19, 2021 at 8:32 PM DT (1.8 months ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Johnson, Comar, Plaintiff
v.
No Logo Hochholdinger, Peter, Defendant
Musk, Elon Reeve Musk, Elon Reeve, Defendant
Officially listed as "Musk, Elon"
Tesla, Inc. CEO, Tesla, Inc., October 15, 2008 - Present
Beneficial Owner, Excession LLC
SolarCity Corporation Chairman of the Board, SolarCity Corporation
Tesla, Inc. Tesla, Inc., Defendant
Officially listed as "Tesla Inc, Doing Business In California As Tesla Motors, Inc."
No Logo Kuei, Jean F., Attorney
Case Type Civil
Complaint Type Civil Rights
Case Subtype General Civil
Filing Location Hayward Hall of Justice
  Entries (73) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 73 Filed: 2/1/2021, Entered: None ?
Case Management Conf Continuance 06/28/2021 02:30 PM D- 518
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 72 Filed: 2/1/2021, Entered: None ?
    Case Management Conference Order Issued (1 Page)
      Request RequestSpace
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 71 Filed: 2/1/2021, Entered: None ?
      Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed (1 Page)
        Request RequestSpace
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 70 Filed: 1/21/2021, Entered: None ?
        Case Management Statement of Tesla Inc, doing business in California as Tesla Motors, Inc. Filed (7 Pages)
          Request RequestSpace
          Blank 69 Filed: 7/27/2020, Entered: None ?
          Case Management Conf Continuance 02/01/2021 02:30 PM D- 518
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 68 Filed: 7/27/2020, Entered: None ?
            Case Management Conference Order Issued (1 Page)
              Request RequestSpace
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 67 Filed: 7/27/2020, Entered: None ?
              Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed (1 Page)
                Request RequestSpace
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 66 Filed: 6/24/2020, Entered: None ?
                Notice of Entry of Order Filed (6 Pages)
                  Request RequestSpace
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 65 Filed: 6/10/2020, Entered: None ?
                  Petition to Compel Arbitration (Motion) Granted (2 Pages)
                    Request RequestSpace
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 64 Filed: 6/10/2020, Entered: None ?
                    Civil Law and Motion Hearing Commenced and Completed (1 Page)
                      Request RequestSpace
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 63 Filed: 6/4/2020, Entered: None ?
                      Proof of Service Memo of Points and Authorities in Opposition Filed (3 Pages)
                        Request RequestSpace
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 62 Filed: 6/3/2020, Entered: None ?
                        Proof of Service Filed (3 Pages)
                          Request RequestSpace
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 61 Filed: 6/3/2020, Entered: None ?
                          Declaration Filed (6 Pages)
                            Request RequestSpace
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 60 Filed: 6/3/2020, Entered: None ?
                            Reply Filed (5 Pages)
                              Request RequestSpace
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 59 Filed: 5/29/2020, Entered: None ?
                              Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Opposition Motion to Compel Arbitration Filed (6 Pages)
                                Request RequestSpace
                                Blank 58 Filed: 5/15/2020, Entered: None ?
                                Petition to Compel Arbitration (Motion) Hearing Confirmed for 06/10/2020 02:30 PM D- 518
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 5/15/2020, Entered: None ?
                                  Petition to Compel Arbitration (Motion) Filed for Defendant (56 Pages)
                                    Request RequestSpace
                                    Blank 56 Filed: 3/16/2020, Entered: None ?
                                    Case Management Conf Continuance 07/27/2020 02:30 PM D- 518
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 3/16/2020, Entered: None ?
                                      Case Management Conference Order Issued (3 Pages)
                                        Request RequestSpace
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 3/16/2020, Entered: None ?
                                        Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed (1 Page)
                                          Request RequestSpace
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 3/2/2020, Entered: None ?
                                          Case Management Statement of Tesla Inc, doing business in California as Tesla Motors, Inc. Filed (7 Pages)
                                            Request RequestSpace
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 2/27/2020, Entered: None ?
                                            Proof of Service by Mail Filed (3 Pages)
                                              Request RequestSpace
                                              Blank 51 Filed: 2/21/2020, Entered: None ?
                                              Request Re: Waive Additional Court Fees As to Comar Johnson Granted
                                                Blank 50 Filed: 2/20/2020, Entered: None ?
                                                Request Re: Waive Additional Court Fees Filed for Comar Johnson
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 2/20/2020, Entered: None ?
                                                  Case Management Statement of Comar Johnson Filed (5 Pages)
                                                    Request RequestSpace
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 1/29/2020, Entered: None ?
                                                    Answer to 1st Amended Complaint Filed for Tesla Inc, doing business in California as Tesla Motors, I (14 Pages)
                                                      Request RequestSpace
                                                      Blank 47 Filed: 1/17/2020, Entered: None ?
                                                      Case Management Conf Continuance 03/16/2020 02:30 PM D- 518
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 1/17/2020, Entered: None ?
                                                        Case Management Conference Order Issued (1 Page)
                                                          Request RequestSpace
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 1/17/2020, Entered: None ?
                                                          Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed (1 Page)
                                                            Request RequestSpace
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 1/10/2020, Entered: None ?
                                                            Proof of Service by Mail of CMC Statement Filed (2 Pages)
                                                              Request RequestSpace
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 1/2/2020, Entered: None ?
                                                              Case Management Statement of Comar Johnson Filed (5 Pages)
                                                                Request RequestSpace
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 1/2/2020, Entered: None ?
                                                                Proof of Service on Complaint As to Peter Hochholdinger Filed (1 Page)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 1/2/2020, Entered: None ?
                                                                  Proof of Service on Complaint As to Tesla Inc, doing business in California as Tesla Motors, Inc. F (3 Pages)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 1/2/2020, Entered: None ?
                                                                    Proof of Service on Complaint As to Elon Musk Filed (3 Pages)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 12/23/2019, Entered: None ?
                                                                      Case Management Statement of Tesla Inc, doing business in California as Tesla Motors, Inc. Filed (7 Pages)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 12/23/2019, Entered: None ?
                                                                        First Amended Complaint Filed (33 Pages)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 12/6/2019, Entered: None ?
                                                                          Notice of Entry of Order Filed (8 Pages)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 12/6/2019, Entered: None ?
                                                                            Notice of Entry of Order Filed (8 Pages)
                                                                              Request RequestSpace
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 12/6/2019, Entered: None ?
                                                                              Notice of Entry of Order Filed (8 Pages)
                                                                                Request RequestSpace
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 12/5/2019, Entered: None ?
                                                                                Proof of Service by Mail on Opposition to Demurrer Filed (2 Pages)
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 12/4/2019, Entered: None ?
                                                                                  Demurrer Sustained With Leave to Amend (3 Pages)
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 12/4/2019, Entered: None ?
                                                                                    Civil Law and Motion Hearing Commenced and Completed (2 Pages)
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 12/4/2019, Entered: None ?
                                                                                      Demurrer Sustained With Leave to Amend (3 Pages)
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 12/4/2019, Entered: None ?
                                                                                        Civil Law and Motion Hearing Commenced and Completed (2 Pages)
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 12/4/2019, Entered: None ?
                                                                                          Demurrer Sustained With Leave to Amend (3 Pages)
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 12/4/2019, Entered: None ?
                                                                                            Civil Law and Motion Hearing Commenced and Completed (2 Pages)
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 12/2/2019, Entered: None ?
                                                                                              Declaration in Reply Reply to Plaintiffs' Opposition to Defendants Demurrers to Plaintiffs Complaint (7 Pages)
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 12/2/2019, Entered: None ?
                                                                                                Declaration in Reply Andrea Milano Filed by Tesla Inc, a Delaware corporation, Elon Musk, Peter Hoch (2 Pages)
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 12/2/2019, Entered: None ?
                                                                                                  Proof of Service Filed (3 Pages)
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 11/25/2019, Entered: None ?
                                                                                                    Proof of Service by Mail Filed (2 Pages)
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                      Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 11/25/2019, Entered: None ?
                                                                                                      Proof of Service by Mail Filed (2 Pages)
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 11/25/2019, Entered: None ?
                                                                                                        Opposition Filed (10 Pages)
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 11/25/2019, Entered: None ?
                                                                                                          Opposition Filed (10 Pages)
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 11/25/2019, Entered: None ?
                                                                                                            Opposition Filed (9 Pages)
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                              Blank 19 Filed: 11/4/2019, Entered: None ?
                                                                                                              Demurrer to Complaint Hearing Confirmed for 12/04/2019 02:30 PM D- 518
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 11/4/2019, Entered: None ?
                                                                                                                Demurrer to Complaint Filed by Peter Hochholdinger, Elon Musk, Tesla Inc, doing business in Californ (20 Pages)
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 10/29/2019, Entered: None ?
                                                                                                                  Hearing Reset to Initial Case Management Conference 01/17/2020 02:30 PM D- 518 (2 Pages)
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 10/9/2019, Entered: None ?
                                                                                                                    Proof of Service on Complaint As to Elon Musk Filed (2 Pages)
                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 10/8/2019, Entered: None ?
                                                                                                                      Application Re: Extension of Time Granted (3 Pages)
                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 10/7/2019, Entered: None ?
                                                                                                                        Application Re: Extension of Time Filed for Comar Johnson - to Serve Pto Serve Pleading (2 Pages)
                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                          Blank 13 Filed: 9/26/2019, Entered: None ?
                                                                                                                          Demurrer to Complaint Hearing Confirmed for 12/04/2019 02:30 PM D- 518
                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 9/26/2019, Entered: None ?
                                                                                                                            Demurrer to Complaint Filed by Tesla Inc, a Delaware corporation (15 Pages)
                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                              Blank 11 Filed: 9/26/2019, Entered: None ?
                                                                                                                              Demurrer to Complaint Hearing Confirmed for 12/04/2019 02:30 PM D- 518
                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 9/26/2019, Entered: None ?
                                                                                                                                Demurrer to Complaint Filed by Peter Hochholdinger (18 Pages)
                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 9/20/2019, Entered: None ?
                                                                                                                                  Proof of Personal Service on Complaint - Civil Rights As to Tesla Inc, a Delaware corporation Filed (1 Page)
                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 9/19/2019, Entered: None ?
                                                                                                                                    Proof of Service on Complaint As to Peter Hochholdinger Filed (2 Pages)
                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 8/14/2019, Entered: None ?Court Filing
                                                                                                                                      Notice of Assignment of Judge for All Purposes Issued (3 Pages)
                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 8/14/2019, Entered: None ?
                                                                                                                                        Initial Case Management Conference 12/27/2019 02:30 PM D- 518 (2 Pages)
                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                          Blank 5 Filed: 8/12/2019, Entered: None ?
                                                                                                                                          Request Re: Waive Court Fees As to Comar Johnson Granted
                                                                                                                                            Blank 4 Filed: 8/9/2019, Entered: None ?
                                                                                                                                            Request Re: Waive Court Fees Filed for Comar Johnson
                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 8/9/2019, Entered: None ?
                                                                                                                                              Summons on Complaint Issued and Filed (1 Page)
                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 8/9/2019, Entered: None ?
                                                                                                                                                Complaint - Civil Rights Filed (17 Pages)
                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 1 Filed: 8/9/2019, Entered: None ?
                                                                                                                                                  Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed for Comar Johnson (3 Pages)

                                                                                                                                                    Statistics

                                                                                                                                                    This case has been viewed 113 times.

                                                                                                                                                    No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                    Space
                                                                                                                                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                     
                                                                                                                                                    PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                    Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                    Need Password Help?