Morton v. Tesla, Inc.
State Civil Lawsuit Superior Court of California, County of Alameda, Case No. RG19030980

Tags
Last Updated March 19, 2021 at 8:34 PM DT (1.9 months ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Morton, Christopher, Plaintiff
v.
Tesla, Inc. Tesla, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Anvar, Jessica, Attorney
No Logo Tahsildoost, Soheyl, Attorney
Case Type Civil
Complaint Type Breach of Contract/Warranty
Case Subtype General Civil
Filing Location Rene C. Davidson Alameda County Courthouse
  Entries (31) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 31 Filed: 1/6/2021, Entered: None ?
Case Management Conf Continuance 08/04/2021 01:30 PM D- 15
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 1/6/2021, Entered: None ?
    Case Management Conference Order Issued (1 Page)
      Request RequestSpace
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 1/6/2021, Entered: None ?
      Compliance Hearing Commenced and Completed (1 Page)
        Request RequestSpace
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 12/10/2020, Entered: None ?
        Case Management Statement of Christopher Morton Filed (7 Pages)
          Request RequestSpace
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 9/11/2020, Entered: None ?
          Hearing Reset to Case Management Conf Continuance 01/06/2021 01:30 PM D- 15 (1 Page)
            Request RequestSpace
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 3/13/2020, Entered: None ?
            Motion to Compel (Motion) Granted (3 Pages)
              Request RequestSpace
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 3/13/2020, Entered: None ?
              Civil Law and Motion Hearing Commenced and Completed (2 Pages)
                Request RequestSpace
                Blank 24 Filed: 3/13/2020, Entered: None ?
                Case Management Conf Continuance 12/04/2020 09:15 AM D- 15
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 3/13/2020, Entered: None ?
                  Case Management Conference Order Issued (2 Pages)
                    Request RequestSpace
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 3/13/2020, Entered: None ?
                    Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed (1 Page)
                      Request RequestSpace
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 3/9/2020, Entered: None ?
                      Second Declaration of Soheyl Tahsildoost ISO Def. Motion to Compel Arbitration Filed (11 Pages)
                        Request RequestSpace
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 3/9/2020, Entered: None ?
                        Reply in Support of Defendant's Motion to Compel Arbitration Filed (8 Pages)
                          Request RequestSpace
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 3/3/2020, Entered: None ?
                          Declaration of Vanessa J Oliva Filed (4 Pages)
                            Request RequestSpace
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 3/3/2020, Entered: None ?
                            Opposition Filed (6 Pages)
                              Request RequestSpace
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 2/28/2020, Entered: None ?
                              Case Management Statement of Tesla, Inc. Filed (6 Pages)
                                Request RequestSpace
                                Blank 16 Filed: 12/27/2019, Entered: None ?
                                Motion to Compel (Motion) Hearing Confirmed for 03/13/2020 10:00 AM D- 15
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 12/27/2019, Entered: None ?
                                  Motion to Compel (Motion) Filed for Defendant (38 Pages)
                                    Request RequestSpace
                                    Blank 14 Filed: 12/26/2019, Entered: None ?
                                    Case Management Conf Continuance 03/13/2020 09:15 AM D- 15
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 12/26/2019, Entered: None ?
                                      Case Management Conference Order Issued (2 Pages)
                                        Request RequestSpace
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 12/26/2019, Entered: None ?
                                        Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed (1 Page)
                                          Request RequestSpace
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 12/11/2019, Entered: None ?
                                          Case Management Statement of Tesla, Inc. Filed (6 Pages)
                                            Request RequestSpace
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 11/27/2019, Entered: None ?
                                            Case Management Statement of Christopher Morton Filed (7 Pages)
                                              Request RequestSpace
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 11/27/2019, Entered: None ?
                                              Notice of Posting Jury Fees Filed (3 Pages)
                                                Request RequestSpace
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 10/28/2019, Entered: None ?
                                                Notice of of CMC Filed (6 Pages)
                                                  Request RequestSpace
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 9/16/2019, Entered: None ?
                                                  Answer to Complaint Filed for Tesla, Inc. (13 Pages)
                                                    Request RequestSpace
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 9/5/2019, Entered: None ?
                                                    Proof of Service on Complaint As to Tesla, Inc. Filed (1 Page)
                                                      Request RequestSpace
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 8/14/2019, Entered: None ?Court Filing
                                                      Notice of Assignment of Judge for All Purposes Issued (4 Pages)
                                                        Request RequestSpace
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 8/14/2019, Entered: None ?
                                                        Initial Case Management Conference 12/26/2019 09:15 AM D- 15 (2 Pages)
                                                          Request RequestSpace
                                                          Legal Document 3 Filed: 8/13/2019, Entered: None ?
                                                          Summons on Complaint Issued and Filed (1 Page)
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 8/13/2019, Entered: None ?
                                                            Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed for Christopher Morton (2 Pages)
                                                              Request RequestSpace
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 8/13/2019, Entered: None ?
                                                              Complaint Breach of Contract/Warranty Filed (9 Pages)
                                                                Request RequestSpace

                                                                Statistics

                                                                This case has been viewed 138 times.

                                                                No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                Space
                                                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                 
                                                                PlainSite
                                                                Sign Up
                                                                Need Password Help?