JANCO v. TESLA, INC.
State Civil Lawsuit Superior Court of California, County of Alameda, Case No. HG19031595

Tags
Last Updated March 19, 2021 at 8:32 PM DT (1.9 months ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Janco, Michelle, Plaintiff
v.
Tesla, Inc. Tesla, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Barry Esq, David N., Attorney
No Logo Tahsildoost, Soheyl, Attorney
Case Type Civil
Complaint Type Breach of Contract/Warranty
Case Subtype General Civil
Filing Location Hayward Hall of Justice
  Entries (65) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 65 Filed: 12/21/2020, Entered: None ?
Request Re: Dismissal with prejudice - entire action Entered (4 Pages)
    Request RequestSpace
    Blank 64 Filed: 12/16/2020, Entered: None ?
    Compliance Hearing Hearing Dropped from dept: 22 date: 12/16/2020 time: 03:00 PM
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 63 Filed: 12/15/2020, Entered: None ?
      Request Re: Dismissal with prejudice - entire action Filed (4 Pages)
        Request RequestSpace
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 62 Filed: 10/14/2020, Entered: None ?
        Compliance Hearing 12/16/2020 03:00 PM D- 22
          Request RequestSpace
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 61 Filed: 10/14/2020, Entered: None ?
          Case Management Conference Order Issued (2 Pages)
            Request RequestSpace
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 60 Filed: 8/24/2020, Entered: None ?
            Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed (1 Page)
              Request RequestSpace
              Blank 59 Filed: 8/24/2020, Entered: None ?
              Case Management Conf Continuance 10/13/2020 02:30 PM D- 22
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 58 Filed: 8/24/2020, Entered: None ?
                Case Management Conference Order Issued (1 Page)
                  Request RequestSpace
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 8/24/2020, Entered: None ?
                  Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed (1 Page)
                    Request RequestSpace
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 8/10/2020, Entered: None ?
                    Case Management Statement of TESLA, INC. Filed (6 Pages)
                      Request RequestSpace
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 8/7/2020, Entered: None ?
                      Case Management Statement of MICHELLE JANCO Filed (8 Pages)
                        Request RequestSpace
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 7/20/2020, Entered: None ?
                        Notice of Court Mediation Referral Filed (1 Page)
                          Request RequestSpace
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 7/19/2020, Entered: None ?
                          Case Management Conf Continuance 08/24/2020 02:30 PM D- 22
                            Request RequestSpace
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 7/19/2020, Entered: None ?
                            Case Management Conference Order Issued (2 Pages)
                              Request RequestSpace
                              Blank 51 Filed: 7/15/2020, Entered: None ?
                              Case Management Conf Continuance 08/24/2020 02:30 PM D- 22
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 7/15/2020, Entered: None ?
                                Case Management Conference Order Issued (1 Page)
                                  Request RequestSpace
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 7/15/2020, Entered: None ?
                                  Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed (1 Page)
                                    Request RequestSpace
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 7/10/2020, Entered: None ?
                                    Declaration of Kainoa Aliviado Pursuant to Local Rule 3.31 in Advance of July 15, 2020 IDC Filed (3 Pages)
                                      Request RequestSpace
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 7/1/2020, Entered: None ?
                                      Case Management Statement of TESLA, INC. Filed (6 Pages)
                                        Request RequestSpace
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 5/11/2020, Entered: None ?
                                        Hearing Reset to Case Management Conf Continuance 07/15/2020 03:00 PM D- 22 (1 Page)
                                          Request RequestSpace
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 5/11/2020, Entered: None ?
                                          Hearing Vacated: Motion to Compel (Motion) 05/26/2020 03:00 PM D- 22
                                            Request RequestSpace
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 3/30/2020, Entered: None ?
                                            Returned Mail: Notice of Hearing Filed (1 Page)
                                              Request RequestSpace
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 3/18/2020, Entered: None ?
                                              Hearing Reset to Motion to Compel (Motion) 05/26/2020 03:00 PM D- 22 (1 Page)
                                                Request RequestSpace
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 3/18/2020, Entered: None ?
                                                Hearing Reset to Case Management Conf Continuance 05/26/2020 03:00 PM D- 22 (1 Page)
                                                  Request RequestSpace
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 2/21/2020, Entered: None ?
                                                  Stipulation and Order Re: Continuance of Hearing Granted (2 Pages)
                                                    Request RequestSpace
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 2/20/2020, Entered: None ?
                                                    Hearing Continued to Civil Law and Motion dept: 22 date: 03/26/2020 time: 03:00 PM
                                                      Request RequestSpace
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 2/20/2020, Entered: None ?
                                                      Motion to Compel (Motion) - Motion Rescheduled (2 Pages)
                                                        Request RequestSpace
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 2/20/2020, Entered: None ?
                                                        Civil Law and Motion Hearing Commenced and Continued (1 Page)
                                                          Request RequestSpace
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 2/20/2020, Entered: None ?
                                                          Hearing Reset to Case Management Conf Continuance 03/26/2020 03:00 PM D- 22 (1 Page)
                                                            Request RequestSpace
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 2/20/2020, Entered: None ?
                                                            Case Management Statement of MICHELLE JANCO Filed (8 Pages)
                                                              Request RequestSpace
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 2/20/2020, Entered: None ?
                                                              Notice of Case Management Conference Filed (4 Pages)
                                                                Request RequestSpace
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 2/14/2020, Entered: None ?
                                                                Stipulation and Order Re: Continuance of Hearing Filed for TESLA, INC. (3 Pages)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 2/13/2020, Entered: None ?
                                                                  Reply in Support of Motion to Compel Filed (10 Pages)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 2/10/2020, Entered: None ?
                                                                    Case Management Statement of TESLA, INC. Filed (6 Pages)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 1/3/2020, Entered: None ?
                                                                      Stipulation and Order Re: Continuance of Hearing Granted (1 Page)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace
                                                                        Blank 30 Filed: 1/2/2020, Entered: None ?
                                                                        Hearing Reset to Case Management Conf Continuance 02/20/2020 03:00 PM D- 22
                                                                          Blank 29 Filed: 12/31/2019, Entered: None ?
                                                                          Hearing Reset to Motion to Compel (Motion) 02/20/2020 03:00 PM D- 22
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 12/31/2019, Entered: None ?
                                                                            Stipulation and Order Re: Continuance of Hearing Filed for TESLA, INC. - for Motiton to Compel Arbit (3 Pages)
                                                                              Request RequestSpace
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 12/19/2019, Entered: None ?
                                                                              Opposition Filed (21 Pages)
                                                                                Request RequestSpace
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 12/16/2019, Entered: None ?
                                                                                Case Management Statement of TESLA, INC. Filed (6 Pages)
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 12/12/2019, Entered: None ?
                                                                                  Notice of Posting Jury Fees Filed (4 Pages)
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 12/10/2019, Entered: None ?
                                                                                    Notice of Case Management Conference Filed (4 Pages)
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 12/10/2019, Entered: None ?
                                                                                      Case Management Statement of MICHELLE JANCO Filed (8 Pages)
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace
                                                                                        Blank 22 Filed: 11/12/2019, Entered: None ?
                                                                                        Motion to Compel (Motion) Hearing Confirmed for 01/03/2020 10:00 AM D- 22
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 11/12/2019, Entered: None ?
                                                                                          Motion to Compel (Motion) Filed for Defendant (29 Pages)
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 11/5/2019, Entered: None ?
                                                                                            Case Management Conf Continuance 01/03/2020 10:00 AM D- 22
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 11/5/2019, Entered: None ?
                                                                                              Case Management Conference Order Issued (2 Pages)
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 11/5/2019, Entered: None ?
                                                                                                Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed (1 Page)
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 11/4/2019, Entered: None ?
                                                                                                  Notice of Judicial Reassignment for All Purposes Issued (5 Pages)
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 10/17/2019, Entered: None ?
                                                                                                    Notice of CMC Filed (4 Pages)
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                      Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 10/17/2019, Entered: None ?
                                                                                                      Notice of CMC Filed (4 Pages)
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 10/17/2019, Entered: None ?
                                                                                                        Case Management Statement of MICHELLE JANCO Filed (8 Pages)
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 9/30/2019, Entered: None ?
                                                                                                          Answer to Complaint Filed for TESLA, INC. (13 Pages)
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 9/26/2019, Entered: None ?
                                                                                                            Case Management Conf Continuance 11/05/2019 03:00 PM D- 22
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 9/26/2019, Entered: None ?
                                                                                                              Case Management Conference Order Issued (2 Pages)
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 9/26/2019, Entered: None ?
                                                                                                                Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed (1 Page)
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 9/19/2019, Entered: None ?
                                                                                                                  Notice of CMC Filed (4 Pages)
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 9/19/2019, Entered: None ?
                                                                                                                    Case Management Statement of MICHELLE JANCO Filed (8 Pages)
                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 9/16/2019, Entered: None ?
                                                                                                                      Hearing Reset to Initial Case Management Conference 09/26/2019 03:00 PM D- 22 (2 Pages)
                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 9/9/2019, Entered: None ?
                                                                                                                        Proof of Service on Complaint As to TESLA, INC. Filed (2 Pages)
                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 8/19/2019, Entered: None ?Court Filing
                                                                                                                          Notice of Assignment of Judge for All Purposes Issued (4 Pages)
                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 8/19/2019, Entered: None ?
                                                                                                                            Initial Case Management Conference 12/30/2019 03:00 PM D- 22 (2 Pages)
                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                              Legal Document 3 Filed: 8/14/2019, Entered: None ?
                                                                                                                              Summons on Complaint Issued and Filed (1 Page)
                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 8/14/2019, Entered: None ?
                                                                                                                                Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed for MICHELLE JANCO (1 Page)
                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 1 Filed: 8/14/2019, Entered: None ?
                                                                                                                                  Complaint Breach of Contract/Warranty Filed (9 Pages)

                                                                                                                                    Statistics

                                                                                                                                    This case has been viewed 44 times.

                                                                                                                                    No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                    Space
                                                                                                                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                     
                                                                                                                                    PlainSite
                                                                                                                                    Sign Up
                                                                                                                                    Need Password Help?