Barrett Business Services, Inc. v. Oracle America, Inc. Et Al
State Civil Lawsuit Superior Court of California, County of San Francisco, Case No. CGC 19 572474
Superior Court Judge Richard B. Ulmer, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated December 5, 2019 at 9:23 PM EST (2 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Space Space

No Logo BARRETT BUSINESS SERVICES, INC. A MARYLAND CORPORATION, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jason Kim +1 213 485 1234
v.
No Logo COGNIZANT TECHNOLOGY SOLUTIONS CORPORATION A DELAWARE CORPORATION, INDEPENDENTLY AND AS SUCCESSOR-IN-INTEREST TO KBACE TECHNOLOGIES, INC., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Sami M. Ahmed
Space Andrew M Hetherington
Space Andrew C Shen
No Logo COGNIZANT WORLDWIDE LIMITED AN ENGLAND AND WALES CORPORATION, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Sami M. Ahmed
Space Andrew M Hetherington
Space Andrew C Shen
No Logo DOES 1 TO 30 INCLUSIVE, Defendant
No Logo ORACLE AMERICA, INC. A DELAWARE CORPORATION, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Meryl Macklin +1 415 268 1981 +1 415 268 1999 meryl.macklin@hro.com
  Entries (82) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document 82 Filed: 11/19/2019, Entered: None ?
Order ; Stipulation And Protective Order (see Scanned Order For Details)
    Legal Document 81 Filed: 6/28/2019, Entered: None ?
    Notice Of Entry Of Order/notice Of Ruling Filed Granting Specially Appearing Defendants Cognizant Worldwide Ltd. And Cognizant Technology Solutions Corp.'s Motion To Dismiss Based On Forum Non Conveniens (transaction Id # 100076184) Filed By Defendant Cognizant Worldwide Limited An England And Wales Corporation Cognizant Technology Solutions Corporation A Delaware Corporation, Independently And As Successor-in-interest To Kbace Technologies, Inc.
      Legal Document 80 Filed: 6/6/2019, Entered: None ?Court Filing
      Law And Motion 302, Specially Appearing Defendant Cognizant Worldwide Limited, Cognizant Technology Solutions Corporation's Unopposed Motion To File Under Seal. The Court Adopts The Tentative Ruling. Defendants Cognizant Worldwide Ltd. And Cognizant Technology Solutions Corp.'s Unopposed Motion To File Under Seal Is Granted. Defendants Identify An Interest That Overcomes Public Access To The Records And Demonstrate That The Proposed Sealing Is Narrowly Tailored To Protect That Interest. (crc 2.550.)order Is Signed. (see Scanned Order For Details) Judge: Richard B. Ulmer Jr., Clerk: M. Goodman, Court Reporter: Maria Torreano, Csr#8600, Maria.torreano@gmail.com, Reported. =(302/rbu)
        Legal Document 79 Filed: 6/6/2019, Entered: None ?
        Mini Minutes For Jun-06-2019 09:30 Am For Dept 302
          Legal Document 78 Filed: 5/23/2019, Entered: None ?
          Declaration Of Galen Weaver In Support Of Plaintiff Barrett Business Services Inc.s Opposition To Defendants Motion To Dismiss For Forum Non Conveniens (transaction Id # 100072798) Filed By Plaintiff Barrett Business Services, Inc. A Maryland Corporation
            Legal Document 77 Filed: 5/21/2019, Entered: None ?
            Case Management Conference Of Jun-05-2019 Continued To Jul-17-2019 At 10:30 Am In Department 610. Notice Sent By Court.
              Legal Document 76 Filed: 5/8/2019, Entered: None ?
              Proof Of Service - Civil (transaction Id # 100071194) Filed By Defendant Cognizant Worldwide Limited An England And Wales Corporation Cognizant Technology Solutions Corporation A Delaware Corporation, Independently And As Successor-in-interest To Kbace Technologies, Inc.
                Legal Document 75 Filed: 5/8/2019, Entered: None ?
                Answer To 1st Amended Complaint (transaction Id # 63244678) Filed By Defendant Oracle America, Inc. A Delaware Corporation
                  Legal Document 74 Filed: 4/12/2019, Entered: None ?Court Filing
                  Law And Motion,defendant Oracle America, Inc.'s Demurrer To Plaintiff's Complaint. Off Calendar Per Request Of The Moving Party. Email Dated 4/1/19. Judge: Richard B. Ulmer Jr., Clerk: M. Goodman, Court Reporter: Maria Torreano, Csr#8600, Maria.torreano@gmail.com, Reported. =(302/rbu)
                    Legal Document 73 Filed: 4/12/2019, Entered: None ?Court Filing
                    Law And Motion 302, Defendant Cognizant Worldwide Limited, Cognizant Technology Solutions Corporation's Unopposed Motion To Seal.off Calendar Per Request Of The Moving Party. (email Dated 4/10/19) Judge: Richard B. Ulmer Jr., Clerk: M. Goodman, Court Reporter: Maria Torreano, Csr#8600, Maria.torreano@gmail.com, Reported. =(302/rbu)
                      Legal Document 72 Filed: 4/8/2019, Entered: None ?
                      1st Amended Complaint (transaction Id # 100068316) Filed By Plaintiff Barrett Business Services, Inc. A Maryland Corporation As To Defendant Oracle America, Inc. A Delaware Corporation Cognizant Worldwide Limited An England And Wales Corporation Cognizant Technology Solutions Corporation A Delaware Corporation, Independently And As Successor-in-interest To Kbace Technologies, Inc. Does 1 To 30 Inclusive
                        Legal Document 71 Filed: 3/21/2019, Entered: None ?
                        ** Redacted ** Exhibit 1 To The Declaration Of Sami M. Ahmed (transaction Id # 100066604) Filed By Defendant Cognizant Worldwide Limited An England And Wales Corporation Cognizant Technology Solutions Corporation A Delaware Corporation, Independently And As Successor-in-interest To Kbace Technologies, Inc.
                          Legal Document 70 Filed: 3/18/2019, Entered: None ?
                          Demurrer To Complaint (transaction Id # 100066269) Filed By Defendant Oracle America, Inc. A Delaware Corporation Hearing Set For Apr-12-2019 At 09:30 Am In Dept 302
                            Legal Document 69 Filed: 3/13/2019, Entered: None ?
                            Proof Of Service By Overnight Delivery Of Notice Of Hearing, Etc. (transaction Id # 100065859) Filed By Defendant Cognizant Worldwide Limited An England And Wales Corporation Cognizant Technology Solutions Corporation A Delaware Corporation, Independently And As Successor-in-interest To Kbace Technologies, Inc.
                              Legal Document 68 Filed: 3/13/2019, Entered: None ?
                              Motion To Admit Counsel Pro Hac Vice, Points And Authorities, Declaration (transaction Id # 100065859) Filed By Defendant Cognizant Worldwide Limited An England And Wales Corporation Cognizant Technology Solutions Corporation A Delaware Corporation, Independently And As Successor-in-interest To Kbace Technologies, Inc. Hearing Set For Apr-05-2019 At 09:30 Am In Dept 302
                                Legal Document 67 Filed: 10/7/2019, Entered: None ?
                                Answer To Complaint Of Key Equipment Finance In Non-lead Case No. Cgc-19-577837 (transaction Id # 100085373) Filed By Defendant (consolidated Case) Barrett Business Services, Inc., A Maryland Corporation
                                  Legal Document 66 Filed: 10/1/2019, Entered: None ?
                                  Amendment To 1st Amended Complaint Per Order Defendant Sued Herein As Doe 1 To Be Key Equipment Finance, A Division Of Keybank National Association, A National Banking Association, Assignee Of Oracle Credit Corporation
                                    Legal Document 65 Filed: 9/16/2019, Entered: None ?
                                    Filing Fee Paid For Amendment To Complaint (transaction Id # 100083458) Filed By Plaintiff Barrett Business Services, Inc. A Maryland Corporation Key Equipment Finance A Division Of Keybank National Association , A National Banking Association, Assignee Of Oracle Credit Corporation
                                      Legal Document 64 Filed: 9/3/2019, Entered: None ?Court Filing
                                      Law And Motion 302, Plaintiff Key Equipment A Division Of Keybank National Assocation's Motion To Consolidate Actions Of Case Number Cgc-19-572474 With Case Number Cgc-19-577837 Is Granted. No Opposition Filed. Order Signed. Judge: Ethan P. Schulman, Clerk: Sean Kane, Not Reported.
                                        Legal Document 63 Filed: 9/3/2019, Entered: None ?
                                        Mini Minutes For Sep-03-2019 09:30 Am For Dept 302
                                          Legal Document 62 Filed: 6/20/2019, Entered: None ?
                                          Case Management Statement (jointly) (transaction Id # 63384755) Filed By Defendant Oracle America, Inc. A Delaware Corporation Also Filed By Plaintiff Barrett Business Services, Inc. A Maryland Corporation Estimated Time For Trial: 10.0 Days
                                            Legal Document 61 Filed: 6/6/2019, Entered: None ?Court Filing
                                            Law And Motion 302,defendant Cognizant Worldwide Limited, Cognizant Technology Solutions Corporation's Motion To Dismiss Based On Forum Non Convenienss. The Court Adopts The Tentative Ruling. Defendants Cognizant Worldwide Ltd. And Cognizant Technology Solutions Corp.'s Motion To Dismiss Based On Forum Non Conveniens Is Granted. (see Mini-minutes For Full Details) Order Is Signed. (see Scanned Order For Details) Judge: Richard B. Ulmer Jr., Clerk: M. Goodman, Court Reporter: Maria Torreano, Csr#8600, Maria.torreano@gmail.com, Reported. =(302/rbu)
                                              Legal Document 60 Filed: 5/28/2019, Entered: None ?
                                              Proof Of Service (transaction Id # 100073006) Filed By Defendant Cognizant Worldwide Limited An England And Wales Corporation Cognizant Technology Solutions Corporation A Delaware Corporation, Independently And As Successor-in-interest To Kbace Technologies, Inc.
                                                Legal Document 59 Filed: 5/10/2019, Entered: None ?
                                                Case Management Statement (transaction Id # 100071524) Filed By Plaintiff Barrett Business Services, Inc. A Maryland Corporation Also Filed By Defendant Oracle America, Inc. A Delaware Corporation Cognizant Worldwide Limited An England And Wales Corporation Cognizant Technology Solutions Corporation A Delaware Corporation, Independently And As Successor-in-interest To Kbace Technologies, Inc. Estimated Time For Trial: 10.0 Days
                                                  Legal Document 58 Filed: 5/8/2019, Entered: None ?
                                                  Proof Of Service - Civil (transaction Id # 100071194) Filed By Defendant Cognizant Worldwide Limited An England And Wales Corporation Cognizant Technology Solutions Corporation A Delaware Corporation, Independently And As Successor-in-interest To Kbace Technologies, Inc.
                                                    Legal Document 57 Filed: 4/12/2019, Entered: None ?Court Filing
                                                    Law And Motion, Defendant Cognizant Worldwide Limited, Cognizant Technology Solutions Corporation's Motion To Dismiss Based On Forum Non Conveniens.off Calendar Per Request Of The Moving Party. (email Dated 4/10/19) Judge: Richard B. Ulmer Jr., Clerk: M. Goodman, Court Reporter: Maria Torreano, Csr#8600, Maria.torreano@gmail.com, Reported. =(302/rbu)
                                                      Legal Document 56 Filed: 4/12/2019, Entered: None ?
                                                      Mini Minutes For Apr-12-2019 09:30 Am For Dept 302
                                                        Legal Document 55 Filed: 4/5/2019, Entered: None ?
                                                        Mini Minutes For Apr-05-2019 09:30 Am For Dept 302
                                                          Legal Document 54 Filed: 3/21/2019, Entered: None ?
                                                          ** Redacted ** Exhibit 2 To The Declaration Of Sami M. Ahmed (transaction Id # 100066604) Filed By Defendant Cognizant Worldwide Limited An England And Wales Corporation Cognizant Technology Solutions Corporation A Delaware Corporation, Independently And As Successor-in-interest To Kbace Technologies, Inc.
                                                            Legal Document 53 Filed: 3/19/2019, Entered: None ?
                                                            Proof Of Service By Overnight Delivery Of Notices Of Payment Of Court Reporter Fee (transaction Id # 100066355) Filed By Defendant Cognizant Worldwide Limited An England And Wales Corporation Cognizant Technology Solutions Corporation A Delaware Corporation, Independently And As Successor-in-interest To Kbace Technologies, Inc.
                                                              Legal Document 52 Filed: 3/19/2019, Entered: None ?
                                                              Court Reporting Services Less Than 1 Hour For Hearing On 4/12/19 (transaction Id # 100066355) Filed By Defendant Cognizant Worldwide Limited An England And Wales Corporation Cognizant Technology Solutions Corporation A Delaware Corporation, Independently And As Successor-in-interest To Kbace Technologies, Inc.
                                                                Legal Document 51 Filed: 3/19/2019, Entered: None ?
                                                                Court Reporting Services Less Than 1 Hour For Hearing On 4/5/19 (transaction Id # 100066355) Filed By Defendant Cognizant Worldwide Limited An England And Wales Corporation Cognizant Technology Solutions Corporation A Delaware Corporation, Independently And As Successor-in-interest To Kbace Technologies, Inc.
                                                                  Legal Document 50 Filed: 3/18/2019, Entered: None ?
                                                                  Request For Judicial Notice In Support Of The Demurrer Of Defendant Oracle America, Inc To Plaintiffs Complaint (transaction Id # 100066269) Filed By Defendant Oracle America, Inc. A Delaware Corporation
                                                                    Legal Document 49 Filed: 3/13/2019, Entered: None ?
                                                                    Proof Of Service By Overnight Delivery Of Notice Of Hearing, Etc. (transaction Id # 100065859) Filed By Defendant Cognizant Worldwide Limited An England And Wales Corporation Cognizant Technology Solutions Corporation A Delaware Corporation, Independently And As Successor-in-interest To Kbace Technologies, Inc.
                                                                      Legal Document 48 Filed: 1/2/2019, Entered: None ?
                                                                      Contract/warranty, Complaint Filed By Plaintiff Barrett Business Services, Inc. A Maryland Corporation As To Defendant Oracle America, Inc. A Delaware Corporation Cognizant Worldwide Limited An England And Wales Corporation Cognizant Technology Solutions Corporation A Delaware Corporation, Independently And As Successor-in-interest To Kbace Technologies, Inc. Does 1 To 30 Inclusive Summons Issued, Judicial Council Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed Case Management Conference Scheduled For Jun-05-2019 Proof Of Service Due On Mar-04-2019 Case Management Statement Due On May-13-2019
                                                                        Legal Document 47 Filed: 9/4/2019, Entered: None ?
                                                                        Parties/attorneys From Consolidated Case Cgc-19-577837 Added To Lead Case Cgc-19-572474 For Mailing Of Court Notices.
                                                                          Legal Document 46 Filed: 9/3/2019, Entered: None ?
                                                                          Order To Consolidate Actions Of Case(s) Cgc-19-577837 With Case Cgc-19-572474 For All Purposes; Cgc-19-572474 Shall Be The Lead Case; All Further Entries Shall Be Made In The Lead Case
                                                                            Legal Document 45 Filed: 8/21/2019, Entered: None ?
                                                                            Motion To Consolidate Actions Of Case(s) Cgc-19-572474 With Case Cgc-19-577837, Proof Of Service (transaction Id # 100081055) Hearing Set For Sep-03-2019 At 09:30 Am In Dept 302
                                                                              Legal Document 44 Filed: 6/6/2019, Entered: None ?
                                                                              Mini Minutes For Jun-06-2019 09:30 Am For Dept 302
                                                                                Legal Document 43 Filed: 5/28/2019, Entered: None ?
                                                                                Specially Appearing Defendants Cognizant Worldwide Ltd.s And Cognizant Technology Solutions U.s. Corporations Reply In Support Of Their Motion To Dismiss Based On Forum Non Conveniens (transaction Id # 100073006) Filed By Defendant Cognizant Worldwide Limited An England And Wales Corporation Cognizant Technology Solutions Corporation A Delaware Corporation, Independently And As Successor-in-interest To Kbace Technologies, Inc.
                                                                                  Legal Document 42 Filed: 5/8/2019, Entered: None ?
                                                                                  Exhibit 1 To The Declaration Of Andrew C. Shen - *** Un-redacted *** (transaction Id # 100071194) (conditionally Sealed) Filed By Defendant Cognizant Worldwide Limited An England And Wales Corporation Cognizant Technology Solutions Corporation A Delaware Corporation, Independently And As Successor-in-interest To Kbace Technologies, Inc.
                                                                                    Legal Document 41 Filed: 4/5/2019, Entered: None ?Court Filing
                                                                                    Law And Motion 302, Defendants Cognizant Worldwide Limited And Cognizant Technology Solutions Corporation's Motion To Admit Counsel Pro Hac Vice Is Granted. No Opposition Filed And Good Cause Shown. Off Calendar At The Request Of The Moving Party, Order Is Signed. Judge: Richard B. Ulmer , Clerk: W. Trupek, Court Reporter: Tonyvaughn@yahoo.com, Reported. =(302/rbu)
                                                                                      Legal Document 40 Filed: 4/5/2019, Entered: None ?Court Filing
                                                                                      Law And Motion 302, Defendants Cognizant Worldwide Limited And Cognizant Technology Solutions Corporation's Motion To Admit Counsel Pro Hac Vice Granted. No Opposition Filed And Good Cause Shown. Order Is Signed. Judge: Richard B. Ulmer , Clerk: W. Trupek, Court Reporter: Tonyvaughn@yahoo.com, Reported. =(302/rbu)
                                                                                        Legal Document 39 Filed: 4/5/2019, Entered: None ?
                                                                                        Order Granting Application To Appear As Counsel Pro Hac Vice For Attorney Andrew M Hetherington Filed By Counsel For Defendant Cognizant Worldwide Limited An England And Wales Corporation Cognizant Technology Solutions Corporation A Delaware Corporation, Independently And As Successor-in-interest To Kbace Technologies, Inc.
                                                                                          Legal Document 38 Filed: 3/18/2019, Entered: None ?
                                                                                          Declaration Of Meryl Macklin Under Ccp 430.41 Regarding Demurrer Meet And Confer (transaction Id # 100066269) Filed By Defendant Oracle America, Inc. A Delaware Corporation
                                                                                            Legal Document 37 Filed: 3/18/2019, Entered: None ?
                                                                                            Proof Of Service By Overnight Mail Of Notice Of Unopposed Motion To Seal (transaction Id # 100066240) Filed By Defendant Cognizant Worldwide Limited An England And Wales Corporation Cognizant Technology Solutions Corporation A Delaware Corporation, Independently And As Successor-in-interest To Kbace Technologies, Inc.
                                                                                              Legal Document 36 Filed: 3/13/2019, Entered: None ?
                                                                                              Motion To Admit Counsel Pro Hac Vice, Points And Authorities, Declaration (transaction Id # 100065859) Filed By Defendant Cognizant Worldwide Limited An England And Wales Corporation Cognizant Technology Solutions Corporation A Delaware Corporation, Independently And As Successor-in-interest To Kbace Technologies, Inc. Hearing Set For Apr-05-2019 At 09:30 Am In Dept 302
                                                                                                Legal Document 35 Filed: 2/22/2019, Entered: None ?
                                                                                                Summons On Complaint (transaction Id # 100064077), Proof Of Service Only, Filed By Plaintiff Barrett Business Services, Inc. A Maryland Corporation Served Feb-14-2019, Personal Service As To Defendant Cognizant Technology Solutions Corporation A Delaware Corporation, Independently And As Successor-in-interest To Kbace Technologies, Inc.
                                                                                                  Legal Document 34 Filed: 9/30/2019, Entered: None ?
                                                                                                  Jury Fees (transaction Id # 100084786) Deposited By Plaintiff Barrett Business Services, Inc. A Maryland Corporation
                                                                                                    Legal Document 33 Filed: 5/23/2019, Entered: None ?
                                                                                                    Opposition To Defendant Cognizant Worldwide Limited And Cognizant Technology Solutions Corporations Motion To Dismiss Based On Forum Non Conveniens Memorandum Of Poinst And Authorities And Declaration Of Galen Weaver In Support Thereof (transaction Id # 100072798) Filed By Plaintiff Barrett Business Services, Inc. A Maryland Corporation
                                                                                                      Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                      Legal Document 32 Filed: 5/8/2019, Entered: None ?
                                                                                                      Court Reporting Services Less Than 1 Hour (transaction Id # 100071194) Filed By Defendant Cognizant Worldwide Limited An England And Wales Corporation Cognizant Technology Solutions Corporation A Delaware Corporation, Independently And As Successor-in-interest To Kbace Technologies, Inc.
                                                                                                        Legal Document 31 Filed: 5/8/2019, Entered: None ?
                                                                                                        Exhibit 2 To The Declaration Of Andrew C. Shen - *** Un-redacted *** (transaction Id # 100071194) (conditionally Sealed) Filed By Defendant Cognizant Worldwide Limited An England And Wales Corporation Cognizant Technology Solutions Corporation A Delaware Corporation, Independently And As Successor-in-interest To Kbace Technologies, Inc.
                                                                                                          Legal Document 30 Filed: 5/8/2019, Entered: None ?
                                                                                                          Exhibit 3 To The Declaration Of Andrew C. Shen (transaction Id # 100071194) Filed By Defendant Cognizant Worldwide Limited An England And Wales Corporation Cognizant Technology Solutions Corporation A Delaware Corporation, Independently And As Successor-in-interest To Kbace Technologies, Inc.
                                                                                                            Legal Document 29 Filed: 5/8/2019, Entered: None ?
                                                                                                            Exhibit 2 To The Declaration Of Andrew C. Shen - *** Redacted *** (transaction Id # 100071194) Filed By Defendant Cognizant Worldwide Limited An England And Wales Corporation Cognizant Technology Solutions Corporation A Delaware Corporation, Independently And As Successor-in-interest To Kbace Technologies, Inc.
                                                                                                              Legal Document 28 Filed: 5/8/2019, Entered: None ?
                                                                                                              Exhibit 1 To The Declaration Of Andrew C. Shen - *** Redacted *** (transaction Id # 100071194) Filed By Defendant Cognizant Worldwide Limited An England And Wales Corporation Cognizant Technology Solutions Corporation A Delaware Corporation, Independently And As Successor-in-interest To Kbace Technologies, Inc.
                                                                                                                Legal Document 27 Filed: 3/19/2019, Entered: None ?
                                                                                                                Court Reporting Services Less Than 1 Hour For Hearing On 4/5/19 (transaction Id # 100066355) Filed By Defendant Cognizant Worldwide Limited An England And Wales Corporation Cognizant Technology Solutions Corporation A Delaware Corporation, Independently And As Successor-in-interest To Kbace Technologies, Inc.
                                                                                                                  Legal Document 26 Filed: 3/18/2019, Entered: None ?
                                                                                                                  Proof Of Service Of Notice Of Unopposed Motion To Seal, Etc. (transaction Id # 100066240) Filed By Defendant Cognizant Worldwide Limited An England And Wales Corporation Cognizant Technology Solutions Corporation A Delaware Corporation, Independently And As Successor-in-interest To Kbace Technologies, Inc.
                                                                                                                    Legal Document 25 Filed: 3/18/2019, Entered: None ?
                                                                                                                    Notice Of Motion, Motion To Dismiss Based On Forum Non Conveniens, Memorandum Of Points And Authorities, And Declaration Of Sami M. Ahmed, Points And Authorities, Declaration (transaction Id # 100066240) Filed By Defendant Cognizant Worldwide Limited An England And Wales Corporation Cognizant Technology Solutions Corporation A Delaware Corporation, Independently And As Successor-in-interest To Kbace Technologies, Inc. Hearing Set For Apr-12-2019 At 09:30 Am In Dept 302
                                                                                                                      Legal Document 24 Filed: 2/22/2019, Entered: None ?
                                                                                                                      Summons On Complaint (transaction Id # 100064077), Proof Of Service Only, Filed By Plaintiff Barrett Business Services, Inc. A Maryland Corporation Served Feb-14-2019, Personal Service As To Defendant Cognizant Worldwide Limited An England And Wales Corporation
                                                                                                                        Legal Document 23 Filed: 6/28/2019, Entered: None ?
                                                                                                                        Notice Of Time And Place Of Trial, Court Trial Set For Jul-13-2020 At 9:30 Am In Dept. 206. Case Management Conference On Jul-17-2019 Is Off Calendar. Notice Sent By Court.
                                                                                                                          Legal Document 22 Filed: 6/6/2019, Entered: None ?
                                                                                                                          Order Granting Specially Appearing Defendants Cognizant Worldwide Ltd. And Cognizant Technology Solutions Corp.'s Motion To Dismiss Based On Forum Non Conveniens.
                                                                                                                            Legal Document 21 Filed: 5/8/2019, Entered: None ?
                                                                                                                            Court Reporting Services Less Than 1 Hour (transaction Id # 100071194) Filed By Defendant Cognizant Worldwide Limited An England And Wales Corporation Cognizant Technology Solutions Corporation A Delaware Corporation, Independently And As Successor-in-interest To Kbace Technologies, Inc.
                                                                                                                              Legal Document 20 Filed: 5/8/2019, Entered: None ?
                                                                                                                              Notice Of Unopposed Motion, Unopposed Motion To File Under Seal, Memorandum Of Points And Authorities, And Declaration Of Andrew C. Shen (transaction Id # 100071194) Filed By Defendant Cognizant Worldwide Limited An England And Wales Corporation Cognizant Technology Solutions Corporation A Delaware Corporation, Independently And As Successor-in-interest To Kbace Technologies, Inc. Hearing Set For Jun-06-2019 At 09:30 Am In Dept 302
                                                                                                                                Legal Document 19 Filed: 4/5/2019, Entered: None ?
                                                                                                                                Order Granting Application To Appear As Counsel Pro Hac Vice For Attorney Andrew C Shen Filed By Counsel For Defendant Cognizant Worldwide Limited An England And Wales Corporation Cognizant Technology Solutions Corporation A Delaware Corporation, Independently And As Successor-in-interest To Kbace Technologies, Inc.
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 18 Filed: 3/21/2019, Entered: None ?
                                                                                                                                  Proof Of Service (by Overnight Delivery) (transaction Id # 100066604) Filed By Defendant Cognizant Worldwide Limited An England And Wales Corporation Cognizant Technology Solutions Corporation A Delaware Corporation, Independently And As Successor-in-interest To Kbace Technologies, Inc.
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 17 Filed: 3/21/2019, Entered: None ?
                                                                                                                                    Exhibit 1 To The Declaration Of Sami M. Ahmed - Unredacted (transaction Id # 100066604) (conditionally Sealed) Filed By Defendant Cognizant Worldwide Limited An England And Wales Corporation Cognizant Technology Solutions Corporation A Delaware Corporation, Independently And As Successor-in-interest To Kbace Technologies, Inc.
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 16 Filed: 3/19/2019, Entered: None ?
                                                                                                                                      Court Reporting Services Less Than 1 Hour For Hearing On 4/12/19 (transaction Id # 100066355) Filed By Defendant Cognizant Worldwide Limited An England And Wales Corporation Cognizant Technology Solutions Corporation A Delaware Corporation, Independently And As Successor-in-interest To Kbace Technologies, Inc.
                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 15 Filed: 3/18/2019, Entered: None ?
                                                                                                                                        Proof Of Service (transaction Id # 100066269) Filed By Defendant Oracle America, Inc. A Delaware Corporation
                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 14 Filed: 11/18/2019, Entered: None ?
                                                                                                                                          Ex Parte Application For Order Ex Parte Application And Stipulated Request For Entry Of A Protective Order Based Upon The Stipulation Of The Parties Memorandum Of Points And Authorities Declaration Of Counsel In Support (transaction Id # 100089280) Filed By Defendant Oracle America, Inc. A Delaware Corporation
                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 13 Filed: 9/5/2019, Entered: None ?
                                                                                                                                            Order Granting Application To Appear As Counsel Pro Hac Vice For Attorney Janna Sheiman Filed By Counsel For Plaintiff Barrett Business Services, Inc. A Maryland Corporation Key Equipment Finance A Division Of Keybank National Association , A National Banking Association, Assignee Of Oracle Credit Corporation
                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 12 Filed: 9/3/2019, Entered: None ?
                                                                                                                                              Added To Calendar For Plaintiff Key Equipment A Division Of Keybank National Assoc Motion To Consolidate Actions Of Case(s) Cgc-19-572474 With Case Cgc-19-577837 Hearing Set For Sep-03-2019 At 09:30 Am In Dept 302
                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 11 Filed: 6/6/2019, Entered: None ?
                                                                                                                                                Order Granting Specially Appearing Defendants Cognizant Worldwide Ltd. And Cognizant Technology Solutions Corp's Unopposed Motion To File Under Seal.
                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 10 Filed: 5/8/2019, Entered: None ?
                                                                                                                                                  Notice Of Motion, Motion To Dismiss Basbd On Forum Non Conveniens, Memorandum Of Points And Authorities, And Declaration Of Andrew C. Shen (transaction Id # 100071194) Filed By Defendant Cognizant Worldwide Limited An England And Wales Corporation Cognizant Technology Solutions Corporation A Delaware Corporation, Independently And As Successor-in-interest To Kbace Technologies, Inc. Hearing Set For Jun-06-2019 At 09:30 Am In Dept 302
                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 9 Filed: 4/12/2019, Entered: None ?
                                                                                                                                                    Mini Minutes For Apr-12-2019 09:30 Am For Dept 302
                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 8 Filed: 4/12/2019, Entered: None ?
                                                                                                                                                      Mini Minutes For Apr-12-2019 09:30 Am For Dept 302
                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 7 Filed: 4/5/2019, Entered: None ?
                                                                                                                                                        Mini Minutes For Apr-05-2019 09:30 Am For Dept 302
                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 6 Filed: 3/21/2019, Entered: None ?
                                                                                                                                                          Proof Of Service (by Overnight Delivery) (transaction Id # 100066604) Filed By Defendant Cognizant Worldwide Limited An England And Wales Corporation Cognizant Technology Solutions Corporation A Delaware Corporation, Independently And As Successor-in-interest To Kbace Technologies, Inc.
                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 5 Filed: 3/21/2019, Entered: None ?
                                                                                                                                                            Exhibit 2 To The Declaration Of Sami M. Ahmed - Unredacted (transaction Id # 100066604) (conditionally Sealed) Filed By Defendant Cognizant Worldwide Limited An England And Wales Corporation Cognizant Technology Solutions Corporation A Delaware Corporation, Independently And As Successor-in-interest To Kbace Technologies, Inc.
                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 4 Filed: 3/18/2019, Entered: None ?
                                                                                                                                                              Court Reporting Services Less Than 1 Hour (transaction Id # 100066269) Filed By Defendant Oracle America, Inc. A Delaware Corporation
                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 3 Filed: 3/18/2019, Entered: None ?
                                                                                                                                                                Notice Of Unopposed Motion, Unopposed Motion To Seal, Memorandum Of Points And Authorities, And Declaration Of Sami M. Ahmed, Declaration (transaction Id # 100066240) Filed By Defendant Cognizant Worldwide Limited An England And Wales Corporation Cognizant Technology Solutions Corporation A Delaware Corporation, Independently And As Successor-in-interest To Kbace Technologies, Inc. Hearing Set For Apr-12-2019 At 09:30 Am In Dept 302
                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 2 Filed: 2/22/2019, Entered: None ?
                                                                                                                                                                  Summons On Complaint (transaction Id # 100064077), Proof Of Service Only, Filed By Plaintiff Barrett Business Services, Inc. A Maryland Corporation Served Feb-14-2019, Personal Service As To Defendant Oracle America, Inc. A Delaware Corporation
                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 1 Filed: 1/2/2019, Entered: None ?
                                                                                                                                                                    Notice To Plaintiff

                                                                                                                                                                      Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                      This case has been viewed 16 times.

                                                                                                                                                                      No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                      Space
                                                                                                                                                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                       
                                                                                                                                                                      PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                      Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                      Need Password Help?