HORNER v. COUNTY OF ATLANTIC, et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit New Jersey District Court, Case No. 1:99-cv-00047-SMO

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo WILLIAM HORNER, SR., Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by BARRY, CORRADO, GRASSI & GIBSON, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space JOSEPH C. GRASSI +1 609 729 1333 jgrassi@capelegal.com
v.
No Logo COUNTY OF ATLANTIC, Defendant
No Logo FRANK MAZZONE, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space John P. Morris +1 856 453 1000 +1 781 740 4482 lqrlnd@verizon.net
No Logo FRANK PREMONE, Defendant
No Logo JEFFREY BLITZ, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space WILLIAM A. GARRIGLE +1 856 427 9300 garrigle@aol.com
No Logo John Doe 1-10, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space WILLIAM A. GARRIGLE +1 856 427 9300 garrigle@aol.com
No Logo THE ATLANTIC COUNTY DEPARTMENT OF PUBLIC SAFETY, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space John P. Morris +1 856 453 1000 +1 781 740 4482 lqrlnd@verizon.net
No Logo THE ATLANTIC COUNTY PROSECUTOR'S OFFICE, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space WILLIAM A. GARRIGLE +1 856 427 9300 garrigle@aol.com
No Logo THE VICTIM WITNESS COORDINATOR OF THE ATLANTIC COUNTY PROSECUTOR'S OFFICE, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space WILLIAM A. GARRIGLE +1 856 427 9300 garrigle@aol.com
No Logo CITY OF BRIGANTINE, Cross-Claimant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space DARYL F TODD +1 609 927 7200
No Logo COUNTY OF ATLANTIC, Cross-Claimant
No Logo FRANK MAZZONE, Cross-Claimant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space John P. Morris +1 856 453 1000 +1 781 740 4482 lqrlnd@verizon.net
No Logo JEFFREY BLITZ, Cross-Claimant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space WILLIAM A. GARRIGLE +1 856 427 9300 garrigle@aol.com
No Logo John Doe 1-10, Cross-Claimant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space WILLIAM A. GARRIGLE +1 856 427 9300 garrigle@aol.com
No Logo THE ATLANTIC COUNTY DEPARTMENT OF PUBLIC SAFETY, Cross-Claimant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space John P. Morris +1 856 453 1000 +1 781 740 4482 lqrlnd@verizon.net
No Logo THE ATLANTIC COUNTY PROSECUTOR'S OFFICE, Cross-Claimant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space WILLIAM A. GARRIGLE +1 856 427 9300 garrigle@aol.com
No Logo THE POLICE DEPARTMENT OF THE CITY OF BRIGANTINE, Cross-Claimant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space DARYL F TODD +1 609 927 7200
No Logo THE VICTIM WITNESS COORDINATOR OF THE ATLANTIC COUNTY PROSECUTOR'S OFFICE, Cross-Claimant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space WILLIAM A. GARRIGLE +1 856 427 9300 garrigle@aol.com
No Logo COUNTY OF ATLANTIC, Cross-Defendant
No Logo FRANK MAZZONE, Cross-Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space John P. Morris +1 856 453 1000 +1 781 740 4482 lqrlnd@verizon.net
No Logo FRANK PREMONE, Cross-Defendant
No Logo JEFFREY BLITZ, Cross-Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space WILLIAM A. GARRIGLE +1 856 427 9300 garrigle@aol.com
No Logo THE ATLANTIC COUNTY DEPARTMENT OF PUBLIC SAFETY, Cross-Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space John P. Morris +1 856 453 1000 +1 781 740 4482 lqrlnd@verizon.net
No Logo THE ATLANTIC COUNTY PROSECUTOR'S OFFICE, Cross-Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space WILLIAM A. GARRIGLE +1 856 427 9300 garrigle@aol.com
No Logo THE VICTIM WITNESS COORDINATOR OF THE ATLANTIC COUNTY PROSECUTOR'S OFFICE, Cross-Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space WILLIAM A. GARRIGLE +1 856 427 9300 garrigle@aol.com
Office Camden
Filed 1/6/1999
Jury Demand Both
Demand $0
Nature of Suit 440 - Civil Rights: Other
Cause Section 28 U.S.C. § 1441 Notice of Removal
Jurisdiction Federal Question
Disposition Dismissed - Settled
County Atlantic
Terminated 12/18/2000
Origin 2
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case ATL-L-4184-98[SUP.CT.ATL.CNTY.]
Def Custody Status
Flags 12BG, CLOSED, SCHEDO
  Entries (60) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 44 Filed: 1/3/2001, Entered: 1/3/2001 Satisfaction of Judgment
SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT FILED. n.m. (ar1)
    LREF
    Blank 43 Filed: 12/22/2000, Entered: 12/28/2000 OrderCourt Filing
    ORDER approving settlement, allocating proceeds of settlement and entering judgment in favor of plaintiff William Horner, as the Administrator and Administrator Ad Prosequendum of the Estate of Donna Munyon, and on behalf of William Horner, Jr. and Holly Horner as Guardians and Katherine Morris as Guardian ad litem on behalf of Christopher Munyon, a minor, against defendant The County of Atlantic, in the amount of $600,000.00. n.m. ( signed by Mag. Judge Joel B. Rosen ) (ar1)
      LREF
      Blank 42 Filed: 12/18/2000, Entered: 12/18/2000 OrderCourt Filing
      ORDER, dismissing this action as settled without prejudice and without costs. n.m. ( signed by Judge Stephen M. Orlofsky ) (ar1)
        LREF
        Blank 41 Filed: 12/18/2000, Entered: 12/18/2000 OrderCourt Filing
        ORDER denying [23-1] motion for summary judgment and denying [17-1] motion for sanctions, subject to the consummation of the settlement in this matter. n.m. ( signed by Judge Stephen M. Orlofsky ) (ar1)
          LREF
          Blank -- Filed: 12/18/2000, Entered: 12/18/2000 Set/Reset Deadlines:
          Deadline updated; terminating [23-2] hearing Motion set for 12/17/99 on [23-1] motion and terminating [17-2] hearing Motion set for 11/19/99 on [17-1] motion. (ar1)
            LREF
            Blank -- Filed: 12/18/2000, Entered: 12/18/2000 Terminated Case
            Case closed " (ar1)
              LREF
              Blank -- Filed: 10/10/2000, Entered: 10/10/2000 Settlement Conference
              Settlement conference held before Mag. Judge Joel B. Rosen on 10/5/00. (ar1)
                LREF
                Blank 40 Filed: 10/5/2000, Entered: 10/6/2000 RemarkCourt Filing
                Court Exhibit No.#1, filed per Judge Joel B. Rosen, USMJ. (er)
                  LREF
                  Blank 39 Filed: 10/5/2000, Entered: 10/6/2000 Remark
                  Report of Katherine M. Morris, Esquire, Guiardian ad litem for Christopher Munyon. (er)
                    LREF
                    Blank 38 Filed: 10/5/2000, Entered: 10/6/2000 Affidavit
                    AFFIDAVIT of Katherine M. Morris, Esq. Guardian Ad Litem on behalf of CHRISTOPHER MUNYON. (er)
                      LREF
                      Blank 37 Filed: 10/5/2000, Entered: 10/6/2000 Letter
                      LETTER By Ralph A. Paolone, Esq., advising the he represents the interests of David Horner. (er)
                        LREF
                        Blank 36 Filed: 10/5/2000, Entered: 10/6/2000 Minutes-MiscellaneousCourt Filing
                        Minute entry: Proceedings recorded by Ct-Reporter: Lisa Marcus; Minutes of: 10/5/00; The following actions were taken, FRIENDLY HEARING, Ordered William Horner, Sr. sworn. Terms of Settlement placed on the record. All parties questioned as to the terms of settlement. Court accepts Report and Recommendation of Guardian Ad Litem, Court approves settlement. Order to be submitted. By Mag. Judge Joel B. Rosen (er)
                          LREF
                          Blank 35 Filed: 9/6/2000, Entered: 9/7/2000 OrderCourt Filing
                          ORDER appointing Katherine M. Morris as Guardian Ad Litem to represent Christopher Munyon, an infant. n.m. ( signed by Mag. Judge Joel B. Rosen ) (ar1)
                            LREF
                            Blank -- Filed: 7/26/2000, Entered: 7/26/2000 Status Conference
                            Status conference held before Mag. Judge Joel B. Rosen on 07/24/00. (db)
                              LREF
                              Blank 34 Filed: 7/21/2000, Entered: 7/24/2000 Minutes-MiscellaneousCourt Filing
                              Minute entry: Proceedings recorded by Ct-Reporter: Tape #559 & #860; Minutes of: 07/17/00; The following actions were taken, status conf. held on the record. By Mag. Judge Joel B. Rosen (db)
                                LREF
                                Blank 33 Filed: 7/18/2000, Entered: 7/19/2000 Scheduling OrderCourt Filing
                                SCHEDULING ORDER setting Discovery cutoff 8/25/00 ; Pretrial order to be submitted on or before 2:00 10/30/00 ; Status conference 11:30 8/29/00 ; Dispositive Motion due on or before 9/15/00. n.m. ( signed by Mag. Judge Joel B. Rosen ) (db)
                                  LREF
                                  Blank 32 Filed: 4/14/2000, Entered: 4/19/2000 OrderCourt Filing
                                  ORDER dismissing this action with prejudice against defts. CITY OF BRIGANTINE AND THE POLICE DEPARTMENT OF THE CITY OF BRIGANTINE AND ITS OFFICERS. n.m. ( signed by Mag. Judge Joel B. Rosen ) (ar1)
                                    LREF
                                    Blank -- Filed: 4/10/2000, Entered: 4/10/2000 Status Conference
                                    Status conference held before Mag. Judge Joel B. Rosen on 4/4/00. (ar1)
                                      LREF
                                      Blank 31 Filed: 4/6/2000, Entered: 4/6/2000 Minutes-MiscellaneousCourt Filing
                                      Minute entry: Tape #830; Minutes of: 4/4/00; The following actions were taken - Status conference held on the record. By Mag. Judge Joel B. Rosen (femp)
                                        LREF
                                        Blank 30 Filed: 4/5/2000, Entered: 4/5/2000 Scheduling OrderCourt Filing
                                        SCHEDULING ORDER setting Pretrial conference 3:30 7/17/00 ; Dispositive Motion due on or before 6/1/00. n.m. ( signed by Mag. Judge Joel B. Rosen ) (ar1)
                                          LREF
                                          Blank -- Filed: 2/10/2000, Entered: 2/10/2000 Status Conference
                                          Status conference held before Mag. Judge Joel B. Rosen on 2/4/00. (ar1)
                                            LREF
                                            Blank 29 Filed: 2/8/2000, Entered: 2/10/2000 Scheduling OrderCourt Filing
                                            SCHEDULING ORDER setting Discovery cutoff 2/29/00 ; Settlement conference 11:15 4/4/00 ; Dispositive Motion due on or before 5/1/00. n.m. ( signed by Mag. Judge Joel B. Rosen (ar1)
                                              LREF
                                              Blank 28 Filed: 12/27/1999, Entered: 12/28/1999 Minutes-MiscellaneousCourt Filing
                                              Minute entry: Proceedings recorded by Ct-Reporter: None; Minutes of: 12/17/99; The following actions were taken, granting as modified [21-1] motion for protective order. By Mag. Judge Joel B. Rosen (ar1)
                                                LREF
                                                Blank 27 Filed: 12/20/1999, Entered: 12/21/1999 OrderCourt Filing
                                                ORDER granting in part as modified [21-1] motion for protective order. n.m. ( signed by Mag. Judge Joel B. Rosen ) (ar1)
                                                  LREF
                                                  Blank -- Filed: 12/20/1999, Entered: 12/21/1999 Set/Reset Deadlines:
                                                  Deadline updated; terminating [21-2] hearing Motion set for 12/17/99 on [21-1] motion (ar1)
                                                    LREF
                                                    Blank 26 Filed: 12/1/1999, Entered: 12/1/1999 Certificate Of Service.
                                                    CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by defts. JEFFREY BLITZ, ETC; Re: Brief in opposition to motion for protective order. (ar1)
                                                      LREF
                                                      Blank 25 Filed: 11/23/1999, Entered: 11/24/1999 Certificate Of Service.
                                                      CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by JEFFREY BLITZ, THE VICTIM WITNESS, THE ATLANTIC COUNTY, JOHN DOE 1-10; Re: Brief in opposition to motion for summary judgment and for sanctions. (ar1)
                                                        LREF
                                                        Blank 24 Filed: 11/23/1999, Entered: 11/24/1999 Miscellaneous Document
                                                        STATEMENT by JEFFREY BLITZ, THE VICTIM WITNESS, THE ATLANTIC COUNTY, JOHN DOE 1-10 (ar1)
                                                          LREF
                                                          Blank 23 Filed: 11/23/1999, Entered: 11/24/1999, Terminated: 12/18/2000 Motion for Summary Judgment
                                                          Notice of MOTION for summary judgment by JEFFREY BLITZ, THE VICTIM WITNESS, THE ATLANTIC COUNTY, JOHN DOE 1-10, Motion set for 12/17/99 on [23-1] motion . (All Briefs/PO Subm) (ar1)
                                                            LREF
                                                            Blank 22 Filed: 11/22/1999, Entered: 11/22/1999 Certification
                                                            CERTIFICATION of Holly Horner on behalf of WILLIAM HORNER SR. Re: [21-1] motion for protective order (ar1)
                                                              LREF
                                                              Blank 21 Filed: 11/22/1999, Entered: 11/22/1999, Terminated: 12/20/1999 Motion for Protective OrderCourt Filing
                                                              Notice of MOTION for protective order by WILLIAM HORNER SR. [21-1] motion referred to Mag. Judge Joel B. Rosen, Motion set for 12/17/99 on [21-1] motion . (Brief/PO Submitted with exhibits) (ar1)
                                                                LREF
                                                                Blank 20 Filed: 11/10/1999, Entered: 11/12/1999 Minutes-MiscellaneousCourt Filing
                                                                Minute entry: Proceedings recorded by Ct-Reporter: Tape #783; Minutes of: 11/8/99; The following actions were taken, Settlement conference held on the record. By Mag. Judge Joel B. Rosen (ar1)
                                                                  LREF
                                                                  Blank 19 Filed: 11/9/1999, Entered: 11/10/1999 Scheduling OrderCourt Filing
                                                                  SCHEDULING ORDER setting Discovery cutoff 11/30/99 ; Status conference 11:45 1/31/00 ; Dispositive Motion due on or before 11/24/99. n.m. ( signed by Mag. Judge Joel B. Rosen ) (ar1)
                                                                    LREF
                                                                    Blank -- Filed: 11/8/1999, Entered: 11/16/1999 Settlement Conference
                                                                    Settlement conference held before Mag. Judge Joel B. Rosen on 11/8/99. (er)
                                                                      LREF
                                                                      Blank -- Filed: 10/20/1999, Entered: 10/20/1999 Motions No Longer Referred
                                                                      Motion(s) no longer referred: [17-1] motion for sanctions (MB)
                                                                        LREF
                                                                        Blank 18 Filed: 10/19/1999, Entered: 10/19/1999, Terminated: 12/18/2000 ~Notice (other)
                                                                        Notice of Intent to submit a Dispositive motion for summary judgment by JEFFREY BLITZ, THE VICTIM WITNESS, THE ATLANTIC COUNTY, JOHN DOE 1-10. (ar1)
                                                                          LREF
                                                                          Blank 17 Filed: 10/19/1999, Entered: 10/19/1999, Terminated: 12/18/2000 Motion for Sanctions
                                                                          Notice of MOTION for sanctions by defts. JEFFREY BLITZ, ETC; [17-1] Motion set for 11/19/99 on [17-1] motion . (Brief/PO Submitted with exhibits) (ar1) Modified on 10/20/1999
                                                                            LREF
                                                                            Blank 16 Filed: 9/29/1999, Entered: 9/30/1999 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                            ORDER permitting the deposition of Frank Premone. n.m. ( signed by Mag. Judge Joel B. Rosen ) (ar1) Modified on 09/30/1999
                                                                              LREF
                                                                              Blank 15 Filed: 5/20/1999, Entered: 5/20/1999 Scheduling OrderCourt Filing
                                                                              SCHEDULING ORDER setting Discovery cutoff 9/15/99 ; Settlement conference 2:30 11/8/99. ( signed by Mag. Judge Joel B. Rosen ) (ar1)
                                                                                LREF
                                                                                Blank -- Filed: 5/20/1999, Entered: 5/20/1999 Status Conference
                                                                                Status conference held before Mag. Judge Joel B. Rosen on 5/19/99. (ar1)
                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                  Blank 14 Filed: 3/18/1999, Entered: 3/19/1999 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                  ORDER permitting the deposition of Frank Premone on April 29, 1999 at 10:30a.m. ( signed by Mag. Judge Joel B. Rosen ) (ar1)
                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                    Blank -- Filed: 2/25/1999, Entered: 2/25/1999 Clerks Entry of Default*
                                                                                    DEFAULT ENTERED as to defendant FRANK PREMONE for failure to plead or otherwise defend. (ar1)
                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                      Blank 13 Filed: 2/24/1999, Entered: 2/25/1999 Summons Returned Executed
                                                                                      RETURN OF SERVICE executed by Sheriff of Atlantic County as to FRANK PREMONE 12/23/98 Answer due on 1/12/99 for FRANK PREMONE. (ar1)
                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                        Blank 12 Filed: 2/18/1999, Entered: 2/19/1999 request for default
                                                                                        REQUEST TO ENTER DEFAULT BY PLAINTIFF WILLIAM HORNER SR. AGAINST DEFENDANT FRANK PREMONE FOR FAILURE TO PLEAD OR OTHERWISE DEFEND. (ar1)
                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                          Blank 11 Filed: 2/11/1999, Entered: 2/17/1999 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                          ORDER removing case from the arbitration program. ( signed by Mag. Judge Joel B. Rosen ) (ar1)
                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                            Blank 10 Filed: 2/11/1999, Entered: 2/17/1999 Scheduling OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                            SCHEDULING ORDER setting Discovery cutoff 7/30/99 ; Status conference 11:00 5/14/99. ( signed by Mag. Judge Joel B. Rosen ) (ar1)
                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                              Blank -- Filed: 2/11/1999, Entered: 2/17/1999 Scheduling Conference
                                                                                              Scheduling conference held before Mag. Judge Joel B. Rosen on 2/11/99. (ar1)
                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                Blank -- Filed: 2/11/1999, Entered: 2/17/1999 Case No Longer Referred to Arbitration
                                                                                                CASE WITHDRAWN from Arbitration. (ar1)
                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                  Blank 9 Filed: 2/4/1999, Entered: 2/4/1999, Terminated: 12/18/2000 Answer
                                                                                                  ANSWER to complaint; jury demand and CROSSCLAIM by CITY OF BRIGANTINE, BRIGANTINE POLICE against COUNTY OF ATLANTIC, JEFFREY BLITZ, THE VICTIM WITNESS, THE ATLANTIC COUNTY, THE ATLANTIC COUNTY, FRANK MAZZONE, FRANK PREMONE (ar1)
                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                    Blank 8 Filed: 2/3/1999, Entered: 2/3/1999, Terminated: 12/18/2000 Amended Answer to Complaint
                                                                                                    AMENDED ANSWER; jury demand and CROSSCLAIM by JEFFREY BLITZ, THE VICTIM WITNESS, THE ATLANTIC COUNTY, JOHN DOE 1-10 against FRANK PREMONE (ar1)
                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                      Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                      Blank 7 Filed: 2/2/1999, Entered: 2/3/1999 Answer
                                                                                                      ANSWER to complaint; jury demand and CROSSCLAIM by THE ATLANTIC COUNTY, FRANK MAZZONE against FRANK PREMONE (ar1)
                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                        Blank 6 Filed: 2/1/1999, Entered: 2/2/1999 Answer to Crossclaim
                                                                                                        ANSWER by COUNTY OF ATLANTIC to [6-2] any and all cross claims which may be made against COUNTY OF ATLANTIC denies all allegations. (er)
                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                          Blank 6 Filed: 2/1/1999, Entered: 2/2/1999 Answer
                                                                                                          ANSWER to complaint; jury demand and CROSSCLAIM by COUNTY OF ATLANTIC against FRANK PREMONE. (er)
                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                            Blank 5 Filed: 1/21/1999, Entered: 1/21/1999, Terminated: 12/18/2000 Answer
                                                                                                            ANSWER to Complaint by JEFFREY BLITZ, THE VICTIM WITNESS, THE ATLANTIC COUNTY PROSECUTORS, JOHN DOE 1-10; jury demand (ar1)
                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                              Blank 4 Filed: 1/19/1999, Entered: 1/19/1999 Application and Clerk's Order to extend time to an
                                                                                                              APPLICATION by THE ATLANTIC COUNTY, FRANK MAZZONE and Clerk's Order extending time to answer. Answer due 2/2/99 for FRANK MAZZONE, for THE ATLANTIC COUNTY (ar1)
                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                Blank 3 Filed: 1/11/1999, Entered: 1/11/1999 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                ORDER, set scheduling conference for 9:30 2/11/99 ( signed by Mag. Judge Joel B. Rosen ) (js)
                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                  Blank 2 Filed: 1/11/1999, Entered: 1/11/1999, Terminated: 12/18/2000 Case Assigned/ReassignedCourt Filing
                                                                                                                  NOTICE of Allocation and Assignment filed. Magistrate Judge JOEL B. ROSEN (js)
                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                    Blank -- Filed: 1/11/1999, Entered: 1/11/1999 Case Referred to Arbitration
                                                                                                                    CASE REFERRED to arbitration (js)
                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                      Blank 1 Filed: 1/6/1999, Entered: 1/11/1999 Complaint
                                                                                                                      COMPLAINT filed in Superior Court Atlantic County on or about December 7, 1998, docket #ATL-L-4184-98; jury demand (js)
                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                        Blank 1 Filed: 1/6/1999, Entered: 1/11/1999 Notice of Removal
                                                                                                                        NOTICE OF REMOVAL by THE ATLANTIC COUNTY DEPARTMENT OF PUBLIC SAFETY & FRANK MAZZONE. Filed with the following state court proceedings, A]Complaint. FILING FEE $ 150.00 RECEIPT # 246453 (js)
                                                                                                                          LREF

                                                                                                                          Statistics

                                                                                                                          This case has been viewed 180 times.

                                                                                                                          No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                          Space
                                                                                                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                           
                                                                                                                          PlainSite
                                                                                                                          Sign Up
                                                                                                                          Need Password Help?