Walmart Inc. (f/k/a Wal-Mart Stores, Inc.) v. Tesla Energy Operations, Inc. (f/k/a SolarCity Corporation)
State Civil Lawsuit Supreme Court of the State of New York, New York County, Case No. 654765/2019

Tags

Reality Check: Tesla, Inc.

This docket is featured in the January 7, 2020 article Reality Check: Tesla, Inc..

Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Wal-Mart Stores, Inc. Wal-Mart Stores, Inc., Plaintiff
Officially listed as "Walmart Inc. (f/k/a Wal-Mart Stores, Inc.)"
Unknown Role, Green Dot Corp
v.
Tesla Energy Operations, Inc. Tesla Energy Operations, Inc., Defendant
Officially listed as "Tesla Energy Operations, Inc. (f/k/a SoalrCity Corporation)"
  Entries (75) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (1) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document 75 Filed: 11/4/2019, Entered: None
STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE ( REQUEST TO SO ORDER )
    Legal Document 74 Filed: 10/25/2019, Entered: None
    STIPULATION - OTHER - ( REQUEST TO SO ORDER ): Stip. Extending Time to Respond to Complaint
      Legal Document 73 Filed: 9/24/2019, Entered: 9/24/2019
      STIPULATION - OTHER - ( REQUEST TO SO ORDER ) (Motion #001): Stipulation for Further Extension of Sealing Deadlines
        Legal Document 72 Filed: 9/17/2019, Entered: 9/17/2019
        STIPULATION - OTHER - ( REQUEST TO SO ORDER ): Stipulation Extending Time to Respond to Complaint
          Legal Document 71 Filed: 9/9/2019, Entered: 9/9/2019
          AFFIRMATION: Affirmation Of David W. Shapiro In Support Of Unopposed Request Extending Deadlines Set Forth In Ord(..)
            Legal Document 70 Filed: 9/9/2019, Entered: 9/9/2019
            STIPULATION - BRIEFING SCHEDULE: Unopposed Request Extending Deadlines Set Forth In Order To Show Cause And Temporary Restraining Ord(..)
              Legal Document 69 Filed: 9/5/2019, Entered: 9/5/2019
              AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
                Legal Document 68 Filed: 9/4/2019, Entered: 9/4/2019
                LETTER APPLICATION TO ADMINISTRATIVE JUDGE REQUESTING ASSIGNMENT TO COMMERCIAL DIVISION
                  Legal Document 67 Filed: 8/29/2019, Entered: 8/29/2019
                  AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
                    Legal Document 66 Filed: 8/23/2019, Entered: 8/23/2019
                    COMPLAINT: Redacted Summons, Complaint and Appendix, Redacted per 22 NYCRR ยง202.5(e)
                      Legal Document 65 Filed: 8/23/2019, Entered: 8/23/2019
                      NOTIFICATION FOR SEALING
                        Legal Document 64 Filed: 8/21/2019, Entered: 8/21/2019
                        ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE (Motion #001)
                          Legal Document 63 Filed: 8/20/2019, Entered: 8/20/2019
                          ADDENDUM - COMMERCIAL DIVISION (840C)
                            Legal Document 62 Filed: 8/20/2019, Entered: 8/20/2019
                            RJI -RE: ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE
                              Legal Document 61 Filed: 8/20/2019, Entered: 8/20/2019
                              EXHIBIT(S) - A: Exhibit A to Emergency Affirmation of James P. Rouhandeh
                                Legal Document 60 Filed: 8/20/2019, Entered: 8/20/2019
                                AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF PROPOSED OSC/EXPARTE APP
                                  Legal Document 59 Filed: 8/20/2019, Entered: 8/20/2019
                                  ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE ( PROPOSED )
                                    Legal Document 58 Filed: 8/20/2019, Entered: 8/20/2019
                                    EXHIBIT(S) - 252: Exhibit 252
                                      Legal Document 57 Filed: 8/20/2019, Entered: 8/20/2019
                                      EXHIBIT(S) - 251: Exhibit 251
                                        Legal Document 56 Filed: 8/20/2019, Entered: 8/20/2019
                                        EXHIBIT(S) - 250: Exhibit 250
                                          Legal Document 55 Filed: 8/20/2019, Entered: 8/20/2019
                                          EXHIBIT(S) - 249: Exhibit 249
                                            Legal Document 54 Filed: 8/20/2019, Entered: 8/20/2019
                                            EXHIBIT(S) - 248: Exhibit 248
                                              Legal Document 53 Filed: 8/20/2019, Entered: 8/20/2019
                                              EXHIBIT(S) - 247: Exhibit 247
                                                Legal Document 52 Filed: 8/20/2019, Entered: 8/20/2019
                                                EXHIBIT(S) - 246: Exhibit 246
                                                  Legal Document 51 Filed: 8/20/2019, Entered: 8/20/2019
                                                  EXHIBIT(S) - 245: Exhibit 245
                                                    Blank 50 Filed: 8/20/2019, Entered: 8/20/2019
                                                    EXHIBIT(S) - REQUEST TO SEAL - 243: Exhibits 243-244
                                                      Blank 49 Filed: 8/20/2019, Entered: 8/20/2019
                                                      EXHIBIT(S) - REQUEST TO SEAL - 241: Exhibits 241-242
                                                        Blank 48 Filed: 8/20/2019, Entered: 8/20/2019
                                                        EXHIBIT(S) - REQUEST TO SEAL - 239: Exhibits 239-240
                                                          Blank 47 Filed: 8/20/2019, Entered: 8/20/2019
                                                          EXHIBIT(S) - REQUEST TO SEAL - 237: Exhibits 237-238
                                                            Blank 46 Filed: 8/20/2019, Entered: 8/20/2019
                                                            EXHIBIT(S) - REQUEST TO SEAL - 235: Exhibits 235-236
                                                              Blank 45 Filed: 8/20/2019, Entered: 8/20/2019
                                                              EXHIBIT(S) - REQUEST TO SEAL - 233: Exhibits 233-234
                                                                Blank 44 Filed: 8/20/2019, Entered: 8/20/2019
                                                                EXHIBIT(S) - REQUEST TO SEAL - 231: Exhibits 231-232
                                                                  Blank 43 Filed: 8/20/2019, Entered: 8/20/2019
                                                                  EXHIBIT(S) - REQUEST TO SEAL - 225: Exhibits 225-230
                                                                    Blank 42 Filed: 8/20/2019, Entered: 8/20/2019
                                                                    EXHIBIT(S) - REQUEST TO SEAL - 210: Exhibits 210-224
                                                                      Blank 41 Filed: 8/20/2019, Entered: 8/20/2019
                                                                      EXHIBIT(S) - REQUEST TO SEAL - 159: Exhibits 159-209, Possible SSN Administratively Redacted
                                                                        Blank 40 Filed: 8/20/2019, Entered: 8/20/2019
                                                                        EXHIBIT(S) - REQUEST TO SEAL - 157: Exhibits 157-158
                                                                          Blank 39 Filed: 8/20/2019, Entered: 8/20/2019
                                                                          EXHIBIT(S) - REQUEST TO SEAL - 154: Exhibits 154-156
                                                                            Blank 38 Filed: 8/20/2019, Entered: 8/20/2019
                                                                            EXHIBIT(S) - REQUEST TO SEAL - 151: Exhibits 151-153
                                                                              Blank 37 Filed: 8/20/2019, Entered: 8/20/2019
                                                                              EXHIBIT(S) - REQUEST TO SEAL - 148: Exhibits 148-150A
                                                                                Blank 36 Filed: 8/20/2019, Entered: 8/20/2019
                                                                                EXHIBIT(S) - REQUEST TO SEAL - 146: Exhibits 146-147A
                                                                                  Blank 35 Filed: 8/20/2019, Entered: 8/20/2019
                                                                                  EXHIBIT(S) - REQUEST TO SEAL - 145: Exhibit 145.2-145A
                                                                                    Blank 34 Filed: 8/20/2019, Entered: 8/20/2019
                                                                                    EXHIBIT(S) - REQUEST TO SEAL - 145: Exhibit 145.1
                                                                                      Blank 33 Filed: 8/20/2019, Entered: 8/20/2019
                                                                                      EXHIBIT(S) - REQUEST TO SEAL - 143: Exhibits 143-144A
                                                                                        Blank 32 Filed: 8/20/2019, Entered: 8/20/2019
                                                                                        EXHIBIT(S) - REQUEST TO SEAL - 141: Exhibits 141-142A
                                                                                          Blank 31 Filed: 8/20/2019, Entered: 8/20/2019
                                                                                          EXHIBIT(S) - REQUEST TO SEAL - 139: Exhibits 139-140
                                                                                            Blank 30 Filed: 8/20/2019, Entered: 8/20/2019
                                                                                            EXHIBIT(S) - REQUEST TO SEAL - 135: Exhibits 135-138
                                                                                              Blank 29 Filed: 8/20/2019, Entered: 8/20/2019
                                                                                              EXHIBIT(S) - REQUEST TO SEAL - 133: Exhibits 133-134
                                                                                                Blank 28 Filed: 8/20/2019, Entered: 8/20/2019
                                                                                                EXHIBIT(S) - REQUEST TO SEAL - 131: Exhibits 131-132
                                                                                                  Blank 27 Filed: 8/20/2019, Entered: 8/20/2019
                                                                                                  EXHIBIT(S) - REQUEST TO SEAL - 129: Exhibits 129-130
                                                                                                    Blank 26 Filed: 8/20/2019, Entered: 8/20/2019
                                                                                                    EXHIBIT(S) - REQUEST TO SEAL - 127: Exhibits 127-128
                                                                                                      Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                      Blank 25 Filed: 8/20/2019, Entered: 8/20/2019
                                                                                                      EXHIBIT(S) - REQUEST TO SEAL - 125: Exhibits 125-126
                                                                                                        Blank 24 Filed: 8/20/2019, Entered: 8/20/2019
                                                                                                        EXHIBIT(S) - REQUEST TO SEAL - 123: Exhibits 123-124
                                                                                                          Blank 23 Filed: 8/20/2019, Entered: 8/20/2019
                                                                                                          EXHIBIT(S) - REQUEST TO SEAL - 121: Exhibits 121-122
                                                                                                            Blank 22 Filed: 8/20/2019, Entered: 8/20/2019
                                                                                                            EXHIBIT(S) - REQUEST TO SEAL - 119: Exhibits 119-120
                                                                                                              Blank 21 Filed: 8/20/2019, Entered: 8/20/2019
                                                                                                              EXHIBIT(S) - REQUEST TO SEAL - 118: Exhibit 118
                                                                                                                Blank 20 Filed: 8/20/2019, Entered: 8/20/2019
                                                                                                                EXHIBIT(S) - REQUEST TO SEAL - 117: Exhibit 117
                                                                                                                  Blank 19 Filed: 8/20/2019, Entered: 8/20/2019
                                                                                                                  EXHIBIT(S) - REQUEST TO SEAL - 115: Exhibits 115-116
                                                                                                                    Blank 18 Filed: 8/20/2019, Entered: 8/20/2019
                                                                                                                    EXHIBIT(S) - REQUEST TO SEAL - 113: Exhibits 113-114
                                                                                                                      Blank 17 Filed: 8/20/2019, Entered: 8/20/2019
                                                                                                                      EXHIBIT(S) - REQUEST TO SEAL - 111: Exhibits 111-112
                                                                                                                        Blank 16 Filed: 8/20/2019, Entered: 8/20/2019
                                                                                                                        EXHIBIT(S) - REQUEST TO SEAL - 107: Exhibits 107-110
                                                                                                                          Blank 15 Filed: 8/20/2019, Entered: 8/20/2019
                                                                                                                          EXHIBIT(S) - REQUEST TO SEAL - 102: Exhibits 102-106
                                                                                                                            Blank 14 Filed: 8/20/2019, Entered: 8/20/2019
                                                                                                                            EXHIBIT(S) - REQUEST TO SEAL - 98-: Exhibits 98-101
                                                                                                                              Blank 13 Filed: 8/20/2019, Entered: 8/20/2019
                                                                                                                              EXHIBIT(S) - REQUEST TO SEAL - 94-: Exhibits 94-97
                                                                                                                                Blank 12 Filed: 8/20/2019, Entered: 8/20/2019
                                                                                                                                EXHIBIT(S) - REQUEST TO SEAL - 90-: Exhibits 90-93
                                                                                                                                  Blank 11 Filed: 8/20/2019, Entered: 8/20/2019
                                                                                                                                  EXHIBIT(S) - REQUEST TO SEAL - 86-: Exhibits 86-89
                                                                                                                                    Blank 10 Filed: 8/20/2019, Entered: 8/20/2019
                                                                                                                                    EXHIBIT(S) - REQUEST TO SEAL - 81-: Exhibits 81-85
                                                                                                                                      Blank 9 Filed: 8/20/2019, Entered: 8/20/2019
                                                                                                                                      EXHIBIT(S) - REQUEST TO SEAL - 75-: Exhibits 75-80
                                                                                                                                        Blank 8 Filed: 8/20/2019, Entered: 8/20/2019
                                                                                                                                        EXHIBIT(S) - REQUEST TO SEAL - 71-: Exhibits 71-74
                                                                                                                                          Blank 7 Filed: 8/20/2019, Entered: 8/20/2019
                                                                                                                                          EXHIBIT(S) - REQUEST TO SEAL - 67-: Exhibits 67-70
                                                                                                                                            Blank 6 Filed: 8/20/2019, Entered: 8/20/2019
                                                                                                                                            EXHIBIT(S) - REQUEST TO SEAL - 63-: Exhibits 63-66
                                                                                                                                              Blank 5 Filed: 8/20/2019, Entered: 8/20/2019
                                                                                                                                              EXHIBIT(S) - REQUEST TO SEAL - 59-: Exhibits 59-62
                                                                                                                                                Blank 4 Filed: 8/20/2019, Entered: 8/20/2019
                                                                                                                                                EXHIBIT(S) - REQUEST TO SEAL - 43-: Exhibits 43-58
                                                                                                                                                  Blank 3 Filed: 8/20/2019, Entered: 8/20/2019
                                                                                                                                                  EXHIBIT(S) - REQUEST TO SEAL - 27: Exhibits 27-42
                                                                                                                                                    Blank 2 Filed: 8/20/2019, Entered: 8/20/2019
                                                                                                                                                    EXHIBIT(S) - REQUEST TO SEAL - 1-: Exhibits 1-26
                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 1 Filed: 8/20/2019, Entered: 8/20/2019
                                                                                                                                                      SUMMONS + COMPLAINT: Redacted Summons, Complaint and Appendix

                                                                                                                                                        Statistics

                                                                                                                                                        This case has been viewed 9,496 times.

                                                                                                                                                        No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                        Space
                                                                                                                                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                         
                                                                                                                                                        PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                        Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                        Need Password Help?