Dave Jorge v. Tesla, Inc.
State Civil Lawsuit Superior Court of California, County of Santa Clara, Case No. 19CV352511

Tags
Last Updated March 10, 2021 at 8:57 PM ST (2.1 months ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Jorge, Dave, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Ronald S. Galasi +65085620 650 085 6200 +1 650 685 6204 galasi.law@gmail.com
v.
Tesla, Inc. Tesla, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Andrea Rose Milano +1 415 276 8841 +1 415 723 7537 amilano@littler.com
Case Type Other Employment Unlimited (15)
Case Status Active
Case Location Civil
  Entries (43) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document 43 Filed: 12/17/2020, Entered: None Notice: Change Address/Firm Name
Notice of Change of Address
    Legal Document 42 Filed: 12/10/2020, Entered: None Minute Order
      Legal Document 41 Filed: 12/10/2020, Entered: None Notice
      NOTICE OF APPEARANCES
        Legal Document 40 Filed: 5/21/2020, Entered: None Minute Order
          Legal Document 39 Filed: 5/21/2020, Entered: None Order: Submitted MatterCourt Filing
          on Def. Tesla's Motion to Compel Arbitration and to Stay Action Pending Outcome of the Arbitration is GRANTED by Judge Manoukian
            Legal Document 38 Filed: 5/19/2020, Entered: None Clerk Rejection LetterCourt Filing
            DO NOT USE THIS ORDER per Judge Manoukian
              Legal Document 37 Filed: 5/14/2020, Entered: None Clerk Rejection LetterCourt Filing
              DO NOT USE THIS Order per Judge Manoukian
                Legal Document 36 Filed: 5/14/2020, Entered: None Proof Of Service-
                Proof of Service
                  Legal Document 35 Filed: 5/13/2020, Entered: None Proof Of Service-
                  Proof of Service
                    Legal Document 34 Filed: 5/4/2020, Entered: None Response/Reply
                    Hrg 5 7 2020 9am Defendants Response To Plaintiffs Objection To Defendant Tesla Incs Reply Supplemental Declaration Of Nicole White And New Evidence
                      Legal Document 33 Filed: 5/4/2020, Entered: None Response/Reply
                      Hrg 5 7 2020 9am Defendants Surreply In Support Of Its Motion To Compel Arbitration
                        Legal Document 32 Filed: 5/4/2020, Entered: None Proof Of Service-
                        Hrg 5 7 2020 9am Proof Of Service
                          Legal Document 31 Filed: 5/4/2020, Entered: None Opposition/Objections
                          hrg 05/07/20 D20 9AM
                            Legal Document 30 Filed: 5/4/2020, Entered: None Proof Of Service-
                              Legal Document 29 Filed: 4/30/2020, Entered: None Response/Reply
                              Reply in Support of Motion to Compel Arbitration
                                Legal Document 28 Filed: 4/30/2020, Entered: None Declaration
                                Supplemental Declaration of Nicole White
                                  Legal Document 27 Filed: 4/30/2020, Entered: None Proof Of Service-
                                  Proof of Service
                                    Legal Document 26 Filed: 4/24/2020, Entered: None Proof of Service-Mail
                                    Proof of Service
                                      Legal Document 25 Filed: 4/24/2020, Entered: None Opposition/Objections
                                      Opposition to Motion
                                        Legal Document 24 Filed: 4/24/2020, Entered: None Declaration
                                        Declaration of Dave Jorge
                                          Legal Document 23 Filed: 4/24/2020, Entered: None Declaration
                                          Declaration of AS
                                            Legal Document 22 Filed: 4/24/2020, Entered: None Request
                                            Request for Judicial Notice
                                              Legal Document 21 Filed: 4/15/2020, Entered: None Motion: Compel Arbitration
                                              Hrg 5 7 2020 9am Defendants Notice Of Motion And Motion To Compel Arbitration
                                                Legal Document 20 Filed: 4/15/2020, Entered: None Memorandum Points & Authorities
                                                Hrg 5 7 2020 9am Defendants Memorandum Of Points And Authorities In Support Of Its Motion To Compel Arbitration
                                                  Legal Document 19 Filed: 4/15/2020, Entered: None Request
                                                  Hrg 5 7 2020 9am Request For Judicial Notice In Support Of Defendants Motion To Compel Arbitration
                                                    Legal Document 18 Filed: 4/15/2020, Entered: None Declaration
                                                    Hrg 5 7 2020 9am Declaration Of Nicole White In Support Of Defendants Motion To Compel Arbitration
                                                      Legal Document 17 Filed: 4/15/2020, Entered: None Declaration
                                                      Hrg 5 7 2020 9am Declaration Of Andrea R Milano In Support Of Defendants Motion To Compel Arbitration
                                                        Legal Document 16 Filed: 4/15/2020, Entered: None Proof Of Service-
                                                        Hrg 5 7 2020 9am Proof Of Service
                                                          Legal Document 15 Filed: 4/3/2020, Entered: None Notice
                                                          Defendant s Notice of Correct Contact Information
                                                            Legal Document 14 Filed: 3/11/2020, Entered: None Minute Order
                                                              Blank 13 Filed: 3/10/2020, Entered: None Referral: Mediation
                                                                Legal Document 12 Filed: 3/6/2020, Entered: None Statement: Case Management Conference
                                                                Case Management Statement
                                                                  Legal Document 11 Filed: 3/5/2020, Entered: None Statement: Case Management Conference
                                                                  Case Management Statement
                                                                    Legal Document 10 Filed: 2/7/2020, Entered: None Substitution-Attorney
                                                                    Old atty: Negrete / New atty: Sarapinian
                                                                      Legal Document 9 Filed: 2/6/2020, Entered: None Clerk Rejection Letter
                                                                      ENV#3992935 / Substitution of Atty: Name of party making substitution must be completed above item #1 (see highlighted).
                                                                        Legal Document 8 Filed: 11/21/2019, Entered: None Minute Order
                                                                          Legal Document 7 Filed: 11/1/2019, Entered: None Statement: Case Management Conference
                                                                          Hrg: 11/19/19 Case Management Statement
                                                                            Legal Document 6 Filed: 9/27/2019, Entered: None Answer (Unlimited) (Fee Applies)
                                                                            To Complaint atty: Milano
                                                                              Legal Document 5 Filed: 9/27/2019, Entered: None Proof of Service-Mail
                                                                                Legal Document 4 Filed: 8/14/2019, Entered: None Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil)
                                                                                Proof Of Service
                                                                                  Legal Document 3 Filed: 8/9/2019, Entered: None Civil Case Cover Sheet
                                                                                    Legal Document 2 Filed: 8/9/2019, Entered: None Summons: Issued/Filed
                                                                                      Legal Document 1 Filed: 8/9/2019, Entered: None Complaint (Unlimited) (Fee Applies)

                                                                                        Statistics

                                                                                        This case has been viewed 74 times.

                                                                                        No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                        Space
                                                                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                         
                                                                                        PlainSite
                                                                                        Sign Up
                                                                                        Need Password Help?