Current Power Electric, Inc. v. SolarCity Engineering, Inc.
State Civil Lawsuit Superior Court of California, County of Santa Clara, Case No. 19CV350566

Tags
Last Updated March 10, 2021 at 8:41 PM ST (1.3 months ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Current Power Electric, Inc., Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Ronnie Chow

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Ronnie Chow
v.
SolarCity Engineering, Inc. SolarCity Engineering, Inc., Defendant
Case Type Collections Rule 3.740 Limited (09) - under 10,000
Case Status Active
Case Location Civil
  Entries (17) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document 17 Filed: 6/30/2020, Entered: None Judgment Default
$3,883.70 (Eserved 6/30/2020)
    Legal Document 16 Filed: 6/30/2020, Entered: None Order
    RE: Attorney's Fees (Eserved 6/30/2020)
      Legal Document 15 Filed: 6/5/2020, Entered: None Order: Default Judgment not entered
      It appears that venue is improper. The 585 declaration attaches an invoice showing defendant's address in San Mateo. Signed by Lucas.
        Legal Document 14 Filed: 5/27/2020, Entered: None Declaration: Interest
          Legal Document 13 Filed: 5/27/2020, Entered: None Declaration in Support
            Legal Document 12 Filed: 5/27/2020, Entered: None Default Entered
              Legal Document 11 Filed: 12/24/2019, Entered: None Default Entered
              e-served 2/14/2020
                Legal Document 10 Filed: 12/24/2019, Entered: None Request Dismissal
                Does Only
                  Legal Document 9 Filed: 12/24/2019, Entered: None Declaration Ccp 585
                  Affidavit 585.5
                    Legal Document 8 Filed: 12/24/2019, Entered: None Declaration in Support
                    Declaration 1717.5
                      Legal Document 7 Filed: 12/24/2019, Entered: None Declaration Ccp 1033
                        Legal Document 6 Filed: 12/24/2019, Entered: None Declaration: Interest
                          Legal Document 5 Filed: 9/27/2019, Entered: None Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil)
                            Legal Document 4 Filed: 9/27/2019, Entered: None Default Entered
                              Legal Document 3 Filed: 7/3/2019, Entered: None Complaint (Limited): Up to $10K
                                Legal Document 2 Filed: 7/3/2019, Entered: None Civil Case Cover Sheet
                                  Legal Document 1 Filed: 7/3/2019, Entered: None Summons: Issued/Filed

                                    Statistics

                                    This case has been viewed 533 times.

                                    No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                    Space
                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                     
                                    PlainSite
                                    Sign Up
                                    Need Password Help?