MORRIS v. CAMDEN COUNTY, et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit New Jersey District Court, Case No. 1:99-cv-00962-SMO

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo GREGORY MORRIS, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space THOMAS G. ROTH +1 973 736 9090 +1 973 736 8005 tgroth395@aol.com
v.
No Logo BERLIN BOROUGH, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space WILLIAM A. GARRIGLE +1 856 427 9300 garrigle@aol.com

Toggle Switch Represented by White & Williams LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Michael O. Kassak +1 856 317 3600 +1 856 317 3603 kassakm@whiteandwilliams.com
No Logo BERLIN BOROUGH POLICE DEPARTMENT, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space WILLIAM A. GARRIGLE +1 856 427 9300 garrigle@aol.com

Toggle Switch Represented by White & Williams LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Michael O. Kassak +1 856 317 3600 +1 856 317 3603 kassakm@whiteandwilliams.com
No Logo BERLIN TOWNSHIP, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space WILLIAM A. GARRIGLE +1 856 427 9300 garrigle@aol.com

Toggle Switch Represented by White & Williams LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Michael O. Kassak +1 856 317 3600 +1 856 317 3603 kassakm@whiteandwilliams.com
No Logo BERLIN TOWNSHIP POLICE DEPARTMENT, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space WILLIAM A. GARRIGLE +1 856 427 9300 garrigle@aol.com

Toggle Switch Represented by White & Williams LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Michael O. Kassak +1 856 317 3600 +1 856 317 3603 kassakm@whiteandwilliams.com
No Logo BILL MOORE, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space WILLIAM A. GARRIGLE +1 856 427 9300 garrigle@aol.com

Toggle Switch Represented by White & Williams LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Michael O. Kassak +1 856 317 3600 +1 856 317 3603 kassakm@whiteandwilliams.com
No Logo BONFIGLIO, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space WILLIAM A. GARRIGLE +1 856 427 9300 garrigle@aol.com

Toggle Switch Represented by White & Williams LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Michael O. Kassak +1 856 317 3600 +1 856 317 3603 kassakm@whiteandwilliams.com
No Logo Camden County, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by OFFICE OF THE CAMDEN COUNTY COUNSEL

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space DONNA M. WHITESIDE +1 856 225 5543 dwhiteside@camdencounty.com
No Logo CAMDEN COUNTY, OFFICE OF THE PROSECUTOR, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by OFFICE OF THE CAMDEN COUNTY COUNSEL

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space DONNA M. WHITESIDE +1 856 225 5543 dwhiteside@camdencounty.com
No Logo CHRIS FERRARI, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space WILLIAM A. GARRIGLE +1 856 427 9300 garrigle@aol.com

Toggle Switch Represented by White & Williams LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Michael O. Kassak +1 856 317 3600 +1 856 317 3603 kassakm@whiteandwilliams.com
No Logo COLLINGSWOOD BOROUGH, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by White & Williams LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Michael O. Kassak +1 856 317 3600 +1 856 317 3603 kassakm@whiteandwilliams.com
No Logo COLLINGSWOOD BOROUGH POLICE DEPARTMENT, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by White & Williams LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Michael O. Kassak +1 856 317 3600 +1 856 317 3603 kassakm@whiteandwilliams.com
No Logo HARRY GLEMSER, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by OFFICE OF THE CAMDEN COUNTY COUNSEL

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space DONNA M. WHITESIDE +1 856 225 5543 dwhiteside@camdencounty.com

Toggle Switch Represented by White & Williams LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Michael O. Kassak +1 856 317 3600 +1 856 317 3603 kassakm@whiteandwilliams.com
No Logo Hill & Simpson, PC, Defendant
Officially listed as "HILL"

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space WILLIAM A. GARRIGLE +1 856 427 9300 garrigle@aol.com

Toggle Switch Represented by White & Williams LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Michael O. Kassak +1 856 317 3600 +1 856 317 3603 kassakm@whiteandwilliams.com
No Logo James, Bruno, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by White & Williams LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Michael O. Kassak +1 856 317 3600 +1 856 317 3603 kassakm@whiteandwilliams.com
No Logo John and Jane Does 1 Through 10, Defendant
Officially listed as "JOHN AND JANE DOES"
No Logo JOHN CLANCY, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space WILLIAM A. GARRIGLE +1 856 427 9300 garrigle@aol.com

Toggle Switch Represented by White & Williams LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Michael O. Kassak +1 856 317 3600 +1 856 317 3603 kassakm@whiteandwilliams.com
No Logo John, Gregory, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space WILLIAM A. GARRIGLE +1 856 427 9300 garrigle@aol.com

Toggle Switch Represented by White & Williams LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Michael O. Kassak +1 856 317 3600 +1 856 317 3603 kassakm@whiteandwilliams.com
No Logo JOSEPH JACKSON, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space WILLIAM A. GARRIGLE +1 856 427 9300 garrigle@aol.com

Toggle Switch Represented by White & Williams LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Michael O. Kassak +1 856 317 3600 +1 856 317 3603 kassakm@whiteandwilliams.com
No Logo LARRY KNICELY, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space WILLIAM A. GARRIGLE +1 856 427 9300 garrigle@aol.com

Toggle Switch Represented by White & Williams LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Michael O. Kassak +1 856 317 3600 +1 856 317 3603 kassakm@whiteandwilliams.com
No Logo LEE A. SOLOMON, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by OFFICE OF THE CAMDEN COUNTY COUNSEL

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space DONNA M. WHITESIDE +1 856 225 5543 dwhiteside@camdencounty.com
Hayden, Michael V. Hayden, Michael V., Defendant
Officially listed as "MICHAEL HAYDEN"
Motorola, Inc. Unknown Role, Motorola, Inc.

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space WILLIAM A. GARRIGLE +1 856 427 9300 garrigle@aol.com

Toggle Switch Represented by White & Williams LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Michael O. Kassak +1 856 317 3600 +1 856 317 3603 kassakm@whiteandwilliams.com
No Logo MICHAEL WOLCOTT, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space WILLIAM A. GARRIGLE +1 856 427 9300 garrigle@aol.com

Toggle Switch Represented by White & Williams LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Michael O. Kassak +1 856 317 3600 +1 856 317 3603 kassakm@whiteandwilliams.com
No Logo VINCENT DEMATTEO, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space WILLIAM A. GARRIGLE +1 856 427 9300 garrigle@aol.com

Toggle Switch Represented by White & Williams LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Michael O. Kassak +1 856 317 3600 +1 856 317 3603 kassakm@whiteandwilliams.com
No Logo BERLIN BOROUGH, Cross-Claimant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space WILLIAM A. GARRIGLE +1 856 427 9300 garrigle@aol.com

Toggle Switch Represented by White & Williams LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Michael O. Kassak +1 856 317 3600 +1 856 317 3603 kassakm@whiteandwilliams.com
No Logo BERLIN BOROUGH POLICE DEPARTMENT, Cross-Claimant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space WILLIAM A. GARRIGLE +1 856 427 9300 garrigle@aol.com

Toggle Switch Represented by White & Williams LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Michael O. Kassak +1 856 317 3600 +1 856 317 3603 kassakm@whiteandwilliams.com
No Logo BERLIN TOWNSHIP, Cross-Claimant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space WILLIAM A. GARRIGLE +1 856 427 9300 garrigle@aol.com

Toggle Switch Represented by White & Williams LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Michael O. Kassak +1 856 317 3600 +1 856 317 3603 kassakm@whiteandwilliams.com
No Logo BERLIN TOWNSHIP POLICE DEPARTMENT, Cross-Claimant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space WILLIAM A. GARRIGLE +1 856 427 9300 garrigle@aol.com

Toggle Switch Represented by White & Williams LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Michael O. Kassak +1 856 317 3600 +1 856 317 3603 kassakm@whiteandwilliams.com
No Logo BILL MOORE, Cross-Claimant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space WILLIAM A. GARRIGLE +1 856 427 9300 garrigle@aol.com

Toggle Switch Represented by White & Williams LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Michael O. Kassak +1 856 317 3600 +1 856 317 3603 kassakm@whiteandwilliams.com
No Logo BONFIGLIO, Cross-Claimant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space WILLIAM A. GARRIGLE +1 856 427 9300 garrigle@aol.com

Toggle Switch Represented by White & Williams LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Michael O. Kassak +1 856 317 3600 +1 856 317 3603 kassakm@whiteandwilliams.com
No Logo Camden County, Cross-Claimant

Toggle Switch Represented by OFFICE OF THE CAMDEN COUNTY COUNSEL

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space DONNA M. WHITESIDE +1 856 225 5543 dwhiteside@camdencounty.com
No Logo CAMDEN COUNTY, OFFICE OF THE PROSECUTOR, Cross-Claimant

Toggle Switch Represented by OFFICE OF THE CAMDEN COUNTY COUNSEL

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space DONNA M. WHITESIDE +1 856 225 5543 dwhiteside@camdencounty.com
No Logo CHRIS FERRARI, Cross-Claimant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space WILLIAM A. GARRIGLE +1 856 427 9300 garrigle@aol.com

Toggle Switch Represented by White & Williams LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Michael O. Kassak +1 856 317 3600 +1 856 317 3603 kassakm@whiteandwilliams.com
No Logo COLLINGSWOOD BOROUGH, Cross-Claimant

Toggle Switch Represented by White & Williams LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Michael O. Kassak +1 856 317 3600 +1 856 317 3603 kassakm@whiteandwilliams.com
No Logo COLLINGSWOOD BOROUGH POLICE DEPARTMENT, Cross-Claimant

Toggle Switch Represented by White & Williams LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Michael O. Kassak +1 856 317 3600 +1 856 317 3603 kassakm@whiteandwilliams.com
No Logo HARRY GLEMSER, Cross-Claimant

Toggle Switch Represented by OFFICE OF THE CAMDEN COUNTY COUNSEL

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space DONNA M. WHITESIDE +1 856 225 5543 dwhiteside@camdencounty.com
No Logo Hill & Simpson, PC, Cross-Claimant
Officially listed as "HILL"

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space WILLIAM A. GARRIGLE +1 856 427 9300 garrigle@aol.com

Toggle Switch Represented by White & Williams LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Michael O. Kassak +1 856 317 3600 +1 856 317 3603 kassakm@whiteandwilliams.com
No Logo James, Bruno, Cross-Claimant

Toggle Switch Represented by White & Williams LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Michael O. Kassak +1 856 317 3600 +1 856 317 3603 kassakm@whiteandwilliams.com
No Logo JOHN CLANCY, Cross-Claimant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space WILLIAM A. GARRIGLE +1 856 427 9300 garrigle@aol.com

Toggle Switch Represented by White & Williams LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Michael O. Kassak +1 856 317 3600 +1 856 317 3603 kassakm@whiteandwilliams.com
No Logo John, Gregory, Cross-Claimant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space WILLIAM A. GARRIGLE +1 856 427 9300 garrigle@aol.com

Toggle Switch Represented by White & Williams LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Michael O. Kassak +1 856 317 3600 +1 856 317 3603 kassakm@whiteandwilliams.com
No Logo JOSEPH JACKSON, Cross-Claimant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space WILLIAM A. GARRIGLE +1 856 427 9300 garrigle@aol.com

Toggle Switch Represented by White & Williams LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Michael O. Kassak +1 856 317 3600 +1 856 317 3603 kassakm@whiteandwilliams.com
No Logo LARRY KNICELY, Cross-Claimant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space WILLIAM A. GARRIGLE +1 856 427 9300 garrigle@aol.com

Toggle Switch Represented by White & Williams LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Michael O. Kassak +1 856 317 3600 +1 856 317 3603 kassakm@whiteandwilliams.com
No Logo LEE A. SOLOMON, Cross-Claimant

Toggle Switch Represented by OFFICE OF THE CAMDEN COUNTY COUNSEL

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space DONNA M. WHITESIDE +1 856 225 5543 dwhiteside@camdencounty.com
Hayden, Michael V. Hayden, Michael V., Cross-Claimant
Officially listed as "MICHAEL HAYDEN"
Motorola, Inc. Unknown Role, Motorola, Inc.

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space WILLIAM A. GARRIGLE +1 856 427 9300 garrigle@aol.com

Toggle Switch Represented by White & Williams LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Michael O. Kassak +1 856 317 3600 +1 856 317 3603 kassakm@whiteandwilliams.com
No Logo MICHAEL WOLCOTT, Cross-Claimant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space WILLIAM A. GARRIGLE +1 856 427 9300 garrigle@aol.com

Toggle Switch Represented by White & Williams LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Michael O. Kassak +1 856 317 3600 +1 856 317 3603 kassakm@whiteandwilliams.com
No Logo VINCENT DEMATTEO, Cross-Claimant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space WILLIAM A. GARRIGLE +1 856 427 9300 garrigle@aol.com

Toggle Switch Represented by White & Williams LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Michael O. Kassak +1 856 317 3600 +1 856 317 3603 kassakm@whiteandwilliams.com
No Logo BERLIN BOROUGH, Cross-Defendant
No Logo BERLIN BOROUGH POLICE DEPARTMENT, Cross-Defendant
No Logo BERLIN TOWNSHIP, Cross-Defendant
No Logo BERLIN TOWNSHIP POLICE DEPARTMENT, Cross-Defendant
No Logo BILL MOORE, Cross-Defendant
No Logo BONFIGLIO, Cross-Defendant
No Logo Camden County, Cross-Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by OFFICE OF THE CAMDEN COUNTY COUNSEL

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space DONNA M. WHITESIDE +1 856 225 5543 dwhiteside@camdencounty.com
No Logo CAMDEN COUNTY, OFFICE OF THE PROSECUTOR, Cross-Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by OFFICE OF THE CAMDEN COUNTY COUNSEL

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space DONNA M. WHITESIDE +1 856 225 5543 dwhiteside@camdencounty.com
No Logo CHRIS FERRARI, Cross-Defendant
No Logo COLLINGSWOOD BOROUGH, Cross-Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by White & Williams LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Michael O. Kassak +1 856 317 3600 +1 856 317 3603 kassakm@whiteandwilliams.com
No Logo COLLINGSWOOD BOROUGH POLICE DEPARTMENT, Cross-Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by White & Williams LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Michael O. Kassak +1 856 317 3600 +1 856 317 3603 kassakm@whiteandwilliams.com
No Logo HARRY GLEMSER, Cross-Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by OFFICE OF THE CAMDEN COUNTY COUNSEL

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space DONNA M. WHITESIDE +1 856 225 5543 dwhiteside@camdencounty.com

Toggle Switch Represented by White & Williams LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Michael O. Kassak +1 856 317 3600 +1 856 317 3603 kassakm@whiteandwilliams.com
No Logo Hill & Simpson, PC, Cross-Defendant
Officially listed as "HILL"
No Logo James, Bruno, Cross-Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by White & Williams LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Michael O. Kassak +1 856 317 3600 +1 856 317 3603 kassakm@whiteandwilliams.com
No Logo John and Jane Does 1 Through 10, Cross-Defendant
Officially listed as "JOHN AND JANE DOES"
No Logo JOHN CLANCY, Cross-Defendant
No Logo John, Gregory, Cross-Defendant
No Logo JOSEPH JACKSON, Cross-Defendant
No Logo LARRY KNICELY, Cross-Defendant
No Logo LEE A. SOLOMON, Cross-Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by OFFICE OF THE CAMDEN COUNTY COUNSEL

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space DONNA M. WHITESIDE +1 856 225 5543 dwhiteside@camdencounty.com
Hayden, Michael V. Hayden, Michael V., Cross-Defendant
Officially listed as "MICHAEL HAYDEN"
Motorola, Inc. Unknown Role, Motorola, Inc.
No Logo MICHAEL WOLCOTT, Cross-Defendant
No Logo VINCENT DEMATTEO, Cross-Defendant
Office Camden
Filed 3/3/1999
Jury Demand Both
Demand $0
Nature of Suit 440 - Civil Rights: Other
Cause Section 42 U.S.C. § 1981 Civil Rights
Jurisdiction Federal Question
Disposition Transfer/Remand - Remanded to State Court
County Camden
Terminated 6/30/1999
Origin 2
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case L-774-99[SUP.CT.CAMDEN CNTY.]
Def Custody Status
Flags 12BJ, CLOSED, SCHEDO
  Entries (39) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 34 Filed: 7/1/1999, Entered: 7/1/1999 Certificate Of Service.
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by GREGORY MORRIS; Re: Reply Brief submitted in support of [27-1] cross-motion, etc. (ar1)
    LREF
    Blank 33 Filed: 7/1/1999, Entered: 7/1/1999 Miscellaneous Document
    DECLARATION of Louise Arkel, Esquire on behalf of GREGORY MORRIS Re: [27-1] cross motion to stay proceedings pending resolution of pltf's motion to remand and the resolution of criminal charges (ar1)
      LREF
      Blank 32 Filed: 6/30/1999, Entered: 6/30/1999 OrderCourt Filing
      ORDER dismissing as moot [12-1] cross motion for sanctions and granting [10-1] motion to remand to Superior Court Camden County. ( signed by Judge Stephen M. Orlofsky ) (ar1)
        LREF
        Blank 31 Filed: 6/30/1999, Entered: 6/30/1999 OrderCourt Filing
        MEMORANDUM OPINION ( signed by Judge Stephen M. Orlofsky ) (ar1)
          LREF
          Blank -- Filed: 6/30/1999, Entered: 6/30/1999 Terminated Case
          Case closed (ar1)
            LREF
            Blank 30 Filed: 6/25/1999, Entered: 6/30/1999 Certification
            CERTIFICATION of Donna M. Whiteside on behalf of CAMDEN COUNTY, OFFICE OF PROSECUTOR, LEE A. SOLOMON, HARRY GLEMSER Re: in support of [25-1] motion for sanctions. (Letter Brief Submitted) (ar1)
              LREF
              Blank 29 Filed: 6/18/1999, Entered: 6/22/1999 Miscellaneous Document
              DECLARATION of Louise Arkel on Re: [27-1] cross motion to stay proceedings pending resolution of pltf's motion to remand and the resolution of criminal charges (mgr)
                LREF
                Blank 28 Filed: 6/18/1999, Entered: 6/22/1999 Miscellaneous Document
                DECLARATION of Thomas Roth on Re: [27-1] cross motion to stay proceedings pending resolution of pltf's motion to remand and the resolution of criminal charges (mgr)
                  LREF
                  Blank 27 Filed: 6/18/1999, Entered: 6/22/1999 Motion to Stay
                  Notice of CROSS MOTION to stay proceedings pending resolution of pltf's motion to remand and the resolution of criminal charges by plaintiff GREGORY MORRIS, Motion set for 7/16/99 on [27-1] cross motion (Brief Subm.) (Oral Argument Requested). (mgr)
                    LREF
                    Blank 26 Filed: 6/18/1999, Entered: 6/18/1999 Miscellaneous Document
                    STATEMENT THAT NO BRIEF IS NECESSARY by BERLIN BOROUGH, BERLIN BORO POLICE, BERLIN TOWNSHIP, BERLIN TWP. POLICE, JOHN CLANCY, MICHAEL HAYDEN, JOSEPH JACKSON, JOHN GREGORY, CHRIS FERRARI, HILL, BONFIGLIO, VINCENT DEMATTEO, BILL MOORE, MICHAEL WOLCOTT, LARRY KNICELY (ar1)
                      LREF
                      Blank 25 Filed: 6/18/1999, Entered: 6/18/1999, Terminated: 6/30/1999 Motion for SanctionsCourt Filing
                      Notice of MOTION for sanctions by BERLIN BOROUGH, BERLIN BORO POLICE, BERLIN TOWNSHIP, BERLIN TWP. POLICE, JOHN CLANCY, MICHAEL HAYDEN, JOSEPH JACKSON, JOHN GREGORY, CHRIS FERRARI, LARRY KNICELY [25-1] motion referred to Mag. Judge Robert B. Kugler, Motion set for 7/16/99 on [25-1] motion . (PO Subm) (ar1)
                        LREF
                        Blank 24 Filed: 6/4/1999, Entered: 6/7/1999 Certification
                        CERTIFICATION of Donna M. Whiteside on behalf of CAMDEN COUNTY, OFFICE OF PROSECUTOR, LEE A. SOLOMON, HARRY GLEMSER Re: [23-1] for sanctions (ar1)
                          LREF
                          Blank 23 Filed: 6/4/1999, Entered: 6/7/1999 Motion for SanctionsCourt Filing
                          Notice of MOTION for sanctions by CAMDEN COUNTY, OFFICE OF PROSECUTOR, LEE A. SOLOMON, HARRY GLEMSER [23-1] motion referred to Mag. Judge Robert B. Kugler, Motion set for 9:00 7/2/99 on [23-1] motion . (Brief/PO Subm) (ar1)
                            LREF
                            Blank 22 Filed: 5/24/1999, Entered: 5/25/1999 Certificate Of Service.
                            CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by GREGORY MORRIS; Re: Plaintiff's request to stay deposition and all supporting papers, etc. (ar1)
                              LREF
                              Blank 21 Filed: 5/24/1999, Entered: 5/25/1999 Miscellaneous Document
                              DECLARATION of Thomas Roth, Esquire on behalf of GREGORY MORRIS; Re: Plaintiff's request to stay deposition. (ar1)
                                LREF
                                Blank 20 Filed: 5/24/1999, Entered: 5/25/1999 Miscellaneous Document
                                DECLARATION of Louise Arkel, Esquire on behalf of GREGORY MORRIS; Re: Plaintiff's request to stay deposition. (ar1)
                                  LREF
                                  Blank 19 Filed: 5/11/1999, Entered: 5/12/1999 OrderCourt Filing
                                  ORDER permitting deft. Camden County to take deposition of plaintiff by May 31, 1999. ( signed by Mag. Judge Robert B. Kugler ) (ar1)
                                    LREF
                                    Blank 18 Filed: 5/3/1999, Entered: 5/3/1999, Terminated: 6/30/1999 Answer
                                    ANSWER to complaint; jury demand and CROSSCLAIM by BERLIN BOROUGH, BERLIN BORO POLICE, BERLIN TOWNSHIP, BERLIN TWP. POLICE, JOHN CLANCY, MICHAEL HAYDEN, JOSEPH JACKSON, JOHN GREGORY, CHRIS FERRARI, HILL, BONFIGLIO, VINCENT DEMATTEO, BILL MOORE, MICHAEL WOLCOTT, LARRY KNICELY against CAMDEN COUNTY, OFFICE OF PROSECUTOR, LEE A. SOLOMON, HARRY GLEMSER, COLLINGSWOOD BORO, COLLINGSWOOD POLICE, JAMES BRUNO and answers to any and all crossclaims. (ar1)
                                      LREF
                                      Blank 17 Filed: 4/29/1999, Entered: 4/29/1999, Terminated: 6/30/1999 Answer to Crossclaim
                                      ANSWER by COLLINGSWOOD BORO, COLLINGSWOOD POLICE, JAMES BRUNO to [9-2] cross claim; [4-2] cross claim and all crossclaims filed. Jury Demand (ar1)
                                        LREF
                                        Blank 16 Filed: 4/28/1999, Entered: 4/28/1999 Certificate Of Service.
                                        CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by GREGORY MORRIS; Reply to defts. opposition, etc. (ar1)
                                          LREF
                                          Blank 15 Filed: 4/28/1999, Entered: 4/28/1999 Miscellaneous Document
                                          DECLARATION of Louise Arkel, Esquire on behalf of GREGORY MORRIS; Re: in support of plaintiff's reply to the moving defts. opposition to [10-1] motion to remand to Superior Court Camden County. (ar1)
                                            LREF
                                            Blank 14 Filed: 4/28/1999, Entered: 4/28/1999 Certificate Of Service.
                                            CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by CAMDEN COUNTY, OFFICE OF PROSECUTOR, LEE A. SOLOMON, HARRY GLEMSER; Re: Response to motion to remand, etc. (ar1)
                                              LREF
                                              Blank 13 Filed: 4/28/1999, Entered: 4/28/1999 Certification
                                              CERTIFICATION of Donna M. Whiteside, Esquire on behalf of CAMDEN COUNTY, OFFICE OF PROSECUTOR, LEE A. SOLOMON, HARRY GLEMSER; Re: in support of [12-1] cross motion for sanctions and in opposition to [10-1] motion to remand to Superior Court Camden County. (ar1)
                                                LREF
                                                Blank 12 Filed: 4/28/1999, Entered: 4/28/1999, Terminated: 6/30/1999 Motion for Sanctions
                                                Notice of CROSS MOTION for sanctions and response to motion to remand by defts. CAMDEN COUNTY, OFFICE OF PROSECUTOR, LEE A. SOLOMON, HARRY GLEMSER, set for 5/21/99 on [12-1] cross motion . (ar1)
                                                  LREF
                                                  Blank 11 Filed: 4/28/1999, Entered: 4/28/1999 Miscellaneous Document
                                                  DECLARATION of Louise Arkel, Esquire on behalf of GREGORY MORRIS Re: [10-1] motion to remand to Superior Court Camden County (ar1)
                                                    LREF
                                                    Blank 10 Filed: 4/28/1999, Entered: 4/28/1999, Terminated: 6/30/1999 Motion to Remand
                                                    Notice of MOTION to remand to Superior Court Camden County by GREGORY MORRIS, Motion set for 5/21/99 on [10-1] motion . (All Briefs/PO Subm) (ar1)
                                                      LREF
                                                      Blank 9 Filed: 4/19/1999, Entered: 4/19/1999, Terminated: 6/30/1999 Answer
                                                      ANSWER to complaint; jury demand and CROSSCLAIM by COLLINGSWOOD BORO, COLLINGSWOOD POLICE, JAMES BRUNO against CAMDEN COUNTY, OFFICE OF PROSECUTOR, LEE A. SOLOMON (ar1)
                                                        LREF
                                                        Blank 8 Filed: 4/19/1999, Entered: 4/19/1999 Notice of Appearance/
                                                        NOTICE of attorney appearance for BERLIN BOROUGH, BERLIN BORO POLICE, BERLIN TOWNSHIP, BERLIN TWP. POLICE, JOHN CLANCY, MICHAEL HAYDEN, JOSEPH JACKSON, HARRY GLEMSER, JOHN GREGORY, COLLINGSWOOD BORO, COLLINGSWOOD POLICE, JAMES BRUNO, CHRIS FERRARI, HILL, BONFIGLIO, VINCENT DEMATTEO, BILL MOORE, MICHAEL WOLCOTT, LARRY KNICELY by MICHAEL O. KASSAK (ar1)
                                                          LREF
                                                          Blank 7 Filed: 4/19/1999, Entered: 4/19/1999 Order on Motion to Amend/CorrectCourt Filing
                                                          STIPULATION and ORDER, extending time , and setting answer due for 5/18/99 for LARRY KNICELY, for MICHAEL WOLCOTT, for BILL MOORE, for VINCENT DEMATTEO, for BONFIGLIO, for HILL, for CHRIS FERRARI, for JAMES BRUNO, for COLLINGSWOOD POLICE, for COLLINGSWOOD BORO, for JOHN GREGORY, for HARRY GLEMSER, for JOSEPH JACKSON, for MICHAEL HAYDEN, for JOHN CLANCY, for BERLIN TWP. POLICE, for BERLIN TOWNSHIP, for BERLIN BORO POLICE, for BERLIN BOROUGH ( signed by Judge Stephen M. Orlofsky ) (ar1)
                                                            LREF
                                                            Blank 6 Filed: 4/16/1999, Entered: 4/19/1999 Scheduling OrderCourt Filing
                                                            SCHEDULING ORDER setting Amending of pleadings on 8/20/99 ; Discovery cutoff 10/1/99 ; Status conference 2:00 6/9/99. ( signed by Mag. Judge Robert B. Kugler ) (ar1)
                                                              LREF
                                                              Blank -- Filed: 4/15/1999, Entered: 4/15/1999 Scheduling Conference
                                                              Scheduling conference held before Mag. Judge Robert B. Kugler on 4/6/99. (ar1)
                                                                LREF
                                                                Blank 5 Filed: 4/5/1999, Entered: 4/7/1999 ~Notice (other)
                                                                Notice of Intent to submit a Dispositive motion to remand by GREGORY MORRIS. (ar1)
                                                                  LREF
                                                                  Blank 4 Filed: 3/9/1999, Entered: 3/10/1999 Answer to Crossclaim
                                                                  ANSWER by defendants CAMDEN COUNTY, OFFICE OF PROSECUTOR, LEE A. SOLOMON, and HARRY GLEMSER to any Crossclaims. (mgr)
                                                                    LREF
                                                                    Blank 4 Filed: 3/9/1999, Entered: 3/10/1999 Answer
                                                                    ANSWER to complaint; jury demand and CROSSCLAIM by defendants CAMDEN COUNTY, OFFICE OF PROSECUTOR, LEE A. SOLOMON, and HARRY GLEMSER against BERLIN BOROUGH, BERLIN BORO POLICE, BERLIN TOWNSHIP, BERLIN TWP. POLICE, JOHN CLANCY, MICHAEL HAYDEN, JOSEPH JACKSON, JOHN GREGORY, COLLINGSWOOD BORO, COLLINGSWOOD POLICE, JAMES BRUNO, CHRIS FERRARI, HILL, BONFIGLIO, VINCENT DEMATTEO, BILL MOORE, MICHAEL WOLCOTT, LARRY KNICELY, JOHN AND JANE DOES (mgr)
                                                                      LREF
                                                                      Blank 3 Filed: 3/4/1999, Entered: 3/4/1999 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                      ORDER, set scheduling conference for 11:30 4/6/99 ( signed by Mag. Judge Robert B. Kugler ) (et)
                                                                        LREF
                                                                        Blank 3 Filed: 3/4/1999, Entered: 3/4/1999 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                        ORDER, set scheduling conference for 4/6/99 ( signed by Mag. Judge Robert B. Kugler ) (et)
                                                                          LREF
                                                                          Blank 2 Filed: 3/4/1999, Entered: 3/4/1999 Case Assigned/ReassignedCourt Filing
                                                                          NOTICE of Allocation and Assignment filed. Magistrate Judge ROBERT B. KUGLER (et)
                                                                            LREF
                                                                            Blank 1 Filed: 3/3/1999, Entered: 3/4/1999 Complaint
                                                                            COMPLAINT filed in Superior Court Camden County on or about February 3, 1999, docket #L-774-99; jury demand (et)
                                                                              LREF
                                                                              Blank 1 Filed: 3/3/1999, Entered: 3/4/1999 Notice of Removal
                                                                              NOTICE OF REMOVAL by CAMDEN COUNTY, CAMDEN COUNTY OFFICE OF THE PROSECUTOR, LEE A. SOLOMON, HARRY GLEMSER. Filed with the following state court proceedings, A]Complaint, etc. FILING FEE $ 150.00 RECEIPT # 246728 (et)
                                                                                LREF

                                                                                Statistics

                                                                                This case has been viewed 123 times.

                                                                                No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                Space
                                                                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                 
                                                                                PlainSite
                                                                                Sign Up
                                                                                Need Password Help?