Yolanda Velasquez v. Solar City Corporation
State Civil Lawsuit Superior Court of California, County of Ventura, Case No. 56-2019-00529092-CU-BC-VTA

Tags
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Velasquez, Alisa, Plaintiff
No Logo Velasquez, Yolanda, Plaintiff
v.
SolarCity Corporation SolarCity Corporation, Defendant
  Entries (5) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 5 Filed: 7/23/2019, Entered: 7/23/2019
Proof of Service of Statement of Venue - Certified Mail - Out of State filed by Velasquez, Alisa; Velasquez, Yolanda on 07/23/2019.
    Blank 4 Filed: 6/7/2019, Entered: 6/7/2019
    MANDATORY APPEARANCE CMC/Order to Show Cause Re Sanctions/Dismissal for Failure to File Proof of Service/Default - scheduled for 11/01/2019 at 08:15:00 AM in 22B at Ventura.
      Blank 3 Filed: 6/3/2019, Entered: 6/3/2019
      Case assigned to Department 43.
        Legal Document 2 Filed: 6/3/2019, Entered: 6/3/2019
        Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Velasquez, Yolanda; Velasquez, Alisa on 06/03/2019.
          Legal Document 1 Filed: 6/3/2019, Entered: 6/3/2019
          Complaint filed by Velasquez, Yolanda; Velasquez, Alisa on 06/03/2019. Filed By: Velasquez, Yolanda(Plaintiff) | Velasquez, Alisa(Plaintiff) Refers To: Solar City Corporation(Defendant)

          Statistics

          This case has been viewed 45 times.

          No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
          Space
          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
           
          PlainSite
          Sign Up
          Need Password Help?