HAGOPIAN v. DILORENZO, et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit New Jersey District Court, Case No. 1:99-cv-03101-JBS

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated January 19, 2017 at 7:16 PM ST (4.5 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo JACK HAGOPIAN, JR., Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by The Law Firm of Philip Stephen Fuoco

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space PHILIP STEPHEN FUOCO +1 856 354 1100 pfuoco@msn.com
v.
No Logo BRIAN SWIERCZYNSKI, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Cooper Levenson April Niedelman & Wagenheim, PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space RUSSELL L. LICHTENSTEIN +1 609 344 3161 rlichtenstein@cooperlevenson.com
No Logo CATHY HAGAMAN, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Cooper Levenson April Niedelman & Wagenheim, PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space RUSSELL L. LICHTENSTEIN +1 609 344 3161 rlichtenstein@cooperlevenson.com
No Logo DON REILLY, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Cooper Levenson April Niedelman & Wagenheim, PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space RUSSELL L. LICHTENSTEIN +1 609 344 3161 rlichtenstein@cooperlevenson.com
No Logo KARL MOCK, Defendant
No Logo MICHAEL LYONS, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Cooper Levenson April Niedelman & Wagenheim, PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space RUSSELL L. LICHTENSTEIN +1 609 344 3161 rlichtenstein@cooperlevenson.com
No Logo OFFICER THOMAS DILORENZO, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by ATTORNEYS HARTMAN, CHARTERED

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 03/22/2002, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED FRANCIS J. HARTMAN +1 856 235 0220
Trump Casino Services, LLC Trump Casino Services, LLC, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Poplar, Carl D.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED CARL D. POPLAR +1 856 216 9979 +1 856 216 9970 rodonnell@poplarlaw.com
Trump's Castle Associates, LP Trump's Castle Associates, LP, Defendant
Officially listed as "TRUMP CASTLE ASSOCIATES, L.P."

Represented by Poplar, Carl D.

Trump Hotels & Casino Resorts, Inc. Trump Hotels & Casino Resorts, Inc., Defendant
Unknown Role, Riviera Holdings Corp

Represented by Poplar, Carl D.

No Logo BRIAN SWIERCZYNSKI, Cross-Claimant

Toggle Switch Represented by Cooper Levenson April Niedelman & Wagenheim, PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space RUSSELL L. LICHTENSTEIN +1 609 344 3161 rlichtenstein@cooperlevenson.com
No Logo CATHY HAGAMAN, Cross-Claimant

Toggle Switch Represented by Cooper Levenson April Niedelman & Wagenheim, PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space RUSSELL L. LICHTENSTEIN +1 609 344 3161 rlichtenstein@cooperlevenson.com
No Logo CATHY HAGARMAN, Cross-Claimant

Toggle Switch Represented by Cooper Levenson April Niedelman & Wagenheim, PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space RUSSELL L. LICHTENSTEIN +1 609 344 3161 rlichtenstein@cooperlevenson.com
No Logo DON REILLY, Cross-Claimant

Toggle Switch Represented by Cooper Levenson April Niedelman & Wagenheim, PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space RUSSELL L. LICHTENSTEIN +1 609 344 3161 rlichtenstein@cooperlevenson.com
No Logo THOMAS DILORENZO, Cross-Claimant

Toggle Switch Represented by ATTORNEYS HARTMAN, CHARTERED

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space FRANCIS J. HARTMAN +1 856 235 0220
No Logo TRUMP MARINA HOTEL CASINO, Cross-Claimant

Represented by Poplar, Carl D.

No Logo CITY OF ATLANTIC CITY, Third Party Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space MICHAEL J. BLEE +1 609 646 7400 mjbleelaw@comcast.net
No Logo FICTITIOUS PERSONS, Third Party Defendant
No Logo JOHN DOES 1-10, Third Party Defendant
No Logo JOHN DOES 2-10, Third Party Defendant
No Logo THOMAS DILORENZO, Third Party Defendant
No Logo MARTIN RUIZ, Cross Claimant

Toggle Switch Represented by COOPER LEVENSON, PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 11/08/2000, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED RUSSELL L. LICHTENSTEIN +1 609 344 3161 rlichtenstein@cooperlevenson.com
No Logo OFFICER THOMAS DILORENZO, Cross Claimant

Toggle Switch Represented by ATTORNEYS HARTMAN, CHARTERED

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED FRANCIS J. HARTMAN +1 856 235 0220
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED FRANCIS J. HARTMAN +1 856 235 0220
No Logo OFFICER THOMAS DILORENZO, Cross Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by ATTORNEYS HARTMAN, CHARTERED

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED FRANCIS J. HARTMAN +1 856 235 0220
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED FRANCIS J. HARTMAN +1 856 235 0220
No Logo OFFICER THOMAS DILORENZO, ThirdParty Defendant
No Logo THOMAS DILORENZO, Cross-Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by ATTORNEYS HARTMAN, CHARTERED

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space FRANCIS J. HARTMAN +1 856 235 0220
Trump Hotels & Casino Resorts, Inc. Trump Hotels & Casino Resorts, Inc., Cross-Defendant
Unknown Role, Riviera Holdings Corp

Represented by Poplar, Carl D.

No Logo TRUMP MARINA HOTEL CASINO, Cross-Defendant

Represented by Poplar, Carl D.

Trump Casino Services, LLC Trump Casino Services, LLC, ThirdParty Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Poplar, Carl D.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED CARL D. POPLAR +1 856 216 9979 +1 856 216 9970 rodonnell@poplarlaw.com
Trump Casino Services, LLC Trump Casino Services, LLC, Third Party Plaintiff

Represented by Poplar, Carl D.

Trump Hotels & Casino Resorts, Inc. Trump Hotels & Casino Resorts, Inc., Third Party Plaintiff
Unknown Role, Riviera Holdings Corp

Represented by Poplar, Carl D.

No Logo TRUMP MARINA HOTEL CASINO, Third Party Plaintiff

Represented by Poplar, Carl D.

Office Camden
Filed 7/1/1999
Jury Demand Both
Demand $0
Nature of Suit 440 - Civil Rights: Other
Cause Section 28 U.S.C. § 1331 Federal Question
Jurisdiction Federal Question
Disposition Dismissed - Settled
County Camden
Terminated 5/20/2002
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flags 12BG, CLOSED, LEAD, PRETRL
  Entries (117) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 98 Filed: 5/22/2002, Entered: 5/24/2002 Stipulation of Dismissal
STIPULATION of dismissal with prejudice. (db)
    LREF
    Blank 97 Filed: 5/20/2002, Entered: 5/20/2002 OrderCourt Filing
    ORDER, dismissing this action without costs and without prejudice. (signed by Judge Jerome B. Simandle) (NM) (db)
      LREF
      Blank -- Filed: 5/20/2002, Entered: 5/20/2002 Terminated Case
      Case closed (db)
        LREF
        Blank 96 Filed: 3/21/2002, Entered: 3/22/2002 Stipulation of Dismissal
        STIPULATION of dismissal with prejudice as to deft. THOMAS DILORENZO only. (db)
          LREF
          Blank 95 Filed: 3/7/2002, Entered: 3/8/2002 Pretrial OrderCourt Filing
          JOINT FINAL PRETRIAL ORDER filed. (signed by Mag. Judge Joel B. Rosen) (NM) (db)
            LREF
            Blank -- Filed: 2/15/2002, Entered: 2/20/2002 Status Conference
            Status conference held before Mag. Judge Joel B. Rosen on 2/15/02. (js)
              LREF
              Blank 94 Filed: 1/24/2002, Entered: 2/5/2002 OrderCourt Filing
              ORDER of re-assignment from Judge Joel A. Pisano to Judge Jerome B. Simandle (signed by Chief Judge John W. Bissell) (NM) (sb)
                LREF
                Blank -- Filed: 1/8/2002, Entered: 1/8/2002 Settlement Conference
                Settlement conference held before Mag. Judge Joel B. Rosen on 1/7/02. (sb)
                  LREF
                  Blank 93 Filed: 12/6/2001, Entered: 12/7/2001 Scheduling OrderCourt Filing
                  SCHEDULING ORDER setting Pretrial conference 10:30 1/31/02 (signed by Mag. Judge Joel B. Rosen) (NM) (sb)
                    LREF
                    Blank 92 Filed: 11/7/2001, Entered: 11/9/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                    LETTER ORDER granting in part, denying in part [85-1] dispositive motion for summary judgment by Don Reilly, et al and granting in part, denying in part [81-1] dispositive motion for summary judgment by Trump Marina, et al. n.m. (by Judge Joel A. Pisano) (js)
                      LREF
                      Blank 91 Filed: 11/7/2001, Entered: 11/9/2001 Minutes-MiscellaneousCourt Filing
                      Minute entry: Proceedings recorded by Ct-Reporter: none; Minutes of: 11/7/01; The following actions were taken: granting in part, denying in part [85-1] dispositive motion for summary judgment and granting in part, denying in part [81-1] dispositive motion for summary judgment. By Judge Joel A. Pisano (js)
                        LREF
                        Blank 90 Filed: 9/10/2001, Entered: 9/21/2001 Certificate Of Service.
                        CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by DON REILLY, BRIAN SWIERCZYNSKI, MICHAEL LYONS, and CATHY HAGAMAN Re: [85-1] dispositive motion for summary judgment. (sb)
                          LREF
                          Blank 89 Filed: 9/10/2001, Entered: 9/21/2001 Certification
                          SUPPLEMENTAL CERTIFICATION of Stephanie E. Farrell on behalf of DON REILLY, BRIAN SWIERCZYNSKI, MICHAEL LYONS, and CATHY HAGAMAN supporting [85-1] dispositive motion for summary judgment. (sb)
                            LREF
                            Blank 88 Filed: 9/10/2001, Entered: 9/21/2001 Certificate Of Service.
                            CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by defts. DON REILLY, BRIAN SWIERCZYNSKI, MICHAEL LYONS, and CATHY HAGAMAN. Re: [85-1] motion for summary judgment. (sb)
                              LREF
                              Blank 87 Filed: 9/10/2001, Entered: 9/21/2001 Certification
                              CERTIFICATION of Stephanie E. Farrell on behalf of DON REILLY, BRIAN SWIERCZYNSKI, MICHAEL LYONS, and CATHY HAGAMAN supporting [85-1] dispositive motion for summary judgment. (sb)
                                LREF
                                Blank 86 Filed: 9/10/2001, Entered: 9/21/2001 Miscellaneous Document
                                STATEMENT of Material Facts by defts. DON REILLY, BRIAN SWIERCZYNSKI, MICHAEL LYONS, and CATHY HAGAMAN. (sb)
                                  LREF
                                  Blank 85 Filed: 9/10/2001, Entered: 9/21/2001, Terminated: 11/7/2001 Motion for Summary Judgment
                                  Notice of MOTION for summary judgment by defts. DON REILLY, BRIAN SWIERCZYNSKI, MICHAEL LYONS, and CATHY HAGAMAN, Motion set for 10/5/01 on [79-1] dispositive motion notice for summary judgment . (Brief/PO Subm) (sb)
                                    LREF
                                    Blank 84 Filed: 9/10/2001, Entered: 9/21/2001 Certificate Of Service.
                                    CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by JACK HAGOPIAN JR. Re: [83-1] statement of facts. (sb)
                                      LREF
                                      Blank 83 Filed: 9/10/2001, Entered: 9/21/2001 Miscellaneous Document
                                      STATEMENT of facts by plaintiff JACK HAGOPIAN JR. in response to all summary judgment motions of defendants. (sb)
                                        LREF
                                        Blank 82 Filed: 9/10/2001, Entered: 9/21/2001 Miscellaneous Document
                                        STATEMENT of Material Facts by TRUMP MARINA HOTEL, TRUMP HOTELS, TRUMP CASINO SERVICE, and TRUMP CASTLE. (sb)
                                          LREF
                                          Blank 81 Filed: 9/10/2001, Entered: 9/21/2001 Motion for Summary Judgment
                                          Notice of MOTION for summary judgment by TRUMP MARINA HOTEL, TRUMP HOTELS, TRUMP CASINO SERVICE, and TRUMP CASTLE, Motion set for 10/5/01 on [80-1] dispositive motion notice for summary judgment . (Brief/PO Subm) (ORAL ARGUMENT REQUESTED) (sb)
                                            LREF
                                            Blank 80 Filed: 9/10/2001, Entered: 9/21/2001 Notice of Intent to submit a Dispositive motion
                                            Notice of Intent to submit a Dispositive motion for summary judgment by defts. TRUMP MARINA HOTEL, TRUMP HOTELS, TRUMP CASINO SERVICE, and TRUMP CASTLE. (sb)
                                              LREF
                                              Blank 79 Filed: 9/5/2001, Entered: 9/21/2001 Notice of Intent to submit a Dispositive motion
                                              Notice of Intent to submit a Dispositive motion for summary judgment by defts. DON REILLY, BRIAN SWIERCZYNSKI, MICHAEL LYONS, and CATHY HAGAMAN. (sb)
                                                LREF
                                                Blank 78 Filed: 7/13/2001, Entered: 7/26/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                                ORDERED that the complete motion packets shall be filed with the Clerk no later than August 31, 2001. (signed by Mag. Judge Joel B. Rosen)(NM) (sb)
                                                  LREF
                                                  Blank 77 Filed: 6/27/2001, Entered: 6/27/2001, Terminated: 8/28/2001 Notice of Intent to submit a Dispositive motion
                                                  Notice of Intent to submit a Dispositive motion for summary judgmentby defendants BRIAN SWIERCZYNSKI, MICHAEL LYONS, CATHY HAGAMAN (db)
                                                    LREF
                                                    Blank 76 Filed: 6/26/2001, Entered: 6/26/2001, Terminated: 8/28/2001 Notice of Intent to submit a Dispositive motion
                                                    Notice of Intent to submit a Dispositive motion for summary judgment by defts. TRUMP HOTELS, TRUMP CASINO SERVICE, TRUMP CASTLE (db)
                                                      LREF
                                                      Blank 75 Filed: 5/30/2001, Entered: 5/30/2001 Minutes-MiscellaneousCourt Filing
                                                      Minute entry: Proceedings recorded by Ct-Reporter: tape #929; Minutes of: 5/21/01; The following actions were taken: status conference held on the record. By Mag. Judge Joel B. Rosen (sb)
                                                        LREF
                                                        Blank 74 Filed: 5/22/2001, Entered: 5/23/2001 Scheduling OrderCourt Filing
                                                        SCHEDULING ORDER setting Dispositive Motion due on or before 7/20/01. (signed by Mag. Judge Joel B. Rosen)(NM) (sb)
                                                          LREF
                                                          Blank -- Filed: 5/21/2001, Entered: 5/29/2001 Status Conference
                                                          Status conference held before Mag. Judge Joel B. Rosen on 5/21/01. (js)
                                                            LREF
                                                            Blank -- Filed: 5/21/2001, Entered: 5/24/2001 Status Conference
                                                            Status conference held before Mag. Judge Joel B. Rosen on 5/21/01. (js)
                                                              LREF
                                                              Blank 73 Filed: 4/4/2001, Entered: 4/5/2001 Minutes-MiscellaneousCourt Filing
                                                              Minute entry: Proceedings recorded by Ct-Reporter: Tape #919; Minutes of: 4/2/01; The following actions were taken, Status conference held on the record. By Mag. Judge Joel B. Rosen (ar1)
                                                                LREF
                                                                Blank 72 Filed: 4/2/2001, Entered: 4/3/2001 Scheduling OrderCourt Filing
                                                                SCHEDULING ORDER setting Discovery cutoff 5/18/01; Dispositive Motion due on or before 6/29/01; Status conference at 11:30am on 6/15/01;(signed by Mag. Judge Joel B. Rosen ) (js)
                                                                  LREF
                                                                  Blank 71 Filed: 3/9/2001, Entered: 3/14/2001 Minutes-MiscellaneousCourt Filing
                                                                  Minute entry: Proceedings recorded by Ct-Reporter: None; Minutes of: 3/5/01; The following actions were taken, denying in part [63-1] motion to extend time for discovery By Mag. Judge Joel B. Rosen (ar1)
                                                                    LREF
                                                                    Blank 70 Filed: 3/9/2001, Entered: 3/14/2001 Minutes-MiscellaneousCourt Filing
                                                                    Minute entry: Proceedings recorded by Ct-Reporter: None; Minutes of: 3/5/01; The following actions were taken, granting in part, denying in part [64-1] motion to compel discovery By Mag. Judge Joel B. Rosen (ar1)
                                                                      LREF
                                                                      Blank 69 Filed: 3/6/2001, Entered: 3/9/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                      ORDER denying in part [68-1] cross motion for protective order and granting in part and denying in part [64-1] motion to compel discovery. n.m. ( signed by Mag. Judge Joel B. Rosen ) (ar1)
                                                                        LREF
                                                                        Blank -- Filed: 3/6/2001, Entered: 3/9/2001 Set/Reset Deadlines:
                                                                        Deadline updated; terminating [68-2] hearing Motion set for 3/16/01 on [68-1] cross motion and terminating [64-2] hearing Motion set for 2/16/01 on [64-1] motion. (ar1)
                                                                          LREF
                                                                          Blank 68 Filed: 2/15/2001, Entered: 2/21/2001, Terminated: 3/6/2001 Motion for Protective OrderCourt Filing
                                                                          Notice of CROSS MOTION for protective order by TRUMP MARINA HOTEL [64-1] motion to compel discovery referred to Mag. Judge Joel B. Rosen, Motion set for 3/16/01 on [68-1] cross motion . (Brief Submitted) (ar1)
                                                                            LREF
                                                                            Blank 67 Filed: 1/26/2001, Entered: 1/26/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                            ORDER granting [63-1] motion to extend time for discovery ( signed by Mag. Judge Joel B. Rosen ) nm (femp)
                                                                              LREF
                                                                              Blank 65 Filed: 1/12/2001, Entered: 1/24/2001 Affidavit
                                                                              AFFIDAVIT of Philip Fuocco on behalf of JACK HAGOPIAN JR. Re: [64-1] motion to compel discovery (UNDER SEAL) (femp)
                                                                                LREF
                                                                                Blank 64 Filed: 1/12/2001, Entered: 1/24/2001 Motion to CompelCourt Filing
                                                                                Notice of MOTION to compel discovery by JACK HAGOPIAN JR. [64-1] motion referred to Mag. Judge Joel B. Rosen, Motion set for 2/16/01 on [64-1] motion . (Brief/PO Subm) (femp)
                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                  Blank 66 Filed: 1/9/2001, Entered: 1/24/2001 Letter
                                                                                  LETTER advising the Court that defendant hereby joins in David E. Poplar's Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion to Extend Discovery and cross Motion for Protective Order. By THOMAS DILORENZO (db)
                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                    Blank 63 Filed: 12/21/2000, Entered: 12/21/2000, Terminated: 1/26/2001 Motion for Extension of Time to FileCourt Filing
                                                                                    Notice of MOTION to extend time for discovery by JACK HAGOPIAN JR. [63-1] motion referred to Mag. Judge Joel B. Rosen, Motion set for 1/19/01 on [63-1] motion . (Brief/PO Subm) (femp)
                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                      Blank -- Filed: 11/15/2000, Entered: 11/15/2000 Case No Longer Referred to Arbitration
                                                                                      CASE WITHDRAWN from Arbitration. (er)
                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                        Blank 62 Filed: 11/14/2000, Entered: 11/15/2000 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                        ORDER removing case from the Arbitration program. nm ( signed by Mag. Judge Joel B. Rosen ) (er)
                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                          Blank 61 Filed: 11/13/2000, Entered: 11/13/2000 Minutes-MiscellaneousCourt Filing
                                                                                          Minute entry: Proceedings recorded by Ct-Reporter: Stephen Daner; Minutes of: 11/9/00; The following actions were taken - Status conference held on the record. By Mag. Judge Joel B. Rosen (femp)
                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                            Blank 59 Filed: 11/8/2000, Entered: 11/8/2000 Stipulation
                                                                                            STIPULATION of Dismissal as to Martin Ruiz and Karl Mock, ONLY, with prejudice (femp)
                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                              Blank 58 Filed: 11/8/2000, Entered: 11/8/2000 Stipulation
                                                                                              STIPULATION of Dismissal as to defendants Martin Ruiz and Kark Mock, ONLY, with prejudice (femp)
                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                Blank 60 Filed: 11/6/2000, Entered: 11/8/2000 Answer
                                                                                                ANSWER to Complaint by MICHAEL LYONS; jury demand (femp)
                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                  Blank 57 Filed: 11/6/2000, Entered: 11/8/2000 Answer to Third-Party Complaint
                                                                                                  ANSWER by THOMAS DILORENZO to [56-2] third-party complaint (femp) Modified on 11/08/2000
                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                    Blank 57 Filed: 11/6/2000, Entered: 11/8/2000 Answer to Crossclaim
                                                                                                    ANSWER by THOMAS DILORENZO to [3-2] cross claim (femp) Modified on 11/08/2000
                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                      Blank 57 Filed: 11/6/2000, Entered: 11/8/2000 Answer to Amended Complaint
                                                                                                      ANSWER TO AMENDED COMPLAINT; jury demand and CROSSCLAIM by THOMAS DILORENZO against TRUMP HOTELS (femp) Modified on 11/08/2000
                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                        Blank 56 Filed: 11/3/2000, Entered: 11/6/2000 Answer
                                                                                                        ANSWER to Complaint; jury demand and THIRD-PTY CMP by TRUMP HOTELS, TRUMP CASINO SERVICE against CITY OF ATLANTIC, THOMAS DILORENZO, JOHN DOES 1-10, FICTITIOUS PERSONS (femp)
                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                          Blank 55 Filed: 10/27/2000, Entered: 10/27/2000 Minutes-MiscellaneousCourt Filing
                                                                                                          Minute entry: Proceedings recorded by Ct-Reporter: Tape #881a; Minutes of: 10/24/00; The following actions were taken, settlement conference held on the record. By Mag. Judge Joel B. Rosen (db)
                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                            Blank -- Filed: 10/27/2000, Entered: 10/27/2000 Settlement Conference
                                                                                                            Settlement conference held before Mag. Judge Joel B. Rosen on 10/24/00. (db)
                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                              Blank 54 Filed: 10/25/2000, Entered: 10/27/2000 Scheduling OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                              SCHEDULING ORDER setting Discovery cutoff 12/29/00 ; Pretrial conference 9:30 5/21/01 ; Pretrial order to be submitted on or before 5/21/01 ; Dispositive Motion due on or before 5/1/01 ( signed by Mag. Judge Joel B. Rosen ) (femp)
                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                Blank 53 Filed: 10/25/2000, Entered: 10/26/2000 Answer to Amended Complaint
                                                                                                                ANSWER TO SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT; jury demand and CROSSCLAIM by DON REILLY, BRIAN SWIERCZYNSKI, CATHY HAGAMAN against THOMAS DILORENZO. (db)
                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                  Blank 52 Filed: 10/25/2000, Entered: 10/25/2000 Minutes-MiscellaneousCourt Filing
                                                                                                                  Minute entry: Minutes of: 10/20/00; The following actions were taken, granting [46-1] motion to consolidate Civ. 00-3938 and 99-3101 for all purposes By Mag. Judge Joel B. Rosen (femp)
                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                    Blank 51 Filed: 10/17/2000, Entered: 10/17/2000 Minutes-MiscellaneousCourt Filing
                                                                                                                    Minute entry: Proceedings recorded by Ct-Reporter: None; Minutes of: 10/17/00; The following actions were taken, terminating [32-1] dispositive motion notice for summary judgment terminating [31-1] dispositive motion notice for summary judgment By Judge Joel A. Pisano (mb)
                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                      Blank 50 Filed: 9/26/2000, Entered: 9/27/2000 Amended Complaint
                                                                                                                      AMENDED COMPLAINT by JACK HAGOPIAN JR. , (Answer due 10/6/00 ) (femp)
                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                        Blank 49 Filed: 9/25/2000, Entered: 9/25/2000 Minutes-MiscellaneousCourt Filing
                                                                                                                        Minute entry: Minutes of: 9/20/00; The following actions were taken, granting [46-1] motion to consolidate Civ. 00-3938 and 99-3101 for all purposes, granting [43-1] motion for leave to file Second Amended Complaint By Mag. Judge Joel B. Rosen (femp)
                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                          Blank -- Filed: 9/25/2000, Entered: 9/25/2000 Status Conference
                                                                                                                          Status conference held before Mag. Judge Joel B. Rosen on 9/25/00. (femp)
                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                            Blank 48 Filed: 9/22/2000, Entered: 9/25/2000 Scheduling OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                            SCHEDULING ORDER setting Discovery cutoff 11/30/00 ; Status conference 11:45 11/9/00 ; Settlement conference 1:30 10/24/00 ; ( signed by Mag. Judge Joel B. Rosen ) (femp)
                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                              Blank 47 Filed: 9/21/2000, Entered: 9/21/2000 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                              ORDER granting [46-1] motion to consolidate Civ. 00-3938 and 99-3101 for all purposes under Civ. 99-3101; granting [43-1] motion for leave to file Second Amended Complaint; setting a status conference for 11/9/00 at 11:45 a.m. ( signed by Mag. Judge Joel B. Rosen ) nm (femp)
                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                Blank -- Filed: 9/21/2000, Entered: 9/21/2000 Set/Clear Flags
                                                                                                                                Consolidated Lead Case (femp)
                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                  Blank 46 Filed: 9/19/2000, Entered: 9/20/2000, Terminated: 9/21/2000 Motion to Consolidate CasesCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                  Notice of MOTION to consolidate Civ. 00-3938 and 99-3101 for all purposes by JACK HAGOPIAN JR. [46-1] motion referred to Mag. Judge Joel B. Rosen, Motion set for 10/20/00 on [46-1] motion . (Brief/PO Subm) (femp)
                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                    Blank 44 Filed: 9/18/2000, Entered: 9/18/2000 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                    ORDER denying [36-1] motion for summary judgment against deft. Thomas DiLorenzo ( signed by Judge Joel A. Pisano ) nm (femp)
                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                      Blank 45 Filed: 9/15/2000, Entered: 9/18/2000 Minutes-MiscellaneousCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                      Minute entry: Proceedings recorded by Ct-Reporter: Kristen D'Andrea; Minutes of: 9/15/00; The following actions were taken, denying, without prejudice, [36-1] motion for summary judgment against deft. Thomas DiLorenzo By Judge Joel A. Pisano (femp)
                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                        Blank 43 Filed: 8/2/2000, Entered: 8/4/2000 Motion for Leave to FileCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                        Notice of MOTION for an expedited return date for leave to file Second Amended Complaint by JACK HAGOPIAN JR. [43-1] motion referred to Mag. Judge Joel B. Rosen, Motion set for 8/18/00 on [43-1] motion . (Memo under seal Subm) (mgr)
                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                          Blank 42 Filed: 7/21/2000, Entered: 7/24/2000 Minutes-MiscellaneousCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                          Minute entry: Proceedings recorded by Ct-Reporter: tape #851; Minutes of: 06/21/00; The following actions were taken, Status conference held on the record. By Mag. Judge Joel B. Rosen (db)
                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                            Blank 41 Filed: 7/12/2000, Entered: 7/12/2000 Minutes-MiscellaneousCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                            Minute entry: Tape #851 on 6/22/00; Minutes of: 7/10/00; The following actions were taken, granting in part, denying in part [33-1] motion to compel discovery By Mag. Judge Joel B. Rosen (femp)
                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                              Blank 40 Filed: 7/11/2000, Entered: 7/11/2000 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                              ORDER granting in part, denying in part [33-1] motion to compel discovery; denying plaintiff's application for fees; denying, without prejudice, plaintiff's motion to amend complaint ( signed by Mag. Judge Joel B. Rosen ) nm (femp)
                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                Blank 39 Filed: 6/29/2000, Entered: 7/5/2000 Certificate Of Service.
                                                                                                                                                CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE re: Opposition to pltf's motion to compel. (mgr)
                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Blank 38 Filed: 6/22/2000, Entered: 6/23/2000 Scheduling OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                  SCHEDULING ORDER setting Discovery cutoff 10/31/00 ; Status conference 2:00 10/24/00; Failure to appear will lead to the imposition of sanctions, including costs. ( signed by Mag. Judge Joel B. Rosen ) (er)
                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Blank 37 Filed: 6/8/2000, Entered: 6/8/2000 Affidavit
                                                                                                                                                    AFFIDAVIT of Joseph A. Osefchen on behalf of JACK HAGOPIAN JR. Re: [36-1] motion for summary judgment against deft. Thomas DiLorenzo (femp)
                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Blank 36 Filed: 6/8/2000, Entered: 6/8/2000, Terminated: 9/18/2000 Motion for Summary Judgment
                                                                                                                                                      Notice of MOTION for summary judgment against deft. Thomas DiLorenzo by JACK HAGOPIAN JR., Motion set for 7/7/00 on [36-1] motion . (Brief/PO Subm) (femp)
                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Blank 35 Filed: 5/24/2000, Entered: 5/25/2000 Letter
                                                                                                                                                        LETTER By counsel for pltf. THOMAS DILORENZO that pltf. will not be filing a response to discovery motion by pltf. (femp)
                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Blank 34 Filed: 5/19/2000, Entered: 5/22/2000 Affidavit
                                                                                                                                                          AFFIDAVIT of Joseph A. Osefchen on behalf of JACK HAGOPIAN JR. Re: [33-1] motion to compel discovery (femp)
                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Blank 33 Filed: 5/19/2000, Entered: 5/22/2000, Terminated: 7/11/2000 Motion to CompelCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                            Notice of MOTION to compel discovery by JACK HAGOPIAN JR. [33-1] motion referred to Mag. Judge Joel B. Rosen, Motion set for 6/16/00 on [33-1] motion . (Brief/PO Subm) (Brief Under Seal) (femp)
                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Blank 32 Filed: 5/10/2000, Entered: 5/10/2000, Terminated: 10/17/2000 Notice of Intent to submit a Dispositive motion
                                                                                                                                                              Notice of Intent to submit a Dispositive motion for summary judgment by JACK HAGOPIAN JR. (femp)
                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Blank 31 Filed: 5/10/2000, Entered: 5/10/2000, Terminated: 10/17/2000 Notice of Intent to submit a Dispositive motion
                                                                                                                                                                Notice of Intent to submit a Dispositive motion for summary judgment by JACK HAGOPIAN JR. (femp)
                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 30 Filed: 5/9/2000, Entered: 5/9/2000, Terminated: 5/20/2002 Answer to Amended Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                  ANSWER TO AMENDED COMPLAINT; jury demand and CROSSCLAIM by DON REILLY, BRIAN SWIERCZYNSKI, KARL MOCK, MARTIN RUIZ, CATHY HAGARMAN against THOMAS DILORENZO (femp)
                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 29 Filed: 4/12/2000, Entered: 4/12/2000 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                    ORDERthat defts. shall, within 10 days of receipt, supply pltf's counsel with a copy of all records, etc. ( signed by Mag. Judge Joel B. Rosen ) (femp)
                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 28 Filed: 4/12/2000, Entered: 4/12/2000 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                      CONFIDENTIALITY ORDER ( signed by Mag. Judge Joel B. Rosen ) (femp)
                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 26 Filed: 4/11/2000, Entered: 4/11/2000 Scheduling OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                        SCHEDULING ORDER setting Status conference 9:30 6/9/00 ; ( signed by Mag. Judge Joel B. Rosen ) (femp)
                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 27 Filed: 4/10/2000, Entered: 4/12/2000 Minutes-MiscellaneousCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                          Minute entry: Proceedings recorded by Ct-Reporter: Tape #833; Minutes of: 4.10.00; The following actions were taken, discovery conference held on the record By Mag. Judge Joel B. Rosen (jm1)
                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                            Blank -- Filed: 3/16/2000, Entered: 3/16/2000 Status Conference
                                                                                                                                                                            Status conference held before Mag. Judge Joel B. Rosen on 3.13.00. (lc)
                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 25 Filed: 3/13/2000, Entered: 3/14/2000 Minutes-MiscellaneousCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                              Minute entry: Proceedings recorded by Ct-Reporter: Tape #825; Minutes of: 3.13.00; The following actions were taken, STATUS CONFERENCE HELD ON THE RECORD. By Mag. Judge Joel B. Rosen (lc)
                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 24 Filed: 3/6/2000, Entered: 3/6/2000 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER granting in part, denying in part [14-1] motion for an order compelling production of discovery from defendant DiLorenzo; mooting [12-1] motion for an order compelling production of discovery from Trump defendants; denying pltf's motion for fes and costs against deft. Trump ( signed by Mag. Judge Joel B. Rosen ) (femp)
                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 23 Filed: 3/3/2000, Entered: 3/3/2000 Minutes-MiscellaneousCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                  Minute entry: Minutes of: 3/3/00; The following actions were taken, mooting [14-1] motion for an order compelling production of discovery from defendant DiLorenzo By Mag. Judge Joel B. Rosen (femp)
                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 22 Filed: 3/3/2000, Entered: 3/3/2000 Minutes-MiscellaneousCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                    Minute entry: Minutes of: 3/3/00; The following actions were taken, granting in part, denying in part [12-1] motion for an order compelling production of discovery from Trump defendants By Mag. Judge Joel B. Rosen (femp)
                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 21 Filed: 2/23/2000, Entered: 3/1/2000 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER reassigning matter from Judge Jerome B. Simandle to Judge Joel A. Pisano ( signed by Chief Judge Anne E. Thompson ) (femp)
                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 20 Filed: 2/23/2000, Entered: 2/24/2000 Answer to Crossclaim
                                                                                                                                                                                        ANSWER by THOMAS DILORENZO to [3-2] cross claim (lc)
                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 20 Filed: 2/23/2000, Entered: 2/24/2000 Amended Answer to Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                          AMENDED ANSWER; jury demand and CROSSCLAIM by THOMAS DILORENZO against TRUMP MARINA HOTEL (lc)
                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 19 Filed: 2/22/2000, Entered: 2/24/2000 Certificate Of Service.
                                                                                                                                                                                            CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE re: [18-1] Certification (lc)
                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 18 Filed: 2/22/2000, Entered: 2/24/2000 Certification
                                                                                                                                                                                              CERTIFICATION of Jack Hagopian, Jr. in opposition to plaintiff's discovery motion. (lc)
                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 17 Filed: 2/18/2000, Entered: 2/23/2000 Third-Party Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                AMENDED THIRD-PARTY COMPLAINT by TRUMP MARINA HOTEL against JOHN DOES 2-10 (lc)
                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 17 Filed: 2/18/2000, Entered: 2/23/2000 Amended Answer to Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                  AMENDED ANSWER to Complaint by TRUMP MARINA HOTEL WITH CROSSCLAIMS : amends [3-1] answer (lc)
                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 16 Filed: 2/16/2000, Entered: 2/16/2000, Terminated: 5/20/2002 Answer
                                                                                                                                                                                                    ANSWER to Complaint by defendant, THOMAS DILORENZO with jury demand. (lc)
                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 15 Filed: 2/4/2000, Entered: 2/4/2000 Affidavit
                                                                                                                                                                                                      AFFIDAVIT of JOSEPH A. OSEFCHEN on Re: [14-1] motion for an order compelling production of discovery from defendant DiLorenzo. (lc)
                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 14 Filed: 2/4/2000, Entered: 2/4/2000, Terminated: 3/3/2000 Motion to CompelCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Notice of MOTION for an order compelling production of discovery from defendant DiLorenzo by plaintiff, JACK HAGOPIAN JR. [14-1] motion referred to Mag. Judge Joel B. Rosen, Motion set for 3/3/00 on [14-1] motion Certification of Service attached thereto. (MEMO SUBMITTED) (lc)
                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 13 Filed: 2/3/2000, Entered: 2/3/2000 Affidavit
                                                                                                                                                                                                          AFFIDAVIT of Joseph A. Osefchen Re: [12-1] motion for an order compelling production of discovery from Trump defendants. (lc)
                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 12 Filed: 2/3/2000, Entered: 2/3/2000, Terminated: 3/3/2000 Motion to CompelCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Notice of MOTION for an order compelling production of discovery from Trump defendants by plaintiffs, JACK HAGOPIAN JR. [12-1] motion referred to Mag. Judge Joel B. Rosen, Motion set for 3/3/00 on [12-1] motion (Certificate of Service attached thereto) MEMO SUBMITTED. (lc)
                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 11 Filed: 1/31/2000, Entered: 2/1/2000 Amended Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                              AMENDED COMPLAINT by JACK HAGOPIAN JR., (Answer due 2/10/00) amending [1-1] complaint (femp)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 10 Filed: 1/19/2000, Entered: 1/20/2000 Scheduling OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                SCHEDULING ORDER setting Status conference 2:30 4/10/00 ; Discovery cutoff 5/31/00 ; ( signed by Mag. Judge Joel B. Rosen ) (lc)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 9 Filed: 11/23/1999, Entered: 11/23/1999 Scheduling OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  SCHEDULING ORDER No. 2. ( signed by Mag. Judge Joel B. Rosen ) (lc)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 8 Filed: 11/5/1999, Entered: 11/9/1999 Scheduling OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    SCHEDULING ORDER setting Status conference 2:30 3/13/00; (signed by Mag. Judge Joel B. Rosen) (lc)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank -- Filed: 11/4/1999, Entered: 11/16/1999 Scheduling Conference
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Scheduling conference held before Mag. Judge Joel B. Rosen on 11.4.99. (lc)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 7 Filed: 10/8/1999, Entered: 10/12/1999 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        CONSENT ORDER permitting filing of an Answer within 10 days of the date of this Order on behalf defendant, Officer Thomas DiLorenzo. ( signed by Mag. Judge Joel B. Rosen) N.M.(lc) Modified on 10/12/1999
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 6 Filed: 9/29/1999, Entered: 9/30/1999 Answer to Third-Party Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ANSWER by Third party deft. CITY OF ATLANTIC CITY to [3-1] third-party complaint. (lc)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 5 Filed: 9/27/1999, Entered: 9/27/1999, Terminated: 5/20/2002 Answer
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ANSWER to Complaint by THOMAS DILORENZO with jury demand. (lc)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 4 Filed: 9/9/1999, Entered: 9/9/1999 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER, set scheduling conference for 2:00 11/4/99 (signed by Mag. Judge Joel B. Rosen ) (lc)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 3 Filed: 8/31/1999, Entered: 9/1/1999 Third-Party Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                THIRD-PARTY COMPLAINT by TRUMP MARINA HOTEL against CITY OF ATLANTIC CITY and JOHN DOES 2-10. (lc)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 3 Filed: 8/31/1999, Entered: 9/1/1999 Answer
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ANSWER to complaint; jury demand and CROSSCLAIM by TRUMP MARINA HOTEL against THOMAS DILORENZO (lc)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 2 Filed: 7/2/1999, Entered: 7/2/1999, Terminated: 5/20/2002 Case Assigned/ReassignedCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE of Allocation and Assignment filed. Magistrate Judge JOEL B. ROSEN (et)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank -- Filed: 7/2/1999, Entered: 7/2/1999 Case Referred to Arbitration
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      CASE REFERRED to arbitration (et)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank -- Filed: 7/2/1999, Entered: 7/2/1999 Summons Issued
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        SUMMONS(ES) issued for THOMAS DILORENZO, TRUMP MARINA HOTEL ( 20 Days) (Mailed to Counsel) (et)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 1 Filed: 7/1/1999, Entered: 7/2/1999 Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          COMPLAINT filed; jury demand FILING FEE $ 150.00 RECEIPT # 247385 (et)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            This case has been viewed 197 times.

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                             
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Need Password Help?