Mas Marques, Diego v. Greenspan, Aaron Jacob
State Civil Lawsuit Middlesex County Superior Court, Case No. 1981CV02204

Tags
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Space Space

No Logo MasMarques, Diego, Plaintiff
Officially listed as "Diego MasMarques"
v.
Greenspan, Aaron Greenspan, Aaron, Defendant
Officially listed as "Aaron Jacob Greenspan"
  Entries (12) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document 12 Filed: 9/19/2019, Entered: 9/19/2019 Court Filing
Clerk's Notice: You are hereby notified that on 09/19/2019 the following entry was made on the above referenced docket: ORDER: of Dismissal: After hearing, the Court provided each party until September 17, 2019 at 4 pm to make any further filings in this case. None have been made. As all other disputes have been resolved, this case is hereby DISMISSED. Judge: Ricciuti, Hon. Michael D
    Legal Document 11 Filed: 9/19/2019, Entered: 9/19/2019
    Judgment
      Legal Document 10 Filed: 9/19/2019, Entered: 9/19/2019
      Order of Dismissal
        Legal Document 9 Filed: 9/11/2019, Entered: 9/11/2019 Court Filing
        Clerk's Notice: You are hereby notified that on 09/11/2019 the following entry was made on the above referenced docket: Endorsement on Motion to amend the complaint (#7.0): DENIED without prejudice after hearing. On this record, plaintiff has not demonstrated harassment as defined in G.L.c 258E, sec. 1 and O'Brien v. Borowski, 461 Mass 415(2012). Nor for that matter, has defendant adequately supported his request for an order limiting plaintiff's access to this court. Judge: Ricciuti, Hon. Michael D
          Legal Document 8 Filed: 9/5/2019, Entered: 9/5/2019
          Motion to Amend Initial Complaint
            Blank 7 Filed: 9/5/2019, Entered: 9/5/2019
            Hearing
              Legal Document 6 Filed: 9/4/2019, Entered: 9/4/2019
              Motion And Memorandum In Support Of Motion To Strike Complaint For Protection From Harassment And To Strike Any Subsequent Order(s) On Account Of Fraud On The Court
                Legal Document 5 Filed: 8/27/2019, Entered: 8/27/2019
                Clerk's Notice
                  Blank 4 Filed: 8/27/2019, Entered: 8/27/2019
                  Hearing
                    Blank 3 Filed: 8/6/2019, Entered: 8/6/2019
                    Hearing
                      Blank 2 Filed: 7/29/2019, Entered: 7/29/2019
                      Hearing
                        Legal Document 1 Filed: 7/29/2019, Entered: 7/29/2019
                        Complaint

                          Statistics

                          This case has been viewed 980 times.

                          No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                          Space
                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                           
                          PlainSite
                          Sign Up
                          Need Password Help?