Kim v. Tesla, Inc
State Civil Lawsuit Superior Court of California, County of Alameda, Case No. HG19033056

Tags
Last Updated March 19, 2021 at 8:32 PM DT (1.9 months ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Kim, Chongwoo, Plaintiff
v.
Tesla, Inc. Tesla, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Bullock, Patrea R, Attorney
Case Type Civil
Complaint Type Breach of Contract/Warranty
Case Subtype General Civil
Filing Location Hayward Hall of Justice
  Entries (32) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 32 Filed: 3/9/2021, Entered: None ?
Case Management Conf Continuance 06/08/2021 03:00 PM D- 19
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 3/9/2021, Entered: None ?
    Case Management Conference Order Issued (1 Page)
      Request RequestSpace
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 3/9/2021, Entered: None ?
      Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed (2 Pages)
        Request RequestSpace
        Blank 29 Filed: 2/22/2021, Entered: None ?
        Request Re: Dismissal with prejudice - entire action Entered
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 2/22/2021, Entered: None ?
          Request Re: Dismissal with prejudice - entire action Filed (2 Pages)
            Request RequestSpace
            Blank 27 Filed: 10/13/2020, Entered: None ?
            Case Management Conf Continuance 03/09/2021 03:00 PM D- 19
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 10/13/2020, Entered: None ?
              Case Management Conference Order Issued (2 Pages)
                Request RequestSpace
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 10/13/2020, Entered: None ?
                Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed (1 Page)
                  Request RequestSpace
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 9/28/2020, Entered: None ?
                  Case Management Statement of Tesla, Inc Filed (7 Pages)
                    Request RequestSpace
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 9/28/2020, Entered: None ?
                    Case Management Statement of Chong Woo Kim Filed (5 Pages)
                      Request RequestSpace
                      Blank 22 Filed: 5/21/2020, Entered: None ?
                      Case Management Conf Continuance 10/13/2020 03:00 PM D- 19
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 5/21/2020, Entered: None ?
                        Case Management Conference Order Issued (2 Pages)
                          Request RequestSpace
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 5/21/2020, Entered: None ?
                          Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed (1 Page)
                            Request RequestSpace
                            Blank 19 Filed: 3/17/2020, Entered: None ?
                            Hearing Reset to Case Management Conf Continuance 05/21/2020 03:00 PM D- 19
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 3/17/2020, Entered: None ?
                              Case Management Conference Order Issued (1 Page)
                                Request RequestSpace
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 2/4/2020, Entered: None ?
                                Case Management Conf Continuance 03/24/2020 03:00 PM D- 19 (1 Page)
                                  Request RequestSpace
                                  Blank 16 Filed: 2/4/2020, Entered: None ?
                                  Case Management Conf Continuance Hearing Dropped from dept: 25 date: 03/16/2020 time: 09:00 AM
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 2/3/2020, Entered: None ?
                                    Notice of Judicial Reassignment for All Purposes Issued (4 Pages)
                                      Request RequestSpace
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 1/24/2020, Entered: None ?
                                      Proof of Personal Service on Complaint Breach of Contract/Warranty As to Tesla, Inc Filed (1 Page)
                                        Request RequestSpace
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 1/7/2020, Entered: None ?
                                        Notice of Disqualification Filed (3 Pages)
                                          Request RequestSpace
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 1/6/2020, Entered: None ?
                                          Notice of Judicial Reassignment for All Purposes Issued (5 Pages)
                                            Request RequestSpace
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 11/1/2019, Entered: None ?
                                            Joint Stipulation to Arbitrate Pltf's Claims Against Def; Order Filed (12 Pages)
                                              Request RequestSpace
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 11/1/2019, Entered: None ?
                                              Stipulation and Order Re: Other Ex Parte Filed: (3 Pages)
                                                Request RequestSpace
                                                Blank 9 Filed: 11/1/2019, Entered: None ?
                                                Hearing Reset to Case Management Conf Continuance 03/16/2020 09:00 AM D- 25
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 11/1/2019, Entered: None ?
                                                  Case Management Conference Order Issued (2 Pages)
                                                    Request RequestSpace
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 10/31/2019, Entered: None ?
                                                    Stipulation and Order Re: Other Ex Parte Filed: (12 Pages)
                                                      Request RequestSpace
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 9/23/2019, Entered: None ?
                                                      Proof of Service on Complaint As to Tesla, Inc Filed (1 Page)
                                                        Request RequestSpace
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 8/30/2019, Entered: None ?Court Filing
                                                        Notice of Assignment of Judge for All Purposes Issued (4 Pages)
                                                          Request RequestSpace
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 8/30/2019, Entered: None ?
                                                          Initial Case Management Conference 01/15/2020 09:00 AM D- 25 (2 Pages)
                                                            Request RequestSpace
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 8/29/2019, Entered: None ?
                                                            Summons on Complaint Issued and Filed (1 Page)
                                                              Request RequestSpace
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 8/29/2019, Entered: None ?
                                                              Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed for Chong Woo Kim (2 Pages)
                                                                Request RequestSpace
                                                                Legal Document 1 Filed: 8/29/2019, Entered: None ?
                                                                Complaint Breach of Contract/Warranty Filed (11 Pages)

                                                                  Statistics

                                                                  This case has been viewed 45 times.

                                                                  No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                  Space
                                                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                   
                                                                  PlainSite
                                                                  Sign Up
                                                                  Need Password Help?