Nunes v. Fusion GPS a/k/a Bean, LLC et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit Virginia Eastern District Court, Case No. 1:19-cv-01148-LO-TCB
District Judge Liam O'Grady, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated February 22, 2020 at 3:35 PM ST (1.2 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Nunes, Devin G. Nunes, Devin G., Plaintiff
Officially listed as "Devin G. Nunes"

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of Steven S. Biss

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Steven Scott Biss +1 804 643 2090 +1 202 318 4098 stevenbiss@earthlink.net
v.
No Logo Campaign for Accountability, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Fusion GPS a/k/a Bean, LLC, Defendant
No Logo Glenn Simpson, Defendant
Office Alexandria
Filed 9/4/2019
Jury Demand Plaintiff
Demand $9900000000
Nature of Suit 470 - Civil (RICO) Racketeer/Corrupt Organization
Cause Section 18 U.S.C. § 1964 Racketeering (RICO) Act
Jurisdiction Federal Question
Disposition
County Alexandria City
Terminated
Origin 1
Reopened
Lead Case
None
Related Case
None
Other Court Case None
Defendant Custody Status
  Entries (39) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document 34 Filed: 2/21/2020, Entered: 2/21/2020 Order on Motion to Dismiss / Lack of JurisdictionCourt Filing
ORDER granting [25] Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction; granting [28] MOTION to Dismiss Amended Complaint; directing that [12] Amended Complaint is dismissed without prejudice; directing that the plaintiff shall have 30 days from the date of this order to file a second amended complaint if he can do so pursuant to Rule 11. Signed by District Judge Liam O'Grady on 2/21/2020. (aott)
    LREF
    Blank  Remark
    Per LO chambers motions set for 2/21/2020 on the pleadings (clar, )
      LREF
      Legal Document 33 Filed: 2/3/2020, Entered: 2/3/2020 Reply to Response to motion
      REPLY to Response to Motion re [28] MOTION to Dismiss Amended Complaint filed by Campaign for Accountability, Inc.. (McGavin, John)
        LREF
        Legal Document 32 Filed: 2/3/2020, Entered: 2/3/2020 Reply to Response to motion
        REPLY to Response to Motion re [25] MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and Failure to State a Claim filed by Fusion GPS, Glenn Simpson. (Verdi, Kerry)
          LREF
          Legal Document 31 Filed: 1/28/2020, Entered: 1/28/2020 Memorandum in opposition
          Memorandum in Opposition re [28] MOTION to Dismiss Amended Complaint, [25] MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and Failure to State a Claim filed by Devin G. Nunes. (Biss, Steven)
            LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 1/16/2020, Entered: 1/16/2020 Notice of Hearing Date
            Notice of Hearing Date set for February 21, 2020 re [28] MOTION to Dismiss Amended Complaint (McGavin, John)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Blank  set motion and R&R deadlines/hearings
              Set Deadlines as to [25] MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and Failure to State a Claim, [28] MOTION to Dismiss Amended Complaint. Motion Hearing set for 2/21/2020 at 10:00 AM in Alexandria Courtroom 1000 before District Judge Liam O'Grady. (clar, )
                LREF
                Legal Document 29 Filed: 1/15/2020, Entered: 1/15/2020 Memorandum In Support
                Memorandum in Support re [28] MOTION to Dismiss Amended Complaint filed by Campaign for Accountability, Inc.. (McGavin, John)
                  LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 1/15/2020, Entered: 1/15/2020, Terminated: 2/21/2020 Motion to Dismiss
                  MOTION to Dismiss Amended Complaint by Campaign for Accountability, Inc.. (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order)(McGavin, John)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 1/15/2020, Entered: 1/15/2020 Notice of Hearing Date
                    Notice of Hearing Date set for February 21, 2020 re [25] MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and Failure to State a Claim (Verdi, Kerry)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document 26 Filed: 1/15/2020, Entered: 1/15/2020 Memorandum In Support
                      Memorandum in Support re [25] MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and Failure to State a Claim filed by Fusion GPS, Glenn Simpson. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit #1 Simpson Decl., # (2) Proposed Order)(Verdi, Kerry)
                        LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 1/15/2020, Entered: 1/15/2020, Terminated: 2/21/2020 Motion to Dismiss
                        MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and Failure to State a Claim by Fusion GPS, Glenn Simpson. (Verdi, Kerry)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 1/14/2020, Entered: 1/15/2020 Order on Motion for Pro Hac ViceCourt Filing
                          ORDER granting [22] Motion for Pro hac vice as to Clattenburg. Signed by District Judge Liam O'Grady on 1/14/2020. (spar)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 1/14/2020, Entered: 1/15/2020 Order on Motion for Pro Hac ViceCourt Filing
                            ORDER granting [21] Motion for Pro hac vice as to Joshua Levy. Signed by District Judge Liam O'Grady on 1/14/2020. (spar)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 1/13/2020, Entered: 1/13/2020, Terminated: 1/14/2020 Motion to appear pro hac vice
                              Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Rachel Clattenburg and Certification of Local Counsel Kerry Brainard Verdi Filing fee $ 75, receipt number 0422-7022749. by Fusion GPS, Glenn Simpson. (Verdi, Kerry)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 1/13/2020, Entered: 1/13/2020, Terminated: 1/14/2020 Motion to appear pro hac vice
                                Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Joshua Levy and Certification of Local Counsel Kerry Brainard Verdi Filing fee $ 75, receipt number 0422-7022745. by Fusion GPS, Glenn Simpson. (Verdi, Kerry)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 1/7/2020, Entered: 1/8/2020 Order on Motion to withdraw as attorneyCourt Filing
                                  ORDER granting [19] Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Kerry Brainard Verdi terminated as to Defendant Campaign for Accountability only. Signed by Magistrate Judge Theresa Carroll Buchanan on 1/7/2020. (rban, )
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 1/7/2020, Entered: 1/7/2020, Terminated: 1/7/2020 Motion to withdraw as attorney
                                    MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Campaign for Accountability, Inc.. (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order)(Verdi, Kerry)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 1/6/2020, Entered: 1/6/2020 Notice
                                      NOTICE by Campaign for Accountability, Inc. of Withdrawal of Counsel (Verdi, Kerry)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document 17 Filed: 12/17/2019, Entered: 12/17/2019 Order on Motion to continueCourt Filing
                                        ORDER granting [16] Consent MOTION to Continue Time to Respond to Amended Complaint; directing Defendants to respond to the Amended Complaint on or before January 15, 2019. Signed by District Judge Liam O'Grady on 12/17/2019. (spar)
                                          LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 12/17/2019, Entered: 12/17/2019, Terminated: 12/17/2019 Motion to Continue
                                          Consent MOTION to Continue Time to Respond to Amended Complaint by Campaign for Accountability, Inc.. (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order)(Verdi, Kerry)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 12/17/2019, Entered: 12/17/2019 Corporate Disclosure Statement
                                            Corporate Disclosure Statement by Fusion GPS. (Verdi, Kerry)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 12/17/2019, Entered: 12/17/2019 Notice of appearance
                                              NOTICE of Appearance by Kerry Brainard Verdi on behalf of Fusion GPS, Glenn Simpson (Verdi, Kerry)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 12/16/2019, Entered: 12/16/2019 Order on Motion to Dismiss / Lack of JurisdictionCourt Filing
                                                ORDER denying as moot [6] Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction. Signed by District Judge Liam O'Grady on 12/16/2019. (spar)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document 12 Filed: 12/13/2019, Entered: 12/13/2019 Amended Complaint
                                                  AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Devin G. Nunes.(Biss, Steven)
                                                    LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 12/6/2019, Entered: 12/6/2019 Notice of appearance
                                                    NOTICE of Appearance by Anna Grace Gillespie Zick on behalf of Campaign for Accountability, Inc. (Zick, Anna)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 12/6/2019, Entered: 12/6/2019 Notice of appearance
                                                      NOTICE of Appearance by John David McGavin on behalf of Campaign for Accountability, Inc. (McGavin, John)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Blank  set motion and R&R deadlines/hearings
                                                        Set Deadlines as to [6] MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and Failure to State a Claim. Motion Hearing set for 12/20/2019 at 10:00 AM in Alexandria Courtroom 1000 before District Judge Liam O'Grady. (clar, )
                                                          LREF
                                                          Legal Document 9 Filed: 11/22/2019, Entered: 11/22/2019 Corporate Disclosure Statement
                                                          Corporate Disclosure Statement by Campaign for Accountability, Inc.. (Verdi, Kerry)
                                                            LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 11/22/2019, Entered: 11/22/2019 Notice of Hearing Date
                                                            Notice of Hearing Date set for December 20, 2019 re [6] MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and Failure to State a Claim (Verdi, Kerry)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document 7 Filed: 11/22/2019, Entered: 11/22/2019 Memorandum In Support
                                                              Memorandum in Support re [6] MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and Failure to State a Claim filed by Campaign for Accountability, Inc.. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit #1 Stevens Decl., # (2) Proposed Order)(Verdi, Kerry)
                                                                LREF
                                                                Legal Document 6 Filed: 11/22/2019, Entered: 11/22/2019, Terminated: 12/16/2019 Motion to Dismiss
                                                                MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and Failure to State a Claim by Campaign for Accountability, Inc.. (Verdi, Kerry)
                                                                  LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 11/18/2019, Entered: 11/18/2019 Notice of appearance
                                                                  NOTICE of Appearance by Kerry Brainard Verdi on behalf of Campaign for Accountability, Inc. (Verdi, Kerry)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 9/6/2019, Entered: 9/6/2019 Summons issued
                                                                    Summons Issued as to Campaign for Accountability, Inc., Fusion GPS, Glenn Simpson. NOTICE TO ATTORNEY: Print out two electronically issued summons and one copy of the attachments for each defendant to be served with the complaint. (Attachments: # (1) Notice)(rban, )
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Blank  Case Assigned/Reassigned
                                                                      Case Reassigned to District Judge Liam O'Grady. District Judge T. S. Ellis, III no longer assigned to the case. (rban, )
                                                                        LREF
                                                                        Blank  Initial Case Assignment
                                                                        Initial Case Assignment to District Judge T. S. Ellis, III and Magistrate Judge Theresa Carroll Buchanan. (rban, )
                                                                          LREF
                                                                          Legal Document 3 Filed: 9/4/2019, Entered: 9/4/2019 Financial Disclosure Statement
                                                                          Financial Interest Disclosure Statement (Local Rule 7.1) by Devin G. Nunes. (Biss, Steven)
                                                                            LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 9/4/2019, Entered: 9/4/2019 Proposed Summons
                                                                            Proposed Summons re [1] Complaint by Devin G. Nunes. (Biss, Steven)
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document 1 Filed: 9/4/2019, Entered: 9/4/2019 Complaint
                                                                              Complaint ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0422-6819613.), filed by Devin G. Nunes. (Attachments: # (1) Civil Cover Sheet)(Biss, Steven)
                                                                                LREF

                                                                                Statistics

                                                                                This case has been viewed 89 times.

                                                                                No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                Space
                                                                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                 
                                                                                PlainSite
                                                                                Sign Up
                                                                                Need Password Help?