District Appellate Supreme
Federal
Nevada District Court Court of Appeals for the Ninth Circuit United States Supreme Court

Godhart v. Tesla, Inc.
Federal Civil Lawsuit Nevada District Court, Case No. 2:19-cv-01541-JAD-VCF
District Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey, presiding

Tags
Last Updated July 9, 2020 at 2:47 AM DT (10.4 months ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Joshua J Godhart, Plaintiff
v.
Tesla, Inc. Tesla, Inc., Defendant
  Entries (56) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document 55 Filed: 7/8/2020, Entered: 7/8/2020 Order on Motion for Leave to File DocumentCourt Filing
ORDER. IT IS ORDERED that [52] Plaintiff's First Motion for Leave to File Mediation Questionnaire is DENIED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 7/8/2020.(Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JQC)
    LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 7/6/2020, Entered: 7/6/2020 Receipt of Payment
    RECEIPT of Payment: $ 505, receipt number NVLAS070761. (JQC)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 7/2/2020, Entered: 7/2/2020 reply
      REPLY to [50] USCA Order, by Plaintiff Joshua J Godhart. (Godhart, Joshua)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 6/23/2020, Entered: 6/23/2020, Terminated: 7/8/2020 Motion for Leave to file document
        First MOTION for Leave to File Mediation Questionnaire by Plaintiff Joshua J Godhart. (Godhart, Joshua)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 6/23/2020, Entered: 6/23/2020 Notice - other
          NOTICE Mediation Questionnaire by Joshua J Godhart re [34] Jury Demand. (Godhart, Joshua)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 6/15/2020, Entered: 6/17/2020 USCA order
            ORDER of USCA, Ninth Circuit, as to [48] Notice of Appeal, filed by Joshua J Godhart. Within 21 days after the date of this order, appellant shall pay to the district court the $505.00 filing and docketing fees for this appeal and file in this court proof of such payment or file in this court a motion to proceed in forma pauperis. (MR)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 6/10/2020, Entered: 6/12/2020 USCA Order for Time Schedule
              USCA ORDER for Time Schedule as to [48] Notice of Appeal, filed by Joshua J Godhart. USCA Case Number 20-16140. (MR)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 6/9/2020, Entered: 6/9/2020 Notice of appeal
                NOTICE OF APPEAL as to [47] Order on Motion, Order on Motion to Dismiss, Order on Motion to Strike, by Plaintiff Joshua J Godhart. Filing fee $ 505. E-mail notice (NEF) sent to the US Court of Appeals, Ninth Circuit. (Attachments: # (1) Supplement FRCP 81(a)(6)(b)) (Godhart, Joshua)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document 47 Filed: 6/4/2020, Entered: 6/4/2020 Order on MotionCourt Filing
                  ORDER. IT IS ORDERED that [16] the defendant's motion for attorney's fees and costs is DENIED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that [18] the defendant's motion to compel arbitration is GRANTED. Plaintiff must arbitrate his claims. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that [19] the defendant's motion to dismiss is GRANTED. This case is dismissed without prejudice to the parties' ability to arbitrate this dispute. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that [20] the plaintiff's motion to strike is DENIED. Signed by Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 6/4/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JQC)
                    LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 1/13/2020, Entered: 1/13/2020 Order on Motion for Default JudgmentCourt Filing
                    ORDER. IT IS ORDERED that [26] Plaintiff's Motion for Default and Default Judgment is DENIED. Signed by Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 1/13/2020.(Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JQC)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 12/17/2019, Entered: 12/17/2019 Order on Motion for Relief from Early Neutral EvaluationCourt Filing
                      ORDER granting [41] Motion for Relief from Early Neutral Evaluation. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 12/17/2019.(Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 12/12/2019, Entered: 12/12/2019 reply
                        REPLY to Response to [41] Motion for Relief from ENE by Defendant Tesla, Inc.. (Sliker, Joshua)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 12/9/2019, Entered: 12/9/2019 response
                          RESPONSE to [41] Motion for Relief from ENE by Plaintiff Joshua J Godhart. (Godhart, Joshua)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 12/6/2019, Entered: 12/6/2019 OrderCourt Filing
                            ORDER re [41] Motion for Relief from ENE. A response shall be filed be filed no later than 12/11/2019. Any reply shall be filed no later than 12/12/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 12/6/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 12/5/2019, Entered: 12/5/2019, Terminated: 12/17/2019 Motion for Relief from ENE
                              MOTION for Relief from Early Neutral Evaluation re [37] Order Setting Early Neutral Evaluation Session, by Defendant Tesla, Inc.. Responses due by 12/19/2019. (Sliker, Joshua)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 12/3/2019, Entered: 12/3/2019 OrderCourt Filing
                                ORDER granting [39] Request for an ADA accommodation. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 12/3/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 12/2/2019, Entered: 12/2/2019 reply
                                  REPLY to [38] Order by Plaintiff Joshua J Godhart. (Godhart, Joshua)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 12/2/2019, Entered: 12/2/2019 OrderCourt Filing
                                    NOTICE REGARDING EX PARTE COMMUNICATIONS. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 12/2/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 11/21/2019, Entered: 11/21/2019 Order Setting Early Neutral Evaluation SessionCourt Filing
                                      ORDER Setting Early Neutral Evaluation Session. Early Neutral Evaluation set for 1/6/2020 at 09:30 AM in LV Chambers before Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe. The written evaluation statements shall be submitted, in an envelope marked "Confidential," directly to the undersigned's box in the Clerk's Office no later than 3:00 p.m. on 12/30/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 11/21/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 11/19/2019, Entered: 11/19/2019 Order on motion to stay discoveryCourt Filing
                                        ORDER granting [15] Motion to Stay Discovery. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 11/19/2019.(Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 11/12/2019, Entered: 11/12/2019 reply
                                          REPLY to [33] Response re [26] Motion for Default Judgment by Plaintiff Joshua J Godhart. (Godhart, Joshua) Modified docket entry relationship on 11/12/2019 (DKJ).
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 11/12/2019, Entered: 11/12/2019 Jury Demand
                                            DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Plaintiff Joshua J Godhart. (Godhart, Joshua)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 11/8/2019, Entered: 11/8/2019 response
                                              RESPONSE to [26] Motion for Default Judgment by Defendant Tesla, Inc.. Replies due by 11/15/2019. (Sliker, Joshua)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 10/29/2019, Entered: 10/29/2019 Exhibit
                                                EXHIBIT to [22] Response, [23] Response by Plaintiff Joshua J Godhart. (Godhart, Joshua)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 10/29/2019, Entered: 10/29/2019 Exhibit
                                                  EXHIBIT to [21] Response by Plaintiff Joshua J Godhart. (Godhart, Joshua)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 10/28/2019, Entered: 10/28/2019 reply
                                                    REPLY to Response to [19] Motion to Dismiss by Defendant Tesla, Inc.. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit 1 - ALJ Decision, # (2) Exhibit 2 - GC NRLB's Motion, # (3) Exhibit 3 - Fifth Circuit Order, # (4) Exhibit 4 - NLRB Docket) (Sliker, Joshua)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 10/28/2019, Entered: 10/28/2019 reply
                                                      REPLY to Response to [18] Motion by Defendant Tesla, Inc.. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit 1 - Tesla, Inc.'s 10-K, # (2) Exhibit 2 - Tesla, Inc.'s 8-K) (Sliker, Joshua)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 10/28/2019, Entered: 10/28/2019 reply
                                                        REPLY to Response to [15] Motion to Stay Discovery by Defendant Tesla, Inc.. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit 2 - Tesla, Inc.'s 10-K, # (2) Exhibit 2 - Tesla, Inc.'s 8-K) (Sliker, Joshua)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 10/28/2019, Entered: 10/28/2019 reply
                                                          REPLY to [24] Response to [16] MOTION for Attorneys' Fees by Defendant Tesla, Inc.. (Sliker, Joshua)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 10/25/2019, Entered: 10/25/2019, Terminated: 1/13/2020 Motion for Default Judgment
                                                            First MOTION for Default Judgment and Default by Plaintiff Joshua J Godhart. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit SolarCity NLRB Case) (Godhart, Joshua)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 10/24/2019, Entered: 10/24/2019 response
                                                              RESPONSE to [20] Motion to Strike by Defendant Tesla, Inc.. Replies due by 10/31/2019. (Sliker, Joshua)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 10/21/2019, Entered: 10/21/2019 response
                                                                RESPONSE to [16] Motion by Plaintiff Joshua J Godhart. Replies due by 10/28/2019. (Godhart, Joshua)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 10/21/2019, Entered: 10/21/2019 response
                                                                  RESPONSE to [18] Motion by Plaintiff Joshua J Godhart. Replies due by 10/28/2019. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit SolarCity Full Offer Packet, # (2) Exhibit SolarCity NLRB Case) (Godhart, Joshua)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 10/19/2019, Entered: 10/19/2019 response
                                                                    RESPONSE to [15] Motion to Stay Discovery by Plaintiff Joshua J Godhart. Replies due by 10/26/2019. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit Full Offer Packet, # (2) Exhibit SEC 10-k Forms, # (3) Exhibit Tesla Motors Inc. SEC 8-k Forms) (Godhart, Joshua)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 10/19/2019, Entered: 10/19/2019 response
                                                                      RESPONSE to [19] Motion to Dismiss by Plaintiff Joshua J Godhart. Replies due by 10/26/2019. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit SolarCity NLRB Case) (Godhart, Joshua)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 10/10/2019, Entered: 10/10/2019, Terminated: 6/4/2020 Motion to strike
                                                                        First MOTION to Strike [18] Motion, [15] Motion to Stay Discovery, [19] Motion to Dismiss, [16] Motion by Plaintiff Joshua J Godhart. Responses due by 10/24/2019. (Godhart, Joshua)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 10/7/2019, Entered: 10/7/2019, Terminated: 6/4/2020 Motion to Dismiss
                                                                          MOTION to Dismiss [1] Complaint by Defendant Tesla, Inc.. Responses due by 10/21/2019. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A, # (2) Exhibit B, # (3) Exhibit C, # (4) Exhibit D, # (5) Exhibit E, # (6) Exhibit F) (Sliker, Joshua)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 10/7/2019, Entered: 10/7/2019, Terminated: 6/4/2020 Motion
                                                                            MOTION to Compel Arbitration by Defendant Tesla, Inc.. Responses due by 10/21/2019. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A, # (2) Exhibit B, # (3) Exhibit C, # (4) Exhibit D, # (5) Exhibit E, # (6) Exhibit F) (Sliker, Joshua)
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Blank 17 Filed: 10/7/2019, Entered: 10/7/2019 QC Notice
                                                                              CLERK'S NOTICE of violation of the local rules and Attorney Action Required to document [14] - ERROR: Document [14] was not filed pursuant to LR IC 2-2(b) and LR IC 2-2(c) by attorney Joshua A Sliker. Attorney is advised, pursuant to LR IC 2-2(b) for each type of relief requested or purpose, a separate document must be filed. CORRECTION: Attorney Joshua A Sliker is advised to refile document [14] as Motion to Compel Arbitration and Motion to Dismiss, or Alternatively, Motion to Stay Proceedings contained in document [14] using the correct event separately, in compliance with LR IC 2-2(b), LR IC 2-2(c), LR IC 2-2(d) and FRCP 7. Document [14] terminated as filed in error pursuant to LR IC 7-1. (no image attached) (RFJ)
                                                                                LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 10/7/2019, Entered: 10/7/2019, Terminated: 6/4/2020 Motion
                                                                                MOTION for Attorneys' Fees and Costs by Defendant Tesla, Inc.. Responses due by 10/21/2019. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A, # (2) Exhibit B, # (3) Exhibit C, # (4) Exhibit D, # (5) Exhibit E, # (6) Exhibit F) (Sliker, Joshua)
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 10/7/2019, Entered: 10/7/2019, Terminated: 11/19/2019 Motion to stay discovery
                                                                                  MOTION to Stay Discovery; filed by Defendant Tesla, Inc.. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A, # (2) Exhibit B, # (3) Exhibit C, # (4) Exhibit D, # (5) Exhibit E, # (6) Exhibit F) (Sliker, Joshua)
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 10/7/2019, Entered: 10/7/2019, Terminated: 10/7/2019 Motion
                                                                                    ERROR: Document not filed per LR IC 2-2(b) and LR IC 2-2(c) by attorney Joshua A Sliker. CORRECTION: Attorney advised to refile documents using the correct events in accordance with the local rules. MOTION to Compel; filed by Defendant Tesla, Inc.. Responses due by 10/21/2019. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A, # (2) Exhibit B, # (3) Exhibit C, # (4) Exhibit D, # (5) Exhibit E, # (6) Exhibit F) (Sliker, Joshua) Document [14] terminated as filed in error, pursuant to LR IC 7-1 on 10/7/2019 (RFJ).
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 10/1/2019, Entered: 10/1/2019 Order on Motion to Extend/Shorten TimeCourt Filing
                                                                                      ORDER Granting [11] Motion to Extend Time Re: [1] Complaint. Tesla, Inc. answer due 10/7/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 10/1/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JQC)
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 9/30/2019, Entered: 9/30/2019 Certificate of Interested Parties
                                                                                        CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Tesla, Inc.. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Sliker, Joshua)
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 9/30/2019, Entered: 9/30/2019, Terminated: 10/1/2019 Motion to Extend/Shorten Time
                                                                                          First MOTION to Extend Time (First Request) to Answer or Otherwise Respond re [1] Complaint by Defendant Tesla, Inc.. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A - Correspondence between Plaintiff and Defendant's Counsel) (Sliker, Joshua)
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 9/30/2019, Entered: 9/30/2019 Generic Docket Entry
                                                                                            Notice granting pro se Joshua Godhart CM/ECF access in case 2:19-cv-001541-JAD-VCF. See [8] Order and [9] Notice. (DKJ)
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 9/27/2019, Entered: 9/27/2019 Notice - other
                                                                                              NOTICE re Certificate of ECF Training by Joshua J Godhart. (JM)
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 9/20/2019, Entered: 9/20/2019 Order on Motion for Pro Se Litigant to File ElectronicallyCourt Filing
                                                                                                ORDER Granting [5] Motion for Pro Se Litigant to File Electronically. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 9/20/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JQC)
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 9/13/2019, Entered: 9/16/2019 summons returned executed
                                                                                                  SUMMONS Returned Executed re [2] Summons Issued. Tesla, Inc. served on 9/9/2019, answer due 9/30/2019. (JQC)
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 9/6/2019, Entered: 9/6/2019 Summons issued
                                                                                                    Summons Issued as to Tesla, Inc. re [1] Complaint. (JQC)
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 9/6/2019, Entered: 9/6/2019, Terminated: 9/20/2019 Motion for Pro Se Litigant to File Electronically
                                                                                                      MOTION for Pro Se Litigant to File Electronically, filed by Plaintiff Joshua J Godhart. (JQC)
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 9/4/2019, Entered: 9/4/2019 Advisory Letter Pro Se non-habeas
                                                                                                        ADVISORY LETTER to litigant. (JQC)
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Blank 3 Filed: 9/4/2019, Entered: 9/4/2019 ENE NoticeCourt Filing
                                                                                                          NOTICE: Pursuant to Local Rule 16-6 this case has been assigned to the Early Neutral Evaluation Program. Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe will be the evaluating judge in this case. (no image attached) (JQC)
                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 9/4/2019, Entered: 9/4/2019 Summons issued
                                                                                                            Summons Issued as to Tesla, Inc. re [1] Complaint. (JQC)
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document 1 Filed: 9/4/2019, Entered: 9/4/2019 Complaint
                                                                                                              COMPLAINT against Tesla, Inc. by Joshua J Godhart. Proof of service due by 12/3/2019. (Attachments: # (1) Civil Cover Sheet, # (2) Receipt No. NVLAS065782)(JQC)
                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                              Blank  Assign Judges in Civil Case
                                                                                                              Case randomly assigned to Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey and Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach. (RT)
                                                                                                                LREF

                                                                                                                Statistics

                                                                                                                This case has been viewed 141 times.

                                                                                                                No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                Space
                                                                                                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                 
                                                                                                                PlainSite
                                                                                                                Sign Up
                                                                                                                Need Password Help?