L.M.-M. et al v. CUCCINELLI et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit District Of Columbia District Court, Case No. 1:19-cv-02676-RDM
District Judge Randolph D. Moss, presiding

Tags
Last Updated August 18, 2021 at 12:18 PM DT (1.3 months ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo B.M.-M., Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by cliniclegal.org Law Firm Placeholder

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Bradley Jenkins +1 301 565 4820 +1 301 565 4820 bjenkins@cliniclegal.org

Toggle Switch Represented by Democracy Forward Foundation

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space John T. Lewis +1 202 448 9090 jlewis@democracyforward.org

Toggle Switch Represented by raicestexas.org Law Firm Placeholder

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Manoj Gorantla Govindaiah +1 210 226 7722 +1 210 212 4856 manoj.govindaiah@raicestexas.org
No Logo B.O.-G., Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by cliniclegal.org Law Firm Placeholder

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Bradley Jenkins +1 301 565 4820 +1 301 565 4820 bjenkins@cliniclegal.org

Toggle Switch Represented by Democracy Forward Foundation

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space John T. Lewis +1 202 448 9090 jlewis@democracyforward.org

Toggle Switch Represented by raicestexas.org Law Firm Placeholder

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Manoj Gorantla Govindaiah +1 210 226 7722 +1 210 212 4856 manoj.govindaiah@raicestexas.org
No Logo I.m.a, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by cliniclegal.org Law Firm Placeholder

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Bradley Jenkins +1 301 565 4820 +1 301 565 4820 bjenkins@cliniclegal.org

Toggle Switch Represented by Democracy Forward Foundation

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space John T. Lewis +1 202 448 9090 jlewis@democracyforward.org

Toggle Switch Represented by raicestexas.org Law Firm Placeholder

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Manoj Gorantla Govindaiah +1 210 226 7722 +1 210 212 4856 manoj.govindaiah@raicestexas.org
No Logo L.M.-M., Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Bradley Jenkins +1 301 565 4820 +1 301 565 4820 bjenkins@cliniclegal.org

Toggle Switch Represented by Democracy Forward Foundation

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space John T. Lewis +1 202 448 9090 jlewis@democracyforward.org

Toggle Switch Represented by raicestexas.org Law Firm Placeholder

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Manoj Gorantla Govindaiah +1 210 226 7722 +1 210 212 4856 manoj.govindaiah@raicestexas.org
No Logo Mah, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by cliniclegal.org Law Firm Placeholder

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Bradley Jenkins +1 301 565 4820 +1 301 565 4820 bjenkins@cliniclegal.org

Toggle Switch Represented by Democracy Forward Foundation

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space John T. Lewis +1 202 448 9090 jlewis@democracyforward.org

Toggle Switch Represented by raicestexas.org Law Firm Placeholder

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Manoj Gorantla Govindaiah +1 210 226 7722 +1 210 212 4856 manoj.govindaiah@raicestexas.org
No Logo REFUGEE & IMMIGRANT CENTER FOR EDUCATION & LEGAL SERVICES, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by cliniclegal.org Law Firm Placeholder

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Bradley Jenkins +1 301 565 4820 +1 301 565 4820 bjenkins@cliniclegal.org

Toggle Switch Represented by Democracy Forward Foundation

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space John T. Lewis +1 202 448 9090 jlewis@democracyforward.org

Toggle Switch Represented by raicestexas.org Law Firm Placeholder

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Manoj Gorantla Govindaiah +1 210 226 7722 +1 210 212 4856 manoj.govindaiah@raicestexas.org
No Logo S.G.-C., Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by cliniclegal.org Law Firm Placeholder

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Bradley Jenkins +1 301 565 4820 +1 301 565 4820 bjenkins@cliniclegal.org

Toggle Switch Represented by Democracy Forward Foundation

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space John T. Lewis +1 202 448 9090 jlewis@democracyforward.org

Toggle Switch Represented by raicestexas.org Law Firm Placeholder

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Manoj Gorantla Govindaiah +1 210 226 7722 +1 210 212 4856 manoj.govindaiah@raicestexas.org
No Logo V.M.-M., Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by cliniclegal.org Law Firm Placeholder

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Bradley Jenkins +1 301 565 4820 +1 301 565 4820 bjenkins@cliniclegal.org

Toggle Switch Represented by Democracy Forward Foundation

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space John T. Lewis +1 202 448 9090 jlewis@democracyforward.org

Toggle Switch Represented by raicestexas.org Law Firm Placeholder

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Manoj Gorantla Govindaiah +1 210 226 7722 +1 210 212 4856 manoj.govindaiah@raicestexas.org
v.
No Logo KENNETH T. CUCCINELLI, II, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Archith Ramkumar +1 202 598 8060 Archith.Ramkumar@usdoj.gov

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Julian Kurz +1 202 616 4962 +1 202 305 7000 julian.m.kurz@usdoj.gov
No Logo KEVIN K. MCALEENAN, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Julian Kurz +1 202 616 4962 +1 202 305 7000 julian.m.kurz@usdoj.gov
Space Archith Ramkumar +1 202 598 8060 Archith.Ramkumar@usdoj.gov
United States Citizenship and Immigration Services United States Citizenship and Immigration Services, Defendant
Officially listed as "U.S. CITIZENSHIP & IMMIGRATION SERVICES"

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Julian Kurz +1 202 616 4962 +1 202 305 7000 julian.m.kurz@usdoj.gov
Space Archith Ramkumar +1 202 598 8060 Archith.Ramkumar@usdoj.gov
United States Department of Homeland Security United States Department of Homeland Security, Defendant
Officially listed as "U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY"

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Julian Kurz +1 202 616 4962 +1 202 305 7000 julian.m.kurz@usdoj.gov
Space Archith Ramkumar +1 202 598 8060 Archith.Ramkumar@usdoj.gov
No Logo MORTON ROSENBERG, Amicus

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Gregory M. Lipper +1 202 996 0919 +1 202 204 6320 glipper@clintonpeed.com
Office Washington, DC
Filed 9/6/2019
Jury Demand None
Demand
Nature of Suit 899 - Other Statutes: Administrative Procedures Act/Review or Appeal of Agency Decision
Cause Section 05 U.S.C. § 0706 Judicial Review of Agency Actions
Jurisdiction U.S. Government Defendant
Disposition
County 11001
Terminated
Origin 1
Reopened
Lead Case
None
Related Case
None
Other Court Case None
Defendant Custody Status
Flag TYPE-E
  Entries (74) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 65 Filed: 8/18/2021, Entered: None Status Report
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 64 Filed: 8/11/2021, Entered: None Status Report
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 63 Filed: 7/20/2021, Entered: None Notice of Withdrawal of Motion
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 62 Filed: 6/22/2021, Entered: None Stay
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 61 Filed: 6/22/2021, Entered: None Status Report
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 60 Filed: 4/23/2021, Entered: None Stay
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 59 Filed: 4/23/2021, Entered: None Status Report
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 58 Filed: 4/21/2021, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 4/21/2021, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 2/22/2021, Entered: None Stay
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 2/22/2021, Entered: None Status Report
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 12/22/2020, Entered: None Status Report
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 11/22/2020, Entered: None Notice of Voluntary Dismissal/Party
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 10/23/2020, Entered: None Stay
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 10/23/2020, Entered: None Notice of Withdrawal of Appearance
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 10/23/2020, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 9/30/2020, Entered: None Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 9/24/2020, Entered: None Attorney Fees
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 9/2/2020, Entered: None Status Report
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 8/27/2020, Entered: None USCA Order
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 8/19/2020, Entered: None Supplemental ROA Sent to USCA
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document 34 Filed: 3/1/2020, Entered: 3/1/2020 Order on Motion for Partial Summary JudgmentCourt Filing
                                            MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER: granting in part and denying in part Plaintiffs' partial motion for summary judgment, Dkt. 29, and granting in part and denying in part Defendants' partial motion for summary judgment, Dkt. 30. See document for details. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 03/01/2020. (lcrdm2, )
                                              LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 8/19/2020, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Blank  Order
                                                MINUTE ORDER: In light of the Court's Memorandum Opinion and Order, Dkt. [34], the parties are hereby ORDERED to file a joint status report on or before March 13, 2020, proposing recommended next steps for this litigation, including whether the Court should enter final judgment pursuant to Rule 54(b). Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 03/01/2020. (lcrdm2, )
                                                  LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 6/22/2020, Entered: None Status Report
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Blank  Order on Motion to withdraw as attorney
                                                    MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of Attorney Burnham's motion to withdraw appearance [33], it is hereby ORDERED that the motion is GRANTED. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 02/07/2020. (lcrdm2, )
                                                      LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 5/18/2020, Entered: None Transmission of Notice of Appeal and Docket Sheet to USCA
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 2/4/2020, Entered: 2/4/2020, Terminated: 2/7/2020 Motion to withdraw as attorney
                                                        MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by KENNETH T. CUCCINELLI, II, KEVIN K. MCALEENAN, U.S. CITIZENSHIP & IMMIGRATION SERVICES, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY (Burnham, James)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 5/15/2020, Entered: None Notice of Appeal to DC Circuit
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document 32 Filed: 1/27/2020, Entered: 1/27/2020 Response to Document
                                                            RESPONSE re [31] Notice (Other) filed by B.M.-M., I.M.-A., L.M.-M., M.A.-H., REFUGEE & IMMIGRANT CENTER FOR EDUCATION & LEGAL SERVICES, V.M.-M.. (Lewis, John)
                                                              LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 5/14/2020, Entered: None Status Report
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 1/24/2020, Entered: 1/24/2020 Notice - other
                                                                NOTICE Regarding Relevant Pending D.C. Circuit Cases by KENNETH T. CUCCINELLI, II, KEVIN K. MCALEENAN, U.S. CITIZENSHIP & IMMIGRATION SERVICES, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY (Ramkumar, Archith)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 4/16/2020, Entered: None Order
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Blank 30 Filed: 1/9/2020, Entered: 1/24/2020 Motion for partial summary judgment
                                                                    MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment by KENNETH T. CUCCINELLI, II, U.S. CITIZENSHIP & IMMIGRATION SERVICES, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY. (See Minute Order filed on 01/09/2020) (jf)
                                                                      LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 4/16/2020, Entered: None Memorandum & Opinion
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Blank  Order
                                                                        MINUTE ORDER: As previously advised, and with consent of the parties, it is hereby ORDERED that, pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 65(a)(2), the pending motion for preliminary injunction, Dkt. 12, shall be treated as a partial motion for summary judgment. The Clerk of the Court is directed to create the following events on the docket: (i) Plaintiffs' Motion for Partial Summary Judgment, dated September 27, 2019, and (ii) Defendants' Motion for Partial Summary Judgment, dated December 17, 2019. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 01/09/2020. (lcrdm2, )
                                                                          LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 4/10/2020, Entered: None Status Report
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 12/24/2019, Entered: 12/24/2019 Supplemental Memorandum
                                                                            SUPPLEMENTAL MEMORANDUM to re [12] MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment filed by B.M.-M., I.M.-A., L.M.-M., M.A.-H., REFUGEE & IMMIGRANT CENTER FOR EDUCATION & LEGAL SERVICES, V.M.-M.. (Attachments: # (1) Opposition to Defendants' Statement of Undisputed Material Facts)(Lewis, John)
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 3/13/2020, Entered: None Status Report
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document 27 Filed: 12/17/2019, Entered: 12/17/2019 Supplemental Memorandum
                                                                                SUPPLEMENTAL MEMORANDUM to re Motion Hearing,,, Set Deadlines,, Defendants' Statement of Undisputed Material Facts filed by KENNETH T. CUCCINELLI, II, KEVIN K. MCALEENAN, U.S. CITIZENSHIP & IMMIGRATION SERVICES, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY. (Ramkumar, Archith)
                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 12/17/2019, Entered: 12/17/2019 Response to Document
                                                                                  RESPONSE re [22] Notice (Other),, filed by KENNETH T. CUCCINELLI, II, KEVIN K. MCALEENAN, U.S. CITIZENSHIP & IMMIGRATION SERVICES, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY. (Ramkumar, Archith)
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 12/17/2019, Entered: 12/17/2019 MEMORANDUM
                                                                                    SUPPLEMENTAL MEMORANDUM re [12] Motion for Preliminary Injunction by KENNETH T. CUCCINELLI, II, KEVIN K. MCALEENAN, U.S. CITIZENSHIP & IMMIGRATION SERVICES, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY. (Attachments: # (1) Declaration Supplemental Declaration of Ashley Caudill-Mirillo)(Ramkumar, Archith) Modified text and linkage on 12/18/2019 (ztd).
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 12/11/2019, Entered: 12/11/2019 transcriptCourt Filing
                                                                                      TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS before Judge Randolph D. Moss held on 12/3/19; Page Numbers: 1-122. Court Reporter/Transcriber Sara A. Wick, RPR, CRR, Telephone number 202-354-3284, Transcripts may be ordered by submitting the Transcript Order FormFor the first 90 days after this filing date, the transcript may be viewed at the courthouse at a public terminal or purchased from the court reporter referenced above. After 90 days, the transcript may be accessed via PACER. Other transcript formats, (multi-page, condensed, CD or ASCII) may be purchased from the court reporter.NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have twenty-one days to file with the court and the court reporter any request to redact personal identifiers from this transcript. If no such requests are filed, the transcript will be made available to the public via PACER without redaction after 90 days. The policy, which includes the five personal identifiers specifically covered, is located on our website at www.dcd.uscourts.gov. Redaction Request due 1/1/2020. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 1/11/2020. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 3/10/2020.(ztnr)
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 12/10/2019, Entered: 12/10/2019 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal/Party
                                                                                        NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal re S.G.-C. and B.O.-G. (Lewis, John)
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 12/10/2019, Entered: 12/10/2019 Notice - other
                                                                                          NOTICE of Filing Statement of Undisputed Material Facts by B.M.-M., B.O.-G., I.M.-A., L.M.-M., M.A.-H., REFUGEE & IMMIGRANT CENTER FOR EDUCATION & LEGAL SERVICES, S.G.-C., V.M.-M. re [12] MOTION for Preliminary Injunction (Attachments: # (1) Statement of Facts, # (2) Declaration Supplemental Declaration of Shalyn Fluharty, # (3) Declaration Declaration of I.M.-A., # (4) Declaration Supplemental Declaration of L.M.-M., # (5) Declaration Supplemental Declaration of M.A.-H., # (6) Declaration Supplemental Declaration of Andrea Meza, # (7) Text of Proposed Order)(Lewis, John)
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Blank  Motion Hearing
                                                                                            Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Randolph D. Moss: Motion Hearing held on 12/3/2019 re: [12] MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by M.A.-H., REFUGEE & IMMIGRANT CENTER FOR EDUCATION & LEGAL SERVICES, B.O.-G., S.G.-C., L.M.-M., B.M.-M., V.M.-M., and I.M.-A. Plaintiffs' statement of material facts and any additional factual submission, in support thereof, are due by 12/10/2019; Defendants' response and supplemental brief are due 12/17/2019; Plaintiffs' response to Defendants' supplemental brief is due by 12/24/2019. Briefs shall be no more than 25 pages. (Court Reporter: Sara Wick.) (kt)
                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 12/1/2019, Entered: 12/1/2019 Notice of appearance
                                                                                              NOTICE of Appearance by James Mahoney Burnham on behalf of All Defendants (Burnham, James)
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Blank  Order on Motion for extension of time to answer
                                                                                                MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of Defendants' Consent Motion for an Extension of Time for Defendants to Answer or Otherwise Respond to the Complaint, Dkt. 20, it is hereby ORDERED that Defendants' Motion is GRANTED. Defendants shall file their answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint within fourteen days of the Court's issuance of its ruling on Plaintiffs' pending preliminary injunction motion. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 11/20/2019. (lcrdm2, )
                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 11/19/2019, Entered: 11/19/2019, Terminated: 11/20/2019 motion for extension of time to file answer
                                                                                                  Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re [1] Complaint, by KENNETH T. CUCCINELLI, II, KEVIN K. MCALEENAN, U.S. CITIZENSHIP & IMMIGRATION SERVICES, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order)(Ramkumar, Archith)
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 10/28/2019, Entered: 10/28/2019 Reply to opposition to Motion
                                                                                                    REPLY to opposition to motion re [12] MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by B.M.-M., B.O.-G., I.M.-A., L.M.-M., M.A.-H., REFUGEE & IMMIGRANT CENTER FOR EDUCATION & LEGAL SERVICES, S.G.-C., V.M.-M.. (Lewis, John)
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                      Blank  Order on Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                      MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of Amici's Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Dkt. 14, it is hereby ORDERED that the motion is GRANTED. Joseph Carl Cecere is hereby granted leave to appear pro hac vice in this case. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 10/21/2019. (lcrdm2, )
                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 10/21/2019, Entered: 10/21/2019 Administrative Record
                                                                                                        ADMINISTRATIVE RECORD Notice of Electronic Filing by KENNETH T. CUCCINELLI, II, KEVIN K. MCALEENAN, U.S. CITIZENSHIP & IMMIGRATION SERVICES, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit Index-Administrative Record, # (2) Exhibit Certification of Administrative Record, # (3) Exhibit Administrative Record)(Ramkumar, Archith)
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 10/21/2019, Entered: 10/21/2019 Memorandum in opposition
                                                                                                          Memorandum in opposition to re [12] MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by KENNETH T. CUCCINELLI, II, KEVIN K. MCALEENAN, U.S. CITIZENSHIP & IMMIGRATION SERVICES, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY. (Attachments: # (1) Declaration of Ashley Caudill-Mirillo, # (2) Declaration of Paul Johnson, # (3) Declaration of Michelle Monroe, # (4) Declaration of Julianna Blackwell)(Ramkumar, Archith)
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 10/21/2019, Entered: 10/21/2019 Notice of appearance
                                                                                                            NOTICE of Appearance by Archith Ramkumar on behalf of All Defendants (Ramkumar, Archith)
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document 15 Filed: 10/8/2019, Entered: 10/9/2019 Amicus Brief
                                                                                                              AMICUS BRIEF by MORTON ROSENBERG. (ztd)
                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 10/8/2019, Entered: 10/8/2019, Terminated: 10/22/2019 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- J. Carl Cecere, :Firm- Cecere PC, :Address- 6035 McCommas Blvd.. Phone No. - 469-600-9455. Fax No. - NA Filing fee $ 100, receipt number ADCDC-6430083. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by MORTON ROSENBERG (Attachments: # (1) Affidavit Declaration of J. Carl Cecere, # (2) Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Lipper, Gregory)
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Blank  order on motion for leave to file
                                                                                                                  MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of Morton Rosenberg's unopposed motion for leave to file an amicus curiae brief, Dkt. 13, it is hereby ORDERED that the motion is GRANTED. The brief that Mr. Rosenberg attached to his motion, Dkt. 13-1, is hereby deemed FILED. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 10/08/2019. (lcrdm2, )
                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 10/7/2019, Entered: 10/8/2019 motion for leave to file
                                                                                                                    Consent MOTION for Leave to File Amicus Brief by MORTON ROSENBERG (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit Amicus Brief) (jf)
                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                      Blank  Order on Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                      MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of Plaintiffs' Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Dkt. 11, it is hereby ORDERED that the motion is GRANTED. Bradley Jenkins is hereby granted leave to appear pro hac vice in this case. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 09/28/2019. (lcrdm2, )
                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                        Blank 29 Filed: 9/27/2019, Entered: 1/24/2020 Motion for partial summary judgment
                                                                                                                        MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment by B.M.-M., B.O.-G., I.M.-A., L.M.-M., M.A.-H., S.G.-C., V.M.-M. (See Minute Order filed on 01/09/2020) (jf)
                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document 12 Filed: 9/27/2019, Entered: 9/27/2019, Terminated: 3/1/2020 Motion for preliminary injunction
                                                                                                                          MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by B.M.-M., B.O.-G., I.M.-A., L.M.-M., M.A.-H., REFUGEE & IMMIGRANT CENTER FOR EDUCATION & LEGAL SERVICES, S.G.-C., V.M.-M. (Attachments: # (1) Declaration of Bridget Cambria, # (2) Declaration of Shalyn Fluharty, # (3) Declaration of L.M.-M., # (4) Declaration of M.A.-H., # (5) Declaration of Andrea Meza, # (6) Declaration of Catherine Monk and Exhibits, # (7) Declaration of Dr. Anita Ravi, # (8) Text of Proposed Order)(Lewis, John) Modified on 1/8/2020 to correct docket event/text (jf).
                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 9/27/2019, Entered: 9/27/2019, Terminated: 9/28/2019 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                            MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Bradley Jenkins, :Firm- Catholic Legal Immigration Network, Inc., :Address- 8757 Georgia Ave., Suite 850, Silver Spring, MD 20910. Phone No. - (301) 565-4820. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0090-6404536. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by B.M.-M., B.O.-G., I.M.-A., L.M.-M., M.A.-H., REFUGEE & IMMIGRANT CENTER FOR EDUCATION & LEGAL SERVICES, S.G.-C., V.M.-M. (Attachments: # (1) Declaration, # (2) Text of Proposed Order)(Lewis, John)
                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                              Blank  set/reset deadlines/hearings
                                                                                                                              Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings: Plaintiffs shall file their motion for preliminary injunction on or before 9/27/2019; Plaintiffs shall file their motion for preliminary injunction on or before 10/21/2019; Plaintiffs shall file their reply on or before 10/28/2019. Motion Hearing set for 12/3/2019, at 10:00 AM, in Courtroom 21, before Judge Randolph D. Moss. (kt)
                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                Blank  Order on Motion for Briefing Schedule
                                                                                                                                MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of the parties' joint proposed briefing schedule, Dkt. 8, it is hereby ORDERED that the motion is GRANTED. The following schedule shall govern future proceedings in this matter: Plaintiffs shall file their motion for preliminary injunction on or before September 27, 2019; Defendants shall file their opposition on or before October 21, 2019; and Plaintiffs shall file their reply on or before October 28, 2019. It is further ORDERED that the parties shall appear for oral argument on Plaintiffs' motion for preliminary injunction on December 3, 2019, at 10:00a.m. in Courtroom 21. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 09/26/2019. (lcrdm2, )
                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 9/25/2019, Entered: 9/25/2019 Notice of appearance
                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of Appearance by Julian Michael Kurz on behalf of All Defendants (Kurz, Julian)
                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 9/20/2019, Entered: 9/20/2019 Notice of appearance
                                                                                                                                    NOTICE of Appearance by Manoj Govindaiah on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Govindaiah, Manoj)
                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 9/19/2019, Entered: 9/19/2019, Terminated: 9/26/2019 Motion for Briefing Schedule
                                                                                                                                      Joint MOTION for Briefing Schedule and Stipulation by B.M.-M., B.O.-G., I.M.-A., L.M.-M., M.A.-H., S.G.-C., V.M.-M. (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order)(Lewis, John)
                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 9/13/2019, Entered: 9/13/2019 Summons Returned Executed as to Federal Defendant
                                                                                                                                        RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. KENNETH T. CUCCINELLI, II served on 9/12/2019; KEVIN K. MCALEENAN served on 9/12/2019; U.S. CITIZENSHIP & IMMIGRATION SERVICES served on 9/12/2019; U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY served on 9/12/2019, RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 9/13/19., RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 9/13/2019. ( Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 11/12/2019.) (Attachments: # (1) Declaration)(Lewis, John)
                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 9/11/2019, Entered: 9/11/2019 LCvR 26.1 Certificate of Disclosure - Corporate Affiliations/Financial Interests
                                                                                                                                          LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by REFUGEE & IMMIGRANT CENTER FOR EDUCATION & LEGAL SERVICES (Lewis, John)
                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 9/11/2019, Entered: 9/11/2019 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                            STANDING ORDER: The parties are hereby ORDERED to comply with the directives set forth in the attached Standing Order. See document for details. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 09/11/2019. (lcrdm2, )
                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 9/10/2019, Entered: 9/10/2019 Summons Issued Electronically as to AUSA
                                                                                                                                              SUMMONS (6) Issued Electronically as to KENNETH T. CUCCINELLI, II, KEVIN K. MCALEENAN, U.S. CITIZENSHIP & IMMIGRATION SERVICES, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachments: # (1) Summons, # (2) Summons, # (3) Summons, # (4) Summons, # (5) Summons)(ztd)
                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                Sealed Legal Document 3 Filed: 9/6/2019, Entered: 9/10/2019 SEALED OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                SEALED ORDER re [2] SEALED MOTION filed by B.M.-M., B.O.-G., I.M.-A., L.M.-M., M.A.-H., REFUGEE & IMMIGRANT CENTER FOR EDUCATION & LEGAL SERVICES, S.G.-C., V.M.-M.. (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.) filed by M.A.-H., REFUGEE & IMMIGRANT CENTER FOR EDUCATION & LEGAL SERVICES, B.O.-G., S.G.-C., L.M.-M., B.M.-M., V.M.-M., I.M.-A..(This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.)Signed by Chief Judge Beryl A. Howell on 9/6/19.(ztd)
                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Sealed Legal Document 2 Filed: 9/6/2019, Entered: 9/10/2019 ~~SEALED Motion
                                                                                                                                                  SEALED MOTION filed by B.M.-M., B.O.-G., I.M.-A., L.M.-M., M.A.-H., REFUGEE & IMMIGRANT CENTER FOR EDUCATION & LEGAL SERVICES, S.G.-C., V.M.-M.. (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.) (Attachments: # (1) Certificate of Service, # (2) Text of Proposed Order, # (3) Exhibit)(ztd)
                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 1 Filed: 9/6/2019, Entered: 9/10/2019 Complaint
                                                                                                                                                    COMPLAINT against KENNETH T. CUCCINELLI, II, KEVIN K. MCALEENAN, U.S. CITIZENSHIP & IMMIGRATION SERVICES, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 4616100516) filed by S.G.-C., B.M.-M., M.A.-H., I.M.-A., REFUGEE & IMMIGRANT CENTER FOR EDUCATION & LEGAL SERVICES, L.M.-M., B.O.-G., V.M.-M.. (Attachments: # (1) Civil Cover Sheet, # (2) Certificate of Service)(ztd)
                                                                                                                                                      LREF

                                                                                                                                                      Statistics

                                                                                                                                                      This case has been viewed 23 times.

                                                                                                                                                      No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                      Space
                                                                                                                                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                       
                                                                                                                                                      PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                      Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                      Need Password Help?