GRIFFIN v. COCCO BROTHERS
Federal Civil Lawsuit New Jersey District Court, Case No. 1:99-cv-05718-JBS

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo GLORIA GRIFFIN, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space GLORIA GRIFFIN
v.
No Logo COCCO BROTHERS, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space WILLIAM A. GARRIGLE +1 856 427 9300 garrigle@aol.com
Office Camden
Filed 12/8/1999
Jury Demand Defendant
Demand $0
Nature of Suit 362 - Personal Injury: Medical Malpractice
Cause Section 28 U.S.C. § 1332 Diversity-Medical Malpractice
Jurisdiction Diversity
Disposition Judgment - Motion Before Trial
County Gloucester
Terminated 9/29/2000
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flags 12BJ, CLOSED, SCHEDO
  Entries (26) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank -- Filed: 3/19/2001, Entered: 3/19/2001 Set/Reset Deadlines:
Deadline updated; terminating [16-2] hearing Motion set for 8/18/00 on [15-1] dispositive motion notice dismissing complaint (dt)
    LREF
    Blank 18 Filed: 9/29/2000, Entered: 9/29/2000 OrderCourt Filing
    ORDER granting [16-1] dispositive motion to dismiss complaint without prejudice. n.m. ( signed by Judge Jerome B. Simandle ) (db) Modified on 10/02/2000
      LREF
      Blank -- Filed: 9/29/2000, Entered: 9/29/2000 Terminated Case
      Case closed (db)
        LREF
        Blank 17 Filed: 7/24/2000, Entered: 7/25/2000 Certification
        CERTIFICATION of William A. Garrigle, Esq. on behalf of defendant COCCO BROTHERS Re: [16-1] motion to dismiss plaintiff's complaint for lack of jurisdiction (db) Modified on 08/08/2000
          LREF
          Blank 16 Filed: 7/24/2000, Entered: 8/8/2000, Terminated: 9/29/2000 Motion to Dismiss
          Notice of MOTION to dismiss complaint by COCCO BROTHERS, Motion set for 8/18/00 on [15-1] dispositive motion notice dismissing complaint . (Brief Subm) (mgr)
            LREF
            Blank 15 Filed: 7/13/2000, Entered: 8/8/2000 Notice of Intent to submit a Dispositive motion
            Notice of Intent to submit a Dispositive motion dismissing complaint by deft. COCCO BROTHERS (mgr)
              LREF
              Blank 14 Filed: 6/9/2000, Entered: 6/9/2000 Scheduling OrderCourt Filing
              SCHEDULING ORDER setting Discovery cutoff 8/31/00; Joint Final Pretrial order to be submitted on or before 2:45 1/18/01; Dispositive Motion due on or before 11/30/00 n.m. ( signed by Mag. Judge Robert B. Kugler ) (db)
                LREF
                Blank 13 Filed: 6/9/2000, Entered: 6/9/2000 OrderCourt Filing
                ORDER removing case from the Arbitration Program. n.m. ( signed by Mag. Judge Robert B. Kugler ) (db)
                  LREF
                  Blank -- Filed: 6/9/2000, Entered: 6/9/2000 Case No Longer Referred to Arbitration
                  CASE WITHDRAWN from Arbitration. (db)
                    LREF
                    Blank -- Filed: 6/7/2000, Entered: 6/7/2000 Status Conference
                    Status conference held before Mag. Judge Robert B. Kugler on 6/6/00. (db)
                      LREF
                      Blank -- Filed: 6/5/2000, Entered: 6/5/2000 Status Conference
                      Status conference held before Mag. Judge Robert B. Kugler on 06/05/00. (db)
                        LREF
                        Blank -- Filed: 5/16/2000, Entered: 5/16/2000 Scheduling Conference
                        Scheduling conference held before Mag. Judge Robert B. Kugler on 5/2/00. (femp)
                          LREF
                          Blank 12 Filed: 5/2/2000, Entered: 5/3/2000 Minutes-MiscellaneousCourt Filing
                          Minute entry: Proceedings recorded by Ct-Reporter: Tape #287; Minutes of: 5/2/00; The following actions were taken, Scheduling conference held on the record. By Mag. Judge Robert B. Kugler (ar1)
                            LREF
                            Blank 11 Filed: 4/24/2000, Entered: 4/25/2000 Minutes-MiscellaneousCourt Filing
                            Minute entry: Proceedings recorded by ; Minutes of: 4.24.00; The following actions were taken, granting [5-1] motion to extend time to answer; and terminating [5-2] hearing Motion set for 4/20/00 on [5-1] motion By Mag. Judge Robert B. Kugler (jm1)
                              LREF
                              Blank 10 Filed: 3/31/2000, Entered: 3/31/2000 OrderCourt Filing
                              ORDER, setting scheduling conference for 11:30 5/2/00 ( signed by Mag. Judge Robert B. Kugler ) (jm1)
                                LREF
                                Blank 9 Filed: 3/31/2000, Entered: 3/31/2000, Terminated: 9/29/2000 Answer
                                ANSWER to Complaint by COCCO BROTHERS; jury demand (jm1)
                                  LREF
                                  Blank -- Filed: 3/20/2000, Entered: 3/20/2000 Set/Reset Deadlines:
                                  Deadline updated; reset answer due for 4/28/00 for COCCO BROTHERS (lc)
                                    LREF
                                    Blank 8 Filed: 3/17/2000, Entered: 3/20/2000 OrderCourt Filing
                                    ORDER granting defendant Cocco Brothers an extension of time to answer until 4.28.00 ( signed by Mag. Judge Robert B. Kugler ) n.m. (lc)
                                      LREF
                                      Blank 7 Filed: 3/16/2000, Entered: 3/16/2000 Certificate Of Service.
                                      CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE/PROOOF OF MAILING re: [5-1] Notice of motion. (lc)
                                        LREF
                                        Blank 6 Filed: 3/16/2000, Entered: 3/16/2000 Affidavit
                                        AFFIDAVIT of William A. Garrigle on Re: [5-1] motion to extend time to answer (lc)
                                          LREF
                                          Blank 5 Filed: 3/16/2000, Entered: 3/16/2000, Terminated: 4/24/2000 Motion for Extension of Time to FileCourt Filing
                                          Notice of MOTION to extend time to answer by defendant, COCCO BROTHERS [5-1] motion referred to Mag. Judge Robert B. Kugler, Motion set for 4/20/00 on [5-1] motion (MEMO SUBMITTED) (lc)
                                            LREF
                                            Blank 4 Filed: 2/25/2000, Entered: 2/28/2000 Summons Returned Executed
                                            USM RETURN OF SERVICE of summons and complaint, executed as to COCCO BROTHERS on 2/8/00. Answer due on 2/28/00 for COCCO BROTHERS (lc)
                                              LREF
                                              Blank 3 Filed: 12/30/1999, Entered: 12/30/1999 Case Assigned/ReassignedCourt Filing
                                              NOTICE of Allocation and Assignment filed. Magistrate Judge ROBERT B. KUGLER (femp)
                                                LREF
                                                Blank 2 Filed: 12/9/1999, Entered: 12/30/1999 OrderCourt Filing
                                                ORDER, granting in forma pauperis, ordered that the clerk shall issue summons to the US marshals. ( signed by Judge Jerome B. Simandle ) (femp) Modified on 01/04/2000
                                                  LREF
                                                  Blank 1 Filed: 12/9/1999, Entered: 12/30/1999 Complaint
                                                  COMPLAINT filed with application to proceed in forma pauperis. (femp)
                                                    LREF
                                                    Blank -- Filed: 12/8/1999, Entered: 12/9/1999 Complaint Received
                                                    Complaint Received. (femp)
                                                      LREF

                                                      Statistics

                                                      This case has been viewed 22 times.

                                                      No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                      Space
                                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                       
                                                      PlainSite
                                                      Sign Up
                                                      Need Password Help?