Munich Re and Other Underwriters Subscribing to Lloyds Policy B0595JZ086017H a/s/o Tesla, Inc. v. Total Airport Services, LLC et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit California Central District Court, Case No. 2:19-cv-08052

Tags
Last Updated November 7, 2019 at 12:47 AM ST (1.4 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Munich Re and Other Underwriters Subscribing to Lloyds Policy B0595JZ086017H a/s/o Tesla, Inc., Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Gibson Robb & Lindh LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Joshua A Southwick +1 415 348 6000 +1 415 348 6001 jsouthwick@gibsonrobb.com
v.
No Logo Nippon Cargo Airlines Co., Ltd., Defendant
No Logo Total Airport Services, LLC, Defendant
  Entries (10) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 11/7/2019, Entered: None Clerks Entry of Default (CV-37) - optional html form
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 10/30/2019, Entered: None Clerk to Enter Default
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 10/23/2019, Entered: None Initial Order Setting R26 Scheduling Conference - form only
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 9/20/2019, Entered: None Initial Order upon Filing of Complaint - form only
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 9/19/2019, Entered: None Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 9/17/2019, Entered: 9/17/2019 Corporate Disclosure Statement
            CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Plaintiff Munich Re and Other Underwriters Subscribing to Lloyds Policy B0595JZ086017H a/s/o Tesla, Inc. identifying N/A as Corporate Parent. (Southwick, Joshua)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 9/17/2019, Entered: 9/17/2019 Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties
              Certification and NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Munich Re and Other Underwriters Subscribing to Lloyds Policy B0595JZ086017H a/s/o Tesla, Inc., identifying Munich Re Syndicate Limited; Beazley Furlonge Limited; Beazley Furlonge Limited; Navigators Underwriting Agency Limited; MS Amlin Underwriting Agency Limited; Catlin Underwriting Agencies Limited; Liberty Managing Agency Ltd; Canopius Managing Agents Ltd; W R Berkley Syndicate Management Ltd; Cathedral Underwriting Limited; Hiscox Syndicates Limited. (Southwick, Joshua)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 9/17/2019, Entered: 9/17/2019 Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71)
                CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Munich Re and Other Underwriters Subscribing to Lloyds Policy B0595JZ086017H a/s/o Tesla, Inc.. (Southwick, Joshua)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 9/17/2019, Entered: 9/17/2019 Summons Request
                  Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), [1] filed by Plaintiff Munich Re and Other Underwriters Subscribing to Lloyds Policy B0595JZ086017H a/s/o Tesla, Inc.. (Southwick, Joshua)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document 1 Filed: 9/17/2019, Entered: 9/17/2019 Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)
                    COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-24454113 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiff Munich Re and Other Underwriters Subscribing to Lloyds Policy B0595JZ086017H a/s/o Tesla, Inc.. (Attorney Joshua A Southwick added to party Munich Re and Other Underwriters Subscribing to Lloyds Policy B0595JZ086017H a/s/o Tesla, Inc.(pty:pla))(Southwick, Joshua)
                      LREF

                      Statistics

                      This case has been viewed 144 times.

                      No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                      Space
                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                       
                      PlainSite
                      Sign Up
                      Need Password Help?